Diaz v. Pelo et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Diaz
Defendant: Stephanie Pelo, C. Fraser, Kenneth McKeighan, Rodney Eastman, Christopher Miller and Rachel A. Young
Case Number: 9:2015cv00776
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Presiding Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION, ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 7/30/19. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that 77 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in all respects. ORDERED that 59 Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendants' motion for summary judgment with respect to plaintiff's due process claim against defendant Young is DENIED and that claim will proceed to trial; Defendants' motion for summary judgment with respect to all other claims is GRANTED. ORDERED that the followin g claims are DISMISSED: a. due process claim against defendant Pelo for deduction of $1,660.20 from plaintiff's inmate account; b. retaliation claim against defendants Pelo and Young for deducting $1,660.20 from plaintiff's inm ate account; c. retaliation claim against defendants Fraser and Eastman for issuing plaintiff a false IPC report; d. due process claim against defendant McKeighan regarding the IPC and IGRC impeachment hearings; e. retaliation claim against def endant McKeighan for affirming plaintiff's IPC placement; f. retaliation claim against defendants Eastman and Miller for upholding plaintiff's IPC placement; and g. retaliation claim against defendant Pelo for issuing plaintiff a false misbehavior report. ORDERED that 73 Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. ORDERED that Trial on the sole remaining due process claim against defendant Young is scheduled for Tuesday, August 6, 2019, in Utica, New York with pre-trial papers due on or before 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, July 23, 2019. ORDERED that Plaintiff's prior request for pro-bono trial counsel, ECF No. 58, is considered renewed and GRANTED and counsel will be assigned in due course. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 3/28/19. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that 22 Report and Recommendationis accepted and adopted in all respects. ORDERED that 17 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part; Plaintiff's conspiracy and equal protection claims are DISM ISSED as against all defendants; and Defendants are directed to file an answer to the Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Decision and Order. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 4/17/17. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Pelo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Pelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth McKeighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?