Kelly v. County of Onondaga et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Kelly
Defendant: James Quigley, John Uzunoff and County of Onondaga
Case Number: 9:2020cv01335
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Uzunoff.(Heisler, John)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James Quigley.(Heisler, John)
November 16, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for James Quigley answer due 11/30/2020; John Uzunoff answer due 11/30/2020. (nas, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on County of Onondaga, John Uzunoff, and James Quigley on 11/09/2020, filed by Ryan Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon Uzunoff, #2 Affidavit of Service upon Quigley)(Sivin, Edward)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by County of Onondaga.(Heisler, John)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Heisler, Jr on behalf of County of Onondaga (Heisler, John)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to County of Onondaga, James Quigley, John Uzunoff. (Attachments: #1 Uzunoff, #2 Quigley)(nas )
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2021 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (nas )
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (nas, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Onondaga, James Quigley, John Uzunoff (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5295778) filed by Ryan Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nas )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. County of Onondaga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Quigley
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Uzunoff
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Onondaga
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kelly
Represented By: Edward Sivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?