United States of America v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually, Joseph W. Morgan, Eugene Boffa, Sr., Anthony Provenzano, Robert Holmes, Sr., Salvatore Provenzano, Milton Rockman, Don L. West, Arnold Weinmeister, Theodore Cozza, Matthew Ianniello, Nunzio Provenzano, Gennaro Langella, Francis Sheeran, John H. Cleveland, Daniel Ligurotis, Salvatore Santoro, John Tronolone, William J. McCarthy, Carmine Persico, The Commission of La Cosa Nostra, Anthony Thomas Civella, Paul Kenny, General Executive Board, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, Donald Peters, Philip Rastelli, Joseph John Aiuppa, Anthony Ficarotta, Christopher Furnari, Sr., Edward M. Lawson, Frank Manzo, Jackie Presser, Frank Balistrieri, Michael J. Riley, Angelo Lapietra, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, Maurice R. Schurr, Carl Civella, Harold Friedman, Joseph Massino, Carl Angelo Deluna, John Philip Cerone, Nicholas Marangello, Joseph Trerotola, Jack D. Cox, Joseph Lombardo, Weldon Mathis, Anthony Salerno, Walter J. Shea and Anthony Corallo
Petitioner: Dane Passo, Francis Gillen, Charles M. Carberry, William T. Hogan, Jr., Commonwealth Association of School Administrators (CASA), Local 502, George DiPilato, Jere Nash, Marc M Pekay, Robert Weisenburger and Lawrence Bastian
Respondent: Gerald Pauli, Joseph Kouba, Paul Roa, Ed J. Mireles and Charles Crawley
Interested Party: Abraham Moreno and Gary Guillory
Intervenor: Patrick Flynn, Kevin Wagoner and Larry Alexander
Undetermined: Teamster Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually, Frank Radice and Richard W. Mark
Appellant: Thomas Flaherty and James Deamicis
Amicus Curiae: Teamsters for a Democratic Union
Case Number: 1:1988cv04486
Filed: June 28, 1988
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4618 ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF VIET D. DINH: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Viet D. Dinh is withdrawn from the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Attorney Viet D. Dinh terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/16/2018) (mro)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4617 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from George W. Hicks, Jr. dated 10/16/2018 re: Withdrawal of Viet D. Dinh. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Hicks, George)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4616 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4614 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4615 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4614 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4614 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
April 30, 2018 Filing 4613 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4611 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
April 30, 2018 Filing 4612 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4611 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
April 30, 2018 Filing 4611 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4610 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #4609 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 12/22/2017 re: United States of America v. IBT, et al., No. 88 Civ. 4486 (LAP). Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. ENDORSEMENT: The filing of the unredacted transcript has mooted the motions at dkt. nos. 4573, 4582, and 4583. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate those motions. So ordered. Terminating #4573 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; Terminating #4582 Motion to Unseal; Terminating #4583 Motion to Unseal Document. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/2/2018) (rjm)
December 22, 2017 Filing 4609 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 12/22/2017 re: United States of America v. IBT, et al., No. 88 Civ. 4486 (LAP). Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dinh, Viet)
December 14, 2017 Filing 4608 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4606 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
December 14, 2017 Filing 4607 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4606 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
December 14, 2017 Filing 4606 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
December 8, 2017 Filing 4605 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. TDU Response to Court Order of December 1, 2017. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Harvey, Barbara)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4604 ORDER granting #4603 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/8/2017) (jwh)
December 7, 2017 Filing 4603 MOTION for Extension of Time to file TDU's response to Court's Order of December 1, 2017. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union.(Harvey, Barbara)
December 7, 2017 Filing 4602 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 12/7/2017 re: United States of America v. IBT, et al., No. 88 Civ. 4486 (LAP). Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dinh, Viet)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4601 ORDER re: #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union: Counsel shall inform the court by letter no later than December 7, 2017, of the current status of the redacted portions of the transcript at issue in the Teamsters for a Democratic Union's motion to unseal (dkt. no. 4582). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/1/2017) (jwh)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4600 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on INDEPENDENT INVESTIGATIONS OFFICER'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA DIRECTING REGIONS BANK TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. ENDORSEMENT: granted. Counsel shall submit a form of subpoena. So ordered. Granting #4597 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/28/2017) (rjm)
November 20, 2017 Filing 4599 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4597 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Carberry, Charles)
November 20, 2017 Filing 4598 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4597 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
November 20, 2017 Filing 4597 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
August 11, 2017 Filing 4596 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #4583 MOTION to Unseal Document #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union -- Notice of Motion. TDU Letter Reply to IBT Letter of August 9, 2017. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Harvey, Barbara)
August 9, 2017 Filing 4595 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 08/09/2017 re: Pending motion to unseal the July 20, 2016 transcript. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dinh, Viet)
June 30, 2017 Filing 4594 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. . Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "C-1", #6 Exhibit "C-2", #7 Exhibit "D", #8 Exhibit "E", #9 Exhibit "F")(Harvey, Barbara)
June 30, 2017 Filing 4593 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #4594 Reply) - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. . Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Harvey, Barbara) Modified on 7/5/2017 (db).
June 22, 2017 Filing 4592 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. . Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dinh, Viet)
June 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/22/2017. Replies due by 6/29/2017. (ap)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4591 ORDER: with respect to #4583 Motion to Unseal Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/22/2017) (ap)
June 21, 2017 Filing 4590 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 06/21/2017 re: Joint proposal for briefing schedule. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
June 19, 2017 Filing 4589 MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying #4585 Motion to Strike. ENDORSEMENT: The motion to strike is denied. Counsel shall confer and inform the Court of the proposed briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2017) (mro)
June 12, 2017 Filing 4588 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #4585 MOTION to Strike Document No. #4582 Motion to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. . Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dinh, Viet)
June 9, 2017 Filing 4587 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4585 MOTION to Strike Document No. #4582 Motion to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. . Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Harvey, Barbara)
June 9, 2017 Filing 4586 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. . Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Harvey, Barbara)
June 9, 2017 Filing 4585 MOTION to Strike Document No. #4582 Motion to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
June 9, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Barbara M. Harvey to RE-FILE Document #4584 MOTION to Unseal Document -- Brief in Support of Motion to Unseal. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (db)
June 8, 2017 Filing 4584 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Unseal Document -- Brief in Support of Motion to Unseal. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union.(Harvey, Barbara) Modified on 6/9/2017 (db).
June 8, 2017 Filing 4583 MOTION to Unseal Document #4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union -- Notice of Motion. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union.(Harvey, Barbara)
June 8, 2017 Filing 4582 MOTION to Unseal Union's Transcript of June 20, 2016 Meeting. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. Return Date set for 6/22/2017 at 06:23 PM.(Harvey, Barbara)
June 5, 2017 Filing 4581 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4579 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Carberry, Charles)
June 5, 2017 Filing 4580 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4579 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
June 5, 2017 Filing 4579 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
May 23, 2017 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (jwh)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4578 ORDER re: #4573 MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Unsealing of Judicial Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union: Before the Court is a request for a prehearing motion conference by the Teamsters for a Democratic Union ("TDU") to address the unsealing of a transcript of a meeting held on July 20, 2016. (ECF No. 4573). The Court grants the TDU permission to make the motion within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order. The International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") may respond within 14 days, to which the TDU may submit a reply within 7 days. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/23/2017) (jwh)
May 8, 2017 Filing 4577 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated May 5, 2017 re: Reply in Support of Pre-Motion Hearing Request DE#s 4573,4575, 4576. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B: Teamster Voice-Spring 2017)(Harvey, Barbara)
May 8, 2017 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Barbara M. Harvey. Document No. #4576 Exhibit(s). This document is not filed via ECF. (db)
May 6, 2017 Filing 4576 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated May 5, 2017 re: #4573 MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Unsealing of Judicial Document. TDU Reply Exhibit B. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Harvey, Barbara) Modified on 5/8/2017 (db).
May 6, 2017 Filing 4575 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated May 5, 2017 re: TDU Pre-Motion Conference Request-Reply. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Convoy#2-Jan&Feb1976)(Harvey, Barbara)
May 3, 2017 Filing 4574 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Bradley Raymond dated May 3, 2017 re: response to April 17, 2017 letter filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Hicks, George)
April 19, 2017 Filing 4573 MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Unsealing of Judicial Document. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union.(Harvey, Barbara)
February 27, 2017 Filing 4572 NOTICE of International Brotherhood of Teamsters Response to the Annual Report of the Independent Investigations Officer. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Dinh, Viet)
February 16, 2017 Filing 4571 NOTICE of Annual Report of the Independent Investigations Officer pursuant to Paragraph 30 of the Final Agreement and Order. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4570 ORDER: The Court construes the attached letter from Francis J. Gillen ("Gillen"), proceeding pro se, as a renewed motion for reconsideration of the Court's order dated December 5, 2013, [ECF No. 4328]. Gillen last wrote to the Court on March 31, 2014, [ECF No. 4349], seeking the Court's reconsideration of the December 5th order. Once again, Gillen's arguments merely rehash those that the Court rejected in its previous order. The motion is therefore DENIED. A copy of this order had been mailed to Gillen. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/11/2017) (mro)
January 10, 2017 Filing 4569 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Bradley T. Raymond dated 01/10/2017 re: Response to Order of December 27, 2016. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4568 ORDER granting #4525 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Before the Court is the Government's motion to enforce judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015, [ECF No. 4525], dated November 3, 2016. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the Government's motion to enforce judgment and orders the IBT to produce all documents requested in the March 4 and March 11 notices of examination, including the 15,278 emails deemed privileged and the 17,334 emails deemed unresponsive by the IBT, but excluding those documents concerning Ken Hall's negotiations with UPS that the IIO does not seek, within two weeks of the date of entry of this Order. The Court requests that counsel for the IBT assure that adequate preservation orders remain in place, given the delay in making this production. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/27/2016) (mro)
December 20, 2016 Filing 4567 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca S. Tinio dated December 20, 2016 re: Enclosing Supplemental Declaration. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4566 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4565 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/16/2016) (cf)
December 15, 2016 Filing 4565 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca S. Tinio dated December 15, 2016 re: Request for Approval of Parties' Joint Selection for Independent Review Officer. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4564 ORDER denying #4562 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The request is Denied. Disclosing details of the IIO's investigation might well compromise the investigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/15/2016) (ama) Modified on 12/15/2016 (ama). Modified on 12/15/2016 (ama).
December 15, 2016 Filing 4563 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca S. Tinio dated December 15, 2016 re: Opposition to Union's Request to Review the IIO's Anticipated Ex Parte Declaration. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
December 13, 2016 Filing 4562 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response Letter addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 12/13/2016. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4561 ORDER: Pursuant to footnote 2 in the Government's memorandum of law in support of the motion to enforce judgment, [ECF No. 4526], the Government is directed to submit an ex parte supplemental declaration from the IIO for in camera review that provides more detail about the IIO's investigations of the IBT in the matter at bar. The Government shall submit the declaration within one week of the date of entry of this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/13/2016) (mro)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4560 ORDER granting #4555 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/2/2016) (mro)
December 1, 2016 Filing 4559 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 12/1/2016 re: government's reply in support of motion to enforce. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
November 30, 2016 Filing 4558 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Rebecca S. Tinio in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tinio, Rebecca)
November 30, 2016 Filing 4557 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Charles M. Carberry in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Tinio, Rebecca)
November 30, 2016 Filing 4556 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015. . Document filed by United States of America. (Tinio, Rebecca)
November 30, 2016 Filing 4555 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca S. Tinio dated November 30, 2016. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
November 22, 2016 Filing 4554 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated November 22, 2016 re: Parties' Joint Proposal re: Sealing of Transcript of July 20, 2016 Meeting. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
November 18, 2016 Filing 4553 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015. . Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dinh, Viet)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4552 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated 11/16/2016 re: I write respectfully to request a one-day extension of time to file our letter on the Government's motion to enforce the judgment. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/17/2016) (rjm)
November 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/18/2016. Replies due by 11/30/2016. (rjm)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4551 ORDER granting #4549 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Briefing Deadlines addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca S. Tinio dated November 16, 2016. Document filed by United States of America. 1. 2. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/17/2016) (rjm)
November 17, 2016 Filing 4550 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015. . Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: IRO to James P. Hoffa)(Harvey, Barbara)
November 16, 2016 Filing 4549 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: Briefing Deadlines addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rebecca S. Tinio dated November 16, 2016. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4548 ORDER terminating #4531 Letter Motion for Conference. Before the Court is a letter motion [dkt. no. 4531] of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") requesting a pre-motion conference prior to moving for a protective order to enjoin the Independent Investigations Officer ("IIO") from pursuing charges against an officer of the Union during the IBT's ongoing election process. The parties have agreed that the Court may proceed with the motion on the basis of the pre-motion conference letters. [Dkt. nos. 4531, 4536, 4538, 4540, and 4541]; as further set forth herein. Accordingly, the IBT's request to suspend the charges against Ken Hall, [dkt. no. 4531], is denied. The Court directs that the IIO-referred charges should proceed in the usual manner through the Union and the Independent Review Officer as prescribed by the Final Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/15/2016) (mro)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4547 ORDER: The IBT shall respond to the Government's letter dated November 14, 2016, regarding the sealing of the transcript submitted in support of the request for a protective order [dkt. no. 4545.] (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/15/2016) (mro)
November 15, 2016 Filing 4546 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 11/15/2016 re: the government's letter motion dated 11/14/2016 to unseal the July 20 transcript. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dinh, Viet)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4545 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated November 14, 2016 re: Propriety of sealing July 20, 2016 Transcript. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4544 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4543 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. ( Responses due by 11/17/2016, Replies due by 11/24/2016.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/13/2016) (mro)
November 10, 2016 Filing 4543 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated November 10, 2016 re: Amicus Briefs. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4542 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 11/9/2016 re: The International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") requests approval to file under seal Exhibit 2 of Docket Entry #4538. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/10/2016) (lmb)
November 10, 2016 Filing 4541 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard W. Mark dated November 10, 2016 re: additional information from the Election Supervisor. Document filed by Richard W. Mark.(Mark, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 4540 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 11/10/2016 re: the Court's jurisdiction. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
November 9, 2016 Filing 4539 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated November 9, 2016 re: Proposing Agreed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by United States of America.(Tinio, Rebecca)
November 9, 2016 Filing 4538 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 11/09/2016 re: reply seeking pre-motion conference. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Dinh, Viet)
November 9, 2016 Filing 4537 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4535 Letter, filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. As to a pre-motion conference, counsel may proceed with the actual motion on a prompt scheduled proposed today. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/9/2016) (mro)
November 8, 2016 Filing 4536 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated November 8, 2016 re: #4531 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated November 3, 2016. . Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit diGenova Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to diGenova Affidavit)(La Morte, Tara)
November 7, 2016 Filing 4535 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated 11/07/2016 re: the Court's ORDER dated 11/07/2016 re: the briefing schedule. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4534 ORDER: Having reviewed the letters of counsel regarding a discovery dispute, counsel shall propose, no later than close of business today, a prompt briefing schedule for the motion. In the alternative, counsel may opt to rely on the previously-submitted letters. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/7/2016) (mro)
November 4, 2016 Filing 4533 AFFIDAVIT of Charles M. Carberry in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26-1, #7 Exhibit 26-2, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 36, #18 Exhibit 37, #19 Exhibit 38, #20 Exhibit 39, #21 Exhibit 40, #22 Exhibit 41, #23 Exhibit 42, #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 48, #30 Exhibit 49, #31 Exhibit 50, #32 Exhibit 51, #33 Exhibit 52, #34 Exhibit 53)(La Morte, Tara)
November 4, 2016 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. #4532 HAS BEEN REJECTED. THIS IS A DUPLICATED DOCUMENT. Note to Attorney Tara Marie La Morte : This is a Duplicate Document. Do Not Re-File. (db)
November 4, 2016 Filing 4532 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - AFFIDAVIT of Charles S. Carberry in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26-1, #7 Exhibit 26-2, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 36, #18 Exhibit 37, #19 Exhibit 38, #20 Exhibit 39, #21 Exhibit 40, #22 Exhibit 41, #23 Exhibit 42, #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 48, #30 Exhibit 49, #31 Exhibit 50, #32 Exhibit 51, #33 Exhibit 52, #34 Exhibit 53)(La Morte, Tara) Modified on 11/4/2016 (db).
November 4, 2016 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document Nos. [4528-4529] HAVE BEEN REJECTED. THESE ARE DUPLICATED DOCUMENTS. Note to Attorney Tara Marie La Morte : These are Duplicate Documents. Do Not Re-File. (db)
November 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2016. (mph)
November 3, 2016 Filing 4531 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated November 3, 2016. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dinh, Viet)
November 3, 2016 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 4524 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015, pursuant to docket entry #4530 . (cf)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4530 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from George W. Hicks, Jr. dated 11/3/2016 re: Request to remove docket entry #4524. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/3/2016) (cf)
November 3, 2016 Filing 4529 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - AFFIDAVIT of Charles S. Carberry in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27)(La Morte, Tara) Modified on 11/4/2016 (db).
November 3, 2016 Filing 4528 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - AFFIDAVIT of Charles S. Carberry in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26-1, #7 Exhibit 26-2, #8 Exhibit 26-3, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 36, #18 Exhibit 37, #19 Exhibit 38, #20 Exhibit 39, #21 Exhibit 40, #22 Exhibit 41, #23 Exhibit 42, #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit 48, #30 Exhibit 49, #31 Exhibit 50, #32 Exhibit 51, #33 Exhibit 52, #34 Exhibit 53)(La Morte, Tara) Modified on 11/4/2016 (db).
November 3, 2016 Filing 4527 AFFIDAVIT of Charles S. Carberry in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12-1, #14 Exhibit 12-2, #15 Exhibit 12-3, #16 Exhibit 12-4, #17 Exhibit 12-5, #18 Exhibit 12-6, #19 Exhibit 12-7, #20 Exhibit 12-8, #21 Exhibit 12-9, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16-1, #26 Exhibit 16-2, #27 Exhibit 16-3, #28 Exhibit 16-4, #29 Exhibit 16-5, #30 Exhibit 16-6, #31 Exhibit 16-7, #32 Exhibit 16-8, #33 Exhibit 16-9, #34 Exhibit 17, #35 Exhibit 18, #36 Exhibit 19, #37 Exhibit 20)(La Morte, Tara)
November 3, 2016 Filing 4526 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015. . Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
November 3, 2016 Filing 4525 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Final Order of February 17, 2015. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4523 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4521 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4522 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4521 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4521 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4520 ORDER denying #4497 Motion. Accordingly, the motion by the Local 710 Defendants to enjoin the Illinois Lawsuit [dkt. no. 4497] is denied. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/20/2016) (kl)
August 29, 2016 Filing 4519 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4517 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
August 29, 2016 Filing 4518 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4517 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
August 29, 2016 Filing 4517 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
August 5, 2016 Filing 4516 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/29/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
August 5, 2016 Filing 4515 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/29/2016 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
July 29, 2016 Filing 4514 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4512 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
July 29, 2016 Filing 4513 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4512 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
July 29, 2016 Filing 4512 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4511 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4500 Motion for George W. Hicks, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/11/2016) (lmb)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4510 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4491 Motion for Marc M. Pekay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/4/2016) (kl)
July 8, 2016 Filing 4509 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4493 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Relief Under the Permanent Injunction Entered in This Case., #4497 MOTION Relief under the permanent injunction entered in this case to enjoin Plaintiff Joseph Kouba from seeking relief from defendants in any forum other than the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York re: #4494 Memor . Document filed by Marc M Pekay. (Pekay, Marc)
July 6, 2016 Filing 4508 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4493 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Relief Under the Permanent Injunction Entered in This Case. . Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner. (Deady, Patrick)
July 5, 2016 Filing 4507 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #4493 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Relief Under the Permanent Injunction Entered in This Case., #4497 MOTION Relief under the permanent injunction entered in this case to enjoin Plaintiff Joseph Kouba from seeking relief from defendants in any forum other than the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York re: #4494 Memor . Document filed by Joseph Kouba. (Morales-Doyle, Sean)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4506 ORDER granting #4505 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/30/2016) (kl)
June 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 6/30/2016. (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (mph)
June 30, 2016 Filing 4505 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motion (ECF Nos. 4493 & 4497) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sean Morales-Doyle dated June 27, 2016. Document filed by Joseph Kouba.(Morales-Doyle, Sean)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4504 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4496 Motion for Sean Morales-Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/30/2016) (kl)
June 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2016. (mph)
June 29, 2016 Filing 4503 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated June 29, 2016 re: Responding to the government's request to submit a reply letter. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
June 28, 2016 Filing 4502 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated June 28, 2016 re: #4499 LETTER MOTION to Compel International Brotherhood of Teamsters to Implement Final Order Re: amendment to Article XIX, Section 14 of Union Constitution addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated June 24, 2016. Request to Respond & Proposed Response. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Government's Reply Letter)(La Morte, Tara)
June 28, 2016 Filing 4501 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated June 28, 2016 re: Government's Request for Constitutional Amendment. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dinh, Viet)
June 27, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4500 MOTION for George W. Hicks, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12468167. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 27, 2016 Filing 4500 MOTION for George W. Hicks, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12468167. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hicks, George)
June 24, 2016 Filing 4499 LETTER MOTION to Compel International Brotherhood of Teamsters to Implement Final Order Re: amendment to Article XIX, Section 14 of Union Constitution addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated June 24, 2016. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 (continued), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(La Morte, Tara)
June 23, 2016 Filing 4498 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Benjamin H. Torrance dated June 23, 2016 re: motion for injunction [ECF no. 4493]. Document filed by United States of America.(Torrance, Benjamin)
June 21, 2016 Filing 4497 MOTION Relief under the permanent injunction entered in this case to enjoin Plaintiff Joseph Kouba from seeking relief from defendants in any forum other than the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York re: #4494 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #4493 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Relief Under the Permanent Injunction Entered in This Case. . Document filed by Marc M Pekay.(Pekay, Marc)
June 17, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4496 MOTION for Sean Morales-Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 17, 2016 Filing 4496 MOTION for Sean Morales-Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph Kouba. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of Admission, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Morales-Doyle, Sean)
June 17, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4495 MOTION for Sean Morales-Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12433192. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
June 17, 2016 Filing 4495 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - MOTION for Sean Morales-Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12433192. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph Kouba. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Letter of Good Standing, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Morales-Doyle, Sean) Modified on 6/17/2016 (bcu).
June 9, 2016 Filing 4494 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4493 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Relief Under the Permanent Injunction Entered in This Case. . Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner. (Deady, Patrick)
June 9, 2016 Filing 4493 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Relief Under the Permanent Injunction Entered in This Case. Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint A to Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A)(Deady, Patrick)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4492 ORDER terminating #4490 Letter Motion for Conference. Counsel may proceed with the motion without a conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/7/2016) (kl)
June 6, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4491 MOTION for Marc M. Pekay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12380008. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
June 4, 2016 Filing 4491 MOTION for Marc M. Pekay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12380008. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marc M Pekay. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of admission to the bar, #3 Supplement certificate of service)(Pekay, Marc)
June 3, 2016 Filing 4490 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Patrick E. Deady dated 06/03/2016. Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner.(Deady, Patrick)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4489 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4486 Motion for Patrick E. Deady to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/19/2016) (kl)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4488 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4487 Motion for J. Michael Tecson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/19/2016) (kl)
May 24, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4487 MOTION for J. Michael Tecson to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #4486 MOTION for Patrick E. Deady to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 24, 2016 Filing 4487 MOTION for J. Michael Tecson to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tecson, J.)
May 24, 2016 Filing 4486 MOTION for Patrick E. Deady to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Deady, Patrick)
May 20, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4485 MOTION for Patrick E. Deady to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12328117. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
May 20, 2016 Filing 4485 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Patrick E. Deady to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12328117. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Larry Alexander, Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Kevin Wagoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Deady, Patrick) Modified on 5/20/2016 (wb).
May 20, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4484 MOTION for J. Michael Tecson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12327615. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
May 20, 2016 Filing 4484 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for J. Michael Tecson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12327615. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Patrick Flynn, Gerald Pauli, Larry Alexander, Kevin Wagoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tecson, J.) Modified on 5/20/2016 (wb).
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4483 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Cheiron shall produce any and all documents and information responsive to the subpoena issued by this Court on October 6, 2015 in the above-captioned matter within fourteen (14) days from the date of the conference. In complying with this Order, Cheiron may redact confidential proprietary information. Cheiron will provide a log of any documents withheld under any claim of privilege. To the extent that Cheiron contends in good faith that any other documents or information previously produced by Cheiron in this matter contain allegedly privileged or confidential proprietary information, Cheiron shall identify the documents and the confidential proprietary or privileged information it contains by the date upon which Cheiron's production is due pursuant to this Order. The parties will attempt to reach an agreement with regard to the handling of those documents and information. Nothing in this Order precludes the Office from challenging the propriety of any redactions made by Cheiron. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/2016) (kl)
April 27, 2016 Filing 4482 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kevin C. Meacham dated 4-26-2016 re: Proposed Order. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meacham, Kevin)
April 27, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kevin C. Meacham to RE-FILE Document #4481 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kevin C. Meacham dated 4-26-2016. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
April 26, 2016 Filing 4481 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Discovery Order addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kevin C. Meacham dated 4-26-2016. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meacham, Kevin) Modified on 4/27/2016 (db).
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4480 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KEVIN C. MEACHAM granting #4479 Motion for Kevin C. Meacham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Kevin C. Meacham for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/21/2016) (kl)
April 20, 2016 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4479 MOTION for Kevin C. Meacham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12208496. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 20, 2016 Filing 4479 MOTION for Kevin C. Meacham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12208496. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meacham, Kevin)
April 1, 2016 Filing 4478 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4476 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Carberry, Charles)
April 1, 2016 Filing 4477 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4476 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
April 1, 2016 Filing 4476 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
April 1, 2016 Filing 4475 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Sol Tinio on behalf of United States of America. (Tinio, Rebecca)
March 30, 2016 Filing 4474 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles M. Carberry dated March 30, 2016 re: Request for Pre-Motion Discovery Conference. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
March 18, 2016 Filing 4473 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Discovery Conference) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles M. Carberry dated March 18, 2016. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Carberry, Charles)
March 16, 2016 Filing 4472 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4470 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Carberry, Charles)
March 16, 2016 Filing 4471 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4470 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
March 16, 2016 Filing 4470 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
March 2, 2016 Filing 4469 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4467 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Carberry, Charles)
March 2, 2016 Filing 4468 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4467 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
March 2, 2016 Filing 4467 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
January 14, 2016 Filing 4466 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4464 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carberry, Charles)
January 14, 2016 Filing 4465 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4464 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
January 14, 2016 Filing 4464 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4463 APPLICATION 182 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MARK HARRINGTON: We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/30/2015) (kko)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4462 APPLICATION 181 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND JOSEPH GURRIERI. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This. will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/30/2015) (rjm)
December 1, 2015 Filing 4461 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 181 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF JOSEPH GURRIERI. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 181 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed, the original documents concerning Application 181 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20001, IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/30/2015) (rjm). (Main Document 4461 replaced on 12/3/2015) (rjm).
December 1, 2015 Filing 4460 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 182 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF MARK HARRINGTON. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 182 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed, the original documents concerning Application 182 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20001, IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/30/2015) (rjm) (Main Document 4460 replaced on 12/3/2015) (rjm). Modified on 12/3/2015 (rjm).
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4459 ORDER. For the reasons above, Teamsters Local 710 and John T. Coli's motion for permanent injunction [dkt. no. 4452] is GRANTED and Gerald Pauli is hereby enjoined from litigating any claims relating to money that may or may not be payable to him following General President Hoffa's adoption of the IRB's Report and Recommendation in any jurisdiction other than the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Granting #4452 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/18/2015) (rjm) (Main Document 4459 replaced on 5/17/2016) (kl). Modified on 5/17/2016 (kl).
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4458 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4455 Motion for Jac A. Cotiguala to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/2/2015) (kko)
October 28, 2015 Filing 4457 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Gerald Pauli. (Cotiguala, Jac)
October 28, 2015 Filing 4456 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4452 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Corrected 10/22/2015). . Document filed by Gerald Pauli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Cotiguala, Jac)
October 23, 2015 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4455 MOTION for Jac A. Cotiguala to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11543931. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 23, 2015 Filing 4455 MOTION for Jac A. Cotiguala to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11543931. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gerald Pauli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cotiguala, Jac)
October 22, 2015 Filing 4454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Goodman, Laurence)
October 22, 2015 Filing 4453 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4452 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Corrected 10/22/2015). . Document filed by Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goodman, Laurence)
October 22, 2015 Filing 4452 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Corrected 10/22/2015). Document filed by Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goodman, Laurence)
October 19, 2015 Filing 4451 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (See #4454) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Goodman, Laurence) Modified on 10/22/2015 (kj).
October 19, 2015 Filing 4450 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (See #4453) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4449 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . . Document filed by Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goodman, Laurence) Modified on 10/22/2015 (kj).
October 19, 2015 Filing 4449 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (See #4452) MOTION for Permanent Injunction . Document filed by Teamster Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Goodman, Laurence) Modified on 10/22/2015 (kj).
October 19, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Laurence Mark Goodman to RE-FILE Document #4448 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Enjoining Gerald Pauli From Seeking Monies From Defendants Teamsters Local 710 and John T. Coli, Individually In Any Forum Other Than The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
October 16, 2015 Filing 4448 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Permanent Injunction Enjoining Gerald Pauli From Seeking Monies From Defendants Teamsters Local 710 and John T. Coli, Individually In Any Forum Other Than The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Document filed by Teamsters Local 710 & John T. Coli, Individually. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodman, Laurence) Modified on 10/19/2015 (db).
September 24, 2015 Filing 4447 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4445 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Carberry, Charles)
September 24, 2015 Filing 4446 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4445 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
September 24, 2015 Filing 4445 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
August 20, 2015 Filing 4444 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated August 20, 2015 re: Appointment of Disciplinary Officers. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4443 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4442 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4441 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4440 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4439 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 20, 2015 Filing 4438 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Ellen London dated 7/20/2015 re: Technical Amendments to Election Rules. Document filed by United States of America.(London, Ellen)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4437 ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' submissions [dkt. nos. 4431, 4432, 4433] concerning their disagreement over appointment of an Election Appeals Master, pursuant to paragraphs 3 and 9 of the Election Agreement [dkt. no. 4416], Kathleen Roberts is appointed as Election Appeals Master. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/24/2015) (rjm)
June 25, 2015 Filing 4436 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 25, 2015 Filing 4435 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4434 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Proposed 2016 Election Rules, a copy of which is annexed hereto, are approved and shall govern the 2016 Election unless modified in accordance with the February 2015 Order. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/23/2015) (mro) Modified on 6/24/2015 (mro).
June 23, 2015 Filing 4433 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Benjamin H. Torrance, Ellen M. London dated June 23, 2015 re: Election Appeals Master. Document filed by United States of America.(Torrance, Benjamin)
June 22, 2015 Filing 4432 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated June 22, 2015 re: Election Appeals Master. Document filed by General Executive Board, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 10 Letter)(Dinh, Viet)
June 22, 2015 Filing 4431 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Benjamin H. Torrance, Ellen M. London dated June 22, 2015 re: Election Appeals Master. Document filed by United States of America.(Torrance, Benjamin)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4430 APPLICATION 180 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND SAMUEL ROSAS. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/18/2015) (rjm)
June 19, 2015 Filing 4429 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 180 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF SAMUEL ROSAS. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 180 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed, the original documents concerning Application 180 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20001, IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/18/2015) (rjm)
June 19, 2015 Filing 4428 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Ellen London dated 6/19/2015 re: Proposed Election Rules. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E-1, #9 Exhibit E-2, #10 Exhibit E-3, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit F-1, #13 Exhibit G, #14 Proposed Order)(London, Ellen)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4427 APPLICATION 179 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ARMANDO ALONZO. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/24/2015) (rjm)
May 26, 2015 Filing 4426 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 179 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF ARMANDO ALONZO. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 179 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 179 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20001, IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/24/2015) (rjm)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4425 APPLICATION 178 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND SYDNEY GOLDSTEIN. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/25/2015) (rjm)
March 26, 2015 Filing 4424 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 178 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF SYDNEY GOLDSTEIN. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 178 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 178 of the IRE with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the, Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20001, IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2015) (rjm)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4423 APPLICATION 177 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MICHAEL SWEENEY. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/16/2015) (rjm) (Main Document 4423 replaced on 3/19/2015) (rjm).
March 17, 2015 Filing 4422 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 177 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 177 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Michael Sweeney Application 177 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20001, IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/16/2015) (rjm)
March 17, 2015 Filing 4421 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/11/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 17, 2015 Filing 4420 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/11/2015 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4419 ORDER. For all of the reasons in this Order, Radice's objection must fail. It is hereby ORDERED that the IRB Opinion and Decision of June 18, 2014, is AFFIRMED in all respects. Application 170 is therefore GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/4/2015) (rjm)
March 1, 2015 Filing 4418 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ellen Melissa London on behalf of United States of America. (London, Ellen)
February 26, 2015 Filing 4417 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Henry Torrance on behalf of United States of America. (Torrance, Benjamin)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4416 STIPULATED AGREEMENT AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY AGREED, by and between the parties as follows: Subject to the provisions of the Final Order, the 2016 IBT Election will be conducted in accordance with this Agreement. Nothing in this Agreement precludes or limits the Secretary of Labor's exercise of authority under the Labor Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959, 29 U.S.C. 401 et seq., or any other federal laws, and as further specified and set forth herein. In the event the parties are unable to reach joint agreement as prescribed in paragraphs 3, 4, and 5 of this Agreement, they shall submit all disputes to the Court for resolution. Except as expressly provided for in Paragraph 1, nothing in this Agreement shall limit the rights of the Government or the IBT under the Final Order or the Court's authority or jurisdiction under the Final Order or the All Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. 1651. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/20/2015) (rjm)
February 18, 2015 Filing 4415 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated February 18, 2015 re: Proposed Election Agreement and Order. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 proposed Election Agreement and Order)(La Morte, Tara)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4414 ORDER granting #4409 Motion to Approve. Upon consideration of all the relevant materials before the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion [dkt. no. 4409] is GRANTED and the above-captioned civil action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The terms of the Final Agreement [dkt. no. 4409-1] are incorporated into this order, and this Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce those terms. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/17/2015) (ajs)
February 13, 2015 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #4413 USCA Mandate. (tp)
February 10, 2015 Filing 4413 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #4336 Notice of Appeal filed by Abraham Moreno, Gary Guillory, #4337 Notice of Appeal filed by Paul Kenny USCA Case Number 14-0304(L); 14-0407(CON). UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the cause be AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 2/10/2015. (tp)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4412 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated February 5, 2015 re: Comments on Parties' Joint Application for Approval of proposed Final Agreement and Order. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Comment #1, #2 Comment #2)(La Morte, Tara)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4411 ORDER REGARDING COMMENTS AND HEARING ON JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FINAL AGREEMENT AND ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. The Court will hold a hearing on February 11, 2015, at l1:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12A of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007-1312, on the Joint Motion for Approval, and as further specified and set forth herein. (Oral Argument set for 2/11/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/14/2015) (rjm)
January 14, 2015 Filing 4410 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4409 JOINT MOTION to Approve Final Agreement and Order . . Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
January 14, 2015 Filing 4409 JOINT MOTION to Approve Final Agreement and Order . Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Agreement and Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(La Morte, Tara)
January 14, 2015 Filing 4408 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4407 JOINT MOTION to Approve Final Agreement and Order . . Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara) Modified on 1/14/2015 (ka).
January 14, 2015 Filing 4407 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - JOINT MOTION to Approve Final Agreement and Order . Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Agreement and Order)(La Morte, Tara) Modified on 1/14/2015 (ka).
January 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2015. (mph)
January 5, 2015 Filing 4406 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 176 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 176 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 176 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the parties as further specified herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/2014) (rjm)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4405 APPLICATION 176 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ROBERT ROBERGE. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/2014) (rjm) (Main Document 4405 replaced on 1/6/2015) (rjm).
November 21, 2014 Filing 4404 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4402 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Carberry, Charles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 4403 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4402 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
November 21, 2014 Filing 4402 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
October 17, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/17/2014. (mph)
October 9, 2014 Filing 4401 DECLARATION of Charles M. Carberry in Support re: #4399 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Carberry, Charles)
October 9, 2014 Filing 4400 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4399 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
October 9, 2014 Filing 4399 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carberry, Charles)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4398 APPLICATION 175 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND CHARLES DECOLA. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/8/2014) (rjm)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4397 APPLICATION 174 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ANTHONY LAMY. We respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/8/2014) (rjm)
October 8, 2014 Filing 4396 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 174 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 174 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Anthony Lamy Application 174 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528 Washington, DC 20001 Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq. 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2014) (rjm)
October 8, 2014 Filing 4395 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 175 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 175 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Charles DeCola Application 175 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528 Washington, DC 20001 Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Bradley T. Raymond, Esq. 25 Louisiana Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 IBT General Counsel. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/6/2014) (rjm)
October 3, 2014 Filing 4394 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4392 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Carberry, Charles)
October 3, 2014 Filing 4393 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4392 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
October 3, 2014 Filing 4392 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
September 26, 2014 Filing 4391 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4389 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Carberry, Charles)
September 26, 2014 Filing 4390 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4389 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
September 26, 2014 Filing 4389 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Carberry, Charles)
September 24, 2014 Filing 4388 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 173 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD REGARDING PATRICK FLYNN. This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 173 of the Independent Review Board ("IRE") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 173 of the IRE with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528 Washington, DC 20001 Administrator of the Independent Review Board. Marvin Gittler, Esq. Asher, Gittler, Greenfield & D'Alba 200 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 1900 Chicago, Illinios 60606. Patrick J. Calihan, Esq. 55 West Jackson Blvd, Suite 1534 Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/23/2014) (rjm)
September 18, 2014 Filing 4387 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara M. Harvey dated September 18, 2014 re: IBT Request for Pre-Motion Conference Mediation. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 2a, #2 Appendix 2b, #3 Appendix 2c, #4 Appendix 2d, #5 Appendix 2e, #6 Appendix 2f, #7 Appendix 2g)(Harvey, Barbara)
September 17, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 9/17/2014. (mph)
September 16, 2014 Filing 4386 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara M. Harvey dated September 16, 2014 re: IBT Request for Pre-Motion Conference Mediation. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Stier Report on Project RISE-excerpts)(Harvey, Barbara)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4385 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John J. Cronin, Jr. dated 8/29/2014 re: The IRB has been informed, by the Local 1150 Secretary Treasurer, that Harvey Jackson has died. Therefore, the IRB respectfully requests that Application 172 be withdrawn. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/02/2014) (ama)
August 29, 2014 Filing 4384 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4382 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Carberry, Charles)
August 29, 2014 Filing 4383 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4382 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
August 29, 2014 Filing 4382 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4381 APPLICATION 171 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND TIMOTHY G. RYAN: Pursuant to Paragraph O. of the Rules and Procedures for Operation of the Independent Review Board for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IRB Rules"), the Independent Review Board ("IRE") files this Application submitting the Agreement with Timothy G. Ryan ("Ryan"), a member of Local 682 in Saint Louis, Missouri. The Agreement has been approved by the IRB and is submitted to Your Honor for review and, if appropriate, to be entered as an order, as set forth within. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/19/2014) (ajs)
August 19, 2014 Filing 4380 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 171 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER TIMOTHY G. RYAN: This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 171 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 171 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528 washington, DC 20001 Administrator of the Independent Review Board Michael A. Evans, Esq. 4399 Laclede Avenue Saint Louis, MO 63108 Counsel for the Respondent. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/16/2014) (ajs)
August 1, 2014 Filing 4379 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4377 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, Part 1, #8 Exhibit 6, Part 2, #9 Exhibit 6, Part 3, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31)(Carberry, Charles)
August 1, 2014 Filing 4378 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4377 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
August 1, 2014 Filing 4377 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
July 21, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4376 MOTION for Gary S. Witlen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9908030. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 21, 2014 Filing 4376 MOTION for Gary S. Witlen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9908030. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Witlen, Gary)
July 18, 2014 Filing 4375 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jonathan Bardavid dated July 18, 2014 re: IRB Application 170. Document filed by Frank Radice.(Bardavid, Jonathan)
July 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/16/2014. (mph)
July 14, 2014 Filing 4374 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated July 7, 2014 re: Pre-motion conference. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
July 11, 2014 Filing 4373 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles M. Carberry dated July 11, 2014 re: Response to Objection to Application 170. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
July 3, 2014 Filing 4372 Objection in part to IRB Application 170. Document filed by Frank Radice. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
July 3, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jonathan Michael Bardavid to RE-FILE Document #4368 MOTION to Strike Document No. [IRB Application 170] Objection, in part, to Application 170 of the IRB. Use the event type Objection (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (db)
July 2, 2014 Filing 4371 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4369 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena .. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Carberry, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 4370 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4369 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 4369 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 4368 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Strike Document No. [IRB Application 170] Objection, in part, to Application 170 of the IRB. Document filed by Frank Radice.(Bardavid, Jonathan) Modified on 7/3/2014 (db).
July 2, 2014 Filing 4367 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Michael Bardavid on behalf of Frank Radice. (Bardavid, Jonathan)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4366 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Bradley T. Raymond, Viet D. Dinh dated 6/20/2014 re: Pre-motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/16/2014 at 03:30 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/20/2014) (ajs)
June 19, 2014 Filing 4365 DECLARATION of Daniel K. Healy in Support re: #4363 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Carberry, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 4364 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4363 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena. . Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Filing 4363 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4362 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4360 Motion for Candice Chiu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2014) (ajs)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4361 ORDER: Based on the submissions concerning the IBT's proposed Rule 60(b)(5) motion [dkt. nos. 4355, 4357, 4558, 4359], the Court will hold a pre-motion conference on this matter. Chambers will contact the parties to schedule this conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2014) (ajs)
June 12, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4360 MOTION for Candice Chiu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9772918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
June 12, 2014 Filing 4360 MOTION for Candice Chiu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9772918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(Chiu, Candice)
June 10, 2014 Filing 4359 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated June 10, 2014 re: Reply letter regrading pre-motion conference and intent to file motion to vacate. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
June 9, 2014 Filing 4358 RESPONSE re: #4355 Letter, Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
June 9, 2014 Filing 4357 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara M. Harvey dated June 9, 2014 re: iBT Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union.(Harvey, Barbara)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4356 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Bancroft PLLC be substituted for Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein; James & Hoffman PC; and Willig, Williams & Davidson as attorneys of record of Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters in the above-captioned matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appearance of Bancroft PLLC as counsel in this case shall be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of Viet D. Dinh and Paul D. Clement of Bancroft PLLC, located at 1919 M Street NW, Suite 470, Washington, DC 20036, will be made on the roll of attorneys for the above-captioned case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served upon all counsel of record in this case., Attorney Martha Walfoort; Nancy B. G. Lassen and J Bruce Maffeo terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/5/2014) (lmb)
June 4, 2014 Filing 4355 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Viet D. Dinh dated June 4, 2014 re: pre-motion conference & intent to file motion to vacate 1989 Consent Decree. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Dinh, Viet)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4354 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4351 Motion for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/3/2014) (ajs)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4353 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion of Paul Clement, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/3/2014) (ajs)
June 2, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #4352 MOTION for Paul Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The Certificate of Good Standing From the Supreme Court of Virginia has an incorrect middle name. (sdi)
June 2, 2014 Filing 4352 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by General Executive Board, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(Clement, Paul) Modified on 6/2/2014 (sdi).
June 2, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4351 MOTION for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9735056. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
June 2, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #4350 MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9734963. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Virginia has an incorrect name. (sdi)
June 2, 2014 Filing 4351 MOTION for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9735056. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dinh, Viet)
June 2, 2014 Filing 4350 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul D. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9734963. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(Clement, Paul) Modified on 6/2/2014 (sdi).
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4349 ORDER: IRB APPLICATION 128: The Court construes the attached letter from Francis J. Gillen ("Gillen"), proceeding pro se, as a motion for reconsideration of the Court's order dated December 5, 2013 [dkt. no. 4328], United States v. IBT, No. 88 Civ. 4486(LAP), 2013 WL 6334394 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 5, 2013). Because Gillen's arguments only rehash those that the Court rejected in its previous order, the motion is DENIED. A copy of this order has been mailed to Gillen. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/03/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
March 31, 2014 Filing 4348 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4346 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Carberry, Charles)
March 31, 2014 Filing 4347 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4346 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
March 31, 2014 Filing 4346 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carberry, Charles)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4345 ORDER: Based upon a review of the record pursuant to the well established standards governing this Court's review of disciplinary decisions of the Independent Review Board and having received no submissions from the subject members, Application 164 is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/29/2014) (kgo)
March 24, 2014 Filing 4344 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 164 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 164 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 164 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/20/2014) (ama)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4343 APPLICATION 169 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ARTHUR CANTU: Therefore, we respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, itis respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2014) (ama)
March 17, 2014 Filing 4342 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ARTHUR CANTU: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 169 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 169 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2014) (ama)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4341 APPLICATION 168 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MICHAEL WITEK: Therefore, we respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered". (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2014) (ama) Modified on 3/20/2014 (ama).
March 17, 2014 Filing 4340 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MICHAEL WITEK: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 168 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 168 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2014) (ama)
March 14, 2014 Filing 4339 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MARILYN RAWLINS: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 167 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 167 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/14/2014) (ama)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4338 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: I understand and agree that this Agreement will be submitted to the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for its review and approval. If approved by the IRB, it will be submitted to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York for review. I will transmit this Agreement, signed by me, to the IBT. When it is signed by the IBT and the IRB, it will be submit to the Court for review. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/14/2014) (ama)
February 10, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files (ONLY) for #4337 Notice of Appeal filed by Paul Kenny were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
February 10, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4337 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
February 6, 2014 Filing 4337 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #4331 Order. Document filed by Paul Kenny. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401087385. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp)
January 30, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files ONLY for #4336 Notice of Appeal filed by Abraham Moreno, Gary Guillory were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (APPELLANT'S COUNSEL IS RESPONSIBLE FOR THE PHYSICAL SUPPLEMENTAL INDEX FOR ANY AND ALL NON-ECF DOCUMENTS, ONCE THE CASE IS OPENED IN THE SECOND CIRCUIT) (nd)
January 30, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4336 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
January 30, 2014 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4336 Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-9310027, paid on 1/30/2014. (nd)
January 30, 2014 Filing 4336 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #4331 Order. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Roland, Catherine)
January 30, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Note to Attorney Catherine Roland to RE-FILE Document No. #4335 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the Wrong Event Type was selected. Re-file the document and select the appropriate Appeal event Notice of Appeal. (nd)
January 30, 2014 Filing 4335 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT from #4331 Order. Form 7 and Form 22 are due within 14 days. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9310027. (Roland, Catherine) Modified on 1/30/2014 (nd).
January 9, 2014 Filing 4334 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4332 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Carberry, Charles)
January 9, 2014 Filing 4333 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4332 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
January 9, 2014 Filing 4332 MOTION Issuance of Subpoena. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carberry, Charles)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4331 ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the IRB's determination that the IBT's decision was not inadequate is affirmed in all respects. Accordingly, Application 162 is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/7/2014) (tn)
December 9, 2013 Filing 4330 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE and ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 166 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/9/2013) (rjm)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4329 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on APPLICATION 166 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND SEAN O'BRIEN. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/9/2013) (rjm)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4328 ORDER: IRB APPLICATION 128. For the foregoing reasons, Gillen's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. A copy of this order has been mailed to Gillen. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/5/2013) (djc)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4327 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on APPLICATION 165 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND JERRY CONNER. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/24/2013) (djc)
September 16, 2013 Filing 4326 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tara M. La Morte dated September 16, 2013 re: Application 128 Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4325 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on APPLICATION 155 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF LEIF THORNTON, CHERYL MILISI, FRANCIS DIZOGLIO,JOHN LOGAN AND NICHOLAS MURPHY: ENDORSEMENT: After consideration of Mr. Murphy's letter received May 22, 2013, the IRB's letter dated May 31, 2013, the government's letter dated June 28, 2013, and all of the materials in the record. It is hereby ordered that the IRB's January 25, 2012 Opinion and Decision is affirmed in all respects Application 155 is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/06/2013) (ama) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ama). Modified on 9/11/2013 (ama).
September 6, 2013 Filing 4324 RESPONSE re: 4322 Order, Set Deadlines, Letter in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Raymond, Bradley)
August 29, 2013 Filing 4323 RESPONSE re: #4322 Order, Set Deadlines,, Letter in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Carberry, Charles)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #4284 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/04/2013, Receipt Number 465401064143. (jd)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4322 Application 128 ORDER: Construing the attached letter as a motion for reconsideration based on newly discovered evidence, any opposition to the motion shall be filed no later than September 16, 2013. Reply may be filed by September 30, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 9/16/2013, Replies due by 9/30/2013.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/3/2013) (rsh)
August 1, 2013 Filing 4321 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner in Support re: #4319 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 7 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 7 Part 3, #10 Exhibit 7 Part 4, #11 Exhibit 7 Part 5, #12 Exhibit 7 Part 6, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #15 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #16 Exhibit 9 Part 3, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit 18, #26 Exhibit 19, #27 Exhibit 20, #28 Exhibit 21, #29 Exhibit 22, #30 Exhibit 23, #31 Exhibit 24, #32 Exhibit 25, #33 Exhibit 26, #34 Exhibit 27, #35 Exhibit 28, #36 Exhibit 29, #37 Exhibit 30)(Carberry, Charles)
August 1, 2013 Filing 4320 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4319 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
August 1, 2013 Filing 4319 MOTION Issuance of Subpoenas. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(Carberry, Charles)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4318 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court shall designate the above-referenced matter as an ECF case. Counsel to the parties, if they have not already done so, shall become registered users in the court's CM/ECF system. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/24/2013) (djc)
July 25, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (djc)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4317 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR DOUGLAS N. SILVERSTEIN, ESQ.: granting #4316 Motion for Douglas N. Silverstein, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/24/2013) (djc)
July 23, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4316 MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 22, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4316 MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. (wb)
July 22, 2013 Filing 4316 MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno.(wb) (wb).
July 11, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #4315 MOTION for DOUGLAS N. SILVERSTEIN, ESQ. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. This is a NON-ECF case all PRO HAC VICE motions are to be filed by paper with the Clerks office. (wb)
July 11, 2013 Filing 4315 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for DOUGLAS N. SILVERSTEIN, ESQ. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Douglas) Modified on 7/11/2013 (wb).
July 10, 2013 Filing 4314 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #4302 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas Flaherty USCA Case Number 13-1631-con. Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/10/2013. (nd)
July 10, 2013 Filing 4313 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #4301 Notice of Appeal filed by James Deamicis USCA Case Number 13-1622. Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/10/2013. (nd) Modified on 7/10/2013 (nd).
June 25, 2013 Filing 4312 Objection TO U.S. ATTORNEYS BRIEF IN REGARDS TO APPLICATION 162 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF PAUL KENNY, ABRAHAM MORENO, AND GARY GUILLORY. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Roland, Catherine)
June 24, 2013 Filing 4311 Objection to U.S. Attorney's Brief- Application 162. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Chaikin, Adam)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4310 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on APPLICATION 163 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ALEXIS RODRIGUEZ NORMANDIA. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/21/2013) (ja)
June 24, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #4310 Application 163 of the Independent Review Board. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ja)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4309 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jaime Leeser Nawaday dated 6/10/2013 re: Due to an unusually active docket in recent weeks, however, the Government respectfully requests and additional week, until June 21, 2013, to submit its response to all submissions concerning Application 162. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered., ( Responses due by 6/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/10/2013) (lmb)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4308 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jaimie Leeser Nawaday dated 5/10/2013 re: We respectfully request leave until June 14, 2013, to respond to all submissions concerning Application 162. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/16/2013) (djc)
May 13, 2013 Filing 4307 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition TO THE CHIEF INVESTIGATORS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARDS APPLICATION 162. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Roland, Catherine)
May 2, 2013 Filing 4306 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4305 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLP TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS AND DIRECTING JAMES GIEMZIK, CPA TO APPEAR FOR A SWORN EXAMINATION. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (rjm)
May 2, 2013 Filing 4305 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLP TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS AND DIRECTING JAMES GIEMZIK, CPA TO APPEAR FOR A SWORN EXAMINATION. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (rjm)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4304 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Catherine J. Ronald dated 4/29/2013 re: Counsel request the Court grant counsel leave until 5/13/2013 to respond both pleadings herein. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/1/2013) (tro)
May 1, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #4303 MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Certificates of Good Standing must be issued from the State Court. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bwa)
April 30, 2013 Filing 4303 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Silverstein, Douglas) Modified on 5/1/2013 (bwa).
April 25, 2013 Appeal Fee Due: for #4302 Notice of Appeal. $455.00 Appeal fee due by 5/9/2013. (nd)
April 25, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4302 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4302 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #4274 Order. Document filed by Thomas Flaherty. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (nd)
April 25, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4301 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
April 25, 2013 Appeal Fee Due: for #4301 Notice of Appeal.$455.00 Appeal fee due by 5/9/2013. (nd)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4301 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #4274 Order. Document filed by James Deamicis. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (nd)
April 25, 2013 Filing 4300 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Independent Review Board's Application 162-in the Matter of Paul Kenny, Abraham Moreno and Gary Guillory. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
April 18, 2013 Filing 4299 Objection Evidentiary: Regarding Paul Kenny-Application 162 of the IBT Matter. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Chaikin, Adam)
April 17, 2013 Filing 4298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of IBT Application for Approval of Modified Procedures for Publishing Decisions by the Court to the Teamster Membership served on Charles M. Carberry on 4/16/13. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Raymond, Bradley)
April 17, 2013 Filing 4297 DECLARATION of Bret Caldwell in Support re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership.. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Raymond, Bradley)
April 17, 2013 Filing 4296 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership.. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Raymond, Bradley)
April 17, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Bradley Thomas Raymond to RE-FILE Document #4295 MOTION Certificate of Service re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership. MOTION Certificate of Service re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership. Use the event type Certificate of Service Other found under the event list Service of Process. (db)
April 17, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Bradley Thomas Raymond to RE-FILE Document #4294 MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Inte MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Inte MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Inte MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Inte MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Inte MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Inte. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents, then link to #4292 Motion. (db)
April 17, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Bradley Thomas Raymond to RE-FILE Document #4293 MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Internation MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Internation MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Internation. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents, then link to #4292 Motion. (db)
April 17, 2013 Filing 4295 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION Certificate of Service re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership.. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Raymond, Bradley) Modified on 4/17/2013 (db).
April 17, 2013 Filing 4294 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership., #4293 MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Internation MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Internation MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the Internation. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Raymond, Bradley) Modified on 4/17/2013 (db).
April 17, 2013 Filing 4293 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application By the International Brotherhood of Teamsters For Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By the Court to the Teamsters Membership re: #4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership.. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Raymond, Bradley) Modified on 4/17/2013 (db).
April 17, 2013 Filing 4292 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures For Publishing Decisions By The Court To The Teamster Membership. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(Raymond, Bradley)
April 17, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Bradley Thomas Raymond to RE-FILE Document #4289 MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures for Publishing Decisions by the Court to the Teamster Membership. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
April 16, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #4290 MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8423966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the State Court.. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bcu)
April 16, 2013 Filing 4291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR DOUGLAS N. SILVERSTEIN, ESQ.; CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING OF DOUGLAS N. SILVERSTEIN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR DOUGLAS N. SILVERSTEIN, ESQ. served on Nancy B.G. Lassen, Andrew S. Hoffman, Ellen Yaroshefsky, John W. Morris, Linda H. Chan on April 16, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Silverstein, Douglas)
April 16, 2013 Filing 4290 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Douglas N. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8423966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Douglas N. Silverstein, Esq.)(Silverstein, Douglas) Modified on 4/16/2013 (bcu).
April 16, 2013 Filing 4289 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION Application by the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for Approval of Modified Procedures for Publishing Decisions by the Court to the Teamster Membership. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of the Application by IBT, #2 Declaration of Bret Caldwell in Support of Application by the IBT, #3 Certificate of Service)(Raymond, Bradley) Modified on 4/17/2013 (db).
April 15, 2013 Filing 4288 Objection to Application 162of the Independent Review Board in the Matter of Paul Kenny, Abraham Moreno, and Gary Guillory. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Roland, Catherine)
April 10, 2013 Filing 4287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Catherine Roland); Certificate of Good Standing; Proposed Order thereon served on Andrew S. Hoffman, Ellen Yaroshefsky, John W. Morris, Linda H. Chan, Nancy B.G. Lassen on April 10, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Roland, Catherine)
April 10, 2013 Filing 4286 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Catherine J. Roland, Esq.) served on Andrew S. Hoffman, Ellen Yaroshefsky, John W. Morris, Linda H. Chan, Nancy B.G. Lassen on April 10, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno. (Roland, Catherine)
April 10, 2013 Filing 4285 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine J. Roland on behalf of Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno (Roland, Catherine)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4284 ORDER; granting 4283 Motion for Catherine J. Roland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/5/2013) (sac)
April 8, 2013 Filing 4283 MOTION for Catherine J. Roland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary Guillory, Abraham Moreno.(bwa)
April 5, 2013 Filing 4282 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW TO IRB'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO KENNY'S OBJECTIONS TO APPLICATION 162.. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Chaikin, Adam)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4281 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Catherine J. Roland dated 4/3/2013 re: Counsel on behalf of Abraham Moreno, and Gary Guillory request for a one (1) week extension to file an Objection by Abraham Moreno and Gary Guillory to April 15, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/5/2013) (rsh)
March 21, 2013 Filing 4280 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Adam Chaikin dated 3/20/2013 re: Counsel for Paul Kenny request that Mr. Kenny be given leave to file a reply memoranda to the IRB's memorandum of law filed on 3/18/2013. If the Court is inclined to grant Mr. Kenny's request for leave to file a reply memoranda, Mr. Kenny will have the reply brief on file on or before 4/5/2013. ENDORSEMENT: Permission to file a reply brief by April 5 is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/20/2013) (tro)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4279 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Catherine J. Roland dated 3/7/2013 re: So that the Court may consider all objections to Application 162 simultaneously, we anticipate filing those objections within thirty (30) days or April 8, 2013. In the alternative, Mssrs. Guillory and Moreno will file objections on a date that is convenient for the Court. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/18/2013) (djc)
March 18, 2013 Filing 4278 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Independent Review Board's Application 162-in the Matter of Paul Kenny, Abraham Moreno and Gary Guillory. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (Carberry, Charles)
March 1, 2013 Filing 4277 Objection to Application 162 of the Independent Review Board. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit AA part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits AA part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibits AA part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit AA part 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit AA part 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #7 Exhibit Exhibit CC, #8 Exhibit Exhibit DD, #9 Exhibit Exhibit EE, #10 Exhibit Exhibit FF)(Chaikin, Adam)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4276 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Nicholas Bernhard re: APPLICATION 161 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD - - AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND NICHOLAS BERNHARD. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/22/2013) (djc)
February 22, 2013 Filing 4275 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND NICHOLAS BERNHARD: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 161 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 161 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/22/2013) (djc)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4274 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Application 156 is granted, and the IRB's decision affirmed in all respects. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/20/2013) (djc)
January 22, 2013 Filing 4273 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4272 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 710 PENSION FUND, MOKENA 191/88, LLC, BRIAN O'MALLEY AND LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLP TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (lmb)
January 22, 2013 Filing 4272 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 710 PENSION FUND, MOKENA 191/88, LLC, BRIAN O'MALLEY AND LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLP TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(lmb)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4271 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR IRB APPLICATION 162 granting #4265 Motion for Douglas Olins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/2012) (lmb)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4270 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4267 Motion for Adam E. Chaikin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Adam E. Chaikin, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted.(Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/19/2012) (ama)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4269 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4266 Motion for Mark Scott Bagula to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Mark S. BaguJa, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted.(Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/19/2012) (ama)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4268 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set out above, Applications 157 and 158 are granted, and the IRE's determinations affirmed in all respects. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/11/2012) (cd)
December 10, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4265 MOTION for Douglas Olins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8047459. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 10, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4266 MOTION for Mark Scott Bagula to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8047556. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #4267 MOTION for Adam Chaikin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8047607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 10, 2012 Filing 4267 MOTION for Adam Chaikin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8047607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Chaikin, Adam)
December 10, 2012 Filing 4266 MOTION for Mark Scott Bagula to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8047556. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bagula, Mark)
December 10, 2012 Filing 4265 MOTION for Douglas Olins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8047459. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Olins, Douglas)
November 21, 2012 Filing 4264 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF LEIF THORNTON, CHERYL MILISI FRANCIS DIZOGLIO, JOHN LOGANAND NICHOLAS MURPHY, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/12/2012) (cd)
November 14, 2012 Filing 4263 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF LAWRENCE MAGUIRE: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Opinion and Decision of the IRB of Application 158 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Opinion and Decision of Application 158 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/12/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ja)
November 14, 2012 Filing 4262 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF BERNARD PISCOPO: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Opinion and Decision of the IRB of Application 157 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Opinion and Decision of Application 157 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/12/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ja)
August 17, 2012 Filing 4261 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4260 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING STONE CONSTRUCTION, INC., 21st CENTURY BANK, AMERICAN PRIDE HOME SERVICES, CENTRAL BANK, TODD CHESTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC., TODD CHESTER, LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLC, REPUBLIC NATIONAL DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC - FARGO, MINNEAPOLIS FOOD DISTRIBUTING INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, MINNESOTA TEAMSTERS CONSTRUCTION DIVISION PENSION FUND AND GROCERY/STORAGE PENSION FUND TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (lmb)
August 17, 2012 Filing 4260 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING STONE CONSTRUCTION, INC., 21st CENTURY BANK, AMERICAN PRIDE HOME SERVICES, CENTRAL BANK, TODD CHESTER AND ASSOCIATES, INC., TODD CHESTER, LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLC, REPUBLIC NATIONAL DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC - FARGO, MINNEAPOLIS FOOD DISTRIBUTING INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, MINNESOTA TEAMSTERS CONSTRUCTION DIVISION PENSION FUND AND GROCERY/STORAGE PENSION FUND TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(lmb)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4257 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Affidavit and Agreement. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/23/2012) (mro)
July 23, 2012 Filing 4259 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4258 MOTION to Produce. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (jfe)
July 23, 2012 Filing 4258 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING CENTRAL BANK AND LEGACY PROFESSIONALS, LLC TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(jfe)
July 9, 2012 Filing 4256 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4255 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the Issuance of a Subpoena Directing Village Bank to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (lmb)
July 9, 2012 Filing 4255 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the Issuance of a Subpoena Directing Village Bank to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(lmb)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4254 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: APPLICATION 159 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD --AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND SIAMAK SHOKOUFANDE AND AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/2/2012) (pl)
July 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 7/20/2012 (jfe)
July 2, 2012 Filing 4253 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Defendant's Request For Extension Of Time. ENDORSEMENT: An extension until July 20 is approved. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/2/2012) (jfe)
June 6, 2012 Filing 4252 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4251 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING BANK MUTUAL, FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE AND CENTRAL BANK TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (lmb)
June 6, 2012 Filing 4251 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING BANK MUTUAL, FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE AND CENTRAL BANK TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(lmb)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4250 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A Preska from Tara M LaMorte dated 5/8/2012 re: Request to extend time for 30 days until 6/7/2012 to submit a letter concerning Application 156 of the Independent Review Board. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/9/2012) (cd)
May 4, 2012 Filing 4249 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD'S APPLICATION 156 - IN THE MATTER OF JAMES DEAMICIS AND THOMAS FLAHERTY.Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (djc)
April 2, 2012 Filing 4248 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4247 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing Oppian, Inc., KTJ Limited Partnership One Hundred Thirty-Five, Jones Lang LaSalle, Ryan Companies US, Inc., Pope Assocaites, Inc., CloverLeaf Officer Partners, LLC, Baldwin Partners 1, LLC, Kami, Inc. Greenway Pavers, Inc., Stone Construction, Seven Corners Printing Co., Tschida Printing, American Pride Title, LLc, American Pride Home Services, Inc., Ed Phillips & Sons of ND, Inc. and Northwest Beverages, Inc. to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
April 2, 2012 Filing 4247 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing Oppian, Inc., KTJ Limited Partnership One Hundred Thirty-Five, Jones Lang LaSalle, Ryan Companies US, Inc., Pope Assocaites, Inc., CloverLeaf Officer Partners, LLC, Baldwin Partners 1, LLC, Kami, Inc. Greenway Pavers, Inc., Stone Construction, Seven Corners Printing Co., Tschida Printing, American Pride Title, LLc, American Pride Home Services, Inc., Ed Phillips & Sons of ND, Inc. and Northwest Beverages, Inc. to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4246 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Application 156 of the I.R.B. (Flaherty & Deamicis)-Emergency Request for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/23/2012) (mro)
March 16, 2012 Filing 4245 NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD. Document filed by Thomas Flaherty. (mro)
March 5, 2012 Filing 4244 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: APPLICATION 155 OF THE I.R.B., Emergency request for extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/5/2012) (jfe) Modified on 3/7/2012 (jfe).
March 2, 2012 Filing 4243 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4242 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the Local 272 Welfare Fund, the Local 272 Labor Management Pension Fund, Park It Management, Inc., P.I.M. Associates, Inc., SP Payroll, Inc. and 9495 Parking Corporation to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
March 2, 2012 Filing 4242 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the Local 272 Welfare Fund, the Local 272 Labor Management Pension Fund, Park It Management, Inc., P.I.M. Associates, Inc., SP Payroll, Inc. and 9495 Parking Corporation to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4241 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Thomas Flaherty, Defendant, hereby moves this Honorable Court for a 14 day extension of time to assemble and file a supplemental record of post-hearing motions, memorandums, and submissions that should have been made part of the record, but were not. Defendant would further ask for an additional 14 days in which to prepare and file his response to IRB Application 156 naming him as a defendant. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/2/2012) (rjm)
March 1, 2012 Filing 4240 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for an additional 14 days for James Deamicis in which to prepare and file his response to IRS Application 156 naming him as a defendant. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/29/2012) (cd)
January 11, 2012 Filing 4239 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4238 MOTION application for the issuance of a subpoena directing the Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund of Philadephia and Vicinity to Produce Specified Records. (djc)
January 11, 2012 Filing 4238 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA DIRECTING THE TEAMSTERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Attached is Declaration of Celia Zahner, Esq. (djc) Modified on 1/17/2012 (djc).
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4237 ORDER: The Attorney General's reappointment of Mr. Civiletti, the IBT's reappointment of Mr. diGenova, and Messrs. Civiletti's and diGenova's reappointment of Judge Webster are hereby approved for a five-year term of the IRB, effective immediately. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/19/2011) (ab)
December 7, 2011 Filing 4236 ELECTION SUPERVISOR'S REPORT NO. 4 TO THE COURT. Document filed by Richard W. Mark, Election Supervisor. (mro)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4235 ORDER: The Government and the IBT shall each reappoint its member of the IRB, or designate a new member to serve on the IRB, by no later than December 16, 2011. Each party shall submit the name of its appointee or designee to the Court for its approval promptly after such reappointment or designation is made. The term of office of each current member of the IRB shall continue until such member is reappointed by his appointing entity, or his successor is designated, and until this Court enters an order approving the reappointment or designation of such member. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/17/2011) (ab)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4234 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
November 4, 2011 Filing 4233 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND JOSEPH WOJCIECHOWSKI: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 154 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 154 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4232 MEMO ENDORSED ON AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/27/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4231 MEMO ENDORSED ON ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND PATRICK GEARY: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/27/2011) (js) Copies Mailed by Chambers
October 14, 2011 Filing 4230 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Brian Marc Feldman, New Attorney: Tara M. La Morte, Address: United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York, 86 Chambers St., 3rd Floor, New York, New York, United States 10007, 212-637-2746. Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4229 ORDER: that the Proposed 2011 Supplemental Count Rules, a copy of which is annexed hereto, are approved and shall govern the preparation and counting of secret ballot votes for International union officer candidates with respect to the 2011 Election unless modified in accordance with the November 2009 Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/7/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
September 26, 2011 Filing 4227 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND LOUIS CASSERO: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 152 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 152 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/23/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(rdz)
September 23, 2011 Filing 4228 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Louis Cassero. I make this Affidavit and Agreement (the "Agreement") to permanently resign from the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBTH). This Agreement does not constitute an admission or denial of wrongdoing. I understand that by entering into this Agreement, I am resolving the charge referenced in paragraph 1 and the IRB will not recommend any charge against me for failing to cooperate with the IRB. I make this Agreement freely, under no duress or coercion of any kind. I have authorized counsel for the President of Local 282 to transmit this Agreement, signed by me, to the IRB. If it is signed by the IRB it will be submitted to the Court for review. (rdz)
August 8, 2011 Filing 4226 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4225 APPLICATION for the issuance of a subpoena directing the Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund of Philadelphia and vicinity to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (lmb)
August 8, 2011 Filing 4225 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the issuance of a subpoena directing the Teamsters Health & Welfare Fund of Philadelphia and Vicinity to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. [Declaration of Celia Zahner, Esq. & exhibits 1-2 attached hereto.](lmb)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4224 ORDER, that the Proposed 2011 Supplemental Election Rule is approved and shall govern the schedule and procedures for the nomination of candidates and the secret ballot nomination vote with respect to the 2011 IBT Election unless modified in accordance with the November 2009 Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/25/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl)
June 15, 2011 Filing 4223 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Marie La Morte on behalf of United States of America (La Morte, Tara)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4222 NOLLE PROSEQUI: The filing of this nolle prosegui will dispose of the above- referenced criminal contempt charge with respect to William T. Hogan, Jr., the defendant. In light of the foregoing, I recommend that an order of nolle prosequi be filed as to defendant William Hogan with respect to the criminal contempt charges docketed under 07 Cr. Misc. 1 (LAP), and 88 Civ. 4486 (LAP). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2011) (jpo)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4221 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTOF THE OPINION AND DECISION INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD, this Court hereby acknowledges that the Opinion and Decision of the IRB of Application 151 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Opinion and Decision of Application 151 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. 444 North Capitol Street, NW, Suite 528 Washington, DC 20001 Administrator of the Independent Review Board and, Michael Prelli100 Beekman Street #14G New York, NY 10038: Respondent (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/18/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl)
May 19, 2011 Filing 4220 OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD, that the preponderance of the evidence established that Michael Prelli was an associate of the Luchese LCN family while an IBT member and knowingly associated with members of organized crime and brought reproach upon the IBT and thus violated the IBT Constitution. Accordingly, Prelli is hereafter permanently barred from holding membership in or any position with the IBT or any IBT affiliated entity. Prelli is permanently barred from seeking or accepting from the IBT or any IBT-affiliated entity any salary, severance payment, allowance, fee, payment for unused vacation, or compensation of any kind except fully vested pension compensation and fully vested welfare benefits; and permanently barred from the date of expulsion from having any contributions made on his behalf by any IBT entity to any pension, health and welfare, severance, or other benefit fund. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/18/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl)
May 13, 2011 Filing 4219 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4218 MOTION. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd)
May 13, 2011 Filing 4218 MOTION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING THE TEAMSTERS HEALTH & WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS OF PHILADELPHIA AND VICINITY TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(cd)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4217 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: APPLICATION 146 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF MICHAEL E. DOE. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/10/2011) Copies mailed by Chambers. (jfe) Modified on 5/13/2011 (jfe).
May 10, 2011 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #4216 USCA Mandate,. (nd)
May 10, 2011 Filing 4216 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #4136 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Crawley USCA Case Number 10-1024-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/10/2011. (nd)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4215 STIPULATION AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Government and the IBT, as follows: The IBT agrees to provide the Government and the IRB with all proposed constitutional amendments submitted to the IBT pursuant to Article III, Section 9(a) of the IBT Constitution as Boon as possible after their receipt by the IBT, but in any event no later than June 1, 2011. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/9/11) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (pl)
May 6, 2011 Filing 4214 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND JOHN PERRY. This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 147 of the Independent Review Board ("IRBfI) for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 147 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following persons as named herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/22/11); Copies mailed by Chambers. (djc)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4213 APPLICATION 148 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD --OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF JOHN CASTELLE. Accordingly, Castelle is hereafter permanently barred from holding membership in or any position with the IBT or any IBT-affiliated entity. Castelle is permanently barred from seeking or accepting from the IBT or any IBT-affiliated entity any salary, severance payment, allowance, fee, payment for unused vacation, or compensation of any kind except fully vested pension compensation and fully vested welfare benefits; and permanently barred from the date of expulsion from having any contributions made on his behalf by any IBT entity to any pension, health and welfare, severance, or other benefit fund. Enclosed with our March 16, 2011, Opinion and Decision is the October 13, 2010, IRB Investigative Report (Exhibit A), and the Appendix to Exhibit A (Exhibits 1 to 70), the November 10, 2010, IRB Hearing Transcript (Exhibit B), and the IRB Exhibits IRB-1 to IRB-7 introduced at the hearing (Exhibit C). It is respectfully requested that an Order be entered affirming the IRB's March 16, 2011, Opinion and Decision if Your Honor finds it appropriate. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/24/11); Copies mailed by Chambers (djc)
May 6, 2011 Filing 4212 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD IN THE MATTER OF JOHN CASTELLE. This Court hereby acknowledges that the Opinion and Decision of the IRB of Application 148 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Opinion and Decision of Application 148 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following persons as named herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/24/11); (djc)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4211 ORDER; that the Proposed 2011 Supplemental Election Rules, a copy of which is annexed hereto, are approved and shall govern the schedule and procedures for the nomination of candidates and the secret ballot nomination vote with respect to the 2011 Election unless modified in accordance with the November 2009 Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/4/11) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4210 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re:(Appl. 149) AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT Of ANTHONY O'DONNELL to resolve the planned IRB- recommended charge described in paragraph 1. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/26/11) (pl)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4209 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT Of Thomas Rosano to resolve the planned IRB recommended charge described in paragraph 1 (Appl. 150). ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/26/11) (pl)
April 26, 2011 Filing 4208 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND THOMAS ROSANO, This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 149 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 149 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. and Bradley T. Raymond, Esq. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/26/11) (pl)
April 26, 2011 Filing 4207 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ANTHONY O'DONNELL, This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 149 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 149 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr. and Thomas Gesualdi, President. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/26/11) (pl)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4206 ORDER: Before the Court is Application 141 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB" or the "Board"), dated April 5, 2010, as supplemented by the Supplement to Application 141 of the IRB, dated July 28, 2010. Application 141 seeks an order affirming the IRB's finding that the International Brotherhood of Teamsters' (the "IBT's") disciplinary action against German Vazquez was "not inadequate." For the foregoing reasons, Application 141 is granted, and the IRB's determination affirmed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/11/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mro)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4205 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Affidavit and Agreement. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/22/2011) (jfe)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4204 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Acknowledgment of receipt of the Opinion and Decision of the Independent Review Board. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/22/2011) (jfe)
February 17, 2011 Filing 4203 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4202 APPLICATION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless and America Helper, Inc. to produce specified records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
February 17, 2011 Filing 4202 APPLICATION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless and America Helper, Inc. to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
February 2, 2011 Filing 4201 ELECTION SUPERVISOR'S REPORT No. 2 TO THE COURT. Filed by Richard W. Mark (mbe)
January 13, 2011 Filing 4200 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4199 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA DIRECTING KING'S SEAFOOD COMPANY TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mbe)
January 13, 2011 Filing 4199 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A SUBPOENA DIRECTING KING'S SEAFOOD COMPANY TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mbe)
December 16, 2010 Filing 4198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4197 MOTION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing Morton's the Steakhouse, Dal Rae Restaurant and Fleming's Prime Steakhouse and Wine bar to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
December 16, 2010 Filing 4197 MOTION (APPLICATION) for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing Morton's the Steakhouse, Dal Rae Restaurant and Fleming's Prime Steakhouse and Wine bar to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4196 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Larry Cary dated 12/14/10 re: Please have the Clerk of the Court correct the record by removing my name as an attorney of record (for Defendant International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO) for this action. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Larry Cary terminated. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/16/10) (db)
November 18, 2010 Filing 4195 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4194 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS-CA AND KING'S SEAFOOD COMPANY TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. (mbe)
November 18, 2010 Filing 4194 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESS-CA AND KING'S SEAFOOD COMPANY TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS.(mbe)
August 25, 2010 Filing 4193 DECLARATION of Brian M. Feldman in support of the Joint Application of the United States of America and the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for entry of an order approving election rules fo rhte 2011 International Union Delegate and Officer Election. (mro)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4192 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 5/25/2010 re: Requesting that the Court approve the Parties joint application and approve the Proposed 2011 Election Rules. Document filed by United States of America.(jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4191 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 4/28/2010 re: Enclosed please find a joint application by the Parties requesting that the proposed election rules for the 2011 IBT Election be approved. Document filed by United States of America.(jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4190 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated 5/14/2010 re: This letter states the objections of Teamsters for a Democratic Union to approval of the Proposed Election Rules as presented by the parties. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union.(jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4189 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated 5/17/2010 re: Requesting attachment of this letter to our objections to the proposed Election Rules that we submitted on May 14, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket letter. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/24/2010) (jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4188 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Herman Benson dated 6/1/2010 re: Requesting that the Court consider our view and decide whether it feels we are right or wrong; if it decides we are right. to take whatever steps it feels appropriate to correct the lethal defect in the proposed current election rules. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket letter.(jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4187 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Herman Benson dated 5/12/2010 re: In objection to the joint application by the United States of America and the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for entry of an order approving their proposed election rules for the 2011 International Union Delegate and Officer Election. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket letter.(jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4186 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard W. Mark dated 5/21/2010 re: Requesting that the Court approve the 2011 Election Rules, as submitted by the parties, and reject the efforts by non-parties Association for Union Democracy and Teamsters for a Democratic Union to impose. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket letter.(jpo)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4185 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated 7/8/2010 re: Requesting that the Court grant TDU's motion to appear as amicus curiae for the purpose of considering its suggested modifications of the proposed Rules. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket letter. (jpo)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4184 ORDER: Whereas, the Court has considered the comments of Teamsters for a Democratic Union and Association for Union Democracy, both as amici, it is hereby ordered that the Proposed 2011 Election Rules, a copy of which is annexed hereto, are approved and shall govern the 2011 Election unless modified in accordance with the November 2009 Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/23/2010) (jpo)
August 19, 2010 Filing 4183 ELECTION SUPERVISOR'S REPORT No. 1 TO THE COURT. (mbe)
August 12, 2010 Filing 4182 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of a copy of the IRB's Quarterly report 71 served on Brian Feldman via UPS Next Day; Charles M. Carberry via UPS Next Day, Bradley T. Raymond via Hand Delivery; via UPS Next Day to the Honorable Loretta A. Preska on 7/29/10. (mro)
August 12, 2010 Filing 4181 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John J. Cronin, Jr. dated 7/29/10 re: Enclosed please find a "backed" original and one copy of Quarterly Report 71 of the Independent Review Bard. (mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4180 APPENDIX TO EXHIBIT A; EXHIBITS 1-23 IN THE MATTER OF VINCENT Disario. Document filed by the Independent Review Board.(mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4179 EXHIBITS A-C: In the Matter of Vincent Disario. Document filed by the Independent Review Board. (mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4178 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of a copy of Application 145 (In Re: Vincent Disario) along with the enclosures served on Beth Goldman AUSA via UPS Next day; Charles M. Carberry via UPS Next day; Bradley T. Raymond via Hand Delivery; Vincent Disario via USPS Registered Mail and via UPS Next day to the Honorable Loretta A. Preska on 7/22/10. (mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4177 OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD; In Re: Vincent Disario. Document filed by the Independent Review Board. (mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4176 APPENDIX TO EXHIBIT A; EXHIBITS 1-14 IN THE MATTER OF VINCENT FEDERICO. Document filed by the Independent Review Board.(mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4175 EXHIBITS A-C: In the Matter of Vincent Federico. Document filed by the Independent Review Board.(mro)
August 11, 2010 Filing 4174 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of a copy of Application 145 (In Re: Vincent Federico) along with the enclosures served on Beth Goldman AUSA via UPS Next day; Charles M. Carberry via UPS Next day; Bradley T. Raymond via Hand Delivery; Vincent Federico via UPS Next Day and via UPS Next day to the Honorable Loretta A. Preska on 7/22/10. (mro) Modified on 8/11/2010 (mro).
August 11, 2010 Filing 4173 OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD; In Re: Vincent Federico. Document filed by the Independent Review Board. (mro)
August 5, 2010 Filing 4172 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Application 145 of the Independent Review Board--Opinion and Decision of the Independent Review Board In the Matter of Vincent Federico. ENDORSEMENT: The Opinion and Decision of the IRB dated 7/22/10, is affirmed in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/5/20) (cd)
August 5, 2010 Filing 4171 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Application 144 of the Independent Review Board--Opinion and Decision of The Independent Review Board In the Matter of Vincent Disario. ENDORSEMENT: The Opinion and Decision of the IRB dated 7/22/10, is affirmed in all respects. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/5/10) (cd)
August 5, 2010 Filing 4170 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD and filed with the USDC-SDNY and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to John J. Cronin and Vincent Federico. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/5/10) (cd)
August 5, 2010 Filing 4169 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD and filed in the USDC-SDNY and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to John J. Cronin, Jr. and Vincent Disario. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/5/10) (cd)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4168 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Michael Carucci. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/1/2010) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (tro)
July 7, 2010 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 4139 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #4167 Order Striking Document from Record. (tro)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4167 ORDER striking Document No. 4139 from the record. Document number 4139, titled Affidavit and Agreement of Michael Carucci, shall be removed from the docket for this case. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/6/2010) (tro) Modified on 7/7/2010 (tro). Copies Faxed By Chambers.
July 1, 2010 Filing 4166 APPLICATION 143 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD--AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND EDWARD RODZWICZ. (tro)
July 1, 2010 Filing 4165 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND EDWARD RODZWICZ. This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 143 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 143 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/30/2010) (tro)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4164 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Edward Rodzwicz. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/30/2010) (tro)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4163 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles M. Carbury dated 6/9/2010 re: Counsel writes requesting that the matter be remanded back to the Independent Review Board. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/11/2010) (tve)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4162 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Barbara Harvey dated 6/1/2010 re: Counsel respectfully request an extension of time of 4 business days until 6/7/2010 in which to submit TDU's reply in support of its 5/14/2010 letter. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2010) (jfe)
May 27, 2010 Filing 4161 US Attorney Provisional Release of an Offender/Deferred Prosecution re William Hogan, Jr. Document filed by United States of America and signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska. (cd)
May 26, 2010 Filing 4160 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MONICA PEASLEE. This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 142 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 142 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/25/10) (db)
May 26, 2010 Filing 4159 (ORDER) APPLICATION 142 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- AGREEMENT BETWEEN THEINDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MONICA PEASLEE: Effective with the IRB's approval of the Agreement on May 24, 2010, Monica Peaslee, who was issued a withdrawal card from Local 533 on June 30, 2008, has agreed that for a period of not less than five years from October 2, 2009, the date of her guilty plea, she will refrain from any effort to become an active member of Local 533, the IBT or any affiliate of the IBT. Terms of the Peaslee Agreement are as further set forth in said Order. We have found the Agreement serves to resolve the matter in a fair and equitable manner. Therefore, we respectfully request that Your Honor execute the Agreement on the line provided. This will, in effect, serve to have the Agreement "so ordered" by the Court. Thereafter, it is respectfully requested that a member of Your Honor's staff file the fully executed original Agreement with the Clerk and transmit to me a confirmed copy of the Agreement as "so ordered." (Signed by John J. Cronin, Administrator on 5/24/10) (db) Modified on 5/26/2010 (db).
May 26, 2010 Filing 4158 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of John E. Converse of one executed original and one copy of Application 142 and the original and one copy of the Acknowledgment of Receipt served on Honorable Loretta A. Preska on 5/24/2010. Service was made by UPS NEXT DAY. One copy of Application 142 along with the enclosures were delivered to Beth Goldman, AUSA, via UPS Next Day; Charles M. Carberry, Esq., via UPS Next Day; Bradley T. Raymond, Esq., via Hand delivery. (tro)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4157 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/25/2010) (tro)
May 21, 2010 Filing 4156 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4155 MOTION For the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Contractor Arturo Dorado to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
May 21, 2010 Filing 4155 MOTION (Chief Investigator's Application) For the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Contractor Arturo Dorado to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
May 20, 2010 Filing 4154 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John J. Cronin, Jr. dated 5/13/10 re: Enclosed please find a "backed" original and one copy of Quarterly Report 70 of the Independent Review Board. (mro)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4153 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rocco G. Avallone dated 5/4/2010 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that the following schedule was consented to: A. German Vazquez's letter Motion, not to exceed four pages, must be filed by June 4, 2010. B. IRB's Opposition papers, not to exceed four pages, must be filed by June 18, 2010. C. Vazquez Reply papers, not to exceed two pages, must be filed by June 25, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/10/2010) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (jfe) Modified on 5/10/2010 (jfe).
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4152 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 4/30/2010 re: The Government respectfully requests that the Court set the following schedule, to which all such parties have agree-that any objections from TDU, AUD, or any other objecting party be filed no later than May 14, 2010; that nay response from the Government, IBT, or Election Supervisor be filed no later than May 25, 2010; and that any replies be filed no later than June 1, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 6/1/2010, Responses due by 5/25/2010) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/3/2010) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(jmi)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4151 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 4/23/2010 re: We write on behalf of the United States of America (the "Government") to inform the Court that the parties have agreed upon a resolution of the pending criminal charges, and to respectfully request that the Court (l) briefly adjourn the conference scheduled in this matter for April 26, 2010, for approximately thirty (30) days, and (2) exclude the time between April 26, 2010, and the adjourned conference date for purposes of the speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161 (h) (8) (A), upon a finding that the interests of justice served by such a continuance outweigh the interests of the public and defendant William Hogan ("Defendant") in a speedy trial because the continuance will allow the parties to consummate a proposed disposition of this case. Court adjourn the conference in this matter for a period of approximately thirty (30) days to afford PTS with adequate time review this proposed deferred prosecution agreement. ENDORSEMENT: The Conference is adjourned to May 27, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 5/27/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/26/2010) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(jmi)
April 22, 2010 Filing 4150 QUARTERLY REPORT 69 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD UNDER THE CONSENT ORDER ARTICLE G. "REPORT TO THE COURT". (mbe)
April 13, 2010 Filing 4149 ENDORSEMENT on [Doc. #4147] Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as to Charles Crawley, I.F.P. REQUEST IS GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/12/10) (rmj)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4148 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 4/6/2010 re: Requesting that the Court (1) briefly adjourn the conference scheduled in this matter for April 8, 2010, until April 26, 2010, at 2:30 in the afternoon, and (2)exclude the time between April 8, 2010 and April 26, 2010, for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C.3161(h)(8)(A). ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/7/2010) (jpo)
April 2, 2010 Filing 4147 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Charles Crawley.(mbe)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4146 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4145 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application For the Issuance of a Subpoena directing the Shepard Convention Services, Inc. to Produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4145 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application For the Issuance of a Subpoena directing the Shepard Convention Services, Inc. to Produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4144 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4143 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application For the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the New England Teamsters and Trucking Industry Pension Fund to Produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4143 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application For the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the New England Teamsters and Trucking Industry Pension Fund to Produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4142 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4141 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application For the issuance of Subpoenas directing the Teamsters Local 82 Health and Welfare Fund and the Teamsters Local 82 Savings and Investment fund to Produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4141 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application For the issuance of Subpoenas directing the Teamsters Local 82 Health and Welfare Fund and the Teamsters Local 82 Savings and Investment fund to Produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4140 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND MICHAEL CARUCCI: This court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 140 of the Independent Review Board for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters has been received by the Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 140 with the Clerk of the Court of the S.D.N.Y. This Court further certifies that th instant acknowledgment of Receipt has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the S.D.N.Y., and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, N.W., Suite 528, Washington, DC, 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/24/2010) (tro)
March 26, 2010 Filing 4138 APPLICATION 140 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD--AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDMENT REVIEW BOARD AND MICHAEL CARUCCI. (tro)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4137 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 3/19/10 re: counsel for the United States of America (the "Government") to respectfully request that the Court (1) briefly adjourn the conference presently scheduled in this matter for March 30, 2010, and (2) exclude the time between March 30, 2010, and the date of rescheduled conference for purposes of the Speedy Trial Act 18 U.S.C 3161 (h)(8)(A), upon a finding that the interests of justice served by such a continuance outweigh the interests of the public and defendant William Hogan ("Defendant") in a speedy trial because the continuance will allow the parties to prepare for trial. Defendant consents to this request. ENDORSEMENT: The Conference is adjourned to April 8, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/25/10) Copies faxed by Chambers.(pl) Modified on 4/5/2010 (pl).
March 22, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #4136 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
March 22, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #4136 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
February 26, 2010 Appeal Remark as to #4136 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Crawley. $455.00 APPEAL FEE DUE. (tp)
February 26, 2010 Filing 4136 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #4130 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #4132 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Charles Crawley. (tp)
February 24, 2010 Filing 4135 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4134 MOTION For the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Champion Exposition Services to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
February 24, 2010 Filing 4134 MOTION: Chief Investigator's Application For the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Champion Exposition Services to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro) Modified on 2/25/2010 (mro).
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4133 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 2/5/2010 re: Paragraph 5 of the Stipulation and Order signed by the Court on November 17, 2009, and entered on the docket on November 18, 2009, provided that the Government and the International Brotherhood of Teamsters (collectively, the "parties") would jointly agree upon a budget for the conduct of the 2011 IBT Election within 60 days after entry of the Stipulation and Order. On January 20, 2010, the 2011 Election Administrator, Richard Mark, proposed a budget to the parties in the amount of $11,333,500.00. We write now on behalf of the parties to respectfully inform the Court that the parties have agreed to the budget proposed by Mr. Mark. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/8/2010) (jmi)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4132 ORDER denying 4131 Motion for Reconsideration. On January 26, 2010, the Petitioner filed a motion to reconsider the January 11 Order. The motion [dkt. no. 4131] is therefore DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/2/2010) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (tve)
January 26, 2010 Filing 4131 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #4130 Order on Motion. Document filed by Charles Crawley.(mbe)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4130 ORDER dismissing 4106 Motion. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/11/10) (djc)
January 11, 2010 Filing 4129 LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Loretta A. Preska from Brian M. Feldman dated 1/6/10 re: The Government writes in response to the "Request for Judicial Notice and Contemporaneous Motion for Jurisdictional Question Ruling on the Merits" filed by Charles Crawley. The Government submits that the Court should dismiss the Request because Crawley lacks standing to petition this Court, both under the Consent Decree entered in this case and under well established principles of federal jurisdiction. Document filed by United States of America.(mro)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4128 ORDER: that the time between December 22, 2009 and January 14, 2010 at 9:00 am the date of the nextscheduled pretrial conference, is excluded for purposes of theSpeedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h) (8) (A), in the interests ofjustice. The ends of justice served by such continuance outweighthe interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trialbecause the continuance will allow the parties to discuss a possible disposition of this case, and will allow the parties to prepare for trial. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/22/2009) (tve)
December 18, 2009 Filing 4127 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4126 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing Atlantic Liquidators Office Furniture and Alan Ginesky d/b/a 525 Beach Nominee Trust to Produce Specified Records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
December 18, 2009 Filing 4126 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing Atlantic Liquidators Office Furniture and Alan Ginesky d/b/a 525 Beach Nominee Trust to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
December 18, 2009 Filing 4125 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4124 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing Verizon Wireless and Sprint Nextell to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mro)
December 18, 2009 Filing 4124 MOTION: Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing Verizon Wireless and Sprint Nextell to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mro)
November 20, 2009 Filing 4123 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4122 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for Issuance of a Subpoena Directing Union Payroll Agency, Inc. to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mbe)
November 20, 2009 Filing 4122 MOTION: Chief Investigator's Application for Inssurance of a Subpoena Directing Union Payroll Agency, Inc. to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mbe)
November 19, 2009 Filing 4121 QUARTERLY REPORT 68 OF THE INDEPENDANT REVIEW BOARD. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (mbe)
November 19, 2009 Filing 4120 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of IRB's Quarterly Report 68 served on Beth Goldman, AUSA Charles M. Cranberry, Esq., Brandley T. Raymond., Esq. on 11/5/2009. Service was made by mailed. (mbe)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4119 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby agreed by and between the Government and the IBT (the "parties") that provided that the IBT complies fully with this Stipulation and Order, the Government agrees not to exercise its option to have the 2011 lBT Election supervised by the Department of Labor. Nothing in this Stipulation and Order precludes or limits the Secretary of Labor's exercise of authority under the Labor Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959, 29 U.S.C. 401 et seq., or any other federal laws. The parties have jointly agreed that Richard Mark, Esq., will serve as the Election Supervisor for the 2011 IBT Election (the "2011 Election Supervisor"), as set forth in this stipulation. The parties have jointly agreed that Kenneth Conboy, Esq., will serve as Election Appeals Master for the 2011 IBT Election (the "2011 Election Appeals Master"), as set forth in this stipulation. The 2011 IBT Election shall be conducted in accordance with election rules (the "2011 Election Rules"), which shall be jointly agreed upon by the parties following comments by IBT members and any interested parties, as set forth in this stipulation. The parties will jointly agree upon a budget for the conduct of the 2011 IBT Election within 60 days after entry of this Stipulation and Order. The budget shall be no less than the amount expended by the 2006 Election Supervisor for the 2006 lBT Election, as adjusted for inflation, as set forth in this stipulation. The Government shall have the right to observe and be informed about all aspects of the 2011 IBT Election, as set forth in this stipulation. The IBT shall purchase a policy of insurance in an appropriate amount to protect the 2011 Election Supervisor and the 2011 Election Appeals Master and any persons hired by or acting on behalf of the 2011 Election Supervisor and the 2011 Election Appeals Master, from personal liability (or costs incurred to defend against the imposition of liability) for any of their actions on behalf of the IBT, the 2011 Election Supervisor, or the 2011 Election Appeals Master pursuant to this Stipulation and Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/17/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
November 16, 2009 Filing 4118 RESPONSE re: #4108 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Charles Crawley. (mbe)
November 12, 2009 Filing 4117 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND THOMAS CLAIR. This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 139 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 139 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol street, N.W., suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board, and Marvin Gittler, Esq., Asher Gittler Greenfield & D'Alba, LTD 200 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1900 Chicago, IL 60606 Counsel for Thomas Clair. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/9/2009) Copies Faxed by Chambers. (jfe) Modified on 11/17/2009 (jfe).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4116 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Thomas Clair. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/9/2009) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(jfe)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER For the reasons stated above Hogan's motions to dismiss Counts One and Two of the Second Amended Notice of Charge are DENIED. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/12/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jmi)
November 3, 2009 Filing 4114 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND TONY MANERO. This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 137 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 137 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt (lithe Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol street, N.W., suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board, and David S. smith, Esq., David S. Smith, LLC, 626 Rexcorp Plaza, West Tower, 6th Floor, Uniondale, NY 11556, Counsel for Tony Manero. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4113 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Tony Manero. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
November 3, 2009 Filing 4112 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND ENERST SOWELL: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 138 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 138 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., 444 North Capitol Street, N.W., suite 528, Washington, DC 20001, Administrator of the Independent Review Board, and David Van Os, Esq., David Van Os & Associates, PC, 115 E. Travis Street, Suite 618, San Antonio, TX 78205-1698, Counsel for Ernest Sowell. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4111 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Ernest Sowell. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
October 30, 2009 Filing 4110 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Champion Exposition Service to produce specified records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mbe)
October 30, 2009 Filing 4109 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Champion Exposition Services, Inc. to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mbe)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4108 ORDER that Mr. Crawley shall show cause no later than 11/13/09 why his request should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/20/09) Copies faxed by chambers. (dle) Modified on 10/21/2009 (dle).
October 6, 2009 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #4107 USCA Mandate,. (nd)
October 6, 2009 Filing 4107 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 4053 Notice of Appeal, filed by Francis Gillen USCA Case Number 08-4033-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 10/5/2009. (nd)
September 21, 2009 Filing 4106 MOTION for Judicial Notice and Contemporaneous Motion for Jurisdictional Question Ruling on the Merits. Document filed by Charles Crawley.(mbe)
September 18, 2009 Filing 4105 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4104 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the issuance of a Subpoena Directing Bank of America to Produce Specified Records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mbe)
September 18, 2009 Filing 4104 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of a Subpoena Directing Bank of America to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mbe)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...for the reasons set forth above, Application 131 is granted, and the IRB's determination affirmed in all respects. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/18/09) (cd)
August 4, 2009 Filing 4102 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4101 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issurance of a Subpoena Directing Park Avenue Corporation, Manhattan Parking to Produce Specified Records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (mbe)
August 4, 2009 Filing 4101 (MOTION) Chief Investigator's Application for the Issurance of a Subpoena Directing Park Avenue Corporation, Manhattan Parking to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(mbe)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4100 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 7/16/09 re: Government respectfully requests additional time until August 12, 2009 to respond to a letter submitted in June by counsel for defendant addressing the Supreme Court's holding Abuelhawa v. United States, 129 S.Ct. 2102(2009). ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/20/09) Copies faxed by Chambers.(djc)
June 3, 2009 Filing 4099 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: Richard Radek makes this Affidavit and Agreement (the "Agreement") to resolve the IRB charges described in paragraph 1 as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2009) (jpo)
June 3, 2009 Filing 4098 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 135 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 135 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 135 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/3/2009) (jpo)
June 3, 2009 Filing 4097 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: Peter Innaurato, makes this Affidavit and Agreement (the "Affidavit and Agreement" (the "Agreement") to resolve the IRB recommended charge described in paragraph, as set forth in this Affidavit and Agreement. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2009) (jpo)
June 3, 2009 Filing 4096 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND PETER INNAURATO: This Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 136 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 136 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt ("the Acknowledgment") has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following, as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/3/2009) (jpo)
March 27, 2009 Filing 4095 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4094 MOTION for the issuance of a subpoena directing the employees' pension plan of Local Union 726 to Produce Specified Recorods. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (djc)
March 27, 2009 Filing 4094 MOTION for the issuance of a subpoena directing the employees' pension plan of Local Union 726 to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(djc)
March 13, 2009 Filing 4093 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4092 MOTION for the issuance of Subpoenas directing the Central States Southeast and Southwest areas pension Fund, the The Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund and the Current and former Actuarial Firms for the Employees. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (djc)
March 13, 2009 Filing 4092 MOTION for the issuance of Subpoenas directing the Central States Southeast and Southwest areas pension Fund, the The Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund and the Current and former Actuarial Firms for the Employees' Pension Plan of Local Union 726 to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(djc)
March 12, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #4080 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/10/2008, Receipt Number 672073. (jd)
February 19, 2009 Filing 4091 MOTION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING FRANK VACCARO AND ASSOCIATES, INC AND TRI STATE ADMINISTRATORS, INC TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(djc)
February 19, 2009 Filing 4090 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4082 MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing Frank Vaccaro and Associates, INc and Tri State Administrators, Inc to Produce Specified Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (djc)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4089 INJUNCTION ORDER: Plaintiff in DiPilato v. Commonwealth Association of School Administrators (CASA), Local 502, Philadelphia County, Pa. Court of Common Pleas, April Term 2008, No. 3272, is hereby ordered to dismiss that action, with leave to initiate the claim(s) asserted therein in this Court should he wish to proceed. so Ordered (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/14/09) (js)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4088 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' papers on the IBT andLocal 502's 4084 motion to enjoin George DiPilato from seeking monies from Local 502 in any forum other than this Court, the 4084 motion is GRANTED. Counsel shall confer and present a proposed form of injunction no later than February 13, 2009. ORDER granting 4084 Motion. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/11/09) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db)
February 2, 2009 Filing 4087 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4086 Response. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO, Commonwealth Association of School Administrators (CASA), Local 502. (jmi)
January 26, 2009 Filing 4086 RESPONSE of George Dipilato to The Motion for Injunctive Relief of Defendants International Brotherhood of Teamsters and Commonwealth Association of School Administrators (CASA), Local 502. Document filed by George DiPilato. (jmi)
January 26, 2009 Filing 4085 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4084 MOTION for injunctive relief. Document filed by General Executive Board, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, Commonwealth Association of School Administrators (CASA), Local 502. (dle)
January 26, 2009 Filing 4084 INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS AND COMMONWEALTH ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL ADMINISTRATORS (CASA), LOCAL 502'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ENJOINING GEORGE DIPILATO FROM SEEKING MONIES FROM LOCAL 502 IN ANY FORUM OTHER THAN THE USDC FOR THE SDNY. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(dle)
January 26, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #4077 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/29/08, Receipt Number 673468. (Quintero, Marcos)
January 23, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #4083 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4083 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #4080 Motion for Nancy B. G. Lassen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/22/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers(jpo) Modified on 1/23/2009 (jpo).
January 20, 2009 Filing 4082 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING THE ACCOUNTANT FOR THE BLET GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT FOR THE LONG ISLAND RAILROAD TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS AND TO APPEAR FOR A SWORN EXAMINATION. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(dle)
January 20, 2009 Filing 4081 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4078 MOTION for issuance of subpoenas. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (dle)
January 8, 2009 Filing 4079 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4078 Chief Investigator's application for the issuance of subpoenas directing Local 726s accounting firm and the employees pension plan of Local Union 726 to produce specified records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (pl)
January 8, 2009 Filing 4078 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION for the issuance of subpoenas directing Local 726s accounting firm and the employees pension plan of Local Union 726 to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(pl)
January 6, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #4077 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (dle)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4077 ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF JOHN W. MORRIS PRO HAC VICE: John W. Morris is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for George DiPilato in this case in the USDC for the SDNY as further set forth in this order. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/6/09) (dle)
December 29, 2008 Filing 4076 MOTION for John W. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by George DiPilato.(ae)
December 10, 2008 Filing 4080 MOTION for Nancy Lassen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO.(dle)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4075 MEMO ENDORSED ON ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 134 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/26/08) Copies faxed to Counsel.(js)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4074 MEMO ENDORSED ON AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: I make this Affidavit and Agreement ("the Agreement") to resolve the charges described in paragraph 1. This Agreement does not constitute a admission or denial of the charges. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/26/08) (js)
November 26, 2008 DECLARATION of Danna Drori in Opposition re: Defendants motion to dismiss the Second Amended Notice to Charge. (orig. docketed in 07cr. Misc.01) Document filed by United States of America. (pl)
November 26, 2008 Filing 4073 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Notice of Charge. Document filed by United States of America. (djc)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4072 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Robert A. Hogan. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/2/08) (db)
November 13, 2008 Filing 4071 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4070 MOTION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING LOCAL 726'S ACCOUNTING FIRM AND ELECTION OFFICER TO PRODUCE SPECIFIED RECORDS. (djc)
November 13, 2008 Filing 4070 Chief Investigator's Application/Motion for the issuance of Subpoenas Directing Local 726's Accounting Firm and Election Officer to Produce Specified Records. Attached is Zahner Declaration(djc)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4069 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas P. Clair dated 11/3/08 re: Counsel writes to advise the Court that Local 726 will fully comply with the Courts order to maintain the ballots from the November 4, 2007 Local 726 Officers election until such time as any legal challenges have been resolved. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the above, it is hereby ordered, without objection, that IBT Local 726 maintain the ballots from the November 4, 2007 Local 726 officers election in a safe and secure place until all IBT appeals and court actions concerning that election are exhausted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/3/08) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(mme) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mme).
November 3, 2008 Filing 4068 Chief Investigator's Memorandum of Law in Support of the Independent Review Board's Application 131 - in the Matter of Don M. Hahs. (djc)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4067 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas P.Clair dated 11/3/08 re: I am writing to advise you that Local 726 will fully comply with your order to maintain the ballots from the November 4, 2007 Local 726 officers election until such time as any legal challenges have been resolved. I would note for the record that the reference in your order to "the relief requested in item #10 of the 10/28 letter" appears to be an error, since item #10 of Mr. Tenuto's letter referred to Local 726' s request for an extension of time to the IRS. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the above, it is hereby ordered, without objection that IBT Local 726 maintain the ballots from the November 4, 2007 Local 726 Officers Thomas P. Clan election in a safe and secure place until all IBT appeals and court actions concerning that election are exhausted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/3/08) Copies Faxed & ECF by Chambers.(pl)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4066 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Vince Tenuto dated 10/28/2008 re: Requesting that the Court order an Independent Review Board audit of the Local Unions' books. ENDORSEMENT: The above letter dated October 28, 2008 from Mr. Tenuto (the 10/28 letter) having been filed ex parte (together with over 100 pages of attachments) and having requested emergency relief by November 4, 2008, it is hereby ordered that: 1. The 10/28 letter letter shall be docketed. 2. The attachments shall be maintained in chambers for review by any interested party. 3. Telephone notice will be given by Chambers to the IBT General Counsel, the Government, the Chief Investigator and the Administrator. 4. The IBT General shall immediately give notice to IBT Local 726. 5. Any party opposing the relief requested at item 10 of the 10/28 letter, viz., that IBT Local 726 maintain the ballots from the November 4, 2007 Local 726 Officers election in a safe and secure place until all IBT appeals and Court actions concerning irregulations and violations of the rules in the conduct of that election are exhausted, so inform the Court by letter no later than November 3 at noon by fax (212- 805-7941) and state the reasons for such opposition. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2008) (jpo)
October 27, 2008 Filing 4065 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Anthony Smith dated 10/18/08 re: Anthony Smith refers to his case which was upheld with the California Labor Standards Enforcement. Mr. Smith asks that Your Honor write a letter to this Van Nuys, California Office in hopes that he may get his job back. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is not able to grant Mr. Smith's requests. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/26/08) (tro)
October 20, 2008 Filing 4064 Objections of Don Hahs To Application 131 of the Independent Review Board. (cd)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4062 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Alan R. Kaufman dated 10/16/08 re: this letter is jointly submitted by the government and Mr. Hogan's counsel.The government and I have agreed on the following schedule for submitting supplemental papers, subject to the Court's approval - - defense submission by November 5, 2008; government response by November 26, 2008, defense reply, if any, by December 8, 2008. Once fully submitted, the parties request that there be oral argument. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/17/08) (pl)
October 15, 2008 Filing 4063 Second Amended Notice of Charge. Document filed by United States of America. (pl)
October 15, 2008 Filing 4061 DECLARATION of Lisa Zornberg in Support of the Government's applicaiton for an order to show Cause why William T. Hogan, Jr. should not be adjudged in criminal contempt.. Document filed by United States of America. (pl)
October 15, 2008 Filing 4060 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Government's application for an order to show Cause why William T. Hogan, Jr. should not be adjudged in criminal contempt. Document filed by United States of America. (pl) Modified on 10/20/2008 (pl).
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4059 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Susan Gragel dated 9/18/08 re: Request for an extension of time to file objections to the Application 131 from 9/18/08 until 10/18/08. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/22/08) (cd) Copies sent by chambers
September 10, 2008 Filing 4058 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 133 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 133 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 133 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., Robert S. Harrison, Esq., and Robert Costello, Esq. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2008) (jfe)
September 10, 2008 Filing 4057 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 131 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 131 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning Application 131 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., and Susan L. Gragel, Esq. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2008) (jfe) Modified on 10/15/2008 (jfe).
September 10, 2008 Filing 4056 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND CHRIS LANSER: This Court hereby acknowledges that the agreement enclosed with application 132 of the Independent Review Board ("IRB") for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 132 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin, Jr., and Mr. Sylvester Needham. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2008) (jfe) Modified on 10/15/2008 (jfe).
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4055 ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that should Respondent Don Hahs or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters wish to file objections to said Application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the Government, the Office of the Chief Investigator, IRB no later than ten business days from the date hereof. It is further Ordered that in the event any such objections are files, any response to said objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondent Don Hahs and IBT no later than 10 business days of receipt of said objections. It is further ordered that Courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to Chambers on the same day they are filed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/3/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jfe)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4054 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Chris Lanser. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/2/08) (jfe)
August 13, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 4053 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
August 13, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 4053 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
August 12, 2008 Filing 4053 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #4052 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Francis Gillen. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 659725. Copies mailed to attorney(s) of record: International Brotherhood of Teamsters; Independent Review Board; International Review Board; and A.U.S.A. (tp)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4052 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER For the reasons et forth in this order, application 128 is granted, and the IRBs not adequate finding with respect to the charge against Francis J. Gillen is upheld. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/14/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(mme)
July 1, 2008 Filing 4051 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4050 MOTION for an order for the issuance of a subpoena directing International Longshoreman's Asso9ciation ("ILA"), Local No. 2052 to produce certain business records. MOTION for an order for the issuance of a subpoena directing International Longshoreman's Asso9ciation ("ILA"), Local No. 2052 to produce certain business records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (pl)
July 1, 2008 Filing 4050 MOTION for an order for the issuance of a subpoena directing International Longshoreman's Association ("ILA"), Local No. 2052 to produce certain business records, w/ attched. Declaration in support. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(pl) Modified on 7/2/2008 (pl).
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4049 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 7/3/2008 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/4/2008) Copies Sent By Chambers.(tve)
May 19, 2008 Filing 4048 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Chief Investigator's application for issuance of subpoenas. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (dle)
May 19, 2008 Filing 4047 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS DIRECTING TWO FORMER IBT INVESTIGATORS TO APPEAR FOR SWORN EXAMINATIONS. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(dle)
May 19, 2008 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #4046 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 5/13/08, Receipt Number 650480. (Quintero, Marcos)
May 13, 2008 Filing 4046 MOTION for Paul L. Knight to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Francis Gillen.(dle)
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4045 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Alan Kaufman dated 4/1/08 re: Request to file a Reply Memo of more than 10 pages, (about 14 pages). ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/2/08) (cd)
April 2, 2008 Filing 4044 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW on behalf of William T. Hongan, JR. Document filed by William T. Hogan, Jr. (jmi)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4043 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Alan R. Kaufman dated 3/25/08 re: Counsel for Mr. Hogan requests that the due date for the submission of their reply papers be extended one week, from 3/26/08 to 4/2/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 4/2/2008.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/28/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4042 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Wendy H. Waszmer dated 3/26/08 re: Counsel for the U.S., along with Asst. U.S. Attorneys Beth E. Goldman and Danna Drori, request an extension of time from 3/27/08, until 4/10/08, to submit a letter in connection with Application 128 of the Independent Review Board concerning disciplinary action taken against Francis J. Gillen, a member of Local 500 in Philadelphia, PA. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/28/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro)
March 27, 2008 Filing 4041 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re Application 128 of the Independent Review Board, in the Matter of Francis J. Gillen. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4038 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Andrew S. Hoffman dated 3/7/08 re: Counsel for Respondent Francis J. Gillen request that the Court grant an additional time to file their response to the IRB's application to enforce its decision until 3/10/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/7/08) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(tro)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4037 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Alan R. Kaufman dated 3/7/08 re: Counsel on behalf of Mr. Hogan requests that any reply papers to be submitted in response to the government's Memorandum dated 3/5/08 shall be served and filed by 3/26/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/7/08) (tro) Copies Faxed By Chambers.
March 5, 2008 Filing 4040 DECLARATION of Danna Droro in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Notice of Charge. Document filed by United States of America. (djc)
March 5, 2008 Filing 4039 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by United States of America. (djc)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4036 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 2/27/08 re: Counsel for the Government request an additional short extension to March 5, 2008 to file its brief in opposition to Hogan's motion to dismiss.. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/28/08) (js)
February 27, 2008 Filing 4035 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 130 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: This Court hereby acknowledges that Application 130 of the Independent Review Board for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters has been received by this Court, and that this Court has cause to be filed the original documents concerning Application 130 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. This Court further certifies that the instant Acknowledgment of Receipt has been filed with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the Acknowledgment has bee forwarded to the addresses listed herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/27/08) (tro)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4034 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of John Clancy. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/27/08) (tro)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4033 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 4018 Motion. For reasons further set forth in said Order, the 4018 Sanction imposed against Jackson by the IBT and found "not adequate" by the IRB is AFFIRMED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/25/08) (db)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4032 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 2/20/08 re: Request for an adjournment of time to 2/28/08 for the Government's deadline to file its brief in opposition to Hogan's motion to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing ( Response due by 2/28/2008) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/20/08) (cd).
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4031 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 2/12/08 re: Counsel for the Government request a one-week adjournment of the Government's deadline to file its brief in opposition to Hogan's motion to dismiss, from 2/14/08 until 2/21/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/08) (tro)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4030 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Andrew S. Hoffmann dated 1/7/08 re: Counsel for respondent Francis J. Gillen request that the Court grant an additional extension of their time to file their papers in this matter until 3/7/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/7/08) (tro)
February 6, 2008 Filing 4029 Election Supervisor's Report NO. 5 to the Court 2005-2006 IBT Election. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Election Supervisor. (djc) Modified on 2/6/2008 (djc).
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4027 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Beth Goldman dated 1/24/08 re: Request for an extension of time from 1/25/08, to 1/31/08, to submit a letter in connection with Application 129 of the Independent Review Board. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/28/08) (cd)
January 25, 2008 Filing 4028 Chief Investigator's MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Independent Review Board's Application 129 - in the Matter of James D. Jackson. (djc) Modified on 1/31/2008 (djc).
January 15, 2008 Filing 4026 Objection re: 4020 Order. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (jmi)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4024 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 4015 Motion for the issuance of subpoenas. Counsel shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than 1/7/08, of how they propose to proceed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/26/07) (cd)
December 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4023 ORDER: Application No. 127 is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/26/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
December 10, 2007 Filing 4025 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hugh M. Davis on behalf of James D. Jackson. (jco)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4022 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Hugh M. Davis dated 12/5/07 re: a request for a thirty day extension within which to file respondent Jackson's papers to the IRB's filing. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/7/07) Copies faxed by chambers on 12/7/07.(kco)
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4020 ORDER that should Respondent James D. Jackson or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters wish to file objections to said Application, such objections must be writing and filed with the Court an served on the Government, the Office of the Chief Investigator, IRB no later than ten business days from the date hereof; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event any such objections are filed, any response to said objections must be writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondent James D. Jackson and the IBT no later than ten business days of receipt of said objections; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to Chamber on the same day they are filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/26/2007) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jmi)
November 26, 2007 Filing 4021 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT: I hereby agree that effective on 11/13/2006, I resigned from membership in Local 502 and the IBT. It was as is my intention that my resignation from Local 502 and the IBT be permanent and unconditional. I further agree that from and after the effective date of my resignation I shall not seek or accept elected or appointed office in employment by Local 502 in any capacity, nor shall I have any involvement or participation whatsoever in any of the activities or affairs of Local 502 or the IBT. Within five (5) business days after the effective date of this Agreement, I agree to pay $22,452.63 to Local 502 as restitution for the funds and property IRB alleged were received improperly and converted to my own use and the use of others. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/21/2007) Copies mailed by chambers. (jar)
November 19, 2007 Filing 4019 RESPONDENT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ISSUE SUBPOENAS. (pl)
November 14, 2007 Filing 4018 Application 129 of The Independent Review Board - - in The Matter of James D. Jackson for ruling by the Honorable Loretta A. Preska on the issues heard by te International Brotherhood of Teamsters during a hearing on 4/5/07 and thereafter determined, on the IRB-recommended charge filed against Local 299 member James D. Jackson.(dle)
November 8, 2007 Filing 4017 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 129 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: this Court acknowledges that Application 129 of the Independent Review Board for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning application 129 of the IRB with the Clerk of the Court for the S.D.N.Y. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/8/07) (kco)
November 2, 2007 Filing 4016 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4015 MOTION Chief Investigators Application for the issuance of a subpoena directing the production of certain telephone numbers. (pl)
November 2, 2007 Filing 4015 Chief Investigators Application for the issuance of a subpoena directing the production of certain telephone numbers.(pl)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4014 ORDER APPLICATION NO. 128: The Court, on its own motion, hereby vacates the portion of its Order [dkt. no. 4013] granting Respondent Francis Gillen's motion for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT and Other entities [dkt. no. 4009]. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/26/07) Copies mailed by chambers. (dle) Modified on 10/29/2007 (Lewis, Diahann).
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4013 ORDER granting 4009 Motion for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT and other entities. Upon consideration of Francis J. Gillen's motion for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT and other entities, and any opposition filed, all the facts and circumstances of this matter, and the Court being fully aware of the premises therein, it is on this 22nd day of October, 2007, hereby ORDERED that the motion be, and hereby is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Respondent may serve subpoenas on the International Brotherhood of Teamsters in the form and manner approved by the Court. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/22/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
October 19, 2007 Filing 4012 Respondent Francis J. Gillen's MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 4010 MOTION for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT and Other Entities. (djc)
October 19, 2007 Filing 4011 DECLARATION of Andrew S. Hoffmann in Support re: 4010 MOTION for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT and Other Entities. (djc)
October 19, 2007 Filing 4010 Respondent Francis J. Gillen's MOTION for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT and Other Entities. (djc) Modified on 10/24/2007 (Clark, Dolores).
October 19, 2007 Filing 4009 MOTION for leave to issue subpoenas to the IBT; and MOTION for Extension of Time to File objections to Application 128. (document filed by Respondent Francis J. Gillen) (djc) Modified on 10/24/2007 (Clark, Dolores).
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4008 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta Preska from Andrew S. Hoffman dated 10/16/07 re: Respondent Francis J. Gillen requests that the time for filing their objections to Application No. 128 of the Independent Review Board be extended through this Friday, 10/19/07. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/16/07) (pl)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4007 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - APPLICATION NO. 125: for reasons further set forth in said Order, the IRB's decision is affirmed in all respects. (the Court GRANTS Application No. 125.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/3/07) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4006 ORDER: Whereas, the Court has receievd Application No. 128 of the Independent Review Board("IRB") concerning the penalties that the IRB imposed against Respondent Francis J. Gillen. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that should respondent Francis J. Gillen or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") wish to file objections to said Application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the Government, the Office of the Chief Investigator, IRB no later that ten business days of the date hereof; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the event any such objections are filed, any response to said objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondent Francis J. Gillen and the IBT no later than 10 business days of receipt of said objections; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to Chambers on the same day they are filed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/7) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(laq)
October 2, 2007 Filing 4005 MOTION for ruling by the Honorable Loretta A. Preska on the issues heard by the International Brotherood of Teamsters during a hearing on July 11, 2007, and thereafter determined, on the IRB-recommended charge filed against International Vice President, Joint Council 53 President, Local 500 President and Pennsylvania Conference of Teamsters PResient Francis J. Gillen. (djc)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4004 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 9/19/07 re: Request for an adjournment of the deadline for Hogan to file his motion to dismiss, from 10/1 until 11/1/07. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered.Motion due by 11/1/2007. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/19/07) (cd)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4003 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Alan Kaufman dated 8/30/07 re: counsel for Mr. Hogan requests that the motion schedule be adjusted by two weeks so that dft's motions are due 10/1/07, the government's response by 11/2/07 and dft's reply by 11/19/07. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/7/07) (dle)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4002 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER APPLICATION NO. 121: The IRB's decision is affirmed in all respects, and Application 121 is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/7/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4001 ORDER: Should Respondent Edmund Burke or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters (IBT) wish to file objections to said Application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the Govt, the office of the Chief Investigator, Independent Review Board no later than 10 business days from the date hereof. In the event any such objections are filed, any response to said objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondent Edmund Burke and the IBT no later tan ten business days of receipt of said objections. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/19/2007) Copies mailed by chambers. (jar)
July 12, 2007 Filing 4000 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3999 MOTION for the issuance of a subpoena directing Former Blet Building Manager, Michael Loomis to Appear for a Sworn Examination. (djc)
July 12, 2007 Filing 3999 MOTION for the issuance of a subpoena directing Former Blet Building Manager, Michael Loomis to Appear for a Sworn Examination. Attached is Declaration of Linda H. Chan. (djc)
July 10, 2007 Filing 3998 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3997 MOTION Chief Investigatio's Application for the Issuance of a Subpoena Directing the Indiana Bureau of Motor Vehicles to Produce Specified Records regarding Local 135 Behicles. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (tro)
July 10, 2007 Filing 3997 MOTION for an Order, that this Court issue a Subpoena Directing the Indiana Bureau of Motor Vehicles to produce specified records regarding Local 135 Vehicles no later than July 31, 2007. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(tro)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3996 ORDER: Should Respondent Joseph Pirro or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters (IBT) wish to file objections to said application, objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the Govt, the Office of the Chief Investigator, IBT by 10 business days from the date. In the event any objections are filed, any response to objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondant and the IBT by 10 business days of said objections. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/29/2007) Copies mailed by chambers.(jar)
July 3, 2007 Filing 3995 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE OPINION AND DECISION OF THE INDEPENDANT REVIEW BOARD; this Court acknowledges that the Opinion and Decision of the IRB of Application 127 of the Independent Review Board for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters has been received by this Court. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/29/07) (kco)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3994 ORDER that should Respondent George DiPilate or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters wish to file objections to said Application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court no later than ten business days from the date hereof; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT in the event any such objections are filed, any response to said objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondent George DiPilate and the IBT no later than ten bussiness days of receipt of said objections; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to Chambers on the same day they are filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/7/2007) (jmi)
April 27, 2007 Filing 3993 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3992 MOTION issuance of subpoenas directing the production of certain telephone records... (djc)
April 27, 2007 Filing 3992 MOTION issuance of subpoenas directing the production of certain telephone records. Attached is Chan Declaration. (djc) Modified on 4/30/2007 (Clark, Dolores).
March 29, 2007 Filing 3991 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3990 MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing eight companies with collective bargaining agreements with Local 714 to Produce Specified Records. (djc)
March 29, 2007 Filing 3990 The Chief Investigator's MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing eight companies with collective bargaining agreements with Local 714 to Produce Specified Records. Attached is Zahner Declaration. (djc)
March 26, 2007 Filing 3989 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: Acknowledgment of receipt of application 126 if the independent review board. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/23/2007) (jmi)
March 20, 2007 Filing 3988 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3987 MOTION.. (cd)
March 20, 2007 Filing 3987 MOTION by the Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of a Subpoena Directing Cingular Wireless To Produce Specified Telephone Records...(cd)
March 15, 2007 Filing 3986 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/16/07 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (tro)
February 28, 2007 Filing 3985 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Two Subpoenas Directing The Production of Certain Telephone Records. re: 3984 MOTION.. (rag)
February 28, 2007 Filing 3984 CHIEF INVESTIGATOR'S APPLICATION For The Issuance of Two Subpoenas Directing Verizon and Cellco Partnership DBA Verizon Wireless to Produce Records..(rag)
February 7, 2007 Filing 3983 ELECTION SUPERVISOR'S REPORT No. 4 to the Court. (jar)
January 18, 2007 Filing 3982 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3981 MOTION the issuance of a subpoena directing Kloster Steel Corporation, A Company with a collective bargaining agreement with local 714, to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (jco)
January 18, 2007 Filing 3981 MOTION for the issuance of a subpoena directing Kloster Steel Corporation, a company with a collective bargaining agreement with local 714, to produce specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry.(jco)
January 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3980 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Bradley T. Raymond dated 1/16/07 re: IBT requests that it be permitted to submit a brief letter to the Court in connection with application 125 of the Independent Review Board on or before January 31, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/16/07) (js)
January 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3979 ORDER: APPLICATION No. 122: It is hereby ordered that Application No. 122 [docket entry no. 3925] of the IRB is GRANTED, and the IRB's decision is entered as an order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/16/2007) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(lb)
January 11, 2007 Filing 3978 Chief Investigator's MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Independent Review Board's Application 125 - in the Matter of Jerry Vincent. (djc, )
January 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3977 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 1/9/07 re: counsel for dfts request an extension of time from 1/11/07 until 1/31/07 to submit a letter in connection with Application 125 of the IRB. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/9/07) (dle, )
December 21, 2006 Filing 3976 Objection of Jerry Vincent To Application 125 Of The Independent Review Board. (rw, )
December 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3975 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 1/16/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/12/06) (pl, )
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3974 ORDER that should Respondent Jerry Vincent or the Inernational Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT") wish to file objections to said Application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the Government, the Office of the Cheif Investigator, IRB no later than ten business days from the date hereof; and It is further Ordered that in the event any such objections are filed, any response to said objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on Respondent Jerry Vincent and the IBT no later than ten busniness days of receipt of said objection; and It is further Order that courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to chambers on the same day they are filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/11/2006) (jmi, )
December 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3973 ORDER that should respondent D'Angelo or the International Brotherhood of Teamsters ("IBT");and served on the Government, the Office of the Cheif Investigator, TRB, [and the Administrator, IRB,] no later than ten business days from the date hereof; and It is further Ordered that in the event any such objections are filed, and served on Respondent D'Angelo and the IBT of receipt of said objects; and It is further Order that courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to chambers on the same day they are filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/11/2006) (jmi, )
November 28, 2006 Filing 3972 MEMORANDUM OF LAW of The Chief Investigator in Support re: 3971 MOTION to Produce. (jco, )
November 28, 2006 Filing 3971 MOTION for an Order to issue a subpoena directing Sprint/Nextel Communications Inc. to produce to the Chief Investigator no later than 12/29/06, all subscriber information, billing statements, toll records showing outgoing calls, outgoing call numbers, incoming call numbers, point to point calls, LUDs and MUDs for the billing periods covering any part of the period from 1/1/03 to the present for telephone no. (313) 218-9645, a cellular telephone number assigned to James D. Jackson. (jco, )
November 13, 2006 Filing 3970 Election Supervisor's Report No. 3 To the Court, by Richard W. Mark. (cd, )
October 26, 2006 Filing 3967 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Opinion and Decision of the IRB of Application 124 of the Independent Review Board served on U.S. District Court on 10/24/06; and a copy of the acknowledgement has been forwarded to the following: John J. Cronin..; and Stephen D. Hans...; (djc, )
October 25, 2006 Filing 3969 Opinion and Decision of the Independent Review Board; (volumes I and II (djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2006 (djc, ).
October 25, 2006 Filing 3968 MOTION for ruling by the Honorable Loretta A. Preska on the issues heard by the IRB during a Hearing on April 19, 2006 and thereafter determined, on the charges filed against Robert D'Angelo, a member of IBT Local 813. (djc, )
September 22, 2006 Filing 3966 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3965 MOTION issuance of subpoenas directing 11 telephone complanies to produce subscriber information.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd, )
September 22, 2006 Filing 3965 MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing 11 telephone companies to produce subscriber information. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd, )
September 8, 2006 Filing 3964 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3963 MOTION for the isuance of Subpoenas Directing Nextel Communications and Ameritech-IL to Produce Specific Telephone Records;.. (djc, )
September 8, 2006 Filing 3963 Chief Investigator's MOTION for the isuance of Subpoenas Directing Nextel Communications and Ameritech-IL to Produce Specific Telephone Records; Attached is Zahner Declaration. (djc, )
September 6, 2006 Filing 3962 REPLY Brief in Support of John Kikes' Objections to Application NO. 121 of the Independent Review Board. (djc, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 3961 MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing Devon International Group, Devon It, Inc., Devon Health Services, Inc and MMO Partners to Produce Specified Records. Attached is Zahner Declaration. (djc, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 3960 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing Devon International Group, Devon It, Inc., Devon Health Services, Inc. and MMO Partners to Produce Specified Records. (djc, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3959 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, TDU's application for relief with respect to the Supplemental Rules for distributing the recording of the International Officer Candidate Forum is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/23/06) (db, )
August 21, 2006 Filing 3958 Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of a Subpoena Directing Nextel Communication to Produce Records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (jmi, )
August 21, 2006 Filing 3957 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3935 MOTION Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the production of certain telephone records.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (jmi, )
August 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3956 ORDER: It is hereby ordered pursuant to the Court's power under the All Writs Act, 28 USC 1651, that the Paris Hotel in Las Vegas, Nevada, shall provide to the 2006 IBT Election Supervisor no later than 8/22/2006, a copy of the video recording of the time and place of the incident that occured on 7/27/2006 and is the subject of a pre-election protest. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/15/2006) (lb, )
August 15, 2006 Filing 3953 Application 123 of the Independent Review Board--Agreement Between The Independent Review Board and Edmund Burke. (cd, )
August 14, 2006 Filing 3955 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3954 MOTION.. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd, )
August 14, 2006 Filing 3954 MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing production of specified records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd, )
August 1, 2006 Filing 3952 LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from Dana Drori dated 7/28/06 re: Government reuests that the court apporve the enclosed sitp and order modifying Paragraph 12(D) of the March 14, 1989 consent Decree in the above-referenced matter...;. Document filed by United States of America.(djc, )
August 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3951 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PARAGRAPH 12(D) OF THE MARCH 14, 1989 CONSENT DECREE (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/31/06) (jco, )
July 28, 2006 Filing 3950 ELECTION SUPERVISOR'S REPORT No. 2 TO THE COURT. July 2006. (rag, )
July 28, 2006 Filing 3949 ELECTION SUPERVISOR'S REPORT NO.1 TO THE COURT February 2006. (rag, )
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3948 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the Attorney General's reappointment of Mr. Civiletti, the IBT's reappointment of Mr. diGenova, and Messrs. Civiletti's and diGenova's reappointment of Judge Webster are hereby approved for a 5-year term of the IRB, effective 7/20/2006. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/18/2006) (lb, )
July 18, 2006 Filing 3947 MOTION for the issuance of subpoenas directing Local 714's attorney to appear for a sworn examination and to produce billing records . (jco, )
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3946 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 7/5/2006 re: respectfully requesting a second brief extension of time from 7/7/2006 to 7/14/2006, to submit a letter in connection with Application 121 of the Independent Review Board concerning disciplinary action taken against John Kikes, International Representative and Local 78 President. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/5/2006) (lb, )
June 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3945 ORDER: Counsel shall inform the Court when Thomas Ryan v. Council No. 53, et al (03cv73) has been dismissed. Oral arguments may be set in this matter after that time. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/16/2006) (lb, )
June 13, 2006 Filing 3944 Chief Investigator's Memorandum of Law in support of the Independent Review Board's Application 121 - In the matter of John Kikes. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (dle, )
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3943 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 6/8/06 re: Request an extension of time from June 13, 2006 until July 7, 2006. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/06) (js, )
May 30, 2006 Filing 3942 Objections of Respondent John Kikes to Application No. 121 of the Independent Review Board. (djc, )
May 23, 2006 Filing 3941 MOTION Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing the Production of Certain Telephone Records. (jco, )
May 23, 2006 Filing 3940 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3935 MOTION Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the production of certain telephone records. (jco, )
May 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3939 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Craig H. Livingston dated 5/5/2006 re: we request an additional extension of 21 days, to 5/29/2006 to becoming familiar with this case. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/5/2006) (lb, )
May 3, 2006 Filing 3938 QUARTERLY REPORT 54 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD under the Consent Order article G. "REPORT TO THE COURT". (ae, )
May 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3937 STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the definition of the term "regional area" with respect to General Committees of Adjustment from the former International Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers shall be amended to read as follows: (1) Delegates and alternate delegates elected from General Committees of Adjustment and from geographic areas as designated in paragraphs 6.16 of the Merger Agreement between the International Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and the IBT shall vote in the geographic region in which the entity from which they are elected is headquartered; provided, however, that with respect to any General Committee of Adjustment which is headquartered in a geographic region within which less than one percent of the members assigned to that General Committee of Adjustment are employed, the delegates and alternate delegates shall vote in the geographic region in which the largest number of members of that General Committee of Adjustment are employed. Members of each General Committee of Adjustment shall vote in the geographic region in which the General Committee of Adjustment is headquartered; provided, however, that with respect to any General Committee of Adjustment which is headquartered in a geographic region within which less than one percent of the members assigned to that General Committee of Adjustment are employed shall vote in the geographic region in which the largest number of that General Committee of Adjustment are employed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/1/06) (sac, )
April 28, 2006 Filing 3936 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3808 Application for the Issuance of subpoena directing Nextel Communications to produce records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (kco, ) Modified on 5/1/2006 (kco, ).
April 28, 2006 Filing 3935 MOTION for the Issuance of Subpoenas directing the production of certain telephone records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (kco, )
April 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3934 STIPULATION AND ORDER: regarding procedures agreed to by IBT and the Government to be followed that will govern the distribution of materials relating to the Committees work, including all proposed amendments to the IBT Constitution and all proposed rules for the conduct of the 2006 IBT Convention as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/06) (db, )
April 25, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 3932 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (kco, )
April 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3932 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Bradley T. Raymond is admitted to appear before the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/21/06) (kco, )
April 21, 2006 Filing 3933 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3734 Motion to ContinueMotion for Preliminary InjunctionMotion to ContinueMotion for Preliminary Injunction. (jco, )
April 21, 2006 Filing 3931 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from Craig Livingston dated 4/17/06: that the submission in behalf of Mr. Kikes, which is currently due on 4/21 is extended to 5/8/06. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/21/06) (cd, )
April 7, 2006 Filing 3930 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Application #122 (motion previously terminated). document filed by Thomas J. Ryan, formerly President of Teamsters Local 107. (djc, )
April 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3929 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to JUdge Loretta A. Preska from Robert F. O'Brien dated 3/28/2006 re: to request an extension of seven (7) days, thereby making the response due from Mr.Ryan on April 7,2006. Replies due by 4/7/2006.ENDORSEMENT: Reply from counsel for plaintiff due April 7,2006. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/31/2006) (jmi, )
March 31, 2006 Filing 3928 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from Robert M. Baptiste dated 3/21/06 re: Mr. Kike's time to file papers in connection with application 121 is extended for 30 days.. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/24/06) (djc, )
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3927 ORDER that should respondent IBT wish to file objections to application no. 122 such objections must be in writing and filed with the court and served on the government the Office of the Chief Investigator, IRB and the Administrator no later than ten business days from the date hereof; in the event any such objections are filed any response to said objections must be inwriting and filed with the court and served on respondent Thomas Tyan and the IBT no latter than ten business days of receipt of said objections. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/17/06) (dle, )
March 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3926 ENDORSEMENT, on Acknowledgement of Receipt of Application 122 of the Independent Review Board, so ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/17/06) (cd, )
March 20, 2006 Filing 3925 APPLICATION 122 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- in the matter of Thomas Ryan. (sac, )
March 10, 2006 Filing 3923 APPENDIX to 3922 EXHIBITS to Application 121 of the Independent Review Board (Doc. #3921).(sac, )
March 10, 2006 Filing 3922 EXHIBITS to Application 121 of the Independent Review Board (Doc. #3921). (sac, )
March 10, 2006 Filing 3921 APPLICATION 121 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD -- in the matter of John Kikes. Document filed by the Independent Review Board. (sac, )
March 8, 2006 Filing 3924 LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from Linda Chan dated 3/3/06: for a subpoena directing MCI to produce Incandella's telephone records for the period 6/1/02 to present. (cd, )
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3920 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that should respondent wish to file objections to saaid application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the Government, the office of the chief Investigator, IRB, and the Administator, IRB, no later than ten business days fromthe date hereof; and it is further ordered that in the event any such objections are filed, any response to said objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the respondent John Kikes and the IBT no later than ten business days of receipt of said objections and it is further ordered that courtesy copies of all papers shall be sent to chambers on the same day they are filed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/8/06) (js, )
March 8, 2006 Filing 3919 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF APPLICATION 121 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD: This Court further certifies that the instant acknowledgment of receipt (" the Aknowledgment ") has been filed with the clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York, and that a copy of the acknowledgment has been fowarded to The Administator of the Independent Review Board and to Counsel for respondent(s). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/8/06) (js, )
February 9, 2006 Filing 3918 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3917 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE).. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd, )
February 3, 2006 Filing 3917 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for the Issuance of a Subpoena directing Nextel Comm to produce records. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (cd, )
February 3, 2006 Filing 3916 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) Application for the Issuance of a subpoena directeing Spring to produce Records. Declaration of Linda H. Chan attached. Exhibits attached. (jco, ) Modified on 2/6/2006 (jco, ).
February 3, 2006 Filing 3915 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Chief Investigator's 3864 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE). (jco, )
February 3, 2006 Filing 3914 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3850 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) subpoenas directeing 11 telephone companies to produce subscriber infromation for specified telephone numbers. (jco, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 3913 QUARTERLY REPORT 53 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD under the Consent Order article G. "REPORT TO THE COURT".(sac, )
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3912 ORDER granting 3909 Motion by the Independent Review Board regarding order to be entered affirming the IRB's 10/11/05, Opinion and Decision. It is hereby ordered that application no. 119 of the IRB regarding the charges and sanctions imposed against Joseph L. Bernstein is GRANTED and the IRB's decision is entered as an order of the Court.. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/16/05) (kco, )
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3911 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the proposed candidate Forum Rule a copy of which is annexed to this order, is approved and included as Article V11, section 6 of the Rules for the 2005-2006 IBT International Union Delegate and Officer Election. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/6/05) (js, )
December 9, 2005 Filing 3910 Opinion and Decision of the Independent Review Board re doc #3909.. (cd, )
December 9, 2005 Filing 3909 MOTION/APPLICATION by the Independent Review Board re order to be entered affirming the IRB's 10/11/05, Opinion and Decision if your honor finds it appropriate. (cd, )
November 23, 2005 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 3897 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/9/05, Receipt Number 561167. (jd, )
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3908 ORDER; The proposed 2006 Election Rules..., are approved with the exception of Article VII, Section 6 and shall govern the 2006 IBT Election unless modified in accordance with the March 2005 Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/9/05) (djc, )
November 10, 2005 Filing 3907 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the Agreement Between The Independent Review Board and Joseph Yannucci. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (sac, )
November 10, 2005 Filing 3906 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Andrew W. Schilling dated 11/2/05. ENDORSEMENT: A conference shall be held on November 9th at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12A. Interested parties may participate by telephone but should inform the Court in advance of their desire to do so. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/7/05) (js, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3905 ORDER; should respondent wish to file objections to said application, such objections must be in writing and filed with the Court and served on the government, etc no later than ten business days from the date hereof. Any response to said objections must be in writing and filed within ten days of the receipt of said objections. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/1/05) (kco, )
November 4, 2005 Filing 3904 Acknowledgment of receipt of the opinion and decision of the Independent Review Board in the matter of Joseph L. Bernstein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/05) (kco, )
November 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3903 ORDER: Acknowledgment of receipt of the agreement between the Independent Review Board and Robert Frank Logan. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/26/2005) (lb, )
November 4, 2005 Filing 3902 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Robert Frank Logan re: 3901 Application 119 of the Independent Review Board -- Opinion and Decision of the Independent Review Board in the Matter of Joseph L. Bernstein. (rag, )
November 4, 2005 Filing 3901 APPLICATION 119 of the Independant Review Board -- Opinion and Decision of the Independent Review Board in the Matter of Joseph L. Bernstein. (rag, )
October 6, 2005 Filing 3900 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3899 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for the issuance of a subpoena directing General I ron industries, Inc to Produce Records;.. (djc, )
October 5, 2005 Filing 3899 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for the issuance of a subpoena directing General Iron Industries, Inc to Produce Records; Attached is Zahner Declaration. (djc, )
September 23, 2005 Filing 3898 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Motion of Teamsters for a Democratic Union to appear as Amicus Curiae to comment on the 2005-2006 Election Rules; Teamsters for a Democratic Union may appear as amicus, and its Memorandum of Law dated 9/12/05 will be considered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/22/05) (sac, )
September 23, 2005 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 3897 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd, )
September 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3897 ORDER granting 3896 Motion for Barbara Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/23/05) (cd, )
September 13, 2005 Filing 3895 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (dle, )
September 12, 2005 Filing 3896 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Barbara Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teamsters for a Democratic Union. (dle, )
September 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3894 MEMO ENDORSEMENT the request by Local 786 of the IBT that the Court order the Chief Investigator of the Independent Review Board to commence an investigation into certain evidence concerning Anthony D'Amico and that the Court "take jurisdiction" over those allegations and over an action pending in another court denied. Among other things, Local 786 is not authorized to seek relief under the Consent Decree. Also, the Chief Investigator already has access to the information upon which the allegations are based. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/6/05) (jco, )
September 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3893 ENDORSED LETTER: re: requesting ten days from 8/31/05, in which to make any such submission to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/7/05) (js, )
August 31, 2005 Filing 3892 Joint Application Of The United States Of America and the International Brotherhood of Teamsters for the Entry of an Order Approving Election Rules for the 2006 International Union Delegate and Officer Election. Document filed by United States of America, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (rw, )
August 25, 2005 Filing 3891 LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from John J.Cronin, Jr. dated 8/4/05 re: Quarterly Report 51 of the Independent Review Board. (djc, )
August 16, 2005 Filing 3890 Quarterly Reprot 51 of the Independent Review Board, fld by Administrator J. Cronin. (cd, )
July 18, 2005 Filing 3889 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT of Carlow Scalf. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (mde, )
July 18, 2005 Filing 3888 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the Agreement Between The Independent Review Board And Carlow Scalf. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (mde, )
July 18, 2005 Filing 3887 Application 113 of the Independent Review Board Agreement Between The Independent Review Board And Carlow Scalf. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (mde, )
July 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3886 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, application 113 (Mr. Carlow Scalf) is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/8/05) (db, )
June 23, 2005 Filing 3885 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3884 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) that the Court issue a subpoena directing Ameritech, Inc. to produce documents.. (pl, )
June 23, 2005 Filing 3884 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) that the Court issue a subpoena directing Ameritech, Inc. to produce documents; W/ attch. delcaration in support. (pl, )
June 14, 2005 Filing 3883 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Danna Drori dated 5/27/05 re: the parties have agreed to the budge proposed by Mr. Mark in the amount of $10,725,965.00.. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/6/05) (sac, )
May 23, 2005 Filing 3882 Application 117 of the Independent Review Board -- Agreement between the Independent Review Board and Thomas Cerbone. Filed by John J. Cronin, Jr., Administrator. (db, )
May 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3881 ORDER Acknowlegement of Receipt of the Agreement Between the Independent Review Board and Philip Fasulo. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/12/2005) (jsa, )
May 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3880 ORDER Affidavit and Agreement of Thomas J. Cerbone before the Independent Review Board. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/12/2005) (jsa, )
May 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3879 ORDER Acknowledgment of Receipt of the Agreement Between the Independent Review Board and Thomas Cerbone. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/12/2005) (jsa, )
May 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3878 ORDER Affidavit and agreement of Philip Fasulo before the Independent Review Board. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/12/2005) (jsa, )
May 19, 2005 Filing 3877 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE)for an order approving this application 116 of the Independent Review Board - - Agreement between the IRB and Philip Fasulo and if appropriate, to be entered as an order. . (dle, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 3876 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Application 117 served on A. Schilling; C. Carberry, P. Szymanski on 5/4/05. Service was made by United Parcel Service.. (dle, )
May 16, 2005 Filing 3875 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of application 116 served on Andrew W. Schilling, charles Carberry, Patrick Szymanski, Sylvester Needham on 5/4/05. Service was made by United Parcel Service.. (dle, )
May 9, 2005 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 3874 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp, )
May 9, 2005 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 3874 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp, )
May 5, 2005 Filing 3873 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard W. Levitt dated 3/25/05 re: counsel withdraws their opposition to application 115 and withdraw their request to submit a motion to vacate the IRB's decision. Application 115 is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/1/05) (dle, )
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3872 ORDER In accordance with the reasons set forth on the transcript of the oral argument held on 1/13/05 in Courtoom 12A, Application 112 of the Independent Review Board is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/2/05) (jco, )
April 29, 2005 Filing 3874 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 3872 Order. Document filed by Charles Crawley. Filing fee $ 255.00, receipt number E 542076. Copies of Notice of Interlocutory Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Charles M. Carberry; Danna drori, AUSA; John Cronin, Jr. (tp, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 3871 DECLARATION of Celia A. Zahner re: 3864 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE).. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (jmi, )
April 11, 2005 Filing 3870 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3864 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE).. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (jmi, )
April 1, 2005 Filing 3868 QUARTERLY REPORT 49 OF THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD UNDER THE CONSENT ORDER ARTICLE G. "REPORT TO THE COURT". Document filed by Independent Review Board, dated 2/2/05. (sac, )
March 29, 2005 Filing 3869 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Yvonne Shivers dated 3/14/05 re: granting the following proposed briefing schedule. Motions due by 3/28/2005. Replies due by 4/20/2005. Responses due by 4/13/2005 (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/18/05) (sac, )
March 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3867 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the IBT complies fully with this Stipulation and Order, the Govt agrees not to exercise its option to have the 2006 IBT Election supervised by the Dept of Labor, as further set in this document. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/18/05) (cd, )
March 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3866 ORDER Acknowledgement of the Receipt of Application 115 of the Independent Review Board. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/10/2005) (jsa, )
March 10, 2005 Filing 3865 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from Richard Ware Levitt dated 2/28/2005 re: In light of the extension, counsel shall confer and inform the Court of a proposed briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/4/2005) (jsa, )
February 16, 2005 Filing 3864 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) For an order granting the Chief Investigator's request that this court issue subpoenas directing Nextel Communications, Inc. and Verizon Wireless to produce to the Chief Investigator no later than 3/11/05 all subscriber information, billing statements, toll records showing outgoing calls, ourgoing call numbers, incoming call numbers, point to point calls, LUDs and MUDs for the billing periods covering any part of the period from 6/1/02 to 10/25/02 for telephone number (510) 760-8478 and covering any part of the period from 10/24/02 to the present for telephone number (510) 760-8783. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (dle, )
February 16, 2005 Filing 3863 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Chief Investigator's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Directing Nextel Communications, Inc. and Verizon Wireless, Inc. to Produce Records. (ps, )
February 15, 2005 Filing 3862 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/13/05 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Martin, Leslie)
February 8, 2005 Filing 3860 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Brian O'Dwyer, New Attorney: Law Offices of J. Bruce Maffeo. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, AFL-CIO. (Maffeo, J)
February 5, 2005 Filing 3857 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/13/2005 @ 11:55 am before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (mbe, )
February 1, 2005 Filing 3861 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Application 114 on 1/13/2005. Service was made by UPS Next Day Air. (jp, )
February 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3859 AFFIDAVIT AND AGREEMENT, APPLICATION #114; The Independent Review Board appointed pursuant to the Consent Order entered 3/14/89, recommended in a report dated 8/23/04 that Joint Council 16 file charges against me. I make this Affidavit and Agreement to resolve these issues stated in this document. This Agreement does not constitute an admission or denial of the charges. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/27/05) (sac, )
February 1, 2005 Filing 3858 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF THE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE INDEPENDENT REVIEW BOARD AND JOSEPH G. VITTA; this Court hereby acknowledges that the Agreement enclosed with Application 114 of the Independent Review Board for the International Brotherhood of Teamsters has been received by this Court, and that this Court has caused to be filed the original documents concerning the Agreement enclosed with Application 114 with the Clerk of the Court of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/18/05) (sac, )
January 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3856 CONSENT ORDER to change attorney; the Law Offices of J. Brue Maffeo is substituted for Brian O'Dwyer as local counsel for the dft International Brotherhood of Teamsters in this action. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/19/05) (dle, )
January 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3855 ORDER granting 3827 Motion. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/13/05) (kw, )
December 17, 2004 Filing 3854 Quarterly Report 48 of the Independent Review Board filed. (jp, )
December 15, 2004 Filing 3853 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Robert M. Baptiste to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Charles Crawley. (jp, )
December 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3852 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 1/13/2005 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska in ctrm 12A, US Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/10/04) (kw, )
December 9, 2004 Filing 3851 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 3827 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE).. Document filed by Charles Crawley. (moc, )
December 3, 2004 Filing 3848 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of re: 3827 APPLICATION NO. 112 of the Independent Review Board (FILED ON SERVICE DATE). Document filed by Charles Crawley. (ae, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 3850 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE)for the issusance of subpoenas directing 11 telephone companies to produce subscriber infromation for specified telephone numbers, fld by the Independent Review Board's Chief Investigator. (cd, )
November 30, 2004 Filing 3849 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Chief Investigator's Application for the issuance of subpoenas directing eleven telephone companies to produce subscriber information for specified telephone numbers. Document filed by Charles M. Carberry. (djc, )
November 23, 2004 Filing 3847 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3827 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE). (jco, )
November 4, 2004 Filing 3846 LETTER addressed to Judge Preska from John Cronin dated 9/23/04: re itemized statements of expenses of the Chief Investigator's office totaling $20,920.07 (cd, )
October 26, 2004 Filing 3845 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of the Chief Investigator's application for the issuance of a Subpoena directing Local 727's Accoutant to appear for a sworn examination. (pl, )
October 26, 2004 Filing 3844 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Celia A. Zahner dated 10/21/04 re: Courtesy copy fo an Applicaiton by the Independent Review Board's Chief Investigator requesting that, pursuant to the Consent Decress in this matter, this Court issue a subpoena directeing James J. Giemzik, to appear for a sworn examination before the Chief Investigator on 11/16/04.. (pl, )
October 21, 2004 Filing 3843 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3842 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) Chief Investigator's application for the issuance of a subpiena directing Cingular Wireless, Inc. to produce records. (jge, )
October 21, 2004 Filing 3842 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) Chief Investigator's application for the issuance of a subpoena directing Cingular Wireless, Inc. to produce records. (jge, )
October 21, 2004 Filing 3841 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3840 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) Chief Investigator's Application for the issuance of a subpoena directing Local 727's Accountant to appear for a sworn examination. (jge, )
October 21, 2004