Barnes v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Arrello Barnes
Defendant: Anthony Annucci, Donald Venetozzi, Christopher Miller, R. Eastman, Kenneth McKeighan, R. Boyea, Frazier, Coveny, Borowski, Ollies, Janora, J. Whitford, Richard J. Mahuta, J. Hanson, Stickney, Joseph P. Maxwell, Matt Waters, R. Bell, S. Narkiewicz and K. West
Case Number: 9:2015cv00777
Filed: June 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Chemung
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JUDGMENT that the Order, Report, and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 105 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. That defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 97 ) is GRANTED. That Barnes' cross-motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 102 ) is D ENIED. That Barnes' second amended complaint (Dkt. No. 72 ) is DISMISSED. That the clerk close this case, in accordance with the 111 Order issued by Senior District Judge Gary L. Sharpe on March 27, 2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 76 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. ORDERED that Barnes' second amended complaint (Dkt. No. 72 ) is accepted for filing. ORDERED that the fourth, seventh, and ninth causes of action asserted in the second amended complaint (Dkt. No. 72) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that defendants Borowski, Janora, Waters, Bell, Narkiewicz, West, and Frazier are DISMISSED from this action. ORDERED that the following claims may pro ceed: (1) Fourteenth Amendment procedural due process claim against defendants Coveny, Whitford, and McKeighan; (2) First Amendment free speech claim against defendants Ollies and Mahuta; (3) First Amendment free exercise claim against Mahuta; and (4) Fourteenth Amendment procedural due process claims against defendants Annucci and Venetozzi in their supervisory capacities. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/19/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 70 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 61 ) is GRANTED with respect to the following causes of action and that they are DISMISSED wi thout prejudice to plaintiff's filing of his second amended complaint, which has already been filed (Dkt. No. 72) that cures the deficiencies identified in the Report and Recommendation: (1) plaintiff's First Amendment free speech claims asserted against defendants McKeighan, Frazier, Whitford, Maxwell, and Borowski; (2) plaintiff's First Amendment access to courts claim asserted against defendants Bell, Narkiewicz, and West; (3) plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment due proc ess claims asserted against defendants Frazier, Ollies, Mahuta, Hanson, Maxwell, Whitford, and Borowski; and (4) plaintiff's supervisor liability claims asserted against defendants Annucci and Venetozzi. ORDERED that defendants Frazier, Wh itford, Maxwell, Borowski, Bell, Narkiewicz, West, Annucci, and Venetozzi are DISMISSED from the action. ORDERED that, if plaintiff's second amended complaint does not cure the deficiencies identified in the Report and Recommendation the f ollowing causes of action survive defendants' motion and proceed to discovery: (1) plaintiff's First Amendment free speech claims asserted against defendants Ollies and Mahuta; (2) plaintiff's First Amendment free exercise claim asserted against defendant Mahuta; (3) plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment due process claims asserted against defendants Coveny and McKeighan. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/1/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 56 ) isADOPTED in its entirety. ORDERED that defendants' motion to revoke plaintiff's IFP status and conditionally dismiss the complaint in this matter, (Dkt. No. 30 ), is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/7/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's renewed motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 53 ) is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/20/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrello Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Venetozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth McKeighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Boyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Whitford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Mahuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Narkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?