Warrington v. Hudson Headwaters Health Network et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Warrington
Defendant: Adirondack Radiology Associates, P.C., Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 8:2021cv00522
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Letter Request from Ransom P. Reynolds for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting an extension of time to answer. Answer deadline reset to 8/20/2021. The Initial Conference is reset for 9/17/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Albany. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/10/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/2/2021. (tab)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 Letter Motion from Ransom P. Reynolds for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA requesting an extension of time submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Reynolds, Ransom)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER setting Answer due date for Defendant United States of America. Answer deadline is set for 7/6/2021. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/30/2021. (tab)
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. VanDenburgh on behalf of Adirondack Radiology Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Appearance of John W. VanDenburgh, Esq.)(VanDenburgh, John)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 COURT NOTICE of Conference: the Initial Conference has been reset for Tuesday, 8/3/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tab)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' letter request to withdraw their motion to dismiss and proceed with their motion to substitute the United States of America as a defendant in place of Hudson Headwaters Health Network and Ellen Deprey. Dkt. No. 11. Plaintiff does not oppose Defendants' motion to substitute. Dkt. No. 7 at 5. Defendants' letter request is GRANTED and their motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 5 is withdrawn. Additionally, Defendants' Motion to substitute is GRANTED and the United States of America will be added as a defendant and Hudson Headwaters Health Network and Ellen Deprey will be terminated as defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on June 21, 2021. (sas)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER BRIEF by Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network. (Reynolds, Ransom)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER REQUEST & ORDER granting defendants' #9 Request for an extension of time to file a reply re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ellen Deprey & Hudson Headwaters Health Network. Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/21/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on June 02, 2021. (sas)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Ransom P. Reynolds for Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network requesting an extension of time submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Reynolds, Ransom)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 6/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (tab)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #5 Motion to Dismiss,,, Motion to Substitute Party,,, Motion to Remand,, filed by Patricia Warrington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Mills, Christopher)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Lufkin Schilling on behalf of Adirondack Radiology Associates, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Appearance of Diane Lufkin Schilling, Esq.)(Schilling, Diane)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network. Motion returnable before Judge Lawrence E. Kahn(. Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/7/2021 ), MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network., MOTION to Remand filed by Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network.(. Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/7/2021 ) Response to Motion due by 6/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Reynolds, Ransom)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ellen Deprey, Hudson Headwaters Health Network re #1 Notice of Removal (Reynolds, Ransom)
May 7, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Ellen Deprey answer due 5/13/2021; Hudson Headwaters Health Network answer due 5/13/2021. (hmr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/1/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (hmr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Essex Supreme Court, case number CV20-0351 filed by Hudson Headwaters Health Network, Ellen Deprey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warrington v. Hudson Headwaters Health Network et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Warrington
Represented By: Christopher K. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adirondack Radiology Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Diane Lufkin Schilling
Represented By: John W. VanDenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Deprey
Represented By: Ransom P. Reynolds, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Headwaters Health Network
Represented By: Ransom P. Reynolds, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ransom P. Reynolds, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?