Argonaut Insurance Company v. Heartland Manufacturing Group et al
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Defendant: Heartland Manufacturing Group, Heartland Manufacturing Co., LLC, Heartland Manufacturing, Heartland Companies, Inc. and Fall River Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00784
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Counsel for Plaintiff for Argonaut Insurance Company requesting Pre-Motion Conference submitted to Judge Kahn . (Levien, Bradley)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fall River Holdings, LLC. (hmr)
August 9, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FALL RIVER HOLDINGS, LLC f/k/a HEARTLAND MANUFACTURING GROUP, Heartland Manufacturing Co., LLC, Heartland Manufacturing, and Heartland Companies, Inc. filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Levien, Bradley) Modified on 8/9/2022 (hmr).
August 9, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #5 Amended Complaint: Clerk added "Heartland Manufacturing Co., LLC, Heartland Manufacturing, and Heartland Companies, Inc. filed by Argonaut Insurance Company" to this docket entry, since they were not added to the docket entry when this document was filed. (hmr)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Argonaut Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Argonaut Insurance Company.. (Levien, Bradley)
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2022 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/19/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/27/2022) (egr, ).
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Heartland Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Heartland Manufacturing Co., LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Heartland Manufacturing Group, #3 Summons Issued as to Heartland Manufacturing)(egr)
July 27, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order has been replaced as the original was erroneously filed. Docket Entry #3 now reflect the correct G.O. 25. (egr)
July 27, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has checked off Jury Demand on the Civil Cover Sheet, but the Jury Demand is not noted in the Pleading, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 38. Failure to file a Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 38 constitutes a waiver of a jury trial. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 8/1/2022 (egr)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heartland Companies, Inc., Heartland Manufacturing, Heartland Manufacturing Co., LLC, Heartland Manufacturing Group (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5979985) filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut Insurance Company v. Heartland Manufacturing Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J. Levien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Manufacturing Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Manufacturing Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fall River Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?