Strauss v. Noeth
Petitioner: Charles D. Strauss
Respondent: Attica Correctional Facility and Joseph Noeth
Case Number: 9:2019cv01360
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Clerk respectfully update the docket to include the name of the proper respondent, Superintendent of Attica Correctional Facility, Joseph Noeth; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Local Rule 72.4(e); and it is further ORDERED that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. [Response due by Joseph Noeth served on 11/14/2019, answer due 2/12/2020.] Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(Served as directed)(meb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06741. electronically transferred when case opened
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/18/19. (mailed a copy of this order to petitioner)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/5/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Charles Strauss, dated 10/4/19, to Clerk of Court (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/5/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/5/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ROC011777 (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/5/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Charles D. Strauss. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strauss v. Noeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attica Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Noeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles D. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?