Woods v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Lee Woods
Defendant: Jill Grant, John or Jane Does 11-15, Joseph Bellnier, Donald Venettozzi, Maureen Bosco, Kristin Woodlock, John or Jane Does 46-50, James O'Gorman, John or Jane Does 21-25, Donna Hall, John or Jane Does 1-5, Dr. Carl Koenigsmann, Dale Artus, Anthony Gonzalez, Beth Halburian, Dr. John Morley, Peter Russell, John or Jane Does 56-60, John Tauriello, Bill Vertoske, John or Jane Does 51-55, John or Jane Does 36-40, Christopher Tavella, John or Jane Does 76-80, Debra Mennig, John or Jane Does 31-35, John or Jane Does 16-20, Raymond Coveny, Michael Hogan, Christopher Mayer, John or Jane Does 71-75, John or Jane Does 66-70, Ann Marie Sullivan, Anthony Annucci, Lynda Battaglia, David Rock, John or Jane Does 41-45, Donald Sawyer, John or Jane Does 6-10, Steven Claudio, Christopher Miller, Deborah McCulloch, Albert Prack, Joseph Noeth, John or Jane Does 26-30 and John or Jane Does 61-65
Case Number: 9:2020cv00570
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Christopher Tavella. (meb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 49 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 15, 2020 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Lynda Battaglia. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Bosco, #2 Summons Issued as to Gonzalez, #3 Summons Issued as to Grant, #4 Summons Issued as to Halburian, #5 Summons Issued as to Hall, #6 Summons Issued as to Hogan, #7 Summons Issued as to Mayer, #8 Summons Issued as to McCulloch, #9 Summons Issued as to Mennig, #10 Summons Issued as to Russell, #11 Summons Issued as to Sawyer, #12 Summons Issued as to Sullivan, #13 Summons Issued as to Tautriello, #14 Summons Issued as to Vertoske, #15 Summons Issued as to Woodlock)(meb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 46 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 45 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 44 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 43 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 14, 2020 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Raymond Coveny served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Christopher Miller served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Joseph Noeth served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Dale Artus served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Donald Venettozzi served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. David Rock served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Albert Prack served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. James O'Gorman served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. John Morley served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Carl Koenigsmann served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Steven Claudio served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Joseph Bellnier served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lee Woods. Anthony Annucci served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Arden, James)
June 8, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Anthony Annucci. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to John Morley, #2 Summons Issued as to James O'Gorman, #3 Summons Issued as to Carl Koenigsmann, #4 Summons Issued as to Steven Claudio, #5 Summons Issued as to Joseph Bellnier, #6 Summons Issued as to Christopher Miller, #7 Summons Issued as to David Rock, #8 Summons Issued as to Dale Artus, #9 Summons Issued as to Joseph Noeth, #10 Summons Issued as to Raymond Coveny, #11 Summons Issued as to Donald Venettozzi, #12 Summons Issued as to Albert Prack)(meb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Lee Woods is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint,,,, (Arden, James)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Liu on behalf of Lee Woods (Liu, Cassandra)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Lee Woods; Attorney Cassandra Liu, Email address is caasandra.liu@sidley.com. Phone number is (212) 839-5889. Admissions due by 6/10/2020. (Served on attorney via email.)(meb)
May 27, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (meb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/17/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Anthony Annucci, Dale Artus, Lynda Battaglia, Joseph Bellnier, Maureen Bosco, Steven Claudio, Raymond Coveny, Anthony Gonzalez, Jill Grant, Beth Halburian, Donna Hall, Michael Hogan, John or Jane Does 1-5, John or Jane Does 11-15, John or Jane Does 16-20, John or Jane Does 21-25, John or Jane Does 26-30, John or Jane Does 31-35, John or Jane Does 36-40, John or Jane Does 41-45, John or Jane Does 46-50, John or Jane Does 51-55, John or Jane Does 56-60, John or Jane Does 6-10, John or Jane Does 61-65, John or Jane Does 66-70, John or Jane Does 71-75, John or Jane Does 76-80, Carl Koenigsmann, Christopher Mayer, Deborah McCulloch, Debra Mennig, Christopher Miller, John Morley, Joseph Noeth, James O'Gorman, Albert Prack, David Rock, Peter Russell, Donald Sawyer, Ann Marie Sullivan, John Tauriello, Christopher Tavella, Donald Venettozzi, Bill Vertoske, Kristin Woodlock (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5126010) filed by Lee Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Addendum to Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) Modified on 5/27/2020 to correct the filed date (meb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 11-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bellnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Venettozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Bosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Woodlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 46-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 21-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carl Koenigsmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Artus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Halburian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 56-60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Vertoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 51-55
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 36-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Tavella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 76-80
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Mennig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 31-35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 16-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Coveny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 71-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 66-70
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Battaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 41-45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Claudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Prack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Noeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 26-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 61-65
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Woods
Represented By: Caitlin Matheny
Represented By: James D. Arden
Represented By: Cassandra Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?