Vail v. O'Gorman et al

Plaintiff: Timothy A. Vail and Timothy Vail
Defendant: Joseph Bellnier, Scott Kelly, James O'Gorman, Gerald Gardner, Amber Tomlin, Erie Bell, Louis Pingotti, R. Bishop and Joseph Smith
Case Number: 9:2019cv00034
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: David E Peebles
1 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to plaintiff that eight copies of complaint and eight USM-285 forms are required by 4/8/19 for the US Marshals to effect service.(nas)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is ACCEPTED for filing. ORDERED that the following claims asserted in the complaint require a response: (1) Fourteenth Amendment procedural due process asserted against all defendants; and (2) First Amendment retaliation asserted against defendants Smith, Pingotti, Tomlin, Gardner, Bellnier, O'Gorman, and Kelly. ORDERED that the following claims are DISMISSED without prejudice: (1) Fourteenth Amendment substantive due process asserted against all defendants; (2) First Amendment retaliation asserted against defendant Bell; and (3) Fourteenth Amendment equal protection asserted against all defendants. ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon defendants Smith, Bell, Pingotti, Tomlin, Gardner, Bellnier, O'Gorman, and Kelly. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summonses and complaint by mail to the Office of the New York State Attorney General, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/8/19. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:18-cv-06601. electronically transferred when case opened
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This Court further determines that it is in the interest of justice that all claims arising in Shawangunk Correctional Facility be severed and transferred to the Northern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). This Court makes no ruling as to the sufficiency of the Plaintiffs claims as to Shawangunk Defendants, and instead this Court leaves those issues to the Northern District of New York. Plaintiffs Attica claims and all claims against Defendant Bishop are dismissed without prejudice and that Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint as directed above by forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/3/18. (mailed plaintiff a copy of this order, a copy of the original Complaint, a blank 1983 complaint form, and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint) (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 1/10/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Timothy Vail as to #1 Complaint filed by Timothy Vail. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 1/10/2019.]
August 21, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Privacy notice, consent form and civil case timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 1/10/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Vail.(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 1/10/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Vail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 envelope, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover letter)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 1/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vail v. O'Gorman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bellnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Pingotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy A. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?