W. et al v. Conway et al
Plaintiff: V. W., R. C., C. I., M. R., F. K. and J. P.
Defendant: Eugene Conway, Esteban Gonzalez, Kevin M. Brisson and Syracuse City School District
Case Number: 9:2016cv01150
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Onondaga
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/28/2017. (ptm)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: ORDERED that; 1. The proposed settlement agreement is preliminarily approved subject to further consideration at a Settlement Fairness Hearing; 2. The form of the Notice to the Class of the Settlement Agreement (the "Notice") is approved for distribution; 3. The Notice shall be distributed by the Onondaga County defendants on or before Friday, July 7, 2017 as follows: (a) copies shall be posted, and shall remained posted for forty-five days, in English and Spanish in pr ominent and visible locations accessible to all juvenile inmates on a daily basis, and (b) copies shall be delivered to every juvenile housed in the Justice Center during the forty-five day Notice period; 4. Defendants shall maintain, for a period of forty-five days, at least two copies of the proposed settlement agreement for review by juveniles in any unit where juveniles are housed; 5. The Onondaga County defendants shall file and serve on plaintiffs' counsel a declaration on or befo re Monday, July 10, 2017, affirming that these Notice requirements have been met; 6. Any class member shall have the right to submit a written objection to the Court in accordance with the Notice's terms; 7. Any such objection must be postmarke d on or before Monday, August 21, 2017; 8. Any class member who does not timely make his or her objection in writing must do so in person at the Fairness Hearing; 9. Any class member who fails to object in writing or at the Fairness Hearing shal l be deemed to have waived any such opportunity and shall forever be foreclosed from objecting to the proposed settlement agreement; and 10. A Fairness Hearing shall be held on Monday, August 28, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Utica, New York, at which time the Court will determine whether the Settlement Agreement should be given final approval as fair, reasonable, and adequate. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 6/28/17. (alh, )
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that 1. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is GRANTED (Dkt. No. 5 ); 2. Defendant Syracuse City School District's motion for summary judgment is DENIED (Dkt. No. 28 ; 3. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED (Dkt. No. 46 ; 4. The Onondaga County defendants, their agents, servants, employees, and officers, and all other persons in active concert or participation with them and who receive actual notice of this preliminary injunction, by personal service or otherwise, are hereby IMMEDIATELY ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED, pending the final determination of this action, from imposing 23-hour disciplinary isolation on juveniles at the Justice Center; 5. The Onondaga County defendants and the School District shall IMMEDIATELY afford all eligible juveniles the educational instruction to which they are entitled under NewYork State's laws and regulations; 6. The Onondaga County defendants and the Sch ool District shall IMMEDIATELY afford all juveniles with qualifying disabilities under the IDEA with the special education services and other procedural protections to which they are entitled; and 7. Discipline imposed on juveniles by the Onondaga County defendants must include meaningful social interaction with others, including other juveniles, and no discipline may be imposed that directly harms a juvenile's psychological condition. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/22/17. (alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. et al v. Conway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. W.
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Represented By: Philip L. Desgranges
Represented By: Christopher T. Dunn
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Mariana L. Kovel
Represented By: Samuel C. Young
Represented By: Susan M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. C.
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Represented By: Philip L. Desgranges
Represented By: Christopher T. Dunn
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Mariana L. Kovel
Represented By: Samuel C. Young
Represented By: Susan M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. I.
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Represented By: Philip L. Desgranges
Represented By: Christopher T. Dunn
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Mariana L. Kovel
Represented By: Samuel C. Young
Represented By: Susan M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. R.
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Represented By: Philip L. Desgranges
Represented By: Christopher T. Dunn
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Mariana L. Kovel
Represented By: Samuel C. Young
Represented By: Susan M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. K.
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Represented By: Philip L. Desgranges
Represented By: Christopher T. Dunn
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Mariana L. Kovel
Represented By: Samuel C. Young
Represented By: Susan M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. P.
Represented By: Joshua T. Cotter
Represented By: Philip L. Desgranges
Represented By: Christopher T. Dunn
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Mariana L. Kovel
Represented By: Samuel C. Young
Represented By: Susan M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Conway
Represented By: Kathleen M. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esteban Gonzalez
Represented By: Kathleen M. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Brisson
Represented By: Kathleen M. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse City School District
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fellows
Represented By: Kate I. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?