Olin Corporation v. INS. Company of N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Olin Corporation
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company a/s/o Marco Del Gado, Commercial Union Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, National American Insurance Company of California, Employers Insurance of WAUSAU, Continental Casualty Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Government Employees Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Imdemnity Insurance Company of North America, Onebeacon America Insurance Company, New York Property/Casualty Insurance Security Fund, AIU Insurance Company, The Continental Corporation, Insurance Company of North America, American Re-Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, National Casualty Company, Harbor Insurance Company, Capital Markets Assurance Corp., The Home Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, C.E. Health Compensation & Liability Insurance Co. and Lamorak Insurance Company
Cross Defendant: Onebeacon American Insurance Company and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Lond
3Rd Party Plaintiff: London Market Insurance Companies, London & Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London and London Market Insurance Companies, North River Insurance Company and Lamorak Insurance Company f/k/a OneBeacon America Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America Inc. f/k/a American Re-Insurance Company and Olin-Hunt Specialty Products Inc.
Counter Defendant: General Reinsurance Corporation, Home Insurance Company, Transit Casualty Company, Greenwich Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Aetna Casualty & Surety Company and Integrity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:1984cv01968
Filed: March 20, 1984
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 1993 Filing 642 CROSSCLAIM by Insurance Company of against Allstate Insurance, North River Insuranc, National Union Fire, Capital Markets Assu, London & Edinburgh, Lexington Insurance, Great American Ins., Fireman's Fund Ins., Federal Insurance, C.E. Health Compensa, Employers Ins. of, Continental Casualty, Commercial Union Ins, London Market Ins., Certain Underwriters, American Re-Insuranc, American Home Assura, The Hanover Ins. Co., AIU Ins. Company, The Continental Corp, Government Employees, Granite State Ins., Harbor Ins. Co., The Home Insurance, Imdemnity Ins. Co., Nat'l American Ins., National Casualty, NY Property/Casualt (emil)
December 6, 1993 Filing 641 ANSWER by London Market Ins. to [623-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Condon & Forsyth by attorney Marian Hertz for cross-defendant National Union Fire (emil)
December 3, 1993 Filing 640 ANSWER by Great American Ins. (Attorney Lawrence L. Flynn) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: Gottesman, Wolgel, Secunda etc by attorney Lawrence L. Flynn for defendant Great American Ins. (emil)
December 3, 1993 Filing 639 REPLY by Great American Ins. Re: cross-claims of Hanover Ins. Company (emil)
December 1, 1993 Filing 638 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer w/ Counterclaims upon the following: James J. Harrington and Associates; Anderson Kill Olick & Oshinsky; Seward & Kissel; Roger & Wells; Jackson & Campbell, P.C.; Sheft & Sheft; Condon & Forsyth; Smith, Mazure, Director & Wilkins; Gottesman, Wolgel, Smith & Secunda; Keatring, Meuthing & Klekamp; Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon; Zelle & Larson; Zelle & Larson; D'Amato & Lynch; Bromley, Greene & Walsh; Bower & Gardner; Locker, Greenberg & Brainin; Hopkins & Sutter; LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae by mail on 11/30/93 (emil)
November 30, 1993 Filing 637 Affidavit of service as to Olin-Hunt Specialty by David L. Czirr on 11/22/93 Answer due on 12/13/93 for Olin-Hunt Specialty (emil)
November 29, 1993 Filing 636 ANSWER by National Union Fire to [623-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Smith, Mazure, Director etc. by attorney Marian Hertz for cross-defendant National Union Fire (emil)
November 26, 1993 Filing 635 COUNTERCLAIM by Fireman's Fund Ins. against Olin Corporation (emil)
November 26, 1993 Filing 635 ANSWER by Fireman's Fund Ins. (Attorney Thomas G. De Luca) to amended complaint; jury demand ; Firm of: Postner & Rubin by attorney Thomas G. De Luca for defendant Fireman's Fund Ins. (emil)
November 22, 1993 Filing 634 ANSWER by Federal Insurance (Attorney Joseph H. Spain) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: Rogers & Wells by attorney Joseph H. Spain for defendant Federal Insurance (emil)
November 19, 1993 Filing 633 ANSWER by The Home Insurance (Attorney Joseph DeDonato) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: Morgan, Melhuish, Monaghan etc by attorney Joseph DeDonato for defendant The Home Insurance (emil)
November 18, 1993 Filing 632 Rule 9 certificate filed by North River Insuranc (emil)
November 18, 1993 Filing 631 ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by London & Edinburgh, North River Insuranc, London Market Ins., Certain Underwriters (Attorney Katherine B. Posner) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: Condon & Forsyth by attorney Katherine B. Posner (emil)
November 18, 1993 Filing 630 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by London & Edinburgh, North River Insuranc, London Market Ins., Certain Underwriters against Olin-Hunt Specialty ; Third-party summons issued. (emil)
November 18, 1993 Filing 629 ANSWER by Commercial Union Insurance Company (Attorney Richard H. Gimer) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: Hopkins & Sutter by attorney Richard H. Gimer for defendant Commercial Union Insurance Company. (kg)
November 18, 1993 Filing 628 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by North River Insurance Company (Attorney Robert J. Kelly) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: McElroy, Deutsch & Mulvaney by attorney Robert J. Kelly for defendant North River Insurance Company. (kg)
November 18, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 627 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer to second amended complaint due for 11/26/93 for Fireman's Fund Ins. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
November 17, 1993 Filing 626 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Stip & Order dated 11/2/93 upon the following, by mail on 11/12/93: Anderson Kill Olick & Oshinsky; Olin Corp.; Zelle & Larson; Zelle & Larson; D'Amato & Lynch; Bower & Gardner; Bromley, Greene & Walsh; Seward & Kissel; Hopkins & Sutter; Locker, Greenberg & Brainin; Sheft & Sheft; Jackson & Campbell; Smith, Mazure, Director & Wilkins; Rogers & Wells; Condon & Forsyth; Peterson & Ross; Day, Berry & Howard; Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly; Day, Berry & Howard; LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae; Steptoe & Johnson; Morgan, Melhuish, Monaghan, Arvidson, Abrutyn & Lisowski; Gilberg & Kurent; Postner & Rubin; Gottesman, Wolgel, Secunda, Malamy & Flynn; Keating, Meuthing & Klekamp; Ryan, Ryan, Johnson, Clear & DeLuca; Bumgardner, Hardin & Ellis (emil)
November 17, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 625 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 11/17/93 for American Re-Insuranc, for Continental Casualty, for Nat'l American Ins. and Northbrook Excess ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
November 17, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 624 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer to second amended complaint due for 11/19/93 for Great American Ins. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
November 15, 1993 Filing 623 CROSSCLAIM by The Hanover Ins. Co. against National Union Fire, Employers Ins. of, London Market Ins., Certain Underwriters (emil)
November 12, 1993 Filing 622 Transcript of record of proceedings filed for dates of 9/24/93 (emil)
November 10, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 621 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer to second amended complaint due for 11/19/93 for The Home Insurance ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
November 10, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 620 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer to second amended complaint due for 11/19/93 for Commercial Union Ins ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
November 9, 1993 Filing 619 ANSWER by Government Employees (Attorney Rocco N. Covino) to second amended complaint ; Firm of: LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae by attorney Rocco N. Covino for defendant Government Employees (tr) Modified on 11/10/1993
November 8, 1993 Filing 618 ANSWER by American Home Assura, National Union Fire, Lexington Insurance, Granite State Insura, AIU Ins. Company (Attorney Marian Hertz) to amended complaint; jury demand ; Firm of: Sheft & Sheft. Fld in night deposit on 11/8/93 at 5:41 p.m. (emil)
November 4, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 617 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 12/6/93 for Insurance Company of North America ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
November 4, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 616 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 11/19/93 for Fireman's Fund Ins. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
October 27, 1993 Filing 615 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Olin Corporation of Second Amended Complaint in 92 CV 4278 (LBS) upon Stefan Underhill of Day, Berry & Howard, atty for General Reinsurance Corp. and upon Scott Moser of Day, Berry & Howard, atty for Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. by mail on 10/26/93 (emil)
October 22, 1993 Filing 614 RETURN OF SERVICE executed of Olin Corporation's Second Amended Complaint by mail on 10/21/93 see service list attached to document which listed attorneys names, not the parties they represent. (kk)
October 22, 1993 Filing 613 ANSWER by Olin Corporation to Claim of General Reinsurance Corporation.. (kk)
October 22, 1993 Filing 612 ANSWER by Olin Corporation to claim of Aetna Casualty & Surety Company. (kk)
October 20, 1993 Filing 611 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Olin Corporation , (Answer due 11/2/93 for Insurance Company of, for The Hanover Ins. Co., for American Home Assura, for American Re-Insuranc, for Certain Underwriters, for Commercial Union Ins, for Continental Casualty, for Employers Ins. of, for Federal Insurance, for Fireman's Fund Ins., for Great American Ins., for Lexington Insurance, for London & Edinburgh, for National Union Fire, for North River Insuranc, for Allstate Insurance ) amending [2-1] amended complaint against AIU Ins. Company, The Continental Corp, Government Employees, Granite State Ins., Harbor Ins. Co., The Home Insurance, Imdemnity Ins. Co., Nat'l American Ins., National Casualty, NY Property/Casualt; Summons issued. (emil)
October 1, 1993 Opinion or Order Memo endorsed on motion; granting [600-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts, denying [600-2] motion to modify the Court's 12/7/92 Order as to permit Olin to re-institute an action against Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and General Reinsurance Co. in the Superior Court of the State of CT. Denied on the terms and conditions set forth in open court. See transcript proceedings this date. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (tr)
September 15, 1993 Filing 610 MEMORANDUM by Insurance Company of in opposition to [600-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts, [600-2] motion to modify the Court's 12/7/92 Order as to permit Olin to re-institute an action against Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and General Reinsurance Co. in the Superior Court of the State of CT (emil)
September 13, 1993 Filing 609 CLAIM by Aetna Casualty against Olin Corporation (emil)
September 13, 1993 Filing 608 MEMORANDUM by Aetna Casualty & Sur in opposition to [583-1] motion to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92 (emil)
September 10, 1993 Filing 607 CLAIM of General Reinsurance Corp. against Olin Corp. (emil)
August 27, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 606 STIPULATION and ORDER, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Various London Market Ins. Companies, agree to and join Ins. Co. of North America and Olin Corp. in stipulation to an extension of time, until 9/13/93, to respond to Olin Corp.'s recently filed motion for leave to amend the complaint. The Certain London Market Insurers also join Ins. Co. of North America and Olin Corp. in stipulating that all reply papers prepared by Olin Corp. shall be served by hand or telecopier on or before 9/21/93 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
August 25, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 605 STIPULATION and ORDER, Response to motion reset to 9/13/93 [600-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 9/21/93 [600-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts , Return date reset to Return date reset to 9/24/93 [600-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
August 25, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 604 STIPULATION and ORDER, Return date reset to 9/23/93 [600-2] motion to modify the Court's 12/7/92 Order as to permit Olin to re-institute an action against Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and General Reinsurance Co. in the Superior Court of the State of CT , Response to motion reset to 9/21/93 [600-2] motion to modify the 12/7/92 Order as to permit Olin to re-institute an action against Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and General Reinsurance Co. in the Superior Court of the State of CT ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
August 16, 1993 Filing 603 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Olin Corporation of Olin's Motion and Memo in support of motion for leave to file second amended complaint upon McElroy, Deutsch & Mulvaney by mail 8/13/93 (emil)
August 3, 1993 Filing 602 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Olin Corporation Pltff's motion dated 7/23/93, affidavit, and memo in support by mail. (tr)
July 27, 1993 Filing 601 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of [600-1] motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts, [600-2] motion to modify the Court's 12/7/92 Order as to permit Olin to re-institute an action against Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and General Reinsurance Co. in the Superior Court of the State of CT (emil)
July 27, 1993 Filing 600 NOTICE OF MOTION by Olin Corporation for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to join as additional defts the insurance companies therein named that are not already defts , to modify the Court's 12/7/92 Order as to permit Olin to re-institute an action against Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. and General Reinsurance Co. in the Superior Court of the State of CT , Return date 8/12/93. Affidavit in support attached. (emil)
June 15, 1993 Filing 599 REPLY by Olin Corporation to "Fireman's Fund's Counterclaim against Olin"; Firm of: Anderson Kill Olick & Oshinsky by attorney Stephen A. Dvorkin (emil)
June 15, 1993 Filing 598 REPLY by Olin Corporation to "Counterclaim of Commercial Union Insurance Company and C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co. against Olin Corp."; Firm of: Anderson Kill Olick & Oshinsky by attorney Stephen A. Dvorkin (emil)
May 26, 1993 Filing 597 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Olin Corporation to the Home Insurance Co.'s Claim (emil)
March 30, 1993 Filing 596 ANSWER of Olin Corp. to Harbor Ins. Co.'s Claim against pltff (emil)
March 30, 1993 Filing 595 REPLY by Olin Corporation to [488-1] counter claim ; Firm of: Anderson, Kill Olick etc. by attorney Steven A. Dvorkin (emil)
March 17, 1993 Memo endorsed on motion; withdrawing [589-1] motion to extend time to plead as to Geico. As to Wausau, on consent, Olin's time to plead is extended to 3/30/93 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
March 15, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 594 STIPULATION and ORDER, substituting attorney Stefan Underhill of Day, Berry & Howard in place of James W. Greene of Bromley, Greene & Walsh for deft General Reinsurance Corp. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
March 15, 1993 Filing 593 RULE 3(C) AFFIDAVIT in support of James W. Greene Re: notice of change of atty (emil)
February 26, 1993 Filing 592 RESPONSE and OPPOSITION by Government Employees to [589-1] motion to extend time to plead (emil)
February 25, 1993 Filing 591 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE by Employers Ins. of to [589-1] motion to extend time to plead (emil)
February 11, 1993 Filing 590 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of [589-1] motion to extend time to plead (cd)
February 11, 1993 Filing 589 NOTICE OF MOTION by Olin Corporation to extend time to plead , Return date 3/11/93 (cd)
January 28, 1993 Memo endorsed on motion; denying [583-1] motion to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
January 15, 1993 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [582-1] motion for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson and Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Certain Defts (Terminated ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
January 15, 1993 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [579-1] motion for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson & Ross to withdraw as attorneys (Terminated ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
January 15, 1993 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [580-1] motion for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson and Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Southern American Ins. Co. (Terminated ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
January 15, 1993 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [581-1] motion for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson & Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Bryanston Ins. Co. Ltd ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
January 7, 1993 Filing 588 MEMORANDUM by Employers Ins. of in opposition to [583-1] motion to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92 (kk)
January 7, 1993 Filing 587 MEMORANDUM by Government Employees in opposition to [583-1] motion to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92 (kk)
January 7, 1993 Filing 586 MEMORANDUM by London Market Ins. in opposition to [582-1] motion for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson and Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Certain Defts (kk)
January 3, 1993 Filing 585 MEMORANDUM by Insurance Company of in opposition to [583-1] motion to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92 (kk)
December 21, 1992 Filing 584 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of [583-1] motion to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92. Fld in night dep. on 12/21/92 at 8:05 p.m. (emil)
December 21, 1992 Filing 583 NOTICE OF MOTION by Olin Corporation to reargue the motions of certain defts to enjoin proceedings before the Superior Court of the State of CT and Olin's motion to dismiss the supplemental proceedings as well as the pleadings of certain other defts derivative of the Wausau Counterclaim and for reconsideration of the Opinion dated 12/7/92 , Return date 1/14/93. Fld in night dep. on 12/21/92 at 8:05 p.m. (emil)
December 18, 1992 Filing 582 NOTICE OF MOTION for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson and Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Certain Defts , Return date 1/7/93 (emil)
December 18, 1992 Filing 581 NOTICE OF MOTION for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson & Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Bryanston Ins. Co. Ltd , Return date 1/7/93 (emil)
December 18, 1992 Filing 580 NOTICE OF MOTION for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson and Ross to withdraw as attorneys for Southern American Ins. Co. , Return date 1/7/93 (emil)
December 18, 1992 Filing 579 NOTICE OF MOTION by Certain Underwriters for Condon & Forsyth and Peterson & Ross to withdraw as attorneys , Return date 1/7/93 (emil)
December 8, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 578 Memo endorsed on copy of motion for an order dismissing the First Amended Counterclaim & Cross Claims of Wausau and the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., etc.;, motion decided per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion (see doc. #480);, motion decided per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion (see doc. #482);, motion decided per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion (see doc. #562);, motion decided as per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 8, 1992 Opinion or Order Memo endorsed on motion (see doc. #495);, motion for an order enjoining pltff was decided per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion (see doc. #478);, motion decided per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 8, 1992 Opinion or Order Memo endorsed on motion (see doc. #472);, motion for an order to enjoin Olin decided per opinion dated 12/7/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
December 7, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER, the Court requests that the substance of any communications by the Special Master with the parties not be disclosed to the Court and that the Court be merely advised as to matters of timing and likelihood of success ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed (emil)
December 7, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MEMORANDUM OPINION # 70780 denying [562-1] motion to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin, denying [506-1] motion to dismiss, in whole or in part, the First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claims of Employers Insurance of Wausau; to dismiss the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co., C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co., and The Home Ins. Co., granting [495-1] cross motion for an order enjoining pltff Olin Corp.'s litigation of a State Court action in Connecticut, and granting such other & further relief as may seem appropriate to this Court, granting [480-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of pltff Olin Corp.'s Connecticut action and granting such other relief as the Court may deem just and proper, granting [482-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of an action pltff Olin Corp. has commenced in the Superior Court of Connecticut, granting [478-1] motion for an order enjoining Olin Corp. from litigating its Conneticut action, granting [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action, granting [452-1] cross motion for an Order enjoining Plaintiff Olin Corporation from litigating its Conneticut action, and granting such other and further relief as the Court may deem just & proper. ( Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
November 17, 1992 Filing 575 ANSWER of Firemund's Fund Insurance Company to Harbor Insurance Co.'s claim against all defts (emil)
November 17, 1992 Filing 574 ANSWER by Fireman's Fund Ins. to [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Postner & Rubin (emil)
November 9, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 573 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Fireman's Fund Ins. Companies to answer the first amended Cross-Claims of deft Employers Ins. of Wausau to 10/30/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
October 23, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 572 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for defts American Home Assurance Co., National Union Fire Ins. Co. of PA, Lexington Ins. Co. and Granite State Ins. Co. to answer the cross-claim of Harbor Ins. Co. to 10/8/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
October 9, 1992 Filing 571 ANSWER of Deft The Home Ins. Co. to claim of Harbor Ins. Co. against all defts (emil)
October 9, 1992 Filing 570 AFFIDAVIT of George B. Erense Re: to rebut the inaccurate and misleading statements that counsel for the London Market insurer-defts made to this Court, by letter dated 9/11/92 (emil)
October 8, 1992 Filing 569 ANSWER by American Home Assura, National Union Fire, Lexington Insurance, Granite State Insura to Cross-Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. (emil)
October 7, 1992 Filing 568 ANSWER of Commercial Union Ins. Co., Falcon Ins. Co. and C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co. to Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. (emil)
October 2, 1992 Filing 567 MEMORANDUM by Aetna Casualty & Sur in opposition to [562-1] motion to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin (emil)
October 2, 1992 Filing 566 MEMORANDUM by Federal Insurance in opposition to [562-1] motion to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin (emil)
October 2, 1992 Filing 565 MEMORANDUM by Government Employees in opposition to [562-1] motion to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin (emil)
October 1, 1992 Filing 564 RESPONSE by Employers Ins. of Re: [562-1] motion to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin (emil)
September 14, 1992 Filing 563 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of [562-1] motion to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin (emil)
September 14, 1992 Filing 562 NOTICE OF MOTION by Olin Corporation to dismiss the pleadings listed as against Olin , Return date 10/8/92 (emil)
August 28, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER, the Court, unless otherwise advised by the parties, will treat the pending motions as fully submitted and subjudice as of 9/14/92. The Court will decide such motions as soon thereafter as the Court docket permits. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed (jr)
August 26, 1992 Filing 560 ANSWER by American Re-Insuranc, General Reinsurance, American Re-Insuranc, Continental Casualty, North American Insur. Company of California and Northbrook Insurance Co. to Cross-Claim of Harbor Insurance Co.; Firm of: Bower & Gardner & Bromley etc. by attorney Barry Saretzky (sc)
August 24, 1992 Filing 559 ANSWER of deft Insurance Company of North America to Harbor's Answer, Claim against Olin and Claim against all defts (emil)
August 21, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 558 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for defts American Re-Insurance Co., Continental Casualty Co., Nat'l American Insurance Co. of California, Northbrook Ins. Co. and General Re-Insurance Corp. to answer or respond to the claim against all defts of Harbor Ins. Co. to 8/31/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
August 21, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 557 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Insurance Co. of North America to answer or respond to the answer of deft Harbor Ins. Co. to the first amended counterclaim and cross-claim of deft Employers Insurance of Wausau, a Mutual Co. to 8/21/92 ( signed by Judge Louis J. Freeh, Part I ). (emil)
August 19, 1992 Filing 556 MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) docketed as judgment #92,1896 on 8/19/92 Re: the judgment of the district court is affirmed. (emil)
August 17, 1992 Filing 555 ANSWER by Certain Underwriters to Cross-Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. against all defts ; Firm of: Condon & Forsyth by attorney (emil)
July 30, 1992 Filing 554 Bill of costs docketed as judgment #92,1741 on 7/30/92 (emil)
July 22, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 553 STIPULATION and ORDER, substituting the law firm of Anderson Kill Olick & Oshinsky, P.C. for plaintiff, in place and stead of James J. harrington and Associates. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (jr)
July 21, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 552 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset response to the answer of deft. Harbor Ins. to the first amended counterclaim and cross-claim of deft. Employers Ins. due for 7/31/92 for Insurance Company of ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (jr)
July 16, 1992 Filing 551 Rule 9 certificate filed by Government Employees (emil)
July 16, 1992 Filing 550 ANSWER by Government Employees to Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. ; Firm of: LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae by attorney James J. Harrington for counter-defendant Olin Corporation (emil)
July 14, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 549 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Certain Underweiters at Lloyd's, London and Various Market Ins. Companies, London and Edinburgh Ins. Co. Ltd and North River Ins. Co. to answer the Cross-Claims of deft Harbor Ins. Co. to 8/17/92 ( signed by Judge Sand). (emil)
July 10, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 548 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for Government Employees Ins. Co. may serve an Answer to the Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. against all defts is extended to 7/15/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
June 30, 1992 Filing 547 ANSWER by American Re-Insuranc, Continental Casualty, Capital Markets Assu, Allstate Insurance to [488-1] counter claim, [488-1] cross claim ; by attorney (emil)
June 25, 1992 Filing 546 MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) docketed as Judgment #92,1456 Re: the order of the dist. court is affirmed in accordance w/ the opinion of this court w/ costs to be taxed against the appellant (emil) Modified on 07/01/1992
June 19, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for defts American Re-Insurance Co., Continental Casualty Co., National American Ins. Co. of California, Northbrook Ins. Co. and General Re-Insurance Corp. to answer the claims against all defts of Harbor Ins. Co. to 6/29/92, ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
June 16, 1992 Filing 544 Transcript of record of proceedings filed for dates of April 2, 1992 (emil)
June 16, 1992 Filing 543 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Casualty & Surety of their Answer to Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. upon Bumgardner, Hardin & Ellis by mail on 6/15/92 (emil)
June 15, 1992 Filing 542 ANSWER by Aetna Casualty & Sur to "Claim Against Pltff and Other Defts" of Harbor Ins. Co. (emil)
June 9, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 541 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for defts American Re-Insurance Co., Continental Casualty Co., National American Ins. Co. of CA, Northbrook Ins. Co. and General Re-Insurance Corp. to serve an answer to the claim against all deft of Harbor Ins. Co. to 6/15/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
June 4, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 540 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Certain Underwrites at Lloyd's, London and Various Market Ins. Companies, London and Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited, and North River Insurance Company to answer or otherwise move w/ respect to the Cross-Claims of deft Harbor Ins. Co. to 6/29/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
June 2, 1992 Filing 539 ANSWER by The Hanover Ins. Co. to Harbor Ins. Co.'s Cross-Claim (emil)
June 1, 1992 Filing 538 ANSWER of Employer's Ins. of WAUSAU to Claim of Harbor Ins. Co. (emil)
May 29, 1992 Filing 537 ANSWER by Federal Insurance to [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Rogers & Wells by attorney Joseph H. Spain. (jr)
May 12, 1992 Filing 536 ANSWER of deft Harbor Ins. Co. to [488-1] counter claim, [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Bumgardner, Hardin & Ellis by attorney James J. Harrington for counter-defendant Olin Corporation (emil)
May 12, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 535 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer for deft Harbor Ins. Co. to answer the Summons, 1st Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claim of Employers Ins. Co. of Wausau due for 2/28/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
May 12, 1992 Filing 534 Rule 9 certificate filed by General Reinsurance (emil)
May 12, 1992 Filing 533 ANSWER by General Reinsurance to [488-1] counter claim, [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Bower & Gardner by attorney James J. Harrington for counter-defendant Olin Corporation (emil)
April 23, 1992 Filing 532 Notice that the original record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals: [518-1] appeal by Olin Corporation (emil)
April 14, 1992 Filing 531 ANSWER by National Union Fire to [461-1] cross claim ; by attorney (emil)
April 8, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER, Roger E. Warn , Virginia L. White-Mahaffey, and Gregory Slater are admitted to practice in the SDNY pro hac vice ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed (emil)
April 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [505-1] motion for William Gerald McElroy & Michelle K. Enright to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
April 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [520-1] motion for William F. Richardson & Lori S. Nugent to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
April 8, 1992 Memo endorsed on motion; granting [519-1] motion for Roger E. Warin, Virginia L. White-Mahaffey and Gregory S. Slater to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
April 1, 1992 Filing 529 AFFIDAVIT in support of Jerold Oshinsky Re: Olin's motion to dismiss the counterclaim & cross-claim of deft Employers Ins. of WAUSAU (emil)
April 1, 1992 Filing 527 REPLY by Commercial Union Ins, C.E. Health Compensa Re: [516-1] opposition memorandum (emil)
March 31, 1992 Filing 528 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Insurance Company of re: in support of its motion for an order enjoining Olin from litigating its Connecticut action (emil)
March 30, 1992 Filing 524 ANSWER by The Hanover Ins. Co. to [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Seward & Kissel by attorney (emil)
March 27, 1992 Filing 526 AFFIDAVIT in support of Michelle K. Enright Re: [525-1] opposition memorandum (emil)
March 27, 1992 Filing 525 MEMORANDUM by Employers Ins. of in opposition to [506-1] motion to dismiss, in whole or in part, the First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claims of Employers Insurance of Wausau; to dismiss the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co., C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co., and The Home Ins. Co. (emil)
March 27, 1992 Filing 523 Opposition of Commercial Union Ins. Co. and C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co. to Olin's motion to dismiss certain insurers' counterclaims against Olin (emil)
March 26, 1992 Filing 522 Opposition of Fireman's Fund Ins. Co. to Olin's motion to dismiss those Insurers' counterclaim against Olin (emil)
March 26, 1992 Filing 521 MEMORANDUM by Home Insurance Compa in opposition to [506-1] motion to dismiss, in whole or in part, the First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claims of Employers Insurance of Wausau; to dismiss the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co., C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co., and The Home Ins. Co. (emil)
March 24, 1992 Filing 520 NOTICE OF MOTION by Certain Underwriters, London Market Ins., London & Edinburgh, North River Insuranc for William F. Richardson & Lori S. Nugent to appear pro hac vice , Return date 4/2/92. Affidavit in support is attached (emil) Modified on 03/25/1992
March 18, 1992 Filing 519 NOTICE OF MOTION by Home Insurance Compa for Roger E. Warin, Virginia L. White-Mahaffey and Gregory S. Slater to appear pro hac vice , Return date 4/2/92. Affidavit in support is attached (emil)
March 17, 1992 Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [518-1] appeal by Olin Corporation ; Copy of notice of appeal sent to District Judge. (jf)
March 16, 1992 Filing 518 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Olin Corporation ; from [491-1] judgment order . Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: James J. Harrington ,Seward & Kissel; Mudge Rose; Zelle & Larson; D'Amato & Lynch; Smith Mazure; Condon & Forsythe;Peterson & Ross; Hopkins & Sutter; Locker Greenberg; Bromley Greene; Bower & Gardner;Rogers & Wells; Jackson & Campbell; Sheft & Sheft; Gilberg & Kurent; and Gottesman Wogel. . (jf)
March 11, 1992 Filing 517 JUDGMENT that the First, Second, Ninth and Tenth Claims for relief of the First Amended Complaint as against Employers Insurance of Wausau are dismissed w/ prejudice ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. (emil)
March 10, 1992 Filing 516 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in opposition to [495-1] cross motion for an order enjoining pltff Olin Corp.'s litigation of a State Court action in Connecticut, and granting such other & further relief as may seem appropriate to this Court, [480-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of pltff Olin Corp.'s Connecticut action and granting such other relief as the Court may deem just and proper, [482-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of an action pltff Olin Corp. has commenced in the Superior Court of Connecticut, [478-1] motion for an order enjoining Olin Corp. from litigating its Conneticut action, [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action (emil)
March 5, 1992 Filing 515 NOTICE of ENTRY by Ancillary Receiver of Order in the Supreme Court on 4/14/87 (emil)
March 3, 1992 Filing 514 ANSWER by Aetna Casualty & Sur to [488-1] counter claim, [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly by attorney James J. Harrington for counter-defendant Olin Corporation (emil)
March 3, 1992 Filing 513 Rule 9 certificate filed by Government Employees (emil)
March 3, 1992 Filing 512 ANSWER by Government Employees to [488-1] counter claim, [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae by attorney James J. Harrington for counter-defendant Olin Corporation (emil)
February 28, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 511 STIPULATION and ORDER, Return date reset to Return date reset to 3/5/92 [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action , Response to motion reset to 2/24/92 [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/3/92 [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 26, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER, there is no just reason to delay entry of final judgment in favor of Wausau in connection w/ the Huntsville DDT claims, and the Clerk is directed to enter final judgment dismissing w/ prejudice the 1st, 2nd, 7th, 8th, 9th & 10th claims for relief of the First Amended Complaint as against Wausau ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed (emil)
February 26, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 509 STIPULATION and ORDER, Return date reset to Return date reset to 3/5/92 [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action , Response to motion reset to 2/24/92 [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/2/92 [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 26, 1992 Filing 508 AFFIDAVIT in support of James J. Harrington Re: [506-1] motion to dismiss, in whole or in part, the First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claims of Employers Insurance of Wausau; to dismiss the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co., C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co., and The Home Ins. Co. (emil)
February 26, 1992 Filing 507 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of [506-1] motion to dismiss, in whole or in part, the First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claims of Employers Insurance of Wausau; to dismiss the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co., C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co., and The Home Ins. Co. (emil)
February 26, 1992 Filing 506 NOTICE OF MOTION by Olin Corporation to dismiss, in whole or in part, the First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claims of Employers Insurance of Wausau; to dismiss the counterclaims asserted by Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co., C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins. Co., and The Home Ins. Co. , Return date 3/12/92 (emil)
February 26, 1992 Filing 505 NOTICE OF MOTION by Insurance Company of for William Gerald McElroy & Michelle K. Enright to appear pro hac vice , Return date 2/20/92. Affidavit in support is attached (emil)
February 21, 1992 Filing 504 ANSWER by Insurance Company of to [461-1] cross claim, [461-1] counter claim ; Firm of: Mudge Rose Guthrie etc. by attorney James J. Harrington for counter-defendant Olin Corporation (emil)
February 21, 1992 Filing 503 ANSWER by Insurance Company of to [488-1] counter claim, [488-1] cross claim ; Firm of: Mudge Rose Guthrie etc. by attorney (emil)
February 20, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 501 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Government Employees Ins. Co. to answer the first amended counterclaim & Cross-claim of WAUSAU is extended to 3/2/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 20, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 500 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for Hanover Ins. Co. to answer the first amended cross-claim of deft of WAUSAU is extended to 3/27/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 20, 1992 Filing 499 Transcript of record of proceedings filed for dates of 12/5/92 (emil)
February 19, 1992 Filing 502 ANSWER by Certain Underwriters, London Market Ins. to [461-1] cross claim deft Hanover; Firm of: Condon & Forsyth by attorney (emil)
February 19, 1992 Filing 495 NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION by Great American Ins. for an order enjoining pltff Olin Corp.'s litigation of a State Court action in Connecticut, and granting such other & further relief as may seem appropriate to this Court , Return date 2/20/92 (emil)
February 18, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 498 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Aetna Casualty & Surety Co. to answer the summons & first amended counterclaim & cross-claim of Employers Ins. of WAUSAU to 3/2/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 18, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 497 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Ins. Co. of North America to answer the add'l counterclaim & cross-claims of deft The Hanover Ins. Co. is extended to 2/20/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 18, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 496 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for deft Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Various Market Insurance Companies, London & Edinburgh Ins. Co. Ltd. & North River Ins. Co. to answer the Cross-Claims of deft Hanover Ins. Co. is extended to 2/18/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 13, 1992 Filing 494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Re-Insuranc, Continental Casualty, Capital Markets Assu of Answer of defts to First Amended Counterclaim & Crossclaim of Employers Insurance of Wausau upon Oppenheimer Wolff & Donnelly by mail on 2/11/92 (emil)
February 13, 1992 Filing 493 ANSWER by American Home Assura, National Union Fire, Lexington Insurance, Granite State Ins. Co. to [488-1] cross claim (emil)
February 11, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter dated 2/4/92, Return date reset to 2/20/92 for [480-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of pltff Olin Corp.'s Connecticut action and granting such other relief as the Court may deem just and proper, 2/20/92 for [482-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of an action pltff Olin Corp. has commenced in the Superior Court of Connecticut, 2/20/92 for [478-1] motion for an order enjoining Olin Corp. from litigating its Conneticut action, 2/20/92 for [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ) (emil)
February 11, 1992 Filing 491 JUDGMENT that the 2nd, 9th, and 10th claims for relief of the First Amended Complaint as against Falcon Insurance Company & Commercial Union Ins. Co., to the extent they relate to the Alabama DDT claims, be dismissed w/ prejudice ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. (emil)
February 11, 1992 Filing 490 ANSWER by American Re-Insuranc, Continental Casualty, Capital Markets Assu to [488-1] cross claim ; by attorney (emil)
February 7, 1992 Filing 489 MEMORANDUM by American Re-Insuranc, Continental Casualty, Allstate Insurance, Capital Markets Assu in support of [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action (emil)
February 6, 1992 Filing 488 CROSSCLAIM by Employers Ins. of against Insurance Company of, The Hanover Ins. Co., American Home Assura, American Re-Insuranc, Cert. Underwriters, Certain Underwriters, London Market Ins., Commercial Union Ins, Continental Casualty, Employers Ins. of, C.E. Health Compensa, Federal Insurance, Fireman's Fund Ins., Great American Ins., Lexington Insurance, London & Edinburgh, Capital Markets Assu, National Union Fire, North River Insuranc, Allstate Insurance (emil) Modified on 12/01/1997
February 6, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 487 STIPULATION and ORDER, Defts American Home Assurance Co., Lexington Ins. Co., Nat'l Union Fire In. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA & the Granite State Ins. Co. Response to counterclaim of WAUSAU set for 2/12/92 , Response to crossclaim deadline set for 2/12/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
February 6, 1992 Filing 486 NOTICE of Superintendent of Ins. of the State of NY, as Ancillary Receiver of Intergrity Ins. Co. of entry of order in Supreme Court, County of NY on 4/14/87 (emil)
February 3, 1992 Filing 485 ANSWER of deft The Home Ins. Co. to First Amended Counterclaim & Cross-Claim of deft Employers Ins. of WAUSAU, and Claim agaisnt pltff Olin Corp (emil)
January 31, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 484 STIPULATION and ORDER, Ins. Co. of North America's Response to WAUSAU's amended crossclaim deadline set for 2/20/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
January 30, 1992 Filing 483 MEMORANDUM of deft Federal Ins. Co. in support of [480-1] motion for an order enjoining the litigation of pltff Olin Corp.'s Connecticut action and granting such other relief as the Court may deem just and proper (emil)
January 30, 1992 Filing 482 NOTICE OF MOTION by deft Federal Insurance Co. for an order enjoining the litigation of an action pltff Olin Corp. has commenced in the Superior Court of Connecticut , Return date 2/13/92 (emil)
January 30, 1992 Filing 481 AFFIDAVIT of Katherine B. Posner on behalf of Certain Underwriters (emil)
January 30, 1992 Filing 480 NOTICE OF MOTION by Certain Underwrites at Lloyd's London and various London Market Ins. Co., London and Edinburgh Ins. Co. Ltd, and North River Ins. Co. for an order enjoining the litigation of pltff Olin Corp.'s Connecticut action and granting such other relief as the Court may deem just and proper , Return date 2/13/92 (emil) Modified on 01/31/1992
January 29, 1992 Filing 479 ANSWER by Commercial Union Insurance Company & C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Insurance Co. to [461-1] counter claim of WAUSAU (emil)
January 29, 1992 Filing 478 NOTICE OF MOTION by Falcon Ins. Co., Commercial Union Ins. Co. & C.E. Heath Compensation & Liability Ins Co. for an order enjoining Olin Corp. from litigating its Conneticut action , Return date 2/13/92. Memo in support is attached (emil)
January 27, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 477 STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 2/28/92 for Additional Deft. on Counterclaim, General Reinsurance Corporation ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (rjm)
January 24, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 476 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for Commercial Union & Falcon to answer the WAUSAU complaint to 1/29/92; Defts Commericall Union Ins. Co. & Falcon Ins. Co. shall have until 1/29/92 to answer the Wausau crossclaim ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
January 24, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 475 STIPULATION and ORDER, Response to amended crossclaim deadline set for 2/18/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (emil)
January 24, 1992 Filing 474 ANSWER by deft Fireman's Fund Ins. Co. to [461-1] cross claim of WAUSAU'S Cross Claim ; Firm of: Postner & Rubin (emil)
January 24, 1992 Filing 473 MEMORANDUM by Insurance Company of North America in support of [472-1] motion for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action (rjm)
January 24, 1992 Filing 472 NOTICE OF MOTION by Insurance Company of North America for an Order Enjoining Olin from Litigating its Connecticut action , Return date 2/13/92 (rjm)
January 22, 1992 Filing 471 REPLY of deft National Union Fire Insurance Company of PA Re: Cross Claim of Employers Insurance of Wausau. (emil)
January 22, 1992 Filing 470 REPLY of deft National Union Fire Insurance Company of PA. Re: Amended Cross Claim of Employers Insurance of WAUSAU (emil)
January 17, 1992 Filing 469 ANSWER to Complaint of Defts., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London & Various London Market Insurance Companies, London & Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited, and North River Insurance Company, To Deft. Employers Insurance of Wausau's First Amended Cross-Claim (Attorney ), ; Firm of: Condon & Forsyth by attorney (rjm)
January 17, 1992 Filing 468 ANSWER of Federal Insurance Co. to First Amended Counterclaim and Cross-Claim of Employers Insurance of Wausau ; Firm of: Rogers & Wells by attorney (rjm)
January 16, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 467 STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time to answer cross-claims of Deft. Hanover Insurance Co. to and including 2/10/92 ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ). (rjm)
January 8, 1992 Filing 466 NOTICE of substitution of attorney for Olin Corporation by James J. Harrington (rjm)
January 8, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER, Directing entry of Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed (rjm)
January 8, 1992 Filing 464 AFFIDAVIT in support of Kathryn A. Underhill on behalf of Falcon Ins. & Commercial Union Ins. Co. Re: [459-1] motion for summary judgment (rjm)
January 8, 1992 Filing 463 MEMORANDUM by Defts. Falcon Insurance Co. & Commercial Union Insurance Co. in support of [459-1] motion for summary judgment (rjm)
January 8, 1992 Opinion or Order Memo endorsed on motion; granting [459-1] motion for summary judgment. Submit order on notice. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (rjm)
December 27, 1991 Filing 462 COUNTERCLAIM & CROSS-CLAIMS by Insurance Company of against Olin Corporation (rjm)
December 19, 1991 Filing 461 CROSSCLAIM of deft Hanover against defts INA, WAUSAU, National Union and Lloyds (emil)
December 19, 1991 Filing 460 Notice that the original record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals: [449-1] appeal by Olin Corporation (emil)
December 11, 1991 Duplicate Original Memo endorsed on motion #438 granting leave to file supplemental pleadings. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (rjm)
December 11, 1991 Memo endorsed on motion; denying [446-1] motion to dismiss INA's Second Counterclaim ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (rjm)
December 11, 1991 Opinion or Order Memo endorsed on motion; withdrawing without prejudice [452-1] cross motion for an Order enjoining Plaintiff Olin Corporation from litigating its Conneticut action, and granting such other and further relief as the Court may deem just & proper. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (rjm)
December 9, 1991 Filing 459 NOTICE OF MOTION for summary judgment , Return date 1/9/92. Memo in support is attached. (emil)
December 5, 1991 Filing 458 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of its Motion to Dismiss INA's purported second counterclaim. (rjm)
December 4, 1991 Filing 457 REPLY MEMORANDUM of Hanover & Wausau in further support of their Motion for leave to serve Supplemental Pleadings. (rjm)
December 4, 1991 Filing 456 Reply affidavit of Dale C. Christensen, Jr. in further support of Motion for leave to serve Supplemental Pleadings. (rjm)
November 26, 1991 Filing 455 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in opposition to Joint Motion for leave to serve Supplemental Pleadings. (rjm)
November 26, 1991 Filing 454 AFFIDAVIT in support of Paul R. Koepff by Insurance Company of North America, et al. Re: [452-1] cross motion for an Order enjoining Plaintiff Olin Corporation from litigating its Conneticut action, and granting such other and further relief as the Court may deem just & proper. (rjm)
November 26, 1991 Filing 453 MEMORANDUM by Insurance Company of North America, et al. in support of [452-1] cross motion for an Order enjoining Plaintiff Olin Corporation from litigating its Conneticut action, and granting such other and further relief as the Court may deem just & proper. (rjm)
November 26, 1991 Filing 452 NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION by Insurance Company of North America, et al. for an Order enjoining Plaintiff Olin Corporation from litigating its Conneticut action, and granting such other and further relief as the Court may deem just & proper. , Return date 12/5/91 (rjm)
November 26, 1991 NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION by Insurance Company of North America, Return date 12/5/91 at 2:15pm. Rm. 601 for an Order enjoining plaintiff Olin Corporation from litigating its Connecticut action, and granting such other and further relief as the Court may deem just & proper. (rjm)
November 26, 1991 Filing 451 AFFIDAVIT in opposition of James J. Harrington by Olin Corporation Re: Motion for Leave to serve Supplemental Pleadings. (rjm)
October 29, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER, substituting attorney for deft Employers Insurance of Wausau ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed (emil)
October 23, 1991 Memo endorsed on motion #295 (see paper docket) that the motion for partial summary judgment is withdrawn; ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); Copies mailed. (emil)
October 16, 1991 Filing 449 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Olin Corporation ; from the order entered on 9/16/91 & from the judgments dated 9/16/91 & 9/17/91; Entered on docket Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: . Appeal record due on 11/15/91 (emil)
October 4, 1991 Filing 448 AFFIDAVIT in support of James J. Harrington Re: [446-1] motion to dismiss INA's Second Counterclaim (emil)
October 4, 1991 Filing 447 MEMORANDUM by Olin Corporation in support of [446-1] motion to dismiss INA's Second Counterclaim (emil)
October 4, 1991 Filing 446 NOTICE OF MOTION by Olin Corporation to dismiss INA's Second Counterclaim , Return date 11/7/91 (emil)
October 3, 1991 Filing 445 Transcript of record of proceedings filed for dates of 7/17/91 at 2:30pm. (rjm)
April 17, 1989 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Leonard B. Sand , endorsed on order of reference to Magistrate Judge. ; Copies mailed. (emil)
April 6, 1984 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Olin Corporation , (Answer due 2/28/92 ) ; Summons issued. (emil)
April 3, 1984 Filing 1 Notice of asgmnt. _ to Judge Lloyd McMahon Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: James J. Harrington . (emil)
March 20, 1984 Filing 1653 SCANNED PAPER DOCKET REPORT containing docket entries entered on the Paper Docket for period of 04/03/1984 to 09/17/1991. The Last Document No. used on the Paper Docket is 444. (nd)
March 20, 1984 Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia (emil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olin Corporation v. INS. Company of N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company a/s/o Marco Del Gado
Represented By: Daniel A. Bartoldus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph J. Luongo
Represented By: Bradley James Mortensen
Represented By: Elaine Whiteman Klinger
Represented By: Cynthia Ruggerio
Represented By: Anneliese Scott
Represented By: Susan B. Thauer
Represented By: Ronald A. Uitz
Represented By: Richard H. Gimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence L. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine D. Cockerham
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Urbelis
Represented By: Virginia White-Mahaffey
Represented By: Joseph H. Spain
Represented By: Ruth S. Kochenderfer
Represented By: Joseph DeDonato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National American Insurance Company of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Insurance of WAUSAU
Represented By: Donna Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael L. Anania
Represented By: Douglas J. Steinke
Represented By: Charles Andrew Booth
Represented By: Jody Michelle Tawfik
Represented By: Michael J. Tricarico
Represented By: Barry G. Saretsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Marian Sue Hertz
Represented By: Ann L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Rocco N. Covino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Marian Sue Hertz
Represented By: Ann L. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imdemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Victoria J. Airgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onebeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph J. Luongo
Represented By: Elaine Whiteman Klinger
Represented By: Cynthia Ruggerio
Represented By: Anneliese Scott
Represented By: Susan B. Thauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Property/Casualty Insurance Security Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIU Insurance Company
Represented By: Marian Sue Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Continental Corporation
Represented By: Charles Andrew Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Paul R. Koepff
Represented By: Seth Goodman Park
Represented By: John L. Altieri, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Re-Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. Anania
Represented By: Douglas J. Steinke
Represented By: Jody Michelle Tawfik
Represented By: Charles Andrew Booth
Represented By: Michael J. Tricarico
Represented By: Barry G. Saretsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: David M. Farkouh
Represented By: Steven Gary Adams
Represented By: Marian Sue Hertz
Represented By: Ann L. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Joseph Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Dale C. Christensen, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph DeDonato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Charles Witherwax
Represented By: Catherine M. Colinvaux
Represented By: George Robert Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: James W Greene
Represented By: Charles Andrew Booth
Represented By: George Richard Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Markets Assurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph DeDonato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. De Luca
Represented By: Carlie Fitapelli
Represented By: Brian R. Ade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.E. Health Compensation & Liability Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Scott Kull
Represented By: Erik B Derr
Represented By: Benjamin Blume
Represented By: Ralph J. Luongo
Represented By: Elizabeth A Sutton
Represented By: Elaine Whiteman Klinger
Represented By: Susannah Sidney Geltman
Represented By: Victoria Allen
Represented By: Bryce Leigh Friedman
Represented By: Diana Marie Karnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Onebeacon American Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph J. Luongo
Represented By: Elaine Whiteman Klinger
Represented By: Cynthia Ruggerio
Represented By: Anneliese Scott
Represented By: Susan B. Thauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Lond
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Mary Ann D'Amato
Represented By: George Marshall Moriarty
Represented By: John G. McAndrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: London Market Insurance Companies
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: George Marshall Moriarty
Represented By: Robert Hammesfahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: London & Edinburgh Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: George Marshall Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London and London Market Insurance Companies
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: George Marshall Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: North River Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Robert Hammesfahr
Represented By: George Antonios Tsougarakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Lamorak Insurance Company f/k/a OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Scott Kull
Represented By: Ralph J. Luongo
Represented By: Susannah Sidney Geltman
Represented By: Bryce Leigh Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Munich Reinsurance America Inc. f/k/a American Re-Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Bates, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Robert Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Olin-Hunt Specialty Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: General Reinsurance Corporation
Represented By: Stefan R. Underhill
Represented By: Jonathan B. Tropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Home Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Transit Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Aetna Casualty & Surety Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Wolfe
Represented By: Matthew John Shiroma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Integrity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olin Corporation
Represented By: Joel B. Samson
Represented By: Allison A. Torrence
Represented By: Michael J. Nelson
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: David W. Sobelman
Represented By: Matthew J Thomas
Represented By: Ryan Shawn Luft
Represented By: Stephen Allen Dvorkin
Represented By: Matthew E. Price
Represented By: Michael H. Wetmore
Represented By: Alan E. Popkin
Represented By: Joan Laura Lewis
Represented By: Peter J Brennan
Represented By: Jerry K. Ronecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?