Thomas-Jandrew v. Superintendent
Petitioner: Desheila Thomas-Jandrew
Respondent: Superintendent
Case Number: 9:2021cv01293
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that petitioner may file an amended petition within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order. The Clerk is respectfully directed to provide petitioner with a blank 2254 habeas petition for this purpose. ORDERED that if petitioner does not file an amended petition within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing this action without further order of the Court, Habeas Rule 4. ORDERED that upon the filing of any amended petition, the Clerk shall forward the file in this matter to the Court for further review. No answer to the petition will be required from the respondent until petitioner has submitted the amended petition, and the Court has had the opportunity to review her arguments. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on January 5, 2022. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline 2/7/2022, Case Review Deadline 3/7/2022){order and blank 2254 form served via regular mail on petitioner} (nas)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on December 28, 2021. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number syr060224 (nas, )
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter from Petitioner. (nas, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from Petitioner advising that the filing fee is being sent. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on December 6, 2021. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Desheila Thomas-Jandrew.(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas-Jandrew v. Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Desheila Thomas-Jandrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?