Town of Plattsburgh v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Town of Plattsburgh
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 8:2025cv00099
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town of Plattsburgh. The United States of America served on 3/4/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Napoli, Paul)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Town of Plattsburgh; Attorney Andrew W. Croner, Esq., Email address is acroner@napolilaw.com. Phone number is (212) 397-1000. Admissions due by 2/5/2025. (jel, )(Served by email to attorney along with copy of General Order 25)
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/16/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to the U.S. Attorney General)(jel, )
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The United States of America (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7001568) filed by Town of Plattsburgh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Plattsburgh v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Plattsburgh
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Nicholas H. Mindicino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?