Walker v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Thomas Craig Walker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 8:2021cv01198
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace Lawrence on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Lawrence, Candace)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Having considered the application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915, Plaintiff's #3 in forma pauperis application is GRANTED. Pursuant to General Order No. 18 of this District, Defendant shall file a certified transcript of the administrative proceedings, which shall constitute Defendant's answer, within 90 days of said service, or a motion to dismiss the Complaint within 90 days of said service. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/8/2021. (jdp )
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe and Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (hmr)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Thomas Craig Walker advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Holland, William)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul Nitze appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 1/31/2022. (Nitze, Paul)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 11/23/2021. (map)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Craig Walker. (map)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (map)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: SSA - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Craig Walker
Represented By: William Robert Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Paul Nitze
Represented By: Candace Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?