Tallon v. Main

Petitioner: Dante A. Tallon
Respondent: Robert G. Main, Jr.
Case Number: 9:2018cv01316
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2019 4 MOTION for Reconsideration of #3 Order filed by Dante A. Tallon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 cover letter; affidavit of service, #3 envelope) (nas, )
November 12, 2018 3 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. The Clerk is directed to serve petitioner with a blank IFP Application for that purpose. ORDERED that petitioner must file an amended petition within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order. The Clerk is directed to provide petitioner with a blank 2254 habeas petition for that purpose. ORDERED that, if petitioner does not properly commence said action or file an amended petition within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this action without further order.( Notice of Compliance Deadline 12/12/2018, Case Review Deadline 1/14/2019). Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 11/7/18. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, )
November 9, 2018 2 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Case reassigned to Senior U.S. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy for all further proceedings. Judge Glenn T. Suddaby no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/9/18. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, )
November 9, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dante A. Tallon.(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tallon v. Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dante A. Tallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert G. Main, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?