Griffin v. DiNapoli
Plaintiff: Kevin Griffin
Defendant: Thomas P. DiNapoli
Case Number: 8:2021cv00282
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #6 Report and Recommendations by Kevin Griffin. (hmr)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT-RECOMMENDATIONS AND ORDER: re #1 Complaint, filed by Kevin Griffin: Recommended, that Plaintiff's Complaint be Dismissed with Prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) & 1915(A); Ordered, that Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is Denied; and Ordered, that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Report-Recommendation and Order upon the parties to this action.(Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2021, Case Review Deadline 4/19/2021), Motions terminated: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kevin Griffin. filed by Kevin Griffin.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 03/31/2021. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff at Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929 via regular mail on 3/31/2021.)(hmr)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: that Plaintiff meets the requirement for economic need and thus may properly proceed with this matter in forma pauperis.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 03/31/2021. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail at Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929 on 3/31/2021.)(hmr)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kevin Griffin.(nas )
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Kevin Griffin. (nas )
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(nas, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas P. DiNapoli filed by Kevin Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 cover letter; civil cover sheet, #4 envelope)(nas ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2021: #5 Notice of Motion) (nas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. DiNapoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. DiNapoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?