Shaw v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Allen Shaw
Defendant: James O'Gorman, D. Venettozzi and Anthony J. Annucci
Case Number: 9:2021cv00471
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER: Filed by Allen Shaw, dated May 9, 2021, regarding his IFP Application. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Grievance)(rep)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Allen Shaw. (rep)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Allen Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Statement, #2 Letter and Mailing Envelope)(rep)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS: Filed by Allen Shaw. Effective Date: May 24, 2021. Old Address: Shawangunk Correctional Facility. New Address: Great Meadow Correctional Facility. {Mailing envelope attached}. (rep)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order A copy of the #9 Order and blank IFP Application is being sent to the plaintiff at Great Meadow Correctional Facility via regular mail. (rep)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance Deadline 6/25/2021; Case Review Deadline 7/26/2021. (rep)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's IAP Application (Dkt. No. #7 ) is DENIED; Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed, signed, and certified IFP application; or (3) submit a completed and signed IFP application along with certified copies of his inmate account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint; In the event plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court and the Clerk shall close the case; Upon plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review; and The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on May 24, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application).(rep)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Judge David N. Hurd on 5/11/2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Allen Shaw. (Mailing envelope included)(meb)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter filed by Allen Shaw. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that, if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application; and it is further ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compliance with this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action and forward it to the Court for review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on April 27, 2021. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application)(rep)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Allen Shaw. (rep)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Allen Shaw. (rep)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Allen Shaw (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(rep) Modified on 4/27/2021 (rep, ).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Anthony J. Annucci, James O'Gorman, and D. Venettozzi. Filed by Allen Shaw. {Mailing envelope attached}.(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Venettozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?