Rodriguez v. Monroe et al
Plaintiff: Willie Rodriguez
Defendant: Tracy McCoy, Ulster County, John Doe, Monroe, Bell, Whitaker, Williams and Sedlak
Case Number: 9:2019cv01244
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Copy of complaint; order and summons served on the County Attorney for Ulster County. (nas, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bell, Tracy McCoy, Monroe, Sedlak, Whitaker, and Williams. Service packets forwarded to the USMS for service. {Copy of summons, complaint, and #4 Order also sent to the New York State Attorney General's Office via regular mail}.(rep) Modified on 12/3/2019 (rep, ).
November 26, 2019 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Coxsackie Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #3 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (rep)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is ACCEPTED for filing only to the extent that it asserts (1) Eighth Amendment failure to protect claims against defendants Monroe, Whitaker, Bell, Williams, and Sedlak; and (2) First Amendment retaliation claims against defendants Bell, Sedlak, and Mccoy; and it is further ORDERED that, except as to the foregoing, the claims asserted in plaintiff's complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court TERMINATE from the docket John Doe Chief Administrative Officer, John Doe Corporal, John Doe Sergeant, and Ulster County; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon defendants Monroe, Whitaker, Bell, Williams, Sedlak, and Mccoy. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summonses and complaint by mail to the Office of the New York State Attorney General, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on November 25, 2019. (Copy served as directed)(rep)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Willie Rodriguez. (nas, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie Rodriguez. (nas, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bell, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Tracy McCoy, Monroe, Sedlak, Ulster County, Whitaker, Williams filed by Willie Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulster County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?