Yunus v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Equan Yunus
Defendant: Douglas Jones, Kevin Foster, Robert Mccauley, Winchell, Joshua Alger, Timothy Smith, Garrido and Robert Underwood
Case Number: 9:2016cv01282
Filed: October 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DECISION AND ORDER that Defendants' post-judgment request for costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and Local Rule 54.1(a) of the Local Rules of Practice for this Court (Dkt. No. 96) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, such that cost s are awarded to Defendants from Plaintiff in the amount of ONE THOUSAND SEVEN HUNDRED SIXTY DOLLARS AND FIFTY-EIGHT CENTS ($1,760.58), consisting of the following: (1) one thousand two hundred eighteen dollars and seventy-five cents ($1 ,218.75) for Plaintiff's deposition on October 11, 2018; (2) five hundred dollars and eight cents ($500.08) in fees for witnesses' attendance at the trial held on February 18, 2020, February 19, 2020, and February 20, 2020; and ( 3) forty-one dollars and seventy-five cents ($41.75) for copies of papers (specifically, a copy of Defendants' 167-page initial disclosures provided pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, at a rate of twenty-five cents per page). Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 6/5/2020. (Copy served upon Plaintiff via regular mail). (sal )
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum directing the Superintendent of the Orleans Correctional Facility, or the correctional facility in which Michael Harris, #06-A-0448, is imprisoned and detained, to deli ver Harris, dressed in civilian attire, to the U.S. Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 S. Clinton Street, 11th floor, in Syracuse, New York on Wednesday, February 19, 2020 at 8:30 AM and any recessed date thereafter (his testimony is expected to la st half of the day on February 19, 2020) until the conclusion of his testimony, or when ordered by the Court, and that you return him to the above-named facility under your custody, under safe and secure conduct. The Clerk of Court is directed to ser ve an electronic certified copy of this Order, together with said Writ, to the Orleans Correctional Facility, to serve as notice to prepare Harris for transport. In the event the action is settled prior to the trial, it shall be incumbent upon defend ants or their authorized representative to notify the designated institution where Harris is housed and cancel such Writ to produce. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/3/2020. (Copy served via regular mail upon Plaintiff, and via e-mail to Orleans Correctional Facility and USMS). (sal )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECISION AND ORDER that Magistrate Judge Baxter's Report-Recommendation (Dkt. No. 49 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in its entirety. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 44 ) is GRANTED in part such that all claims against Defe ndants Smith and Foster are DISMISSED from this action. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 44 ) is DENIED in part such that the following claims against Defendants Jones, Alger, Garrido and Underwood SURVIVE Defendants' mo tion: (1) Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Jones arising from Jones' alleged confiscation of Plaintiff's personal property on November 21, 2013; (2) Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim ag ainst Defendant Jones arising from Jones' allegedly false misbehavior report filed against Plaintiff on November 22, 2013; (3) Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Alger arising from Alger's alleged overly intrusive searches of Plaintiff on November 20, 2013, and January 17, 2014; (4) Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendants Garrido and Underwood arising from Garrido's alleged overly intrusive search of Plaintiff ( and Underwood's alleged failure to intervene in that search) on January 23, 2014; (5) Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment sexual-assault claim against Defendant Alger arising from Alger's alleged overly intrusive searches of Plaintiff on N ovember 20, 2013, and January 17, 2014; and (6) Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment sexual-assault claim against Defendants Garrido and Underwood arising from Garrido's alleged overly intrusive search of Plaintiff (and Underwood's alleged failure to intervene in that search) on January 23, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/26/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal )
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Baxter's Report-Recommendation (Dkt. No. 22 ) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in its entirety. ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 19 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) are DISMISSED with prejudice, other portions of the Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice, and the remaining portions of Plaintiff's Complaint SURVIVE this Decision and Order, as set forth on page 30 through 33 of the Report-Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/1/17. {order served via regular and certified mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yunus v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equan Yunus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mccauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?