Gutek v. The People of The State of New York
Plaintiff: Anthony Dennis Gutek
Defendant: The People of the State of New York
Case Number: 9:2017cv00471
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: Brenda K. Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 52 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's motions for extension of time for service and consolidation (Dkt. Nos. 63 , 65 ) are DENIED as moot and the Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 13 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/11/2020. (rjb, )
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 13 ) is ACCEPTED for filing and is the operative pleading in this action. ORDERED that the Clerk shall revise the docket to add (i) "David Parsons" as a defendant i n place of defendant "John Doe #2;" (ii) "Ronald Riquier" as a defendant in place of defendant "John Doe #3;" and (iii) "Franklin Birt" as a defendant in place of "John Doe #4." ORDERED that the Cl erk shall issue a summonses and forward them, along with copies of the Second Amended Complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon the defendants. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summonses and Second Amended Complaint to the Office of the County Attorney for Broome County, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. ORDERED, that a response to the Second Amended Complaint be filed by the defendants, or their counsel, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/1/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that the amended complaint (Dkt. No. 9 ) is accepted for filing and is deemed the operative pleading. ORDERED that the Office of the County Attorney for Broome County is hereby requested to produce the information spec ified above, to the extent that it can, regarding the identity of the defendants within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order. The information should be sent to the Clerk of the Court for the Northern District of New York a long with a copy of this Decision and Order, as well as to plaintiff at his address of record. Once this information is provided, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for furtherreview. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 8/11/17. ( Case Review Deadline 9/11/2017) (served on plaintiff by regular mail; served on the County Attorney for Broome County with a copy of the amended complaint by regular mail)(alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutek v. The People of The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dennis Gutek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?