Saunders v. Dixon et al
Plaintiff: Courtney J. Saunders
Defendant: Stacy Dixon, Melissa M. Davis and State of New York Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Case Number: 9:2024cv00012
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Greene Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #7 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (nas)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims for money damages against DOCCS and defendants Dixon and Davis in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) as barred by the Eleventh Amendment; Plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ORDERED that if plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an amended complaint as directed above within thirty (30) days from the filing date of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that if plaintiff timely files an amended complaint, this matter be returned to the Court for further review. ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint as directed, the Clerk shall enter judgment indicating that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice without further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and U.S.C. 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In that event, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on February 22, 2024. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 3/22/2024 Case Review Deadline 4/23/2024 (nas, )
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on February 7, 2024. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on January 24, 2024. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Courtney J. Saunders. (nas )
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Courtney J. Saunders (Attachments: #1 account statement)(nas)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $405.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on January 4, 2024. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:23-ct-03354. electronically transferred when case opened
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/3/2024. Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (Hardy, Shari) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/3/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for initial review. (Powers, S.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/3/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Courtney J. Saunders. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/3/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melissa M. Davis, Stacy Dixon and State of New York Department of Corrections and Community Supervision filed by Courtney J. Saunders. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 1/3/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Dixon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney J. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?