H.M.S. Hussar, Inc. v. The Unidentified
Case Number: 1:2000cv00121
Filed: January 7, 2000
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Loretta A. Preska
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter filed by Mr. Monaco, dated May 31, 2024. (See dkt. no. 86.) The parties shall appear for a teleconference at 11:00 a.m. on June 24, 2024, using the dial-in (877) 402-9753, access code: 6545179. Mr. Monaco shall serve a copy of this order upon Mr. Governali. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/24/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/3/2024) (tg)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter filed by Mr. Monaco, dated March 11, 2024. (See dkt. no. 84.) The parties shall appear for a teleconference at 2:30 p.m. on April 3, 2024, using the dial-in (877) 402-9753, access code: 6545179. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/12/2024) (ama)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Following the conference held in the above-captioned case on February 15, 2024 (the "Conference"), the Court issues the following rulings: Mr. Monaco shall promptly send to Mr. Governali the proposed documents the parties discussed a t the Conference. Upon receipt of such documents, Mr. Governali shall promptly review the documents and return them, with any comments or proposed modifications, to Mr. Monaco. The parties shall have until March 15, 2024, to file a report with the Co urt about the status of their proposal. Any prior order restricting Mr. Governali's travel to the Southern District of New York is hereby vacated. Mr. Monaco shall mail a copy of this order to Mr. Governali. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/15/2024) (ama)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The Court has received Mr. Monaco's letter dated June 8, 2023. (Dkt. no. 79.) Mr. Governali shall respond to Mr. Monacos letter by letter or email no later than June 15, 2023. Mr. Monaco shall mail a copy of this order to Mr. Governali. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/09/2023) (ama)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: On March 1, 2023, Mr. Monaco informed the Court that Mr. Governali has yet to formally retain counsel. (Dkt. no. 75.) Accordingly, Mr. Governali is ordered to appear for his deposition, with or without counsel, on March 14, 2023, at 10:00 AM in the jury room attached to Courtroom 12A at 500 Pearl Street. Mr. Monaco is responsible for making all arrangements for the deposition, including whatever technology might be required if the deposition is to be virtual. Failure to appear as ordered may result in fines or other sanctions. Mr. Monaco shall mail a copy of this order to Mr. Governali. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 3/14/2023.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/2/2023) (va)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The Court had previously made the jury room available for Mr. Governali's deposition on December 20. He appeared, as did the court reporter, and Mr. Monaco indicated that he was prepared to take the deposition remotely. Instead, Mr. Governali showed the Court his application, dated December 19, 2022, to Bronx Legal Services for pro bono counsel and requested an adjournment of the deposition. When asked why he had not alerted Mr. Monaco of his request for an adjournment, Mr. G overnali responded that he did not want to look like he was trying to avoid the deposition. The Court granted an adjournment of two months but warned Mr. Governali that if a lawyer representing him did not agree with Mr. Monaco within two months to a date for Mr. Governali's deposition, he would be required to sit for his deposition within two weeks, with or without a lawyer. Because of his failure to alert Mr. Monaco in advance to his request for an adjournment, Mr. Governali was order ed to pay the court reporter's appearance fee of $200.00 within one month. Mr. Governali is warned that failure to do so may result in contempt and additional penalties. Mr. Monaco shall mail a copy of this order to Mr. Governali. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/20/2022) (tg)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the parties may use the jury room attached for courtroom 12A at 500 Pearl Street during business hours on December 20, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/8/2022) (va)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER terminating 66 Motion for Sanctions. Accordingly, the Court orders Mr. Governali to pay Mr. Monaco $671.00, which are the costs associated with the failed examinations, within five business days at the following address: The Law Offices of Richard G. Monaco, P.C., 80 Westchester Square, Bronx, New York 10461. (See dkt. no. 66 at 5.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/8/2022) (ks) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The parties shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than Wednesday, June 8, 2022 of the status of the action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2022) (mml)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The parties shall appear for a teleconference on October 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. using the dial-in 877-402-9753, access code: 6545179. The parties shall be prepared to discuss Mr. Monaco's recently filed motion at docket number 49 . SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/8/2021) (va)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. On January 22, 2021, the Court ordered counsel to provide an update regarding the status of the case by February 22. (See dkt. no. 40.) Nothing was ever filed. Accordingly, counsel shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than April 2, 2021 of the status of the action. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of the case, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/26/21) (yv)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Counsel shall confer and inform Judge Preska by letter no later than October 9, 2020 of the status of the action/remaining claims/defendants. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of the case, without prejudice for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/29/2020) (va)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.M.S. Hussar, Inc. v. The Unidentified
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?