Franks v. Eckert et al
Plaintiff: Shaquan Franks
Defendant: Dr. Loricchio Andola, Dr. J. Wolf, William Lee, A. Russo, A. Acevedo, Dr. Jacqueline Elevitt, Katherine Bergamasco, Chreyl Morris, Stewart Eckert, DSP, Dr. Mikhail Gusman, Betty-Jo Gable, Superintendent, E. Burnett and Heidi Lewis
Case Number: 9:2018cv01282
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shaquan Franks Effective Date 12/23/18 Old Address: Wende Correctional Facility New Address: 508 Williams Ave, #2B, Brooklyn NY 11207 (nas, )
December 26, 2018 Copy of dkt. no. 13 and updated copy of docket sheet served on plaintiff at 508 Williams Ave, #2B, Brooklyn NY 11207 (nas, )
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's Section 1983 claims for monetary relief against defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ORDERED that if plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action he must file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that upon the filing of an amended complaint as directed, the Clerk shall return the file to this Court for further review. ORDERED that in the event plaintiff fails to file a signed amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this action without prejudice due to plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and to comply with the terms of this Decision and Order, without further order of this Court. ORDERED that the Clerk shall TERMINATE each of the defendants from Wende Correctional Facility and Sullivan Correctional Facility because the claims against these defendants were not transferred to this District pursuant to the Transfer Order (Dkt. No. 11). Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/19/18. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline 1/22/2019, Case Review Deadline 2/19/2019){order served via regular mail on plaintiff} (nas, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00589. electronically transferred when case opened
November 1, 2018 Remark: A copy of #1 Complaint has been mailed to Plaintiff, along with a blank 1983 complaint form, and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint. (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; that Plaintiff's requests for preliminary injunctive relief, to compel Defendants to answer and for default judgment are denied; that the claims set forth on the Complaint dealing with the Sullivan Correctional Facility are severed and transferred to the Southern District of New York; that the claims set forth on the Complaint dealing with the Eastern Correctional Facility are severed and transferred to the Northern District of New York; that Defendants Superintendent, Burnett, DSP, Lewis, Wolf Lee, Morris, Gusman, Andola, and Russo are terminated from this action, and that that Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint as directed within 45 days of entry of this Order; that in the event Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint as directed, the Complaint shall be dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk of Court shall close this case as dismissed without further order; and that in the event the Complaint is dismissed because Plaintiff has failed to file an amended complaint, leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/31/2018. Copy mailed to Plaintiff.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for an order to force defendants to answer by Shaquan Franks.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment by Shaquan Franks.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Shaquan Franks, dated 9/9/2018, to Clerk. (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for an order compelling defendants to answer by Shaquan Franks. (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Shaquan Franks, dated 8/13/2018, to Clerk. (Status update reply letter sent.) (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Immediate Injunction by Shaquan Franks.(SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shaquan Franks.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Shaquan Franks.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shaquan Franks.(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. Acevedo, Loricchio Andola, Katherine Bergamasco, E. Burnett, DSP, Stewart Eckert, Jacqueline Elevitt, Betty-Jo Gable, Mikhail Gusman, William Lee, Heidi Lewis(IOB, Eastern Correctional Facility), Heidi Lewis(IOB, Sullivan Correctional Facility), Chreyl Morris, A. Russo, Superintendent, J. Wolf, filed by Shaquan Franks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including Privacy Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KLH) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/1/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. Eckert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Loricchio Andola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jacqueline Elevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Bergamasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chreyl Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mikhail Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty-Jo Gable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaquan Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?