DeJesus et al v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Francisco DeJesus, Herron Emerenciano and Rashad Scott
Defendant: Anthony Annucci, Michael Kirkpatrick, Donald Venettozzi, Michael Dixon, Jeffery Rock, Earl Bell, Jerry Kowalowski, Daniel Holdridge, John Doe I, John Doe II and John Doe III
Case Number: 9:2018cv00372
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Daniel J. Stewart
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRIAL ORDER : The jury trial in this case shall begin on August 15, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Syracuse, New York before the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby. Any request to the Court to issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to produce an inmate witnes s to testify at trial must be made by June 27, 2022. All counsel must appear before the undersigned at a final pretrial conference on August 8, 2022 at 10:00 AM at the James Hanley Federal Building, 100 South Clinton Street, Syracuse, New York. A ll pretrial submissions, including any motions in limine, must be filed on or before July 25, 2022, and all responses to motions in limine must be filed on or before August 1, 2022. This order supersedes all deadlines previously set. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/10/2022. (sal)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECISION AND ORDER that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 69 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as described in this Decision and Order. The Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment for Defendants on the following claims, wh ich are DISMISSED: (a) Plaintiff Emerenciano's retaliation claim under the First Amendment against Defendant Bell; (b) Plaintiff Scott's retaliation claim under the First Amendment against Defendant Houck; (c) Plaintiff Emerenciano� 39;s due process claim under the Fourteenth Amendment against Defendant Bell; (d) Plaintiff Emerenciano's due process claim under the Fourteenth Amendment against Defendant Venettozzi; (e) Plaintiff DeJesus' supervisory liability clai m against Defendant Venettozzi; and (f) Plaintiff Emerenciano's supervisory liability claim against Defendant Venettozzi. The following claims SURVIVE this motion for summary judgment: (a) Plaintiff DeJesus' retaliation claim under the First Amendment against Defendant Dixon; (b) Plaintiff DeJesus' retaliation claim under the First Amendment against Defendant Rock; and (c)Plaintiff Emerenciano's retaliation claim under the First Amendment against Defendant Kowalowski. The Clerk of Court shall TERMINATE the following individuals as Defendants in this action: Earl Bell, Richard Houck, and Donald Venettozzi. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/31/2022. (sal )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DECISION AND ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 25 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as described within this Decision and Order. The following claims are DISMISSED: (a) Plaintiff Scott's First Claim under the First Amendment to the extent it is asserted against Defendants Holdridge, Crowley, and Gregory; (b) Plaintiff DeJesus' Third and Fourth Claims under the Fourteenth Amendment; (c) Plaintiff Scott's Fifth Claim under the First and/or Fourteen th Amendment; and (d) Plaintiffs' Second Claims of supervisory liability against Defendants Annucci and Kirkpatrick. The following claims SURVIVE this motion to dismiss: (a) Plaintiffs' First Claim under the First Amendment as asserted b y Plaintiffs DeJesus and Emerenciano against all relevant Defendants, and as asserted by Plaintiff Scott to the extent it is asserted against Defendant Houck based on his alleged transfer of Plaintiff; (b) Plaintiff Emerenciano's Third Clai m under the Fourteenth Amendment against Defendant Bell; (c) Plaintiff Emerenciano's Fourth Claim under the Fourteenth Amendment against Defendant Venettozzi; and (d) Plaintiffs' Second Claim of supervisory liability against Defendant Venettozzi. Defendants Annucci, Kirkpatrick, Holdridge, Crowley, and Gregory are DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/23/2019. (sal)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION: ORDERED, that the Motion to Substitute Yolanda Keyes (Dkt. No. 27 ), as Administratrix, for her deceased father Francisco DeJesus, as a Plaintiff in this action, is GRANTED. ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court shall subst itute Yolanda Keyes, as the Plaintiff on the docket for purposes of pursuing Plaintiff Francisco DeJesus' claims in her capacity as Administratrix of the Estate of Francisco Dejesus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/28/18. (nas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeJesus et al v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco DeJesus
Represented By: Michael E. Cassidy
Represented By: Alissa R. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herron Emerenciano
Represented By: Michael E. Cassidy
Represented By: Alissa R. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashad Scott
Represented By: Michael E. Cassidy
Represented By: Alissa R. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Venettozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Kowalowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Holdridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?