Digwamaje, et al v. IBM Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, William Ngobeni, Moeketsi Thejane, Dorothy Molefi, Thami Zitha, Edward Thepelo Tshimako, Clement Hlongwane, Ndumani Masuku, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, John Lucas Ngobeni, Rahaba Mokgothu, Gladys Mokgoro, William Daniel Peters, Tozamile Botha, Sefuba Sidzumo, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, Masegale Monnapula, Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, Anna Lebese, Selby Semela, Hermina Digwamaje, Mirriam Mzamo, Clifford Masuku, Jongani Hutchinson, Ezekiel Oupa Masuku, Mpumelelo Cilibe, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Jonathan Makhudu Lediga, Hans Langford Phiri, David Motsumi, James Michael Tamboer, Thabo Masuku, Lindiwe Leinana and Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo
Defendant: Nissan Motors, Goldco, Bank of America, Unilever, International Nickel Company, BankAmerica Corporation, Daimler AG, Motorola, American Cyanamid Company, General Electric Corporation, Novartis, Toshiba America, Inc., B.F. Goodrich, Honeywell International, Inc., Rio Tinto, Exxon Corp., Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc., Ashland Oil, IBM Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Dupont, Citicorp/Citibank, Pfizer, Inc., Nestle Co., General Motors, Deere & Co., Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, Nissan North America Inc., NatWest Bank, Chevron Texaco Corporation, Commerzbank AG, Hewlett-Packard Corporation, Eli Lilly, Coca-Cola, Co., America's Holdings Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company/3M Company, Acco Corporation, Daimler Chrysler AG, Corporate Does Nos. 1-100, Pepsico, Inc., Newmont Mining Corporation, British Petroleum, Ford Motor Corporation, Phillip Morris, Xerox Corp., Credit Suisse Group, Standard Chartered Bank, GoldFields, FalconBridge, Kennecott Minerals Company, SmithKline Beecham PLC, UBS AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Phelps Dodge, Royal Dutch/Shell Group, INCO, Weisser's Sporting Goods, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Inc., Total SA, Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company, Dresser Industries, Inc., Dresdner Bank AG, Proctor & Gamble, Barclays Bank PLC, DeBeers Corporation, Fujitsu, Mobil Corporation, Dow chemical (Union Carbide), Coleman Company, Inc., USX Corporation and, Reckitt & Colman, Inc., Sara Lee Corporation, Raytheon, Shell Oil Company, Credit Lyonnais, Kimberly-Clark, Rothmans, Inc., Ompania Hulera Goodyear, Kaiser Aluminum Corporation (OTCBB:KLUCQ), Johnson & Johnson, Banque Indosuez, Alcan Inc., Texaco, Inc., United States Steel Corp, Merck & Co., Fluor Corporation, Anglo-American PLC, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., National Car Register and Unisys
Petitioner: Morgan Stanley, DaimlerChrysler North America Holding Corporation, Fujitsu Limited and Siemens AG doing business as Siemens Corporation
Case Number: 1:2002cv06218
Filed: August 2, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Shira A Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2015 Filing 213 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (165 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (121 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, (202 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (46 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (114 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Daimler AG, (164 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, (112 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Fujitsu, Ltd., Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corportion, (200 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Fujitsu Ltd., International Business Machines Corporation, Ford Motor Company, (45 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, (122 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG USCA Case Number 14-4104(L). The appeals in the above captioned case from an order of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York was argued on the district courts record and the parties' briefs. Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the August 28, 2014 order of the district court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 09/22/2015. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(nd)
September 25, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files (ONLY) for (9 in 1:02-cv-10062-SAS, 171 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 16 in 1:03-cv-01749-SAS, 93 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 12 in 1:04-cv-05381-SAS, 9 in 1:04-cv-02034-SAS, 8 in 1:04-cv-01075-SAS, 284 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 12 in 1:03-cv-01025-SAS, 10 in 1:03-cv-01023-SAS, 10 in 1:03-cv-01026-SAS, 212 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Tozamile Botha, Lungisile Ntesebeza, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, Mpumelelo Cilibe, Lungislie Ntsebeza, William Daniel Peters, Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, James Michael Tamboer, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Mirriam Mzamo, Sigquibo Mpendulo, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Hans Langford Phiri, Dorothy Molefi, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Nothini Betty Dyonashe were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS et al.(tp)
September 25, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (9 in 1:02-cv-10062-SAS, 171 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 16 in 1:03-cv-01749-SAS, 93 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 12 in 1:04-cv-05381-SAS, 9 in 1:04-cv-02034-SAS, 8 in 1:04-cv-01075-SAS, 284 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 12 in 1:03-cv-01025-SAS, 10 in 1:03-cv-01023-SAS, 10 in 1:03-cv-01026-SAS, 212 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS et al. (tp)
September 24, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (282 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,. Document filed by Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntesebeza, Tozamile Botha, Mpumelelo Cilibe, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Mirriam Mzamo, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, Lungislie Ntsebeza, William Daniel Peters, Hans Langford Phiri, Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, James Michael Tamboer, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Sigquibo Mpendulo, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntsebeza. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10137100. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS et al.(Sammons, Diane)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 OPINION AND ORDER #104677 re: (272 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. filed by Sakwe Balintulo, Lungisile Ntzebesa, (159 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. filed by Sakwe Balintulo, (84 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 203 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 273 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 162 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 160 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. filed by Sakwe Balintulo, Lungislie Ntsebeza, (202 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. filed by Lungislie Ntsebeza, (161 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. filed by Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungisile Ntsebeza. For these reasons, plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend their complaints is DENIED. All remaining claims against Ford and IBM are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion and these cases. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(lmb) Modified on 9/4/2014 (ca).
August 8, 2014 Filing 210 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Diane E. Sammons, Esq. dated August 8, 2014 re: Proposed Consolidated Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Lungisile Ntesebeza, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntsebeza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consolidated Second Amended Complaint)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS et al.(Sammons, Diane)
August 8, 2014 Filing 209 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Kristen M. Ward dated 08/08/2014 re: Proposed Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS et al.(Ward, Kristen)
July 11, 2014 Filing 208 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (84 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 203 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 273 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 162 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 160 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. . Document filed by Lungisile Ntesebeza, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Sakwe Balintulo, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Sakwe Balintulo, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Lungisile Ntsebeza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS et al.(Sammons, Diane)
June 27, 2014 Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (84 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 203 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 273 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 162 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 160 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. . Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hacker, Jonathan)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting (164) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:02-cv-04712-SAS; granting (205) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:02-cv-06218-SAS; granting (275) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:02-md-01499-SAS; granting (86) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:03-cv-01024-SAS; granting (162) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:03-cv-04524-SAS. Defendants IBM's and Ford Motor Company's request is hereby granted. Defendants must serve and file their response by June 27, 2014. No further extensions will be granted. Responses due by 6/27/2014. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/3/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS (lmb)
June 3, 2014 Filing 205 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiffs' motion for leave to file amended complaints addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Keith R. Hummel dated June 3, 2014. Document filed by IBM Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, International Business Machines Corportion.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hummel, Keith)
June 2, 2014 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (160 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. . Document filed by Lungislie Ntsebeza, Sakwe Balintulo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Sammons, Diane)
June 2, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Lungislie Ntsebeza, Sakwe Balintulo.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Sammons, Diane)
June 2, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Jay Jacob Rice to RE-FILE Document (272 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. (159 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. (83 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. (202 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. (161 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(db)
May 30, 2014 Filing 202 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Lungislie Ntsebeza. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Service)(Rice, Jay) Modified on 6/2/2014 (db).
May 9, 2014 Filing 201 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Kristen M. Ward dated 05/09/2014 re: Request for Extension. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Ward, Kristen)
May 7, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mark David McPherson on behalf of Fujitsu Limited, Fujitsu Ltd., Fujitsu, Ltd.. New Address: Morrison & Foerster LLP, 250 West 55th Street, New York, NY, 10019,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(McPherson, Mark)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 OPINION AND ORDER 104236 re: (153 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 152 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 264 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 195 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute filed by Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, (263 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 75 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 194 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute filed by Sakwe Balintulo. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs motion for an order finding that corporations may be held liable under the ATS is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may move for leave to file an amended complaint against the remaining American defendants. In that motion plaintiffs must make a preliminary showing that they can plausibly plead that those defendants engaged in actions that touch and concern the United States with sufficient force to overcome the presumption against the extraterritorial reach of the ATS, and that those defendants acted not only with knowledge but with the purpose to aid and abet the South African regimes tortious conduct as alleged in these complaints. Plaintiffs motion and supporting papers must be served no later than May 15, 2014, defendants response shall be served by June 12, 2014, and plaintiffs reply shall be served by June 26, 2014. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. Nos. 263 and 264). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/17/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ajs) (Main Document 268 replaced on 4/17/2014) (tro). Modified on 4/24/2014 (nt).
February 28, 2014 Filing 198 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (152 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute.. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Ward, Kristen)
February 14, 2014 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (152 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hacker, Jonathan)
January 27, 2014 Filing 196 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (152 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute.. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Ward, Kristen)
January 27, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Ward, Kristen)
January 27, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Kristen Marie Ward to RE-FILE Document (263 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 75 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 151 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 194 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(db)
January 24, 2014 Filing 194 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for an Order Finding Corporate Liability Under the Alien Tort Statute. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Ward, Kristen) Modified on 1/27/2014 (db).
January 23, 2014 Filing 193 RULE 54(b) CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated January 17, 2014, there is no just reason for delay, final judgment is entered dismissing the claims against defendants Daimler AG and Rheinmettal AG pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/23/14) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(ml)
January 17, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (73 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 192 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 261 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 149 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 150 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(cd)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: For the reason stated in my December 26, 2013 order, and by consent of the parties, the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a final judgment dismissing claims against defendants Daimler AG and Rheinmettal AG pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(cd)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: Based on the arguments submitted in the letters summarized above, I conclude that it is appropriate to provide plaintiffs an opportunity to brief the issue of whether a corporation may be liable for a violation of the ATS. I reach this conclusion based on the Second Circuit's recent decision in Licci to refer the issue of corporate liability under the ATS to the district court, despite the Second Circuit's 2010 decision in Kiobel. Because I also conclude that plaintiffs have failed to show that they could plausibly plead that the actions of Daimler or Rhinematall-the foreign defendants-touch and concern the United States with sufficient force to rebut the presumption against the extraterritorial reach of the ATS, these defendants are hereby DISMISSED, and as further set forth in this document. Plaintiffs' motion and supporting papers on corporate liability under the ATS shall be served no later than January 24,2014, defendants' response shall be served by February 14, 2014, and plaintiffs' reply shall be served by February 28,2014. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/26/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(cd)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Re: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF STEIG D. OLSON granting (144) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steig Olson terminated in case 1:02-cv-04712-SAS; granting (186) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steig Olson terminated in case 1:02-cv-06218-SAS; granting (241) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steig Olson terminated in case 1:02-md-01499-SAS; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steig Olson terminated in case 1:03-cv-01024-SAS; granting (143) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steig Olson terminated in case 1:03-cv-04524-SAS. Motion granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion in the following cases: 02MD1499; 02 Civ. 4712; 02 Civ. 6218; 03 Civ. 1024; 03 Civ. 4524. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS (mt)
November 7, 2013 Filing 189 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 09-2778-cv(L), 09-2779-cv; 09-2780-cv; 09-2781-cv; 09-2783-cv; 09-2785-cv; 09-2787-cv; 09-2792-cv; 09-2801-cv; 09-3037-cv. The question presented is whether to issue a writ of mandamus to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (Shira A. Scheindlin, Judge) to resolve in the defendants' favor these proposed class-action suits brought under the Alien Tort Statute ("ATS"), 28 U.S.C. 1350, on behalf of those harmed by the decades-long South African legal regime known as "apartheid." The plaintiffs seek damages for violations of customary international law committed by the South African government, allegedly aided and abetted by the South African subsidiary companies of the named corporate defendants-Daimler, Ford, and IBM. In short, the plaintiffs claim that these subsidiary companies sold cars and computers to the South African government, thus making the defendants, their parent companies, liable for the apartheid regime's innumerable race-based depredations and injustices, including rape, torture, and extrajudicial killings. Although the plaintiffs did not claim that any of the South African government's alleged violations of the law of nations occurred in the United States, at the time they flied their complaint they assumed (as did most American courts) that no such geographical connection was necessary. Based on the same assumption, the District Court denied the defendants' motion to dismiss, which had asserted various grounds for dismissal, including that claims brought under the ATS cannot be based on "extraterritorial" conduct-i.e., conduct that occurred in the territory of a sovereign other than the United States. The District Court denied a motion to certify an interlocutory appeal, and the defendants thereupon sought immediate appellate review through a writ of mandamus and by invocation of the "collateral order" doctrine. This putative appeal, held in abeyance pending a decision by the Supreme Court that was not issued until 2013, and now pending for four years, involves challenging and important questions regarding the immediate appealability of certain orders in cases brought under the Alien Tort Statute, where the United States government has informed the district court that the ongoing litigation substantially threatens American foreign policy. We no longer need to answer those questions, however, because all of the underlying claims are plainly barred by the recent opinion of the Supreme Court in Kiobel v. Royal Dutch Petroleum Co., 133 S. Ct. 1659 (2013), which held that federal courts may not, under the ATS, recognize common-law causes of action for conduct occurring in the territory of another sovereign. Id at 1668-69. Because that decision provides a sufficient ground for dismissing all of the remaining claims, we deny mandamus relief. For the same reason, we conclude that the interests of judicial economy, and of the parties, are best served by holding this putative appeal in abeyance and enabling the District Court to consider a motion to dismiss the plaintiffs' remaining claims. The parties can then inform this Court, when appropriate, whether this appeal has been rendered moot. Accordingly, the petition for a writ of mandamus is DENIED; the stay on proceedings in the District Court is VACATED; and any appellate jurisdiction that this Court may have pursuant to the collateral order doctrine is held in abeyance. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/07/2013. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(nd)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND CONSENT FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED, by and among Daimler AG, Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, and Arnold & Porter LLP, that Arnold & Porter LLP may be substituted in the place and stead of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP as the attorneys of record for Defendant Daimler AG in the above-captioned consolidated actions. Arnold & Porter LLP is already counsel of record for Daimler AG in the Court of Appeals. Daimler AG is filing this stipulation at this time to formalize its representation of Daimler AG in this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/27/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(ama)
September 23, 2013 Filing 187 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Jeffrey Khadpe on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Khadpe, Marc)
September 20, 2013 Filing 186 MOTION for Steig D. Olson to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo, Dennis Vincent Frederick Brutus, Mark Fransch, Elsie Gishi, Lesiba Kekana, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Archington Madondo, Alfred Masemola, Michael Mbele, Catherine Mlangeni, Mamosadi Mlangeni, Reuben Mphela, Thulani Nunu, Thandiwe Shezi, Thobile Sikani.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hausfeld, Michael)
August 29, 2013 Filing 185 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hacker, Jonathan)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER ADMITTING DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. The following attorney is granted admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned matter: Jonathan D. Hacker. Attorney Jonathan D. Hacker for Ford Motor Company,Jonathan D. Hacker for Ford Motor Corporation,Jonathan D. Hacker for Ford Motor Company, Inc.,Jonathan D. Hacker for Ford Motor Company,Jonathan D. Hacker for Ford Motor Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/26/2013) (rsh)
April 4, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Judith Brown Chomsky to E-MAIL the PDF for Document 16 Amended Complaint,, to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (laq)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF MICHAEL GERARD, ESQ. Upon consideration of the request to withdraw by Michael Gerard, Esq., this Court orders that Michael Gerard, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Mr. Gerard be removed from the Court's electronic service list. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF MICHAEL GERARD, ESQ.: Upon consideration of the request to withdraw by Michael Gerard, Esq., this Court orders that Michael Gerard, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Mr. Gerard be removed from the Court's electronic service list., Attorney Michael Gerard terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/18/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(pl)
September 16, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Corporation. (Walsh, Michael)
August 20, 2010 Filing 180 NOTICE of Withdrawal. Document filed by Ford Motor Company. (Florence, Justin)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION: For the aforementioned reasons, defendants' motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal on the issue of corporate liability is denied. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close this motion (02 MDL 1499, No. 219; 02 Civ. 4712, No. 132; 02 Civ. 6218, No. 174; 03 Civ. 1024, No. 55; and 03 Civ. 4524, No. 129). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/31/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(jpo)
December 28, 2009 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (129 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 174 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 219 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 132 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 55 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Daimler AG, Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Florence, Justin)
December 28, 2009 Filing 177 DECLARATION of Sri Srinivasan in Support re: (129 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 174 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 219 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 132 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 55 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Daimler AG, Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Florence, Justin)
December 23, 2009 Filing 176 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Sri Srinivasan in Support re: (129 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Florence, Justin) Modified on 12/29/2009 (jar).
December 23, 2009 Filing 175 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (129 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Florence, Justin) Modified on 12/29/2009 (jar).
December 23, 2009 Filing 174 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, International Business Machines Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Florence, Justin)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (165 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (121 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, (202 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (46 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (114 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Daimler AG, (164 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, (112 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Fujitsu, Ltd., Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corportion, (200 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Fujitsu Ltd., International Business Machines Corporation, Ford Motor Company, (45 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, (122 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG USCA Case Number 09-2778-cv(L), 09-2780-cv(con), 09-2787-cv(con), 09-3037-cv(con), 09-2785-cv(con), 09-2801-cv(con), 09-2779-cv(con), 09-2781-cv(con), 09-2783-cv(con), 09-2792-cv(con). These consolidated cases come to us as a continuation of litigation on which this Court and the District Court have already spoken at length. See In re South African Apartheid Litig., 346 F. Supp. 2d 538 (S.D.N.Y. 2004), aff`d in part, vacated in part, Khulumani v. Barclay Nat`l Bank Ltd., 504 F.3d 254 (2d Cir. 2007), aff`d for want of a quorum, Am. Isuzu Motors v. Ntsebeza, 128 S. Ct. 2424 (2008), on remand, In re South African Apartheid Litig., 617 F. Supp. 2d 228 (S.D.N.Y. 2009). Pending before us are (1) plaintiffs-appellees` ("plaintiffs") motion for a 30-day extension of time to file their responsive (red) brief and appendix; (2) defendants-appellants` ("defendants") motion to stay all proceedings in the District Court pending resolution of their appeal; (3) defendants` motion for an expedited appeal; and (4) plaintiffs` motion to dismiss the appeal as untimely and non-final. We resolve those motions as follows: (i) Plaintiffs` motion for an extension of time is GRANTED, but filings will be made in accordance with the schedule set forth in this Order. (ii) Defendants` motion for an expedited appeal is GRANTED, and the appeal will proceed as follows: (a) Plaintiffs` brief and appendix will be filed on or before October 14, 2009. (b) Defendants` reply brief will be filed on or before October 28, 2009. (c) All amici briefs and statements of interest will be filed on or before October 14, 2009. (d) Argument will be heard on Monday, January 11, 2010, at 9:30 a.m. (iii) Defendants` motion to stay all proceedings in the District Court during the pendency of this appeal is GRANTED. (iv) Plaintiffs` motion to dismiss the appeal is deemed submitted for decision by this panel, as the merits panel, in due course after further briefing. We note that in Khulumani, statements of interest were filed by the United States and the Republic of South Africa and that other nations, including the United Kingdom, Canada and Germany, expressed their views to the United States Department of State. We invite those countries, to the extent appropriate or necessary, to express their views on the current state of this litigation and, specifically, the allegations in plaintiffs` amended complaints. Finally, we invite any amici in the Khulumani appeal to submit amici briefs focusing specifically on the allegations in plaintiffs` amended complaints. We invite the parties, in their remaining briefing, to address, inter alia, the following question: What significance, or relative weight, should we attribute to statements of interest submitted by private parties, as opposed to the governments of sovereign states? We also invite the parties to supplement their arguments with respect to plaintiffs` motion to dismiss the appeal, particularly (1) whether defendants` motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal can be deemed a valid notice of appeal and (2) whether the notion of "case-specific deference" described by the Supreme Court in Sosa v. Alvarez-Machain, 542 U.S. 692, 733 n.21 (2004), justifies applying the collateral order doctrine to defendants` appeal. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 9/10/2009. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(nd)
August 10, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (214 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 172 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 53 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 130 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS(rjm)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Adam Coates for Ford Motor Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS(rjm)
August 6, 2009 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: (213 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 171 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 124 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 129 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) USCA Order,,,,,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(nd)
August 6, 2009 Filing 171 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to (165 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (121 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, (202 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (46 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG, (114 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Daimler AG, (164 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, (112 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Fujitsu, Ltd., Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corportion, (200 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Fujitsu Ltd., International Business Machines Corporation, Ford Motor Company, (45 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, (122 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG USCA Case Number 09-2778-cv(L), 09-2780-cv, 09-2787, 09-3037, 09-2785, 09-2801, 09-2779, 09-2781, 09-2783, 09-2792. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellants are granted a temporary stay of the District Court proceedings until such time as the motion for stay pending appeal can be heard and resolved by a three-judge panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 8/6/2009. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(nd)
July 29, 2009 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Teena-Ann V. Sankoorikal on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Sankoorikal, Teena-Ann)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER. When plaintiffs filed the cases now consolidated in this multi-district litigation, Edward Davis Fagan was one of plaintiffs' counsel in several actions. Fagan has since been disbarred in both New York and New Jersey, as well as this Court. At plaintiffs' request, the Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Fagan from the docket in each of the above-captioned cases, so that he no longer receives any further communication concerning this matter. Attorney Edward Davis Fagan terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
July 14, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-2783, 09-2792 from the US Court of Appeals, 2nd Circuit assigned to #164 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation, #165 Notice of Appeal, filed by Daimler AG. (nd)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER. On June 25, 2009, defendants in the above-captioned case filed a notice of appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, seeking interlocutory review of this Court's April 8, 2009 Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part defendants' consolidated motion to dismiss these actions in their entirety. On June 30, 2009, defendants wrote to the Court asserting that the Court had been divested of jurisdiction on the basis of defendants' appeal or - in the alternative - requesting that the Court enter a discretionary stay pending resolution of defendants' appeal. "Appeals under the collateral order doctrine do not generally divest the district court of jurisdiction over issues not under consideration in the appeal." An exception to this principle is the dual jurisdiction rule, which divests a district court of jurisdiction immediately upon the filing of a request for interlocutory review under the collateral order doctrine only in cases "respecting a right not to be tried," such as double jeopardy, foreign sovereign immunity, Eleventh Amendment immunity, and qualified immunity. Political question and comity concerns do not convey formal immunity from suit. Therefore the dual jurisdiction rule does not apply, and this Court retains jurisdiction. This case has been pending for over seven years. That alone is a sufficient basis for this Court to deny a discretionary stay while defendants' interlocutory appeal is pending. Defendants' request to suspend proceedings is hereby denied. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/6/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
June 26, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (167 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 48 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 124 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 116 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 204 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF TYLER R. GIANNINI FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Tyler R. Giannini, Esq. is hereby granted admission pro hac vice to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, for the purpose of appearing in this action, pursuant to Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York; Tyler R. Giannini, Esq. is required to abide by and is subject to the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the District of New York; and Tyler R. Giannini, Esq. is required to notify the Court immediately of any matter that affects his standing at the Bar of any court. Attorney Tyler Giannini for Lungisile Ntzebesa, Dorothy Molefi, Themba Mequbela, Sigquibo Mpendulo, admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
June 26, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (115 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 166 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 123 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 47 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 203 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF JUDITH CHOMSKY FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Judith Chomsky, Esq. is hereby granted admission pro hac vice to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, for the purpose of appearing in this action, pursuant to Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York; Judith Chomsky, Esq. is required to abide by and is subject to the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the District of New York; and Judith Chomsky, Esq. is required to notify the Court immediately of any matter that affects his standing at the Bar of any court. Attorney Judith Brown Chomsky for Lungisile Ntzebesa, Dorothy Molefi, Themba Mequbela, Sigquibo Mpendulo admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
June 26, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #165 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
June 26, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #165 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
June 26, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #164 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
June 26, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #164 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
June 25, 2009 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEAL (Received in Night Deposit Box on 6/25/09 at 10:44 PM) from #160 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions, #136 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Daimler AG. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 692776. Copies mailed to attorney(s) of record: OMelveny & Myers LLP; Hausfeld, LLP; Nagel, Rice & Mazie, LLP; Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP; Morrison & Foerster LLP; Schonburn, Desimone, Seplow, Harris & Hoffman; and Cravath, Swine & Moore LLP. (tp)
June 25, 2009 Filing 164 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #136 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 692739. Copies mailed to attorney(s) of record: Nagel, Rice & Mazie, LLP; Schonburn, Desimone, Seplow, Harris & Hoffman; Cravath, Swine & Moore LLP; Jones Day; Hausfeld, LLP; Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Echsner & Proctor, PA; Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP; and Morrison & Foerster LLP. (tp)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER On May 27, 2009, this Court denied defendants' motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal of the April 8, 2009 Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants now move for reconsideration. In a footnote in the May 27 Opinion and Order, I wrote, "If defendants are suggesting that plaintiffs could have brought this suit in South African courts, defendants failed to raise such forum non conveniens or exhaustion arguments in their motion to dismiss and have now waived them. In the context of a motion under 28 U.S.C. l292 (b), this statement denotes waiver of this argument as a ground for certification for interlocutory appeal of the motion to dismiss. To be perfectly clear, these affirmative defenses are not waived as a general matter. Nevertheless, should defendants intend to move for dismissal on forum non conveniens or exhaustion grounds, they must do so at the soonest reasonable time. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close this motion (02 MDL 1499, No. 190; 02 Civ. 4712, No. 118; 02 Civ. 6218, No. 161; 03 Civ. 1024, No. 42; and 03 Civ. 4524, No. 101). SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/15/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(jmi)
June 10, 2009 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (190 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 101 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 118 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 161 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 42 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (180 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 156 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 113 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 37 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 93 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion,,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; (180 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 156 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 113 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 37 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 93 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion,,.. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hirsch, Jerome)
June 10, 2009 Filing 161 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (180 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 156 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 113 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 37 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 93 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Daimler AG, Ford Motor Company, International Business Machines Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hirsch, Jerome)
June 4, 2009 Filing 159 NOTICE of Bankruptcy. Document filed by General Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Chapter 11 Petition)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Tambe, Jayant)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Brian Anderson for Ford Motor Company, Sri Srinivasan for Ford Motor Company and Ford Motor Company, Inc., Matthew M. Shors for Ford Motor Company and Ford Motor Company, Inc., Charles Borden for Ford Motor Company and Ford Motor Company, Inc., Justin Florence for Ford Motor Company and Ford Motor Company, Inc., Anton Metlitsky for Ford Motor Company, Ford Motor Corporation, Ford Motor Company and Ford Motor Company, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/1/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS(jmi)
May 29, 2009 Filing 157 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ford Motor Company.(Walsh, Michael)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER NO. 97580. For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close this motion (02 MDL 1499, No. 143; 02 Civ. 4712, No. 94; 02 Civ. 6218, No. 138; 03 Civ. 1024, No. 19; and 03 Civ. 4524, No. 62)., Motions terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OPINION AND ORDER:#97579 For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal is denied. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close this motion (02 MDL 1499, No. 145; 02 Civ. 4712, No. 96; 02 Civ. 6218, No. 140; 03 Civ. 1024, No. 21; and 03 Civ. 4524, No. 64). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/27/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(jmi) Modified on 6/3/2009 (jab).
May 22, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (rjm)
May 22, 2009 Filing 155 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Brian C. Anderson dated 5/22/09 re: We have just assumed representation of Ford in the above-captioned action and write to request an unopposed one-week extension of time (from May 22, 2009 to May 29, 2009) in which to file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. Ford's time to answer is extended to and including 5/29/09. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/22/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS(rjm)
May 22, 2009 Filing 154 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Related document: Amended Complaint,, filed by Mirriam Mzamo, Tozamile Botha, Hans Langford Phiri, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, Mpumelelo Cilibe, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Dorothy Molefi, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, William Daniel Peters, Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, James Michael Tamboer.(Hummel, Keith)
May 22, 2009 Filing 153 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Daimler AG. Related document: Amended Complaint,, filed by Mirriam Mzamo, Tozamile Botha, Hans Langford Phiri, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, Mpumelelo Cilibe, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Dorothy Molefi, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, William Daniel Peters, Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, James Michael Tamboer.(Hirsch, Jerome)
May 22, 2009 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph N. Sacca on behalf of Daimler AG Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Sacca, Joseph)
May 22, 2009 Filing 151 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Susan L. Saltzstein. Document filed by Daimler AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Saltzstein, Susan)
May 22, 2009 Filing 150 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by General Motors. Related document: Amended Complaint,, filed by Mirriam Mzamo, Tozamile Botha, Hans Langford Phiri, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, Mpumelelo Cilibe, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Dorothy Molefi, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, William Daniel Peters, Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, James Michael Tamboer.(Tambe, Jayant)
May 15, 2009 Filing 149 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (145 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 96 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 140 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 21 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability ("Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Certify The Court's April 8, 2009 Order For Interlocutory Appeal"). MOTION for Certificate of Appealability ("Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Certify The Court's April 8, 2009 Order For Interlocutory Appeal").. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hummel, Keith)
May 15, 2009 Filing 148 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hirsch, Jerome)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close defendant General Motors Corp.'s Motion to Withdraw its prior Motion to Admit Noel J. Francisco Pro Hac Vice (02 MDL 1499, No. 149; 02 Civ. 4712, No. 100; 02 Civ. 6218, No. 144; 03 Civ. 1024, No. 25; 03 Civ. 4524, No. 68). The Motion to Admit has already been closed. Order terminates (100) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:02-cv-04712-SAS; terminating (144) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:02-cv-06218-SAS; terminating (149) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:02-md-01499-SAS; terminating (25) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:03-cv-01024-SAS; terminating (68) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:03-cv-04524-SAS. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/11/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
May 9, 2009 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Sakwe Balintulo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting (98) Motion for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case for Defendants General Motors Corporation. 1:02-cv-04712-SAS; granting (142) Motion for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-06218-SAS; granting (147) Motion for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-md-01499-SAS; granting (23) Motion for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-01024-SAS; granting (66) Motion for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-04524-SAS. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/4/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(jmi)
April 30, 2009 Filing 144 MOTION to Withdraw (66 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS) MOTION for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Document filed by General Motors Corporation, General Motors, General Motors Corporation, General Motors Corp..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Tambe, Jayant)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SCHEDULING ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: The parties will produce initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) no later than June 11, 2009. The parties will serve document requests no later than June 25, 2009. The parties will provide an initial document production no later than August 7, 2009. This initial production must be accompanied by a letter detailing the scope of the production, the good faith efforts taken to produce relevant documents, and the anticipated time-frame for the production of remaining documents. The parties will begin conducting depositions no later than October 2009. The parties are to tailor early-stage discovery to issues relevant to class certification. The parties are to meet and confer as often as necessary in order to achieve this goal. The Court will conduct a status conference on September 24, 2009, at 4:30 p.m. At that time the Court will establish a briefing schedule for plaintiffs anticipated motion for class certification. Status Conference set for 9/24/2009 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/29/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
April 22, 2009 Filing 142 MOTION for Noel J. Francisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by General Motors Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
April 22, 2009 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (145 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 96 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 64 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 140 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 21 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability ("Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Certify The Court's April 8, 2009 Order For Interlocutory Appeal"). MOTION for Certificate of Appealability ("Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Certify The Court's April 8, 2009 Order For Interlocutory Appeal"). (Memorandum In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Certify The Court's April 8, 2009 Order For Interlocutory Appeal"). Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hummel, Keith)
April 22, 2009 Filing 140 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability ("Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Certify The Court's April 8, 2009 Order For Interlocutory Appeal"). Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hummel, Keith)
April 22, 2009 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hummel, Keith)
April 22, 2009 Filing 138 MOTION for Reconsideration re; (141 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 92 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 136 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 61 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 17 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,, ("Notice Of Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration"). Document filed by Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Hummel, Keith)
April 17, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines: General Motors answer due 5/22/2009; Daimler AG answer due 5/22/2009; Ford Motor Company answer due 5/22/2009; International Business Machines Corporation answer due 5/22/2009. (jmi)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER by and between undersigned counsel, that defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including May 22, 2009. No prior request for an extension of time has been made. (Daimler AG answer due 5/22/2009; Ford Motor Company answer due 5/22/2009; International Business Machines Corporation answer due 5/22/2009; General Motors Corporation answer due 5/22/2009) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/17/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS(jmi) Modified on 4/22/2009 (jmi). Modified on 4/22/2009 (jmi).
April 8, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2009. Motion to Dismiss due by 5/1/2009. Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER # 97390. What remains of these consolidated cases is vastly different from the dozen actions first filed in 2002 and 2003. Corporate defendants accused of merely doing business with the apartheid Government of South Africa have been dismissed. Claims that a corporation that aided and abetted particular acts could be liable for the breadth of harms committed under apartheid have been rejected. What survives are much narrower cases that this Court hopes will move toward resolution after more than five years spent litigating motions to dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' motion to re-solicit the views of the Governments is denied. The following claims remain: Ntsebeza plaintiffs against Daimler, GM, and Ford for aiding and abetting torture, CIDT, extrajudicial killing, and apartheid. Ntsebeza plaintiffs against IBM for aiding and abetting arbitrary dentationalization and apartheid. Khulumani plaintiffs against Rheinmetall for aiding and abetting extrajudicial killing and apartheid. The following claims are dismissed with leave to amend: Khulumani plaintiffs against IBM and Fujitsu for aiding and abetting apartheid. Khulumani plaintiffs against Daimler, GM, and Ford for aiding and abetting extrajudicial killing and apartheid. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice, as any amendment would be futile. The Khulumani plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by May 1, 2009. The stay concerning Rheinmetall Group's objections to the exercise of personal jurisdiction and to improper service of process under the Hague Convention is now lifted, and Rheinmetall may file a motion to dismiss on those grounds by May 1, 2009. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions (02 MDL 1499 docket numbers 96, 99, 100, 104, 106, 110, and 115; 02 Civ. 4712 unnumbered; 02 Civ. 6218 unnumbered; 03 Civ. 1024 unnumbered; and 03 Civ. 4524 unnumbered). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/8/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
March 12, 2009 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/26/09 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (original transcript filed in 02cv4712 doc.#91)(ama)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close Khulumani plaintiffs 9/23/04 motion for a status conference (03 Civ. 4524, Docket No. 22) and 10/25/05 motion for admission pro hac vice (03 Civ. 4524, Docket No. 24). Those motions have been resolved. The Clerk is additionally directed to close defendant Sulzer AG's motion to dismiss (02 MD 1499, Docket no. 8). Sulzer AG is no longer a party to this case. See First Amended Complaint (Docket no. 94); Ntsebeza and Digwamaje Consolidated and Amended Complaint (Docket no. 126). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close Sulzer AG's motion to dismiss (Docket no. 8), Schindler Holding AG's motion to dismiss (Docket no. 11), and DaimlerChrysler's motion to quash service and to dismiss (Docket no. 14). Those companies are no longer parties to this case. See First Amended Complaint (Docket no. 94); Ntsebeza and Digwamaje Consolidated and Amended Complaint (Docket no. 126). The Clerk of the Court is also directed to close plaintiffs Ntsebeza and Digwamaje's motion to strike certain documents (Docket no. 57). This motion addresses documents related to a motion to dismiss resolved by memorandum opinion and order on November 29, 2004 (Docket no. 64). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(rjm)
February 5, 2009 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (115 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Solicit Anew the Views of the Governments of the United States and South Africa.. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC, UBS AG, Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, Fujitsu Ltd., General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Barron, Francis)
February 5, 2009 Filing 132 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss. ("Reply Memorandum In Support Of Defendants' Motions To Dismiss"). Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC, UBS AG, Ford Motor Company, Daimler AG, Fujitsu Ltd., General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Declarations and Cited Public Materials--Volume 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Barron, Francis)
January 23, 2009 Filing 131 DECLARATION of RONALD C SLYE in Opposition re: (104 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (110 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (100 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (96 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM., (99 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Dennis Vincent Frederick Brutus, Mark Fransch, Elsie Gishi, Lesiba Kekana, Archington Madondo, Michael Mbele, Reuben Mphela, Thulani Nunu, Thandiwe Shezi, Thobile Sikani, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Archinton Madondo, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Catherine Mlangeni, Alfred Masemola, Khulumani, Sakwe Balintulo, Mark Fransch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Slye Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Slye Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Slye Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Slye Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig)
January 23, 2009 Filing 130 DECLARATION of BETH STEPHENS in Opposition re: (104 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (110 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (100 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (96 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM., (99 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Dennis Vincent Frederick Brutus, Mark Fransch, Elsie Gishi, Lesiba Kekana, Archington Madondo, Michael Mbele, Reuben Mphela, Thulani Nunu, Thandiwe Shezi, Thobile Sikani, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Archinton Madondo, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Catherine Mlangeni, Alfred Masemola, Khulumani, Sakwe Balintulo, Mark Fransch. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig)
January 23, 2009 Filing 129 DECLARATION of Ralph G Steinhardt in Opposition re: (104 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (110 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (100 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (96 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM., (99 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Dennis Vincent Frederick Brutus, Mark Fransch, Elsie Gishi, Lesiba Kekana, Archington Madondo, Michael Mbele, Mamosadi Mlangeni, Reuben Mphela, Thulani Nunu, Thandiwe Shezi, Thobile Sikani, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Archinton Madondo, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Catherine Mlangeni, Alfred Masemola, Khulumani, Sakwe Balintulo, Mark Fransch. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig)
January 23, 2009 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (104 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (96 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM., (99 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (110 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (100 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungisile Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Dorothy Molefi, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Dennis Vincent Frederick Brutus, Mark Fransch, Elsie Gishi, Lesiba Kekana, Archington Madondo, Michael Mbele, Thulani Nunu, Thandiwe Shezi, Thobile Sikani, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntzebesa, Lungislie Ntsebeza, Dorothy Molefi, Archinton Madondo, Sakwe Balintulo Khulumani, Alfred Masemola, Khulumani, Sakwe Balintulo, Mark Fransch, Dennis Vincent Dennis Vincent Frederick Brutus. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Part 3, #4 Appendix Pat 4, #5 Appendix Part 5, #6 Appendix Part 6, #7 Appendix Part 7, #8 Appendix Part 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig)
January 22, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Steig Olson to RE-FILE Document (127 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 52 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 118 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 82 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 8 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,. ERROR(S): Appendixes cannot be filed individually, they must be filed as attachments to the document they support. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(jar)
January 22, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Steig Olson to RE-FILE Document (7 in 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 126 in 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 81 in 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 51 in 1:03-cv-04524-SAS, 117 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): (1) Each Declaration must be file individually. Use the event type Declaration in Support found under event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. (2) Select all filers associated with the document filed by holding down the "ctrl" key and selecting each individual name. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(jar)
January 22, 2009 Filing 127 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RESPONSE in Opposition re: (104 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (110 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (100 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (96 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM., (99 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' APPENDIX of Materials Cited in Opposition Brief. Document filed by Khulumani. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 3, #4 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 4, #5 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 5, #6 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 6, #7 Appendix Plaintiffs' Appendix Part 7)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig) Modified on 1/23/2009 (jar).
January 22, 2009 Filing 126 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (104 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (110 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (100 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., (106 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., MOTION to Dismiss., (96 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM., (99 in 1:02-md-01499-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Khulumani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ralph G Steinhardt, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Beth Stephens, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald C Slye Part 1, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald C Slye Part 2, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald C Slye Part 3, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald C Slye Part 4, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald C Slye Part 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-md-01499-SAS, 1:02-cv-04712-SAS, 1:02-cv-06218-SAS, 1:03-cv-01024-SAS, 1:03-cv-04524-SAS(Olson, Steig) Modified on 1/23/2009 (jar).
January 13, 2009 Case Designated ECF. (rjm)
January 13, 2009 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:02-md-01499-SAS. (rjm)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The parties, through their respective counsel, subject to the Court's approval, hereby stipulate and agree as follows: 1. The above-captioned consolidated actions shall be referred to the Court's Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") system, and the undersigned hereby consent to the electronic service and filing of all papers. 2. The parties agree to comply with the Court's rules regarding ECF. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall enable ECF in the above-captioned actions. 4. The counsel of record listed in this stipulation and order (including counsel admitted counsel pro hac vice) shall receive ECF notification of all filings in these actions. 5. This Stipulation and Order may be executed in several counterparts, each of which shall serve as an original as against any party who signed it, and all of which taken together shall constitute one and the same document. This Document relates to 02md1499, 02-4712, 02-6218, 03-1024, 03-4524. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/12/09) (rjm)
December 23, 2008 Filing 124 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Judge John E. Sprizzo is no longer assigned to the case. (ama)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John E. Sprizzo from Marc J. Gottridge dated 12/3/08 re: We represent defendant Barclays Bank PLC ("Barclays") in the above-referenced actions. The docket sheets list Gary Lee, as well as myself, as co-counsel of record for Barclays. Mr. Lee, however, is no longer with our firm and he should therefore be removed from the Court's records as counsel for Barclays. The Clerk's office has advised us hat it is necessary for Your Honor to order that Mr. Lee be removed from the docket as one of the counsel of record for Barclays. We therefore respectfully request that the Court "so order" this letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Peter K. Leisure, for Judge John E. Sprizzo on 12/9/08) (db) Modified on 12/11/2008 (db). Modified on 12/11/2008 (db).
December 8, 2008 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC, Fujitsu Limited. Original filed in 02md1499, document # 111. (db)
December 8, 2008 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Fujitsu Limited, Barclays Bank PLC. Original filed in 02md1499, document # 110.(db)
October 27, 2008 NTSEBEZA AND DIGWAMAJE CONSOLIDATED AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barclays Bank PLC, Ford Motor Company, Corporate Does 1-100, Daimler AG, General Motors Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. Document filed by Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko, Tozamile Botha, Mpumelelo Cilibe, William Daniel Peters, Samuel Zoyisile Mali, Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela, James Michael Tamboer, Nothini Betty Dyonashe, Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka, Hans Langford Phiri, Mirriam Mzamo, Dorothy Molefi, Lungisile Ntzebesa. Relates to 02md1499, 03-1024, 02-6218, 02-4712. Entered as Doc. No. 126 in 02md1499. (rjm)
September 23, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #122 Order,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (rjm)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney John E. Hall for Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company/3M Company, Fuad Rana for Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company/3M Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. Relates to 02md1499, 02-6218. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 9/22/08) (rjm)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Attorney John E. Hall for Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company/3M Company, Fuad Rana for Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company/3M Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 9/22/08) (mme)
June 8, 2005 Opinion or Order ORDER Supplementing Record that the letter to the COurt from Minister Penuell Maduna, MP, of the Ministry of Justice and Constitutional Development of the Republic of South Africa, dated 9/11/2003, a copy of which is annexed hereto as Exhibit A. is deemed part of the record in these actions.(signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 6/6/2005 (jsa, )
April 6, 2005 Opinion or Order SUMMARY ORDER;...that, based on the foregoing, plaintiffs' request for permission to file a motion to file an amended and consolidated complaint shall be and hereby is denied. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 3/31/05); (orig. docmt dktd in case no. 02 MDL 1499, docmt #71) (djc, )
April 6, 2005 Opinion or Order SUMMARY ORDER; based on the foregoing, there is no just reason to delay appeal of the Opinion; the Rule 54(b) certification contained in the Opinion shall be and hereby is deemed amended by this Order (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 3/31/05); Orig. docmt dktd imn acse no 02 MDL 1499, docmt #70) (djc, )
February 7, 2005 AMENDED JUDGMENT amending 119 Clerk's Judgment,as to caption only, and that deft's motion to dismiss is granted,and there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to FRCP 54b, the complaints are dismissed as against defendant parties to motion (Orig. filed in case no 02 MDL 1499 (JES) as doc. # 68). (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 2/7/05) (ml, )
December 30, 2004 Filing 120 NOTICE of of Firm change of Address. Document filed by General Electric Corporation. (pl, )
December 23, 2004 Opinion or Order ORDER SUPPLEMENTING RECORD that the letters to the Court from Francis P. Barron of Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP dtd 10/24/04, 12/4/03, 1/12/04 and 7/8/04, copies of which are annexed hereto as Exhibits A-D, respectively, are deemed part of the record in this action. This Document relates to 02-4712, 02-6218, 02-10062, 03-1023, 03-1024, 03-1025, 03-1026, 03-1027, 03-1749, 03-4524. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 12/21/04))Original document filed in case # 02md1499, document #66.
November 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion(90928) and Order dated November 29, 2004, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted and there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to FRCP 54b, the complaints are dismissed as against defendants party to the motion. (Signed by Judge J. Michael McMahon on 11/30/04) (jf, )
November 29, 2004 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 90928; The Court grants Defendants' Motion to Dismiss each of plaintiffs' claims. Since the Court finds that there is no just reason for delay in the appeal of this issue, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment dismissing the Complaints as against defendants to this motion purs. to FRCP 54(b). (Orig. doc. filed in case no. MDL No. 1499, as doc. #64) (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 11/29/04) (ae, ) Modified on 12/6/2004 (ae, ).
October 1, 2004 Filing 118 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name: Shea & Gardner will now be under the name Goodwin Procter, LLP. Document filed by General Electric Corporation. (jp, )
August 16, 2004 REPLY to the Khulumani Submission of Supplemental Authority, the Defendants' 7/8/2004 Letter Response and the Khulumani 7/22/2004 Reply. Document filed by Hermina Digwamaje. Original document filed in case no. 02md1499, doc. #62.(kkc, )
March 23, 2004 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 117 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (kw, )
March 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Kristofor T. Henning to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 96 Motion for John F. Schultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 96 Motion for Michael J. Holston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 3/18/04) (kw, )
December 31, 2003 MOTION to Strike the Declaration by Dr. Penuell Mpapa Maduna and submissions on behalf of the South African Government. Document filed by Hermina Digwamaje. Original document filed under case no. 02 MDL 1499, doc. # 57. (kkc, )
December 29, 2003 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response, Response served on Counsel as indicated on Service List on 12/23/2003. Service was made by Federal Express and Mail. Document filed by Hermina Digwamaje. Original document filed under case no. 02 MDL 1499, Doc. #55. (kkc, )
December 29, 2003 RESPONSE to Khulumani's Response to Statement of Interest and Notice of Correction. Document filed by Hermina Digwamaje. Original document filed under case no. 02 MDL 1499, Doc. #54. (kkc, )
December 29, 2003 RESPONSE to Statement of Interest of U.S. Government. Document filed by Hermina Digwamaje. Original document filed under case no. 02 MDL 1499, Doc. #53. (kkc, )
October 27, 2003 Memorandum of Law in support of pro hac vice admission of Dumisa Buhle Ntsebeza, John Ngcebetsha, Gugu Oscar Madlanga, Medi Mokuena. Original document filed in case #02cv4712, document #70. (dle) Modified on 11/07/2003
October 27, 2003 Filing 116 NOTICE OF MOTION by Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Lindiwe Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, David Motsumi, David Motsumi, Moeketsi Thejane, Moeketsi Thejane, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Gladys Mokgoro, Jongani Hutchinson, Sefuba Sidzumo, Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso, Edward Thepelo Tshimako, Rahaba Mokgothu, Jonathan Makhudu Lediga, Anna Lebese, Anna Lebese, William Ngobeni, John Lucas Ngobeni, Clement Hlongwane, Masegale Monnapula, Thami Zitha, Selby Semela, Ezekiel Oupa Masuku, Ezekiel Oupa Masuku for an order allowing the admission of Medi Moira Mokuena as attorney pro hac vice to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel for plaintiffs Digwamaje, et al . Return Date not indicated. (dle)
October 9, 2003 DECLARATION (This Document relates to 02-4712 and 02-6218) of Neil Merkl by Natwest Bank PLC in support of the Consent Order for Substitution of Attorney. ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ENTERED IN CASE 02 MDL 1499, DOC. #47. (tp)
October 9, 2003 Opinion or Order CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER, (This Document relates to 02-4712 and 02-6218) That Lord Bissell & Brook LLP be submitted as attorneys of record for Defendant National Westminster Bank Plc in the captioned actions 02cv4712 & 02cv6218, in place of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP as of the date hereof . ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ENTERED IN CASE 02 MDL 1499, DOC. #46. (tp)
October 1, 2003 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in opposition to Defendants' joint motion to dismiss. Original filed in case 02cv4712, doc #66. (jco)
October 1, 2003 Certification of Diane E. Sammons, Esq. Original filed in case 02cv4712, doc#65. (jco)
September 30, 2003 Terminated document 34-1 pursuant to instructions of Judge Sprizzo as indicated on the CJRA report. (rag)
September 11, 2003 Filing 114 PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss; (orig. docmt dktd in case no. 02 cv 4712, docmt #64); (djc)
August 5, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [113-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 8/5/03 Receipt # 481177. (sb)
July 22, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting [83-1] motion for an order for Susan Kearns to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Honeywell Int'l ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); forwarded orig doc to the Atty Admissions Clerk (cd)
July 18, 2003 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bristol-Meyers in support of [108-1] motion to dismiss the Digwamaje complaint as against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (kw)
July 18, 2003 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION by Bristol-Meyers, to dismiss the Digwamaje complaint as against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company . No Return Date. (kw)
July 18, 2003 Filing 107 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Bristol-Meyers. (kw)
July 15, 2003 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bristol-Meyers in support of [105-1] motion for an Order dismissing all of the plaintiffs' claims against BMS in this action with prejudice . (yv)
July 15, 2003 Filing 105 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION by Bristol-Meyers for an Order dismissing all of the plaintiffs' claims against BMS in this action with prejudice . Return Date not indicated. (yv) Modified on 07/17/2003
July 15, 2003 Filing 104 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Bristol-Meyers . (yv)
July 15, 2003 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Coca-Cola, Co. in support of [102-1] motion for an Order pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), dismissing all claims against TCCC in this action in their entirety, and with prejudice. (jco)
July 15, 2003 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION by Coca-Cola, Co.; for an Order pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), dismissing all claims against TCCC in this action in their entirety, and with prejudice . Return Date not indicated. (jco)
July 15, 2003 Filing 101 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Coca-Cola, Co. (jco)
July 15, 2003 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by General Electric in support of [93-1] motion to dismiss the complaint with prejudice . (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION by General Electric to dismiss the complaint with prejudice ; Return Date 11/6/03 at 2:00. (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 92 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by General Electric . (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 91 NOTICE OF MOTION by Chevron Texaco Corp. to dismiss the action with prejudice ; Return Date 11/6/03 at 2:00. (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by General Motors in support of [89-1] motion to dismiss the Digwamaje Action . (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by General Motors to dismiss the Digwamaje Action ; Return Date 2:00 11/6/03 (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 88 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Chevron Texaco Corp. . (cd)
July 15, 2003 Filing 87 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by General Motors . (cd)
July 14, 2003 Filing 112 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dupont, Xerox Corp. in support of their motion to dismiss the Digwamaje Action. Received in the night deposit box on 7/14/03 at 9:17 p.m. (sb) Modified on 07/21/2003
July 14, 2003 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Colgate-Palmolive in support of [110-1] motion for an order dismissing all claims against Colgate in their entirety and with prejudice. Received in the night deposit box on 7/14/03 at 5:19 p.m. (sb)
July 14, 2003 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Colgate-Palmolive for an order dismissing all claims against Colgate in their entirety and with prejudice . Return Date 11/6/03 at 2:00. Received in the night deposit box on 7/14/03 at 5:19 p.m. (sb)
July 14, 2003 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. Holston by Hewlett-Packard in support of [96-1] motion for Kristofor T. Henning to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for John F. Schultz to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for Michael J. Holston to appear pro hac vice . (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT of John F.Schultz by Hewlett-Packard in support of [96-1] motion for Kristofor T. Henning to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for John F. Schultz to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for Michael J. Holston to appear pro hac vice . (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT of Kristofor T. Henning by Hewlett-Packard in support of [96-1] motion for Kristofor T. Henning to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for John F. Schultz to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for Michael J. Holston to appear pro hac vice . (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT of Kristin M.Scipione by Hewlett-Packard in support of [96-1] motion for Kristofor T. Henning to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for John F. Schultz to appear pro hac vice, [96-1] motion for Michael J. Holston to appear pro hac vice. (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 96 NOTICE OF MOTION by Hewlett-Packard for Kristofor T. Henning to appear pro hac vice ; Return Date not indicated (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of motion for pro hac vice and accompanying affidavits by first class Mail on 7/14/03 to persons on attached service list. (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 86 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Honeywell by Thomas D. Yannucci, Christopher Landau, Brant W. Bishop, Susan Kearns. (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION by Honeywell for an order dismissing all claims against Honeywell in their entirety and with prejudice ; Return Date 11/6/03 at 2:00. (djc)
July 14, 2003 Filing 84 Supplemental BRIEF by Honeywell in Support of Alternative Grounds for Dismissal (djc)
July 11, 2003 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION by Honeywell Int'l for an order for Susan Kearns to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Honeywell Int'l . No Return Date. Affidavit of Craig S. Primis and Affidavit of Susan Kearns attached. (sb)
June 30, 2003 Filing 82 NOTICE of change of address by Chevron Texaco Corp. . (yv)
May 22, 2003 Filing 80 Letter filed addressed to Judge Sprizzo from Janis M. Meyer, dated 5/14/03, re: remove firm name from service list. (kw)
May 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that plaintiffs dismiss this action without prejudice as against dft Rio Tinto. ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (dle)
May 21, 2003 Filing 78 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P., without prejudice, all claims asserted in this action against deft DaimlerChrysler AG and against that deft only. The action remains pending and is not dismissed as to any other deft. ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (sac)
May 20, 2003 Filing 81 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Hewlett-Packard . (db)
May 16, 2003 Filing 77 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by DaimlerChrysler . (moc)
May 2, 2003 Filing 76 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Colgate-Palmolive. (sb)
April 16, 2003 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by 3M Company. (yv)
April 10, 2003 Filing 74 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Hewlett-Packard by Kristin M. Scipione. (pl)
March 31, 2003 Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Ford Motor Corp. . (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 72 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Ford Motor Corp. by Ann C. Turetsky. (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 71 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Bank of America by Ann C. Turetsky. (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 70 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Bank of America . (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 69 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Dow Chemical by Ann C. Turetsky. (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 68 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Dow Chemical . (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 67 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Union Carbide Corporation by O'Melvney & Myers, L.L.P. (Ann C. Turetsky). (gmo)
March 31, 2003 Filing 66 DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed . (gmo)
March 28, 2003 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Susan L. Saltzstein by DaimlerChrysler in support Re: [62-1] motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the FRCP for an Order quashing service of the complaint in Digwamaje v. Bank of America on DCNAH, [62-2] motion dismissing the Digwamaje complaint to the extent it states claims against DCNAH or DCAG . (yv)
March 28, 2003 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Timothy P. Dykstra by DaimlerChrysler in support Re: [62-1] motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the FRCP for an Order quashing service of the complaint in Digwamaje v. Bank of America on DCNAH, [62-2] motion dismissing the Digwamaje complaint to the extent it states claims against DCNAH or DCAG . (yv)
March 28, 2003 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by DaimlerChrysler in support of [62-1] motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the FRCP for an Order quashing service of the complaint in Digwamaje v. Bank of America on DCNAH, [62-2] motion dismissing the Digwamaje complaint to the extent it states claims against DCNAH or DCAG . (yv)
March 28, 2003 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION by DaimlerChrysler pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5) of the FRCP for an Order quashing service of the complaint in Digwamaje v. Bank of America on DCNAH and, dismissing the Digwamaje complaint to the extent it states claims against DCNAH or DCAG . Return Date 5/5/03 at 3:00. (yv)
March 25, 2003 Received returned mail re: [56-1] assign judge . Mail was addressed to Medi Mokuena at P.O. Box 8591 and was returned for the following reason(s): returned for better fowarding directions. (gf)
March 19, 2003 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Anette V.Lawless by Rio Tinto in support Re: [59-1] motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction . (djc)
March 19, 2003 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Rio Tinto in support of [59-1] motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction . (djc)
March 19, 2003 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION by Rio Tinto to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction ; Return Date 5/19/03 at 3:00 p.m. (djc)
March 19, 2003 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Rio Tinto . (djc)
March 19, 2003 Filing 57 DEMAND for jury trial by Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Lindiwe Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, David Motsumi, David Motsumi, Moeketsi Thejane, Moeketsi Thejane, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Gladys Mokgoro, Jongani Hutchinson, Sefuba Sidzumo, Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso, Edward Thepelo Tshimako, Rahaba Mokgothu, Jonathan Makhudu Lediga, Anna Lebese, Anna Lebese, William Ngobeni, John Lucas Ngobeni, Clement Hlongwane, Masegale Monnapula, Thami Zitha, Selby Semela, Ezekiel Oupa Masuku, Ezekiel Oupa Masuku, Thabo Masuku, Ndumani Masuku, Clifford Masuku . (db)
March 17, 2003 Filing 56 Notice of Case reassignment to Judge John E. Sprizzo . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Sean P. Reid, Donald J. Ridings Jr., Eric H. Holder Jr., Stephen P. Anthony, Robert N. Sayler, Dwight J. Davis, Peter C. Hein, William R. Kirschner, John Townsend Rich, Michael S. Giannotto, Matthew M. Hoffman, Susan M. Sharko, Thomas F. Campion, William F. Sheehan, Paul R. Friedman, John D. Aldock, Kenneth M. Kramer, Janis Meyer, Craig S. Primis, Karen M. Asner, Owen Cary Pell, Robert L. Hickok, Angelo A. Stio III, Thomas E. Zemaitis, Medi Mokuena, Kweku J. Hanson, Paul M. Ngobeni . (gf)
March 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER, granting [47-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court admitting Eric H. Holder Jr. to appear pro hac vice, granting [47-2] motion for Donald J. Ridings, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, granting [47-3] motion for Sean P. Reid to appear pro hac vice. ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); (kw)
March 10, 2003 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by IBM Corporation. (Original document filed in case 2cv4712 as doc # 37). (gf)
March 10, 2003 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. (gf)
March 10, 2003 Filing 54 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Xerox Corp. . (gf)
February 24, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [52-1] order in the amount of $50.00 paid on 2/24/03 Receipt # 465447. (sac)
February 13, 2003 Opinion or Order ORDER, Plaintiffs shall initiate service of process with respect to all defts. in the captioned actions on or before 4/3/03; should plaintiffs fail to initiate service of process as directed by the Court herein, the Court will dismiss without prejudice the above-captioned actions against any deft. w/ respect to which service of process has not been initiated; set scheduling order deadlines: Deadline for Defts to submit their motions to dismiss, limited to the issue of lack of personal jurisdiction purs. to Rule 12(b)(2) of the FRCP, not to exceed 15 pages each, on or before 3/4/03; Ptffs' response to motion deadline, not to exceed 30 pages on or before 4/4/03; Oral Argument set for 3:00 5/5/03; Plaintiffs are granted leave to file Amended Complaints, if any, on or before 3/3/03; This Document relates to 02-4712, 5297, 6218 and 10062. (Orig. doc. Filed in case no. 02 MD 1499, Doc. #5) . ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); (ae)
February 7, 2003 Filing 53 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Colgate-Palmolive by Peter C. Hein. (djc)
February 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: granting [37-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) for Robert N. Sayler to appear pro hac vice, granting [37-2] motion for an Order for Stephen Anthony to appear pro hac vice. Each shall abide by the provisions of the Local Rules of this Court in all aspects and be subjected to the disciplinary jurisdiction of the Court in accordance with Local Civil Rule 1.5. Doument sent to attorneys admissions clerk. ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (db) Modified on 02/10/2003
February 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting [32-1] motion for an order permitting Michael S. Giannotto, John Townsend Rich, and William R. Kirschner, to appear pro hac vice herein as counsel for dft Newmont Mining Corporation ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); forwarded orig doc to the Atty Admissions Clerk (cd)
January 23, 2003 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT of Donald J. Ridings, Jr. in support of [47-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court admitting Eric H. Holder Jr. to appear pro hac vice, [47-2] motion for Donald J. Ridings, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, [47-3] motion for Sean P. Reid to appear pro hac vice. (jco)
January 23, 2003 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Eric H. Holder, Jr. in support of [47-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court admitting Eric H. Holder Jr. to appear pro hac vice, [47-2] motion for Donald J. Ridings, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, [47-3] motion for Sean P. Reid to appear pro hac vice . (jco)
January 23, 2003 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Sean P. Reid in support of [47-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court admitting Eric H. Holder Jr. to appear pro hac vice, [47-2] motion for Donald J. Ridings, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, [47-3] motion for Sean P. Reid to appear pro hac vice. (jco)
January 17, 2003 Filing 46 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Kimberly-Clark by Dwight J. Davis. (cd)
January 8, 2003 Filing 45 NOTICE of attorney appearance (John D. Adlock) by General Electric . (db)
January 8, 2003 Filing 44 NOTICE of attorney appearance (Paul R. Friedman) by General Electric . (db)
January 8, 2003 Filing 43 NOTICE of attorney appearance (William F. Sheehan) by General Electric . (db)
January 8, 2003 Filing 42 NOTICE of attorney appearance (William R. Kirshner) by General Electric . (db)
January 8, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [32-1] motion for an order permitting Michael S. Giannotto, John Townsend Rich, and William R. Kirschner, to appear pro hac vice herein as counsel for dft Newmont Mining Corporation in the amount of $100.00 paid on 1/8/03 Receipt # 461071. (db)
January 6, 2003 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION [filed on service date] by 3M, Procter & Gamble; for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court admitting Eric H. Holder Jr. to appear pro hac vice ; for Donald J. Ridings, Jr. to appear pro hac vice ; for Sean P. Reid to appear pro hac vice . Return Date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. (jco)
January 6, 2003 Text not available.
January 3, 2003 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Stephen P. Anthony by Minnesota Mining, Proctor & Gamble in support of [37-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) for Robert N. Sayler to appear pro hac vice, [37-2] motion for an Order for Stephen P. Anthony to appear pro hac vice. (jco)
January 3, 2003 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Robert N. Sayler by Minnesota Mining, Proctor & Gamble in support of [37-1] motion for an Order, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) for Robert N. Sayler to appear pro hac vice, [37-2] motion for an Order for Stephen P. Anthony to appear pro hac vice. (jco)
December 24, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting [29-1] motion for an oder purs. to Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Civil Rules of this Court for an order permitting John D. Aldock, Paul R. Friedman, William F. Sheehan, William R. Kirschner to appear pro hac vice as counsel for General Electric Corp. ( signed by Judge Richard C. Casey ); forwarded orig. doc. to the Attorney Admissions Clerk (cd)
December 23, 2002 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Stanley D. Davis. (jco)
December 23, 2002 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Gold Fields Mining in support of [34-1] motion for an Order quashing the service of the Amended Summons and the First Amended Class Action Complaint on GFMC . (jco)
December 20, 2002 Filing 31 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Newmont Mining by Matthew M. Hoffman. (dle)
December 19, 2002 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Newmont Mining for an order permitting Michael S. Giannotto, John Townsend Rich, and William R. Kirschner, to appear pro hac vice herein as counsel for dft Newmont Mining Corporation . Return Date not indicated. Proposed order attached. (dle) Modified on 12/27/2002
December 18, 2002 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION [filed on service date] by Gold Fields Mining; for an Order quashing the service of the Amended Summons and the First Amended Class Action Complaint on GFMC . Return Date not indicated. (jco)
December 17, 2002 Filing 30 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Merck & Co. by Thomas F. Campion, Susan M. Sharko. (db)
December 12, 2002 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION [filed on service date] by Minnesota Mining, Proctor & Gamble; for an Order, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) for Robert N. Sayler to appear pro hac vice ; for an Order for Stephen P. Anthony to appear pro hac vice . Return Date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. (jco) Modified on 01/08/2003
December 11, 2002 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION by General Electric; for an oder purs. to Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Civil Rules of this Court for an order permitting John D. Aldock, Paul R. Friedman, William F. Sheehan, William R. Kirschner to appear pro hac vice as counsel for General Electric Corp. No Return Date. (ae)
December 11, 2002 Filing 28 NOTICE of attorney appearance for General Electric by Matthew M. Hoffman. (cd)
December 10, 2002 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Richard C. Casey for the date(s) of 10/30/02. (Original Doc. # 30 Filed in 02 Civ. 4712). (dt)
December 9, 2002 Filing 26 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Citicorp/Citibank by Owen Cary Pell, Karen M. Asner. (tp)
December 9, 2002 Filing 25 RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Citicorp/Citibank. (tp)
December 6, 2002 Filing 27 NOTICE of attorney appearance for NCR Corporation. (not named as a participant) (djc)
November 26, 2002 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order granting admission pro hac vice as to Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Lindiwe Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, David Motsumi, David Motsumi, Moeketsi Thejane, Moeketsi Thejane, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Gladys Mokgoro, Jongani Hutchinson, Sefuba Sidzumo, Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso, Edward Thepelo Tshimako, Rahaba Mokgothu, Jonathan Makhudu Lediga, Anna Lebese, Anna Lebese by facsimile on 11/25/02. (yv)
November 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, granting [18-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 1.3(c) of this Court's Local Rules, admitting pro hac vice Thomas D. Yannucci to this bar for the purposes of this action, granting [18-2] motion for an Order admitting pro hac vice Christopher Landau to this bar for the purposes of this action, granting [18-3] motion for an Order admitting pro hac vice Brant W. Bishop to this bar for the purposes of this action, granting [18-4] motion for an Order admitting pro hac vice David Pruitt to this bar for the purposes of this action pending approval by the Attorney Admission Offices. ( signed by Judge Richard C. Casey ); Copies forwarded by chambers. (Sent to the Attorney Admissions Clerk). (kw) Modified on 11/20/2002
November 14, 2002 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by PepsiCo, Inc. (jco)
November 14, 2002 Filing 40 RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by PepsiCo, Inc. (jco)
November 13, 2002 Filing 20 NOTICE of appearance by Deere & Co. (cd)
November 13, 2002 Filing 19 NOTICE of appearance by United States Steel (cd)
November 12, 2002 Filing 21 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Ashland Inc. by Brian J. Gallagher. (dle)
November 4, 2002 Filing 22 Memorandum to Docket Clerk:10/30/02, status conference held, submitted by M. Brantley . (bls)
October 28, 2002 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION by Siemens AG, Morgan Stanley for an Order pursuant to Rule 1.3(c) of this Court's Local Rules, admitting pro hac vice Thomas D. Yannucci to this bar for the purposes of this action , for an Order admitting pro hac vice Christopher Landau to this bar for the purposes of this action , for an Order admitting pro hac vice Brant W. Bishop to this bar for the purposes of this action , for an Order admitting pro hac vice David Pruitt to this bar for the purposes of this action . Return Date not indicated. Affidavits of Craig S. Primis, Thomas D. Yannucci, Christopher Landau, Brant W. Bishop, David Pruitt in support and Proposed Order attached. (yv)
October 21, 2002 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on copy of [13-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 10/21/02 Receipt # 453969. (kw)
October 21, 2002 Filing 17 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Unisys by Robert L. Hickok. (kw)
October 1, 2002 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [12-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 10/1/02 Receipt # 452156. (laq)
October 1, 2002 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [14-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 10/1/02 Receipt # 452156. (laq)
September 27, 2002 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Lindiwe Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, David Motsumi, David Motsumi, Moeketsi Thejane, Moeketsi Thejane, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Gladys Mokgoro, Jongani Hutchinson, Sefuba Sidzumo, Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso, Edward Thepelo Tshimako, Rahaba Mokgothu, Jonathan Makhudu Lediga, Anna Lebese, Anna Lebese (Answer due for Corporate Does, for Citicorp/Citibank, for Unisys, for General Motors, for Ford Motor Corp., for Mobil for Commerzbank AG, for Dresdner Bank AG, for Deutsche Bank AG, for IBM Corporation ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. Jury Trial demanded. (laq)
September 27, 2002 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY RICO STATEMENT by Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Hermina Digwamaje, Lindiwe Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, Lindiwe Petunia Leinana, David Motsumi, David Motsumi, Moeketsi Thejane, Moeketsi Thejane, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo, Gladys Mokgoro, Jongani Hutchinson, Sefuba Sidzumo, Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso, Edward Thepelo Tshimako, Rahaba Mokgothu, Jonathan Makhudu Lediga, Anna Lebese, Anna Lebese. (laq)
September 23, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, that the Court is granting the [2-1] motion for an order pursuant to local civil rule 1.3(c) of the local rules of the U.S.D.C. for the S.D.N.Y. granting the admission of John F. Niblock, pro hac vice to the bar of the Court for the purposes of representing dft Ford Motor Co. Approved pending approval by the Attorney admissions office. ( signed by Judge Richard C. Casey ). FORWARDED TO ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS CLERK. (tp)
September 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, granting [8-1] motion for Robert L. Hickok to appear pro hac vice pending approval by the Attorney Admissions Office. ( signed by Judge Richard C. Casey ); Copies mailed. (Sent to the Attorney Admissions Clerk). (kw)
September 19, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER; granting pending approval by the Atty Admissions Office [5-1] motion for an order granting the admission of John H. Beisner, pro hac vice to the bar of this court for the purposes of representing dft Ford Motor Co. at the 8/23/02 conference scheduled by the court, and any subsequent proceedings if and when Ford is served in this action; by making this motion, Ford is not entering a general appearance, nor is it waiving any defenses to which it might be entitled . ( signed by Judge Richard C. Casey ); Copies mailed. (docmt forwarded to atty admissions clerk) (djc) Modified on 09/23/2002
September 18, 2002 Filing 11 Letter filed on behalf of Citigroup addressed to Judge Casey from Owen C. Powell, dated 9/12/02, re: Plaintiff's have requested a five day extension of their time to file a Consolidated and Amended Complaint, from 9/13/02- 9/18/02, with a like extension of the schedule set by the Court at the 8/23 hearing. Defendant's have consented to this extension under which Plaintiff's Consolidated and Amended Complaint (and RICO Statement, if any) shall be served 9/1802. Defendant's Motion to dismiss will be due on 10/18; Plaintiff's opposition papers will be due 11/18; Defendant's reply papers will be due on 12/2. (laq)
September 9, 2002 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Angelo A. Stio III by Unisys in support of [8-1] motion for Robert L. Hickok to appear pro hac vice . (djc)
September 9, 2002 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of robert L. Hickok by Unisys in support of [8-1] motion for Robert L. Hickok to appear pro hac vice. (djc)
September 6, 2002 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Unisys for Robert L. Hickok to appear pro hac vice ; Return Date not indicated. (djc)
September 4, 2002 Filing 7 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Unisys by Thomas E. Zemaitis, Angelo A. Stio III. (dle)
September 4, 2002 Filing 6 RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Unisys . (dle)
August 28, 2002 Filing 4 Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Status conference held on 8/23/02 before Judge Casey. Court set motion schedule: Plaintiff to file consolidated complaint by 9/13; Defendant's motion to dismiss by 10/13; response by 11/13; reply by 11/27. (sb)
August 26, 2002 Case accepted as related to 1:02cv4712. (gmo) Modified on 09/11/2002
August 26, 2002 Case accepted as related to 1:02cv4712. Notice of assignment to follow. (rmo) Modified on 09/11/2002
August 26, 2002 Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (rmo)
August 26, 2002 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Richard C. Casey . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Medi Mokuena, Kweku J. Hanson, Paul M. Ngobeni. (rmo)
August 23, 2002 Status Conference held on 8/23/02 before Judge Richard C. Casey . (sb)
August 22, 2002 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Ford Motor Corp. for an order granting the admission of John H. Beisner, pro hac vice to the bar of this court for the purposes of representing dft Ford Motor Co. at the 8/23/02 conference scheduled by the court, and in any subsequent proceedings if and when Ford is served in this action; by making this motion, Ford is not entering a general appearance, nor is it waiving any defenses to which it might be entitled . Return Date 8/23/02 at 9:30. (dle) Modified on 09/05/2002
August 22, 2002 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Ford Motor Corp. for an order pursuant to local civil rule 1.3(c) of the local rules of the U.S.D.C. for the S.D.N.Y. granting the admission of John F. Niblock, pro hac vice to the bar of the Court for the purposes of representing dft Ford Motor Co. . Return Date 8/23/02 at 9:30. Affidavit of John F. Niblock attached. (dle) Modified on 09/03/2002
August 2, 2002 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Richard C. Casey as possibly similar 1:02cv4712. (jol)
August 2, 2002 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 446644. (jol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digwamaje, et al v. IBM Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Ann Cara Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Nickel Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BankAmerica Corporation
Represented By: Ann Cara Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler AG
Represented By: Jerome S. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cyanamid Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corporation
Represented By: William R. Kirschner
Represented By: John D. Aldock
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoffman
Represented By: Paul R. Friedman
Represented By: William F. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.F. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Landau
Represented By: Brant W Bishop, P.C.
Represented By: Susan Kearns
Represented By: Thomas David Yannucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Tinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Corporation
Represented By: Keith R Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citicorp/Citibank
Represented By: Karen M. Asner
Represented By: Owen C Pell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Co.
Represented By: Kenneth Merin Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew M. Shors
Represented By: Adam Coates
Represented By: Brian Anderson
Represented By: Michael John Walsh
Represented By: Charles Borden
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Represented By: Justin Florence
Represented By: Sri Srinivasan
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Keith R Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NatWest Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Texaco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerzbank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Corporation
Represented By: Kristofor T. Henning
Represented By: Kristin Michele Heine
Represented By: Michael J. Holston
Represented By: John F. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company/3M Company
Represented By: Fuad Rana
Represented By: Stephen P. Anthony
Represented By: John E. Hall
Represented By: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Sayler
Represented By: Sean P. Reid
Represented By: Donald J. Ridings, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Chrysler AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Does Nos. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmont Mining Corporation
Represented By: William R. Kirschner
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoffman
Represented By: John Townsend Rich
Represented By: Michael S. Giannotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Petroleum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Corporation
Represented By: Ann Cara Turetsky
Represented By: Anton Metlitsky
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoldFields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FalconBridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennecott Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmithKline Beecham PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch/Shell Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weisser's Sporting Goods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Meyers Squibb Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresser Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dresdner Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor & Gamble
Represented By: Stephen P. Anthony
Represented By: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Sayler
Represented By: Sean P. Reid
Represented By: Donald J. Ridings, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Andrew Mark Behrman
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeBeers Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow chemical (Union Carbide)
Represented By: Ann Cara Turetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USX Corporation and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckitt & Colman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Lee Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Lyonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark
Represented By: Dwight J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothmans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ompania Hulera Goodyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Aluminum Corporation (OTCBB:KLUCQ)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banque Indosuez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corp
Represented By: Janis M Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co.
Represented By: Thomas F. Campion
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo-American PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Car Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Represented By: Thomas Edward Zemaitis
Represented By: Angelo Anthony Stio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindiwe Petunia Leinana
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ngobeni
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moeketsi Thejane
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Molefi
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Represented By: Tyler Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thami Zitha
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thepelo Tshimako
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clement Hlongwane
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ndumani Masuku
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lungislie Ntsebeza
Represented By: Jay Jacob Rice
Represented By: Diane E. Sammons
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Represented By: Tyler Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mncekeleli Henyn Simangentloko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lucas Ngobeni
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahaba Mokgothu
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Mokgoro
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Daniel Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tozamile Botha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sefuba Sidzumo
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Msitheli Wellington Nonyukela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masegale Monnapula
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gobusamang Laurence Lebotso
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nonkululeko Sylvia Ngcaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nothini Betty Dyonashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Lebese
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selby Semela
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermina Digwamaje
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirriam Mzamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Masuku
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jongani Hutchinson
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezekiel Oupa Masuku
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mpumelelo Cilibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Zoyisile Mali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Makhudu Lediga
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Langford Phiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Motsumi
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Tamboer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thabo Masuku
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindiwe Leinana
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascalinah Bookie Phoofolo
Represented By: Kweku J. Hanson
Represented By: Medi Moira Mokuena
Represented By: Medi Mokuena
Represented By: Paul M. Ngobeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Morgan Stanley
Represented By: Craig Scott Primis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DaimlerChrysler North America Holding Corporation
Represented By: William J. Hine
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Jerome S. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fujitsu Limited
Represented By: Michael Gerard
Represented By: Mark David McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Siemens AG doing business as Siemens Corporation
Represented By: Craig Scott Primis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?