United States v. Broadcast Music, Inc

Case Number: 1:1964cv03787
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Louis L. Stanton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2016 100 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. The phrase in Art. II (C) of the Consent Decree defining BMI's repertory as "those compositions, the right of public performance of which [BMI] has the right to license or sublicense" is descriptive, n ot prescriptive. The "right of public performance" is left undefined as to scope or form, to be determined by processes outside the Consent Decree. The Consent Decree neither bars fractional licensing nor requires full-work licensing. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/16/2016) (rjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2016: # 1 Right to Appeal Form #1, # 2 Right to Appeal #2) (rjm).
May 28, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. The petition is granted and the rate for the BMI-Pandora license is set at 2.5% of revenue for the years 2013 through 2016. BMI's AFBL formula is adopted and Pandora is entitled to an advertising agency commission deducti on of up to 15% of third-party costs. So ordered. re: (110 in 1:13-cv-04037-LLS) LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding modification of Protective Order addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Atara Miller, Esq. dated October 2, 2014 filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/27/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-04037-LLS, 1:64-cv-03787-LLS (rjm)
December 19, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER re: (22 in 1:13-cv-04037-LLS) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pandora Media, Inc.: Pandora's motion is denied. The relevant compositions are not within BMI's repertory, and it lacks the power to license them to any applicant, including Pandora. Nothing in this opinion affects the right of licensees to continue to perform the withdrawn compositions under presently-existing licenses. They were legal when made, and the rights they granted are not to be altered retroactively. As far as this ruling is concerned, they continue according to their terms until their expiration. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-04037-LLS, 1:64-cv-03787-LLS (tn)
May 4, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is ordered, that Magistrate Judge Black's Report and Recommendation is adopted in all respects, and the case of P.I.G. Inc. d/b/a/ The Blind Pig and West 6th Street partners Inc. d.b.a Velvet Dog v. Broadcast Music, Inc., 08Civ. 730 (S.D.Ohio) is closed in accordance with the Report and Recommendation. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/1/09) (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Broadcast Music, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?