Stewart v. Albany County et al

Plaintiff: Kazhmel Stewart
Defendant: Albany County, Michael Lyons and Craig D. Apple, Sr.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00574
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kazhmel Stewart. (nas, )
June 23, 2019 Updated copy of docket sheet served via regular mail on plaintiff. (nas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 6 Order Reopening Case sent to Stewart. Address sent to Albany County Correctional Facility. Envelope read "Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. No Longer Incarcerated at Facility." (rar, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kazhmel Stewart Effective Date 6/2/19 Old Address: Albany County Correctional Facility New Address: NIC, 1500 Hazen Street, East elmhurst NY. Dkt. No. 7 served on plaintiff at this address. (nas, )
June 6, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 7/8/2019 Case Review Deadline 8/6/2019 (nas, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED as incomplete. Plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (2) submit an IFP application which has been completed and signed by him and which has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility. ORDERED that in the event plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court and the Clerk shall close the case. Upon plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 6/6/19. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Judge David N. Hurd on 5/31/19. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Kazhmel Stewart. (nas, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Kazhmel Stewart. (nas, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kazhmel Stewart. (Attachments: #1 cover letter; envelope) (nas, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 5/15/19. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albany County, Craig D. Apple, Sr, Michael Lyons filed by Kazhmel Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Albany County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazhmel Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D. Apple, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?