Sipe v. County of Saratoga et al
Plaintiff: Adam Sipe
Defendant: Michael H. Zurlo and County of Saratoga
Case Number: 9:2019cv01048
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Letter Request/ Letter Motion from Brienna L. Christiano, Esq. for County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo requesting proposed Confidentiality Agreement to be so ordered submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Confidentiality Agreement)(Christiano, Brienna)
September 26, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/26/2020 at 10:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Defense counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 11/25/2019. Discovery cutoff is 8/3/2020 (plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 5/5/2020; defendants' expert disclosures due by 6/19/2020; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 7/6/2020). Substantive motions to be filed by 10/2/2020. Anticipated length of trial: 3 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/26/2019. (nmk)
September 26, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 9/26/2019 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel. Mandatory disclosures have been exchanged. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of District Judge Hurd. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration. A telephonic status conference is set for 2/26/2020 at 10:30 AM. Appearances: Mark Mishler, Esq. for plaintiff; Brienna Christiano, Esq. for defendants. Time: 9:59 AM - 10:13 AM. (nmk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo re #7 Notice of Appearance (Christiano, Brienna)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brienna L. Christiano on behalf of County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo (Christiano, Brienna)
September 17, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the court's calendar, the telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 9/23/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 9/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Adam Sipe. (Mishler, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo re #4 Answer to Complaint (Murphy, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo.(Murphy, Michael)
August 23, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for County of Saratoga answer due 8/29/2019; Michael H. Zurlo answer due 8/29/2019. (meb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/16/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to the #1 Notice of Removal filed by County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo. (meb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saratoga County Supreme Court, case number 2019-1557 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4847401) filed by County of Saratoga, Michael H. Zurlo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sipe v. County of Saratoga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Sipe
Represented By: Mark S. Mishler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Zurlo
Represented By: Michael J. Murphy
Represented By: Brienna L. Christiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Saratoga
Represented By: Michael J. Murphy
Represented By: Brienna L. Christiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?