Garcia v. LaClair
Petitioner: Frank Garcia
Respondent: Darwin LaClair
Case Number: 9:2020cv00936
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:20-cv-04259, filed 09/11/2020. (nas, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to electronically transfer this action to the Clerk of the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/11/2020. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/8/2020. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas )
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frank Garcia.(nas, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that petitioner's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 ifp application){petitioner served via regular mail}(nas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frank Garcia.(nas, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order to Show Cause submitted by Garcia (nas, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Frank Garcia. (Attachments: #1 exhibit A, #2 exhibit B, #3 exhibit C, #4 exhibit D, #5 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. LaClair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darwin LaClair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?