Coston et al v. Conway et al
Plaintiff: Lando McMurren, Troy Derby, Tyvonni Purnell, Demonte Perryman, Joshua Kirkland, Sean Patterson, Sheleek Cage, Gregory Lewis, Antoine Felder, Dwight Vaughn, Rashod Coston, Joe Washington, Tony Starling, Jordan Fierece, Monbrel Popel, James Everson, Nestor D. Hernandez-Ortiz, Hassan Nelson, Adah Schenandoah, Jhamel Curriders, Drevionne Taylor, Devon O'Brien, Walter Telfer, Jamel Felton, Earl Hooks, Harris Decreke, G. Knighton, Marshall Pam, Daniel Carroll, Moab Agnew-El, Kaleb Culkins, Jonathan Ingram, Blair Seals, Patrick Kelly, Frank D'Agostino, William Ezell Boyde, Jr., Derrick Harris, Jaydin Huddleston, Savon Swain, D. Miller, Azariah Anderson, Donald Peterson, Victor Alamo-Clemente and David Carroll
Defendant: Mahoney, Peterson, New York State Commission of Corrections, Eugene Conway, New York State Attorney General, State of New York, Onondaga County Sheriff's Office, Onondaga County Justice Center, Sgt. Carsten, Lt. Miller, Andrew Cuomo and Executive McMahon
Case Number: 9:2019cv01552
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Order of 1/6/2020 and blank ifp and authorization forms reserved on Coston at Elmira C.F. (nas, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Rashod Coston. Old Address: Onondaga County Justice Center. New Address: Elmira Correctional Facility. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 36 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to D'Agostino Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Perryman Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Carroll Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Harris Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 32 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Adah Schenandoah. [clerk notes change of address to Jamesville C.F. - docket modified](nas, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Adah Schenandoah. (nas, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Harris Decreke. Envelope reads "D. Harris?"; return to sender. (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Washington Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Agnew-EL Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads" not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Culkins Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. sent to Cage Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "NYS DOCCS". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Fierce (Pierce) Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender - not here". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, ) (Main Document 25 replaced on 1/17/2020) (nas, ).
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Felton Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 23 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to O'Brien Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Popel Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Boyde Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Felder Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - NYS DOCCS". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Coston Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - NYS DOCCS". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Peterson Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here - return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Kirkland Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Hernandez-Ortiz Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads"not here-return to sender". (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Ingram Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads 'not here - NYS DOCCS". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Curriders (Corriders) Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender - rel". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/2020) (nas, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Tony Starling. (nas, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tony Starling. (nas, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Earl Hooks. (nas, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Earl Hooks. (nas, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Lewis Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Knighton Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to Harris Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not here". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #5 Order. Sent to D. Miller Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "not sure- return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order of 1/6/20) (nas, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff Felder shall file a letter within thirty (30) days of the date of this Decision and Order providing the Court with his prison identification number. ORDERED that plaintiff Coston's IFP application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice as incomplete. ORDERED that each of the forty-three plaintiffs must individually, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Decision and Order, either (a) pay the Court's filing fee of $400.00 in full or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application in accordance with this Decision and Order and a signed inmate authorization form reflecting his individual consent to pay the $350.000 filing fee over time, in installments. ORDERED that if, within the time period specified above, any of the plaintiffs fail to comply with the terms of this Decision and Order delineated above, the non-compliant individual will be terminated from the docket and any claims asserted by that non-compliant individual will be dismissed from the action without prejudice without further Order of this Court. ORDERED that, upon full compliance with this Decision and Order, or at the expiration of the deadline to comply, whichever is earlier, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/6/2020. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiffs}(nas)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Rashod Coston.(nas, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Rashod Coston. (nas, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rashod Coston. (nas, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Cuomo, Mahoney, Executive McMahon, Lt. Miller, New York State Attorney General, New York State Commission of Corrections, Onondaga County Justice Center, Onondaga County Sheriff's Office, Peterson, State of New York filed by Troy Derby, Adah Schenandoah, Joshua Kirkland, Kaleb Culkins, William Ezell Boyde, Jr, Rashod Coston, Earl Hooks, Devon O'Brien, Derrick Harris, Lando McMurren, Donald Peterson, Dwight Vaughn, Harris Decreke, Tyvonni Purnell, Nestor D. Hernandez-Ortiz, Walter Telfer, Jaydin Huddleston, Victor Alamo-Clemente, Antoine Felder, Hassan Nelson, Monbrel Popel, Sheleek Cage, Demonte Perryman, Moab Agnew-El, James Everson, Joe Washington, Jamel Felton, Jonathan Ingram, Patrick Kelly, Gregory Lewis, Savon Swain, G. Knighton, Jordan Fierece, Frank D'Agostino, Blair Seals, Azariah Anderson, Marshall Pam, Drevionne Taylor, Jhamel Curriders, David Carroll, D. Miller, Tony Starling, Sean Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 envelope)(nas, ) Modified on 12/20/2019 to reflect correct 1st name of deft. Carroll (nas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coston et al v. Conway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lando McMurren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Derby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyvonni Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demonte Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheleek Cage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashod Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Starling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Fierece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monbrel Popel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor D. Hernandez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adah Schenandoah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhamel Curriders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drevionne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Telfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamel Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris Decreke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Knighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Pam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moab Agnew-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleb Culkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ezell Boyde, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaydin Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savon Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azariah Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alamo-Clemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Commission of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onondaga County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onondaga County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?