DuBois v. St. Louis et al
Plaintiff: Charles DuBois
Defendant: J. St. Louis, C.O. D. Beane, L. Gadway, John Corrow, John Doe #9, John Doe #11, John Doe #13, El Cragle, John Doe #6, John Doe #7 and John Doe #8
Case Number: 9:2022cv00929
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b): (1) Eighth Amendment claims against St. Louis and Cragle; (2) First Amendment retaliation claims; (3) Fourteenth Amendment due process claims; (4) conspiracy claims; and (5) claims against John Doe #9, John Doe #11, and John Doe #13; and it is further ORDERED that the Eighth Amendment claims against Beane, Gadway, Corrow, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, and John Doe #8 survive the Court's sua sponte review under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) and require a response; and it is further ORDERED that St. Louis, Cragle, John Doe #9, John Doe #11, and John Doe #13 are DISMISSED as defendants herein; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall take reasonable steps through discovery to ascertain the identity of defendants John Does 6-8. Plaintiff's failure to timely serve those defendants will result in dismissal of the claims asserted against them and termination of those defendants from the action; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff is afforded an opportunity to request an order of this Court directing service by the U.S. Marshal and provide payment of the service fee to the U.S. Marshal in full by money order or certified check; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's filing of request for assistance, or, if at the expiration of thirty (30) days plaintiff has not complied with the terms of this Decision and Order, the Clerk shall return the file to the Court for further review. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 12/5/2022). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Case law)(Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Letter enclosing the filing fee filed by Charles DuBois. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope)(meb)
October 13, 2022 Filing fee received: $52.00, receipt number SYR061531. (meb)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, either: (1) pay the $52.00 balance of the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) submit an IFP Application which has been completed and signed by him, and which has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event that plaintiff fails to timely comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice, without further Order of this Court; and it is further ORDERED that, if plaintiff timely complies with this Order, the file in this matter shall be returned to the Court for further review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and a blank IFP Application, which includes the Certificate portion required in the Northern District of New York, on plaintiff in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 11/3/2022, Case Review Deadline 12/5/2022). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/4/2022. (Copy served via regular mail, along with blank forms)(meb)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D. Beane, John Corrow, El Cragle, John Doe #11, John Doe #13, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, John Doe #8, John Doe #9, L. Gadway, J. St. Louis (Partial Filing fee $350.00 receipt number SYR061346; SYR061347; SYR061348; SYR061349; SYR061350) filed by Charles DuBois. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuBois v. St. Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. D. Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Gadway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Corrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #13
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Cragle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?