Cole v. The People of the State et al

Plaintiff: Demitrius Cole
Defendant: Marcy Correctional Facility, John Doe Slasher, Superintendent Oneida County where claim arose and The People of the State
Case Number: 9:2018cv01296
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Christian F Hummel
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 USPS Tracking Information for service of Dkt. No. 11 on Cole. (nas, )
November 27, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 12/27/2018 Case Review Deadline 1/28/2019 (rar, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECISION AND ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (Dkt. No. #6 ) is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to renew. Should plaintiff wish to proceed with this action, he must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a renewed in forma pauperis application detailing his current post-release financial condition within thirty (30) days from the date of the filing of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the Clerk shall return the file to the Court for further consideration and, if appropriate, review of the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements as set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be DISMISSED without prejudice without further Order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/27/2018. (Order and blank IFP form served on Plaintiff via certified mail and regular mail) (rar, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:18-cv-06467. electronically transferred when case opened
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/17/2018. This action will be transferred to the Northern District of New York. The pending IFP motion will be left to the Northern District to resolve. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Demitrius Cole updating his address from Wyoming Correctional to 176 Gooding Street, Lockport, NY 14094. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demitrius Cole. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Marcy Correctional Facility, Superintendent Oneida County where claim arose, The People of the State, John Doe Slasher against Demitrius Cole. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on 7/10/2018. (Copy mailed to plaintiff.) (LB) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court will administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee, and will send Plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion form with supporting affirmation. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he must notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order by submitting (1) a properly supported in forma pauperis motion with the requisite trust fund account certification, or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and the $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total). If Plaintiff submits a proper in forma pauperis motion or the filing fees, the Clerk of Court will reopen this case. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/3/2018. (Copy mailed to plaintiff with form on 7/10/2018.) (LB) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIRMATION of Service filed by Demitrius Cole. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demitrius Cole. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Demitrius Cole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. The People of the State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Slasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Oneida County where claim arose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demitrius Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?