Reeder v. Uhler et al
Plaintiff: Raszell Reeder
Defendant: Superintendent Uhler, DSS Bell, Capt. Bishop, Capt. Zerniak, Sgt. Smith, Officer Reif, Officer Ramsdell, Lieutenant Quinn, Lieutenant Salls, Video Officer Drumm and Mental Health Worker Marinelli
Case Number: 9:2015cv01078
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Mae A. D'Agostino
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 180 Motion in Limine: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 173-1) is GRANTED in pa rt and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion in limine (Dkt. No. 180) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 8/8/2019. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff)(ban)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 DECISION AND ORDER that Magistrate Judge Dancks' May 7, 2019 Order and Report-Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons stated therein; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. [1 21]) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Deputy Superintendent Bell as a Defendant in this case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 5/28/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; adopting Report and Recommendations re 70 Report and Recommendations. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/27/2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(ban)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 29 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to amend his complaint (Dkt. No. 29 ) is DENIED as unnecessary in light of the current amended pleading deadline. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/8/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's letter motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 21 ) is DENIED without prejudice for the reasons set forth above. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 22 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 23 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/9/15. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeder v. Uhler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raszell Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Uhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSS Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Zerniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Reif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Salls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Video Officer Drumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Worker Marinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?