Sawyer v. O'Neill
Petitioner: Robert I. Sawyer
Respondent: Sheriff Colleen O'Neill
Case Number: 9:2020cv00798
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Letter containing additional information filed by Robert I. Sawyer. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT that, pursuant to the Decision and Order issued on July 29, 2020 (Dkt. No. #5 ) by the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby, petitioner's IFP Application, Dkt. No. #2 , is GRANTED. The petition, Dkt. No. #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. No certificate of appealability ("COA") shall issue in this case because petitioner has failed to make a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Any further request for a COA must be addressed to the Court of Appeals (Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)). The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this action. All of the above pursuant to the Decision and Order issued by the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby, dated July 29, 2020. Dkt. No. #5 . (Copy served upon Petitioner via regular mail). (sal)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER that petitioner's IFP Application, Dkt. No. #2 , is GRANTED. The petition, Dkt. No. #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. No certificate of appealability ("COA") shall issue in this case because petitioner has failed to make a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Any further request for a COA must be addressed to the Court of Appeals (Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)). Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/29/2020. (Copy served upon petitioner via regular mail). (sal )
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Letter requesting a receipt proving the court received this case filed by Robert I. Sawyer. (Mailing envelope included) [The Clerk notes that a copy of the docket sheet was sent to petitioner via regular mail on 7/24/2020.] (meb)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Letter requesting a receipt proving the court received this case filed by Robert I. Sawyer. (Mailing envelope included) [The Clerk is sending a copy of the docket sheet to petitioner via regular mail.] (meb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert I. Sawyer.(meb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert I. Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Mailing envelope)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Colleen O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert I. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?