Trotman v. McCoy et al
Plaintiff: David M. Trotman, Jr.
Defendant: Jeff McCoy, Christine Onley, Patrick Reardon, J. Doe, Roccwood and F. Durnin
Case Number: 9:2022cv01268
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: On December 28, 2022, plaintiff filed a second IFP application. Dkt. No. #6 . The IFP application was certified by an authorized officer at the Richmond Justice Center. Id. at 2. However, the envelope, containing a postmark of December 22, 2022, indicates that the application was mailed from New York, NY with plaintiff's address as 111 John Street, 9th Floor, New York, New York, 10038. Id. at 3. Upon receipt of the IFP application, the Court issued an Order reopening this matter and mailed a copy of the Order to plaintiff at his address of record; Richmond City Jail, 1701 Fairfield Way, Richmond, VA 23223. Dkt. No. 7. On January 23, 2023, the mailing was returned to the Court as undeliverable with the notation "return to sender - not at this address". Dkt. No. #8 . Under this court's rules, an unrepresented litigant is under a duty to inform the court of any address changes IN WRITING. See N.D.N.Y.L.R. 10.1(c)(2). For the orderly disposition of cases, it is essential that litigants honor their continuing obligation to keep the court informed of address changes. Consequently, plaintiff is advised that he must file a change of address within THIRTY DAYS, and he must continue to submit any address changes to the court as long as his action is pending. "Failure to notify the Court of a change of address in accordance with L.R. 10.1(c)(2) may result in the dismissal of any pending action." N.D.N.Y. L.R. 41.2(b). The Clerk serve a copy of the Order reopening this matter (Dkt. No. 7), this Order and a Change of Address Form on plaintiff at his last known address, and address provided with the IFP application. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 2/27/2023). Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/26/2023. (Copy served via regular mail, along with blank forms)(meb)
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Regarding the # 7 Text Order sent to David M. Trotman, Jr. at the Richmond City Jail. Return to Sender - Not at this Address. (meb)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 12/28/2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
December 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David M. Trotman, Jr. (Mailing envelope included)(meb)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that, if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application; and it is further ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compliance with this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action and forward it to the Court for review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 11/30/2022. (Copy served via regular mail, along with blank forms)(meb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Letter regarding his IFP filed by David M. Trotman, Jr. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM filed by David M. Trotman, Jr. (meb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David M. Trotman, Jr.(meb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against F. Durnin, J. Doe, Jeff McCoy, Christine Onley, Patrick Reardon, Roccwood filed by David M. Trotman, Jr. (Mailing envelope included)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotman v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Trotman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Onley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roccwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Durnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?