Sankara v. The State of New York et al

Plaintiff: Ahmadou Sankara
Defendant: John Doe(s), Officer Anderson, The State of New York, Officer Duheak, DOCCS and Jan Doe
Case Number: 9:2018cv01214
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
1 Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 6 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel (Dkt. No. #5 ) is DENIED without prejudice. In a Decision and Order filed on November 9, 2018, the Court granted Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP. Dkt. No. #4 . IFP status has not been revoked. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for IFP status is DENIED as moot. The deadline for submission of an amended complaint in compliance with the Court's Decision and Order (Dkt. No. #4 ) is extended and reset to January 6, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to timely submit an amended complaint, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further order of the Court. Plaintiff may file a renewed motion for counsel after his amended complaint has been reviewed and accepted for filing. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank form Section 1983 complaint for his use in preparing an amended complaint. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/6/18. {text order and form 1983 civil rights packet served on plaintiff}(nas, )
December 3, 2018 5 Letter Motion from Ahmadou Sankara requesting appointment of counsel and ifp. (nas, )
November 9, 2018 4 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed IFP (Dkt. No. #2 ) is DENIED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) because Plaintiff has three "strikes" and is not entitled to the "imminent danger" exception; ORDERED that this action shall be DISMISSED unless, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Decision and Order, Plaintiff pays the Court's filing fee of four hundred dollars ($400.00) in full; ORDERED that upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the Clerk of the Court shall return the file to this Court for review of Plaintiff's Complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A; ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this Decision and Order, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this action, without prejudice, without further order of this Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/9/18. (Order served via regular mail on plaintiff). (rar)
October 11, 2018 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Ahmadou Sankara. (nas, )
October 11, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ahmadou Sankara. (nas, )
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Anderson, DOCCS, Jan Doe, John Doe(s), Duheak, The State of New York filed by Ahmadou Sankara. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sankara v. The State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Duheak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmadou Sankara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?