Abergut v. Sticht
Petitioner: Majeir Abergut
Respondent: Thomas Sticht
Case Number: 9:2022cv01258
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. McIver on behalf of Thomas Sticht (Attachments: #1 Declaration of service)(McIver, Robert)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Section XIII, Rule 1.1(d) of the Local Rules; and it is further ORDERED that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. (Response due by Thomas Sticht served on 12/2/2022, answer due 3/2/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(Served as directed)(meb)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number SYR061724) filed by Majeir Abergut. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing envelope)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abergut v. Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Majeir Abergut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Sticht
Represented By: Robert C. McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?