Carrigan v. Sticht
Defendant: Thomas Sticht
Petitioner: Mark C. Carrigan
Case Number: 9:2019cv01539
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing response to the Habeas Corpus Petition: It is ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Local Rule 72.4(e); and it is further ORDERED that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/19/2019. [Response due by Thomas Sticht served on 12/19/2019, answer due 3/18/2020.] (Attachments: #1 Petition)(meb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/18/2019. (meb)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number SYR056509. (meb)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: It is hereby ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility; and it is further ORDERED that upon petitioner's compliance with this order, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order on petitioner along with a blank IFP Application. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/16/2019. (meb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Records filed as exhibits 1-9 to the #1 Petition by Mark C. Carrigan. (meb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark C. Carrigan.(meb) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/16/2019 with a copy without the exhibits, which will be filed separately) (meb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrigan v. Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark C. Carrigan
Represented By: John Gilsenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?