Montes v. George
Plaintiff: Germaine Montes
Defendant: Carolyn B. George
Case Number: 8:2021cv00892
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER RE: #10 Letter Request. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until 10/25/2021 to file objections to the report-recommendation. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to renew by properly filing a motion in compliance with Local Rule 7.1. Authorized by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on September 27, 2021. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Germaine Montes requesting an extension of time to file objections to the report-recommendation and for appointment of counsel. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Germaine Montes Effective Date 09/22/2021 Old Address: Bare Hill Correctional Facility, Caller Box 20, Malone, NY 12953 New Address: Moriah Shock Incarceration Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 999, Mineville, NY 12956. (hmr)
September 22, 2021 Copy of Dkt. Nos. 7 and 8 served on plaintiff at Moriah Shock Incarceration Facility. (nas, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT - RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER #1 Complaint filed by Germaine Montes:it is hereby RECOMMENDED, that Plaintiffs Complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice with leave to file an amended complaint; and it is ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Report-Recommendation and Order upon the parties to this action. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), the parties have fourteen (14)2 days within which to file written objections to the foregoing report. Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court. FAILURE TO OBJECT TO THIS REPORT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS WILL PRECLUDE APPELLATE REVIEW.( Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2021, Case Review Deadline 10/4/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on September 17, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(gmd, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on September 17, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(gmd, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Signed by Senior District Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 8/30/2021. (Copy served via regular mail on Plaintiff Germaine Montes)(map)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Germaine Montes. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (map)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM filed by Germaine Montes. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(map)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: that because this action was not property commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court within Thirty (30) Days of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $402.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form; that upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review and that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application and Inmate Authorization Form.Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 08/11/2021. (Copy served via regular mail upon Germaine Montes on 8/12/2021, along with a blank IFP form and Inmate Authorization Form.)(hmr)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Germaine Montes on 8/10/2021. [Copies of Pro Se Notice, Local Rules & Pro Se Handbook mailed to pro se plaintiff via regular mail on 8/10/2021.] (hmr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Carolyn B. George filed by Germaine Montes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montes v. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn B. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?