Rispers v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Rispers
Defendant: D. Miller, J. Gownds and O. Donald
Case Number: 9:2020cv00935
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 6:20-cv-06669, filed 09/04/2020. (nas, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/4/2020. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Rispers dated 8/25/2020. (nas, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Rispers dated 8/20/2020. Updated copy of docket sheet provided. (nas, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Rispers requesting copy of complaint. [copy of complaint provided](nas, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Michael A. Rispers. (nas, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael A. Rispers.(nas, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O. Donald, J. Gownds, D. Miller filed by Michael A. Rispers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 envelope, #3 letter rec'd by the Court on 8/14/2020)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rispers v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gownds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Rispers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?