Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. v. Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc.
Plaintiff: Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. doing business as Panoramic Images
Defendant: Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00041
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd.. Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Dunne, Joseph)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement for Meir Teitelbaum only Response to Motion due by 2/5/2021 filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Dunne, Joseph) Modified on 2/3/2021 to reflect that this is not a motion to withdraw. (mab).
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Meir Teitelbaum, Email address is meir.teitelbaum@sriplaw.com. Admissions due by 1/27/2021. [Copy of notice served upon Attorney Teitelbaum via email](kmc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/6/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/13/2021) (kmc, ).
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (Copy of report served upon Register of Copyrights via regular mail on 1/13/2021] (kmc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc. (kmc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/13/2021) (kmc, ).
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5381052) filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmc)
January 13, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 # Summons Issued and #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order. Clerk inadvertently had a clerical error in the case numbers on the documents. Clerk corrected the documents and replaced them. (kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. v. Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adirondack Country Homes Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. doing business as Panoramic Images
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?