Raymond v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Plaintiff: Latoya Raymond
Defendant: The State of New York, Anthony J. Annucci and New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Case Number: 9:2020cv01380
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER RE #7 Letter Request: Defendants' request for an extension of time to file an answer is GRANTED. Anthony J. Annucci answer due 2/8/2021; New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision answer due 2/8/2021; The State of New York answer due 2/8/2021. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/7/2020. (meb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Request/ Letter Motion from Joshua E. McMahon for Anthony J. Annucci, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, The State of New York requesting a sixty (60) day extension of time with which to submit an Answer or dispositive motion submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (McMahon, Joshua)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua E. McMahon on behalf of Anthony J. Annucci, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, The State of New York (McMahon, Joshua)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on State of New York on 11-12-2020, filed by Latoya Raymond. (Stecker, Andrew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Anthony J. Annucci, NYSDOCCS on 11-16-2020, filed by Latoya Raymond. (Stecker, Andrew)
November 19, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Anthony J. Annucci answer due 12/10/2020; New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision answer due 12/10/2020; The State of New York answer due 12/10/2020. (meb)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/1/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Annucci, #2 Summons Issued as to The State of New York)(meb)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Annucci, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, The State of New York (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5307888) filed by Latoya Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) Modified on 11/9/2020 to correct the file date (meb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Represented By: Joshua E. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Represented By: Joshua E. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Represented By: Joshua E. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Raymond
Represented By: Andrew A. Stecker
Represented By: Michael E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?