Fox v. Gifford et al
Plaintiff: Javell Fox
Defendant: C.O. Gifford and Sgt. Calandra
Case Number: 9:2020cv00797
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance Deadline 10/9/2020; Case Review Deadline 11/9/2020. (rep)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's renewed IFP application (Dkt. No. #9 ) is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (2) submit an IFP application which has been completed and signed by him and which has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing feerequirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court; and it is further ORDERED that, upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP application; and shall also send Plaintiff a second copy of this Decision and Order, which Plaintiff may provide to the inmate accounts office at his facility along with his request for certification of his completed and signed IFP Application (and/or certified copies of his inmate account statements). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on September 9, 2020. {Copy served via regular mail on the plaintiff along with an IFP Application and an extra copy of this Order}.(rep)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Javell Fox. (rep)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION: for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Javell Fox. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement, #2 Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope) (rep)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's renewed IFP Application (Dkt. No. #5 ) is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, either: (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit an IFP Application which has been completed and signed by him and which has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, the complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court; and it is further ORDERED that, upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the matter shall be returned to the Court for further review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP Application; and shall also send Plaintiff a second copy of this Decision and Order, which Plaintiff may provide to the inmate accounts office at his facility along with his request for certification of his completed and signed IFP Application (and/or certified copies of his inmate account statements). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on August 14, 2020. {Notice of Compliance Deadline 9/14/2020, Case Review Deadline 10/14/2020}. [Motions terminated: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Javell Fox].(Two copies of this Order served via regular mail on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application)(rep)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on July 27, 2020. (Copy served via regular mail)(rep)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Javell Fox. (rep)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION: for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Javell Fox.(rep)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance with this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action and forward it to the Court for review. It is ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application and a blank inmate authorization form. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on July 16, 2020. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application and a blank Inmate Authorization Form).(rep)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Javell Fox. (rep)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Javell Fox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (rep)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Calandra and Gifford, filed by Javell Fox. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Gifford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javell Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?