McMillian v. Graham et al
Plaintiff: |
Herman Carlee McMillian |
Defendant: |
Harold Graham, David Walters and Robert Thomas Johnson |
Case Number: |
9:2016cv00277 |
Filed: |
March 9, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Cayuga |
Presiding Judge: |
Mae A. D'Agostino |
Presiding Judge: |
Daniel J. Stewart |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 14, 2018 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 82 Report and Recommendations: The Court hereby ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Stewart's Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 82) is ADOPTED in its en tirety for the reasons stated therein; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 44) is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendant's favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/14/2018. (Copy served via regular to plaintiff)(ban)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing
86
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief (Dkt. Nos. 71 , 73 , 74 , 76 , 77 , 78 , 80 , 81 , 83 , 85 ) are DENIED. ORDERED that Plaintiff is barred from filing any further motions for preliminary injunctive relief in this matter without first obtaining leave of the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 1/18/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
72
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 59 , 61 , 63 , 65 , 67 , and 68 ) are DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/8/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
June 22, 2017 |
Filing
58
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 50 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/22/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
December 30, 2016 |
Filing
36
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief (Dkt. Nos. 30 , 32 and 34 ) are DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/30/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?