Mahay v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Marc Mahay
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00540
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Joseph E. Field for Walgreen Co. requesting Extension of deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint and adjournment of initial pre-trial conference until after a response is filed submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Field, Joseph)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Field on behalf of Walgreen Co. (Field, Joseph)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marc Mahay. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 5/13/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Hartt, James)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (pjh, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/2/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Walgreen Co. (pjh, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Walgreen Co. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5520488) filed by Marc Mahay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Exhibit B - US EEOC Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Holly Shabazz Email, #4 Declaration of James D. Hartt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahay v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Joseph E. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Mahay
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?