Warner v. Fernandez
Petitioner: Derek A. Warner, Jr.
Respondent: Veronica Fernandez
Case Number: 9:2019cv00848
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Letter dated 8/11/2019 advising the court that the filing fee for this case was released from his inmate account filed by Derek A. Warner, Jr. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
August 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SYR055616. [Money to be refunded as petitioner has already paid the filing fee on 8/8/2019.] (meb)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon the United States Attorney for the Northern District of New York in accordance with the Local Rules; and it is ORDERED that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Decision and Order; and it is ORDERED that petitioner may, but is not required to, file a reply within thirty (30) days of the filing date of respondent's answer. Response due by Veronica Fernandez on 10/15/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 8/14/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
August 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SYR055562 (nas, )
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 8/26/2019, Case Review Deadline 9/25/2019. (rep)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that petitioner's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that petitioner must pay the required filing fee of five dollars ($5.00) within thirty (30) days of the date of this Decision and Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to retain the petition for thirty (30) days from the filing date of this Decision and Order. If petitioner pays the filing fee, the Clerk of the Court shall then return this file to the Court. If petitioner fails to submit the required filing fee of five dollars ($5.00), this action will be dismissed without further order from the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on July 24, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(rep)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Derek A. Warner, Jr. (nas, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Derek A. Warner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derek A. Warner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Veronica Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?