Howard v. Schenectady County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Dushawn Sean Howard
Defendant: J. Dickerson, Schenectady County Sheriff Department, D. Dagostino, J. Vanhoeson, L. Labrake, Cufari, C.F.G. Enterprises and Barrett
Case Number: 9:2020cv00264
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Dushawn Sean Howard. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall provide the superintendent of the prison facility in which plaintiff is currently confined, with a copy of plaintiff's inmate authorization form (Dkt. No. #4 ), and notify the official that this action has been filed and that plaintiff is required to pay the entire statutory filing fee of $350.00 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's second IFP application (Dkt. No. #3 ) is DENIED as moot; andit is further ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); and it is further ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff fails to amend his complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Decision and Order, the action will be DISMISSED without prejudice without further order of the Court; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Dkt. No. #5 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on April 8, 2020. (Copy served via regular mail)(rep)
April 9, 2020 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Clinton Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #4 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (rep)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Dushawn Sean Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (rep)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Dushawn Sean Howard. (rep)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION: for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Dushawn Sean Howard.(rep)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Dushawn Sean Howard. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement, #2 Copy of Letter to Inmate Accounts, #3 Proposed Summons) (rep)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Barrett, C.F.G. Enterprises, Cufari, D. Dagostino, J. Dickerson, L. Labrake, Schenectady County Sheriff Department, and J. Vanhoeson. Filed by Dushawn Sean Howard. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Mailing Envelope)(rep) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2020: #4 Affidavit and Certificate of Service) (rep, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (rep, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (rep, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (rep, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Schenectady County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenectady County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Dagostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vanhoeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Labrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cufari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.F.G. Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dushawn Sean Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?