Bouchet v. Kasulke et al
Plaintiff: Perry Bouchet
Defendant: Gouverneur Correctional Facility, Nurse Fitzgerald and Robert Kasulke
Case Number: 9:2019cv01369
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks by telephone. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/18/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copy sent electronically to plaintiff's counsel}.(rep)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Nurse Fitzgerald, Gouverneur Correctional Facility, and Robert Kasulke. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Gouverneur Correctional Facility, #2 Summons Issued as to Robert Kasulke)(rep) Modified on 12/20/2019 - summonses emailed to attorney Bryan Brockington (rep).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court reviewed file and notes that counsel for plaintiff has failed to obtain admission to practice in this court and failed to file a notice of appearance as directed in Dkt. No. #12 . Counsel has also failed to submit proposed summonses. Therefore, plaintiffs counsel shall complete his admission documents, file a notice of appearance and appropriate summonses by 12/20/2019. Failure to do so may result in sanctions including administrative closure of the file, or dismissal for failure to prosecute and follow court orders. The Clerk is directed to forward this Text Order via email to plaintiff's counsel. {Text Order sent to attorney Bryan Brockington via email at bryanjbrockingtonesq@gmail.com}.Authorized by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on December 9, 2019. (Admissions due by 12/20/2019., Notice of Compliance Deadline 12/20/2019)(rep)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Plaintiff's Counsel; Attorney Bryan John Brockington, Esq., Email address is bryanjbrockingtonesq@gmail.com. Phone number is (718) 513-9904. Admissions are due by 11/20/2019. {Admission notice sent via email}.(rep)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01359. electronically transferred when case opened
November 5, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York. (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: Therefore, venue is proper in that district under Subsection (2). I direct the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the Northern District of New York forthwith. The case is transferred without this court's making any finding concerning (1) whether federal jurisdiction exists, (which is to say, whether a federal question has been pleaded); (2) whether Gouverneur Correctional Facility is a suable entity; or (3) whether any of the pleaded claims is barred by the statute of limitations. All such matters will be taken up in the Northern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #6 First Letter. ENDORSEMENT: I do not understand your deference to an "appropriate cover letter." I am ordering that the case be reopened. Mr. Brockington has 10 business days to show cause why this case - which involves events that took place in the Northern District of New York - should not be transferred there forthwith. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/7/2019) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Nurse Fitzgerald, Gouverneur Correctional Facility, Robert Kasulke. Document filed by Perry Bouchet.(Brockington, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16340634, paid on 2/13/2019. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bryan J. Brockington. The party information for the DEFENDANTS have been modified. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. UNKNOWN DEFENDANT has been removed from the case. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Perry Bouchet. Document filed by Perry Bouchet.(Brockington, Bryan) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gp). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
October 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bryan Brockington to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong PDF is associated with the pleading. (The Civil Cover Sheet PDF was attached as the initial pleading). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Bryan Brockington dated 9/26/2019 re: Re-Opening Case. Document filed by Perry Bouchet.(Brockington, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Brockington, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against Nurse Fitzgerald, Gouverneur Correctional Facility, Robert Kasulke. Document filed by Perry Bouchet.(Brockington, Bryan) Modified on 10/1/2019 (gp). [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet for Complaint, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proof of Payment)(Brockington, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case. (Brockington, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 4/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/7/2017) (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
February 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
February 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Bryan John Brockington. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]
February 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bryan John Brockington to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 2/19/2019. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouchet v. Kasulke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gouverneur Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kasulke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Bouchet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?