Ebersol v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Aaron D. Ebersol
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 8:2020cv01626
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy and Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. Served on pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (drm)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 PRO SE NOTICE to Aaron D. Ebersol with acknowledgement of receipt of pro se notice, copy of local rules and pro se handbook. (jel, )
January 15, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #8 Certificate of Service - Replaced document with correct certificate of service of notice of attorney appearance. (jel, )
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security re 7 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner (Parrington, Kevin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/15/2021) (jel, ).
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin Michael Parrington appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 4/14/2021. (Parrington, Kevin)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Having considered the application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915, Plaintiff's #3 in forma pauperis application is GRANTED. Pursuant to General Order No. 18 of this District, Defendant shall file a certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute Defendant's answer, within 90 days of said service, or a motion to dismiss the Complaint within 90 days of said service. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/4/2021. (Copy served on Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail)(jdp )
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 1/20/2021. (khr)(Mailed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued at time complaint was filed 12/30/2020. (khr)(Copy of Pro Se notice, handbook, GO #18 mailed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aaron D. Ebersol. (khr)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (khr)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebersol v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron D. Ebersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kevin Michael Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?