Burnett, et al v. Al Baraka Investment
Plaintiff: Janice K. Punches, George R. Bergin, Kimberly Franco, Mary Kaye Crenshaw, Pamela M. Gould, Brandon Smith, Denis A. Warchola, Rina Rabinowitz, Judy C. Cirri, Mark Betterly, Fredric Mullin, Deborah Ann Hudson, Sandra Burnside, Michael Quackenbush, Donna Garbarini, Brian Voos, Linda Ellicott, Christopher O'Connell, Jennifer Laszczynski, Renee M. Troy, Brother Doe # 87, Robert William Harvey, Mary P. Weinberg, individually Patrick Flynn, Anna E. Collins, Joanne Waters, Deena Gilbey, James H. Miller, Edward Finnegan, Lawrence Cubas, Mary Sullivan, John R. Rogers, Fernando Reyes, Saul Zucker, William J. Riccardulli, Joseph McAuley, Brendan M. Grady, Michael J. Brady, Sister Doe # 91, Maritza Munoz, Susan T. Burghouwt, Josephine Buck, Paul G. Quirke, Marina Bakalinskaya, Edwin J. Gordon, Christine A. Norris, Robert V. Narducci, Elizabeth Wild, Kevin S. Clancy, Bella Boyarsky, Mother Doe # 28, Michael J. Spitz, Jeffrey Wittenstein, Lucia Perconti, Simone Mitchell, Kenneth A. Tietjen, George Dicostanzo, Anatoliy Bakalinskiy, Pil Soon Kang, Carol Diane Wisniewski, Kathleen Megan Poss, Sharon Ritchie Mullin, Anthony A. Rosado, Talat A. Zakhary, Liat Levinhar, Grace Elaine Ellis, Joseph Lowney, Lillian Lefkowitz, Shun-Fa Wen, Danny Ragaglia, Kevin J. Bailey, Brenda Smith Clark, John E. Ginty, Jeanne Trost, Dorothy Cubas, Robert W. Harlin, Kevin John Adams, Marc Douglas Jarret, Diane Antolos, Bobbie Jean Low, Joan P. Rall, Chow Leing Lam, Barbara Hetzel, Millicent Miller, Michael Reina, Timothy Duffy, Lawrence J. Sullivan, Jane Doe # 19, William J. Meehan, III, Norman P. Kinney, Everton Brown, Luz Milagros Luna, Christopher D'Ambrosio, Molly Dune, Taciana Aguiar, Hipolito D'Oleo, Michael A. Weaver, Sr., Gianina Alviar, John Clavin, Tiffany M. Lynch, Peggy S. Lewin, Barry Zelman, Bruce J. Van Nosdall, Alice Ill, Catherine Mazzotta, Anne Moran, Vincent Giallombardo, Maria Corrigan, Benjamin Mercado, Miles Bilcher, Nina Kostic, Yuau Ku, Fortunata Palombo, Kathryn M. Patrick, Judith Byrne, James J. Walsh, Jr., Richard H. Stewart, James L. Lennon, Olga C. Strickland, Vincent Pinto, Bobbi Rosner, Juan Carlos Pardo, Timothy J. Tarpey, Catherine Jezycki, Kathleen S. Maycen, Darren C. Harkins, Paula M. McAvoy, Angelina Trimboli, Catherine Hernandez, Eric Chalcoff, Jonathan A. Lewin, Steven Talty, Ryan Paul Minara, Marueen Maddison, George Stergiopoulos, Jr., Vincent J. Albanese, Thomas P. Canty, James McAneney, Donald Betterly, Jr., Johnny Torres, Cecilia Goldstein, Debra Maffeo Morri, Peter DePalma, Patrick Blaine, Francesco Susca, Jane M. Smithwick, Wife Doe # 93, Wife Doe # 58, Gayle Mosenson, Anne Marie Pescherine, Howard Greenstein, Daniel Reeber, Britt Ehnar, Marion Puiia Donovan, Robert L. O'Brien, Lauren Stabile, Benjamin Alexander Glascoe, Melanie A. Hunt, Stephanie Holland-Brodney, Patrick Malloy, John M. Maloney, Anthony Detullio, Marie Piccio-Pick, Gloria Haramis, Lois Paterson Gallo, Robert Scandole, Dominick Esposito, John Signorelli, Dennis Stefanak, John H. Kim, Lucy Roberto, Maryann Mavrogian, Thomas D. Ryan, Nimisha Patel, Denis M. Farrelly, Ram Anthony Mohabir, Nancy Niedermeyer, Stamatios K. Tzemis, Sachiko Shiratori, Richard E. Murphy, Marian Rogan, Daniel M. Straine, Susan R. Rosen, Monique Padilla-Ferrer, George W. Simmons, Gregory Hindy, William J. Allingham, Michael Grillo, Emily Howell, Andres De La Rosa, Denise Oakley, Giovanni Galante, Douglas Mackay, Venancio Hernandez, Jr., Gerald T. Hanley, Bruce D. Saber, Catherine Stefani, Elias Safi, Robert Schnall, John E. Reinhardt, James F. Mattson, James Dunne, III, Patricia J. Perry, Irene Golinski, Thomas Swannick, Mother Doe # 108, Stephen Fumando, Caroline Harlin, Eileen Heather Simon, Charles R. Evans, Stephanie Ayn Bowser, James John Brennan, Deming Lohez, Francisco Camacho, Brother Doe # 102, Peter Carr, Samuel E. Straub, Armand Talignani, Gary S. Nelson, Thomas Manley, Valeriy Muratov, James H. Tighe, Timothy Villari, Steven Turilli, Gregory McFarland, Jeffrey Crowe, Kerry M. Walsh, Maria I. Pellot, Alison Remy Crowther, Diane Shepherd, Joseph P. Finley, Avram Rosenthal, Laurie Folcik, Heather Gibbon, Michael A. Francese, Alicia M. Patrick, Stanley Freedner, Winifred M. Homer, Antonio R. Lloret, Gladys De La Torre, Corinne O'Rourke, Jaime Villalobos, Kenneth R. Hatton, Alexander Mardikian, Robert Roberto, Jr., Natalie Moriarty, Lynn Morris, Daryl Joseph Meehan, Connie Rizzo, Meigan Kelly, Laura Renee Anspach, Ben Stone, Rudy Mastrocinque, Sr., Sister Doe # 41, Semo P. Sennas, Richard S. Murray, Imelda Reyes Soriano, James M. Kirby, III, Jeffrey Sentowski, Evelyn Stone, Daniel Schug, Shawn May, Lisa Page, Karem Reynoso, Maria Lipari, Nestor J. Chevalier, Sr., Danielle Monaghan, Rita Agnello, Stephen Dempsey, Catherine Coughlan, Maureen Ragaglia, Kenneth R. Schardt, Raz Levinhar, Stella Lazarra, Gordon M. Ward, Arlene Sullivan, David J. King, Jr., Mark A. Chan, Denise Heneck, Laura Piskadlo, Sister Doe # 55, Matthew Salmon, Lorne Lyles, Mary Alice Halloran, Steven Jenkins, Anthony Martino, Earnest Washington, Jr., Gaye Hannon, Vincent A. Gugliuzzo, Linda Sulfaro, Rosalie A. Mastrandrea, Affiong Adanga, Lauren J. Osnato, Jennifer Keene Clyde, James F. Destasio, Edmund L. Plunkett, Thomas M. Greene, Joyce A. Woods, James E. Smith, Jane Alderman, Nicholas Cicero, Jr., Mary E. Straine, Brian J. Donnelly, Father Doe # 32, Deputy Inspector Thomas Green, Janet Stewart, Ramon DeJesus Molina, Elizabeth Collins, Eugene Stolowski, Nancy Burcham, Adelaide M. Driscoll, Edwin Rivera, Jack A. Grandcolas and Bridie O'Neill
Defendant: Ayadi Chafiq Bin Muhammad, Abu Rida Al Suri, Mohrez Amdouni, Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil, Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr, Ali Atwa, Youssef Abdaoui, Society of Islamic Cooperation, Abu Qatada Al-Filistini, Haji Abdul Manan Agha, Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad, Ali Saed Bin Ali El-Hooric, Sanabel Al Kheer, Inc., Abdalrahman Alarnout Abu Aljer, Ansar Al-Islam (AI), Saar Foundation, Musti Rashid Ahmad Ladehyanoy, Mondher Baazzoui, Nurjaman Riduan Ismuddin, The Global Relief Foundation, Hasan Izz-Al-Din, Al-Nur Honey Press Shops, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Muhammad Atif, World Assembly of Muslim Youth, Lionel Dumont, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Anas Al-Liby, Thirwat Salah Shihara, Mercy International Relief Agency, Mohammed Amine Akli, Moussa Ben Amor Essaadi, Mounir Ben Habib Jerraya, Omar Abu Omar, Al Barakaat Exchange LLC, Saudi High Commission, Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa, Muhsin Musa Matwalli Atwah, Mamdouh Mahmud Salim, Mustafa Mohamed Fadhil, Albert Friedrich Arman Huber, International Islamic Relief Organization, Nedal Saleb, Imad Eddin Barakat Yarkas, Riad Hijazi, Yassir Al-Sirri, Osama Bin Laden, Muhammad Al-Hamati, Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah, Amin Al-Haq, Jaish-I-Mohammed, Shaykh Sa'id, Ahmed Hasni Rarrbo, Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi, Chiheb Ben Mohamed Ayari, Muhammed Galeb Kalaje Zouaydi, Adel Abdul Jalil Batterjee, Al-Barakat International, Sheikh Abdullah Azzam, Abu Hafs The Mauritanian, Ahmed Mohammed Hamed Ali, Enaam Mahmoud Arnaout, Muslim World League, Alfaisaliah Group, Islamic Cultural Institute of Milan, Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi, Fahid Mohammed Ally Msalam, Fouzi Iendoubi, Muhammad Salah, Ahmed Khalfan Ghailani, Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya, Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Fazul Abdullah Mohammed, Rachid Fehar, Benevolence International Foundation, Wa'el Hamza Jalaidan, Saudi Bin Laden Group, Mohammed Iqbal Abdurrahman, Khalil Jarraya, Al Rajhi Banking and Investment, Makhtab Al-Khidamat, Mohammad Khair Al Saqqa, Mohammed Loay Bayazid, Saleh Abdullah Kamel, Egyptian Islamic Jihad, Sayf Al-Adl, International Relief Organization, Abdul Al-Moslah, Abu Ismail, Youssef M. Nada & Co., Gesellschaft, M.B.H., Abu Zubaydah, M. Omar Ashraf, Ahmed Khalfan Ahmed, Abubakary K. Ahmed, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Jam, Islamic Al-Haramain, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Elias, Mohammed Ali Hasan Al Moayad, Abu Mohamed Al-Masri, Hassan Ali, Ahmad Al Harbi, Lazhar Ben Mohammed Tlili, Nasco Business Residence Center Sas Di Nasreddin Ahmed Idris Ec, Mohamed Albanna, Tadamon Islamic Bank, Al-Rashid Trust, Khalid, Ahmed Huber, Amr Al-Fatih, Jund Al-Islam, Omar Mahmoud Uthman, Abu Abd Al-Rahman Al-Kanadi, Abu Al Darda, Yaqub M. Mirza, Hassan A.A. Bahafzallah, Ahmed Mohammed Abdurehman, Ammar Mansour Bouslim, Barakat Refreshment Company, Mufti Rashid Ahmad Ludhianvi, Muhammed J. Fakihi, Samir Salwwaii, Mazin M.H. Bahareth, Ahmed Hemed, Guld and African Chamber, Mohammed Al Massari, Fouad Mohammed and Fadel Abdallah Mohammed Ali
Case Number: 1:2003cv05738
Filed: August 1, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331al
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 497 LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 494 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from WAMY SA and WAMY INT'L.Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth, World Assembly of Muslim Youth (Falls Church, Virginia, USA), World Assembly of Muslim Youth of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Mohammedi, Omar)
April 1, 2019 Filing 493 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from WAMY.Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth, World Assembly of Muslim Youth (Falls Church, Virginia, USA), World Assembly of Muslim Youth of Saudi Arabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Mohammedi, Omar)
March 1, 2019 Filing 492 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 491 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 489 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 488 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 487 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 486 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 485 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 484 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in long form or in altered short form addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Timothy B. Fleming dated 11/26/2018. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3742 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' October 2017 motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3742) is DENIED. By September 28, 2018, Jelaidan is ORDERED to file a sworn declaration with the Court providing detailed responses to the questions listed above. In addition, a conference is scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. McMahon and the relevant members of the PECs are ORDERED to appear at the conference in person. The parties should be prepared to discuss the PECs' May 2018 motion for sanctions and McMahon's motion to withdraw. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3742. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 482 OPINION AND ORDER re: (4064 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (4043) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. The Charity Officials' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. In addition, Mr. Alan Kabat, the Charity Officials' attorneys from Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC, and the appropriate representatives from the PECs are ORDERED to appear in person at the discovery conference scheduled for October 12, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 110, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Court intends to discuss why Mr. Kabat made representations on behalf of Al-Turki and Naseef during periods of time when he was not in communication with those clients. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4064. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/30/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3910 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Defendants, World Assembly of Muslim Youth-Saudi Arabia and World Assembly of Muslim Youth-International to to produce responsive documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a), filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 7 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to provide the PECs with a complete list of all of its branch offices from 1992 until 2002. Within 14 days of this Opinion and Order, the PECs are directed to provide WAMY with a list of no more than 20 branch offices that the PECs believe are most relevant to their claims. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to conduct a more thorough search for documents located in the 20 branch offices that the PECs identify and to produce any additional relevant documents. In addition, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to search for and produce the following: all documents responsive to the PECs' fourth set of document requests; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; WAMY's annual reports for 1992, 1993, and 1995; all documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government, Saudi ministries, and Saudi embassies; all documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; all records regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad; and unredacted versions of all documents that WAMY has previously produced in redacted form (with the exception of any documents listed on a privilege log). Finally, within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, WAMY is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration describing in detail its efforts to locate: additional documents in its branch offices; all reports, meeting minutes, and other documents from WAMY's governing bodies, boards, and committees; documents relating to WAMY's relationship with the Saudi government; documents relating to the Benevolence International Foundation; and documents regarding WAMY's relationship with or financial support for Hamas, Fatah, and the Palestinian Islamic Jihad The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3910. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/29/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER denying (817) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4077) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (450) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (626) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (579) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (392) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (607) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (50) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (62) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (91) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (90) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (76) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (84) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (56) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (53) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (54) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (33) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (46) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (36) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (30) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (29) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (1024) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (391) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. The Kingdom's motion to supplement the protective order is DENIED. The Court will not adopt the procedures the Kingdom has proposed. Instead, the parties are directed to comply with the existing protective order, ECF No. 1900, and the Court's Individual Practices when they wish to file any information with the Court that has been designated as confidential. The Court's temporary order prohibiting parties from filing any documents on the docket that have been designated as confidential by the Kingdom (ECF No. 4079) is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4077. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 OPINION AND ORDER re: (3822 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs PI Executive Committee, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (3827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Muslim World League and International Islamic Relief Organization to Produce Responsive Documents, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 3822) is DENIED as untimely. In addition, the PECs' motion to compel (ECF No. 3827) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, MWL and IIRO are ORDERED to search all of the branch offices that they have not already searched and produce any banking records from those offices and any documents falling within the categories identified in the Court's April 12, 2011 Order. MWL and IIRO are not required to search for any other documents at this time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3822 and 3827. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 478 OPINION AND ORDER re: (872 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 3823 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to to produce documents, filed by Kathleen Ashton, (3830 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Compel Yasin Kadi to Document Production, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. The PECs' motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, Kadi is ORDERED to search for and produce the two reports discussed above that were prepared in anticipation of Rowad's liquidation and the 11 documents discussed above regarding Saudi Arabia's investigations of Kadi. If he is unable to locate or obtain all of these reports and documents, Kadi is ORDERED to produce a sworn declaration within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order that describes in detail his efforts to locate the reports and documents. Kadi is not required to produce any other documents at this time. In addition, within 30 days of this Opinion and Order, the parties are directed to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to resolve the disputes regarding Kadi's privilege log. Finally, the PECs' request for attorneys' fees is treated as withdrawn, and Kadi's request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3823, 3830 in the MDL and ECF No. 872 in 02-CV-6977. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (4073) Letter Motion for Discovery; denying (4074) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The motions for protective orders filed by Al-Buthe, Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, and Basha are DENIED, and Naseef's motion for a protective order is DENIED as moot. In addition, Naseef is ORDERED to file a letter within 60 days of the date of this Order and every 60 days thereafter updating the Court on the status of his medical conditions and ability to participate in this action. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 4073 and 4074. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/16/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 8/27/2018, Doc. #4125 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER: No party shall publicly file any document on the docket designated as Confidential by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("KSA") while the Court considers KSA's letter motion dated July 31, 2018. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may respond to KSA's letter motion by August 8, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/1/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
July 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER: On July 20, 2018, Defendants Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al-Turki, Adnan Basha, and Abdullah Omar Naseef moved the Court to reconsider a portion of its July 6, 2018 Opinion and Order. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees may file a response to the motion by August 3, 2018. The defendants may file a reply by August 10, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/23/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING NOTICES TO CONFORM, SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS, AND NOTICES OF AMENDMENT: The Court has previously issued several orders approving forms and setting procedures for the filing of new claims against the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia ("Saudi Arabia") and the Islamic Republic of Iran ("Iran"). ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, 4010. Because of the piecemeal manner in which the various types of new claims have been addressed, the applicable forms and procedures have become convoluted and inconsistent. In addition, the plaintiffs have sought to find ways of adding more plaintiffs to a single case than the Court intended by utilizing a combination of short form complaints and notices of amendment. The Court is attempting to manage the influx of new cases and claims in the most efficient and organized manner possible. To that end, the Court will now establish new procedures governing all newly filed claims against Iran and Saudi Arabia. This Amended Order supersedes ECF Nos. 3543, 3982, and 4010 in their entirety. The parties are directed to adhere to both the letter and spirit of these procedures. In addition, any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/10/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jwh)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 473 OPINION AND ORDER re: (546 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN, 987 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 3748 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 774 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 571 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 850 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 630 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN, 582 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN) MOTION for Sanctions - Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Sanctions as to Charity Official Defendants Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Abdullah Mahsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, and Soliman Al-Buthe. filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. For the foregoing reasons, the PECs' motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Al-Obaid, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are precluded from offering any testimony or further evidence, other than such evidence that has been produced as of the date of this Opinion and Order, to rebut admissible evidence offered by a party to establish these defendants' whereabouts on a particular date. In addition, Defendants Al-Buthe, Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef are ORDERED to produce certifications that fully comply with the Courts orders within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order. The certifications from Al-Turki, Basha, and Naseef must describe the specific medical issues that have prevented them from fulfilling their discovery obligations in a timely manner, and the certifications from Al-Turki and Naseef must indicate whether they are continuing to participate in this litigation. In the alternative, if Al-Turki, Basha, or Naseef is incapacitated, that defendant may produce a competent sworn or affirmed certification from a qualified treating physician identifying the specific medical issues that have prevented the defendant from fulfilling his discovery obligations. If defense counsel is unable to contact Al-Turki and Naseef, counsel must file a letter with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Opinion and Order describing his efforts to contact his clients and indicating when he last had contact with them. The Court will then consider whether a default should be entered against them. If the Charity Officials remain noncompliant with the Court's orders, the Court may impose additional sanctions and may order them to show cause why they should not be held in contempt. Finally, the Court will require the Charity Officials to pay the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs that the PECs incurred in bringing their motion for sanctions. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and make good faith efforts to reach agreement on the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. Within 60 days of the date of this Opinion and Order, the parties shall file a joint status letter indicating whether they have agreed upon the attorneys' fees and costs that should be imposed. If the parties have not reached agreement, the status letter should propose a reasonable schedule for briefing on the amount of the attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3748. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/6/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ne)
June 11, 2018 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (ad)
June 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so redesignated. (ad)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/6/2018) (jwh)
June 6, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (4013 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 73 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:17-cv-06519-GBD, 70 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 617 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 599 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN, 16 in 1:18-cv-00538-GBD, 57 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 442 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 41 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 385 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 48 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 25 in 1:17-cv-08617-GBD, 56 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 81 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 386 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 64 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN, 74 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 64 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-03162-GBD, 1017 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 13 in 1:18-cv-03353-GBD, 804 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 80 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 573 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 42 in 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-00947-GBD, 54 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 34 in 1:17-cv-07914-GBD) MOTION for Daniel V. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15144016. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Superseded by Judge's Order dated 7/10/2018, Doc. #4045 in case 1:03-md-1570. ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; terminating (4007) Letter Motion for Leave to File Document in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The Court hereby approves the Iran Short Form Complaint, ECF No. 4007-1, and Ashton Short Form Saudi Arabia Complaint, ECF No. 4007-2, and further orders as follows: Iran Short Form Complaint. Any plaintiff who has not yet filed a claim against Iran, but intends to do so, may initiate an action against Iran through the filing of an Iran Short Form Complaint, substantially in the form attached as Exhibit A to the PECs' May 23, 2018 Letter, ECF No. 4007-1...As new complaints are being filed against Saudi Arabia, the Court would like to put all plaintiffs on notice that, in the event that liability is ultimately established against Saudi Arabia, solatium claimants shall be required to present documentary evidence of their family relationship to a 9/11 decedent for the Court's review. Such evidence would consist of birth or marriage certificates or, in their absence, sworn affidavits attesting to a family relationship eligible for recovery. For deceased solatium claimants, a death certificate or sworn affidavit shall be requested to ensure that the claimant did not predecease the 9/11 victim. Cf. ECF No. 3442, 3445 (orders vacating judgments against Islamic Republic of Iran and dismissing claims of solatium claimants who had pre-deceased victims). Although liability and damages are bifurcated in this case, the Court strongly encourages all plaintiffs to gather the necessary documentation before or shortly after the filing or amendment of their complaints because such documentation may be more difficult to obtain with the passage of time. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 4007, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras) Modified on 8/28/2018 (ras).
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion to modify the procedures for adding or removing plaintiffs to or from existing cases without seeking further leave from the Court is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. A new plaintiff asserting claims for solatium damages with respect to a deceased family member may be added to the existing case of the decedent's estate without seeking further leave from the Court by (1) filing a Notice of Amendment in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A, and then (2) adding the new plaintiff's name to the docket of the existing case on ECF. Names added onto the docket must be in First Name Last Name format, with only first letters capitalized (i.e., not written in all capitalized letters). No more than 25 new plaintiffs may be added to an existing case with a single Notice of Amendment. Attorneys wishing to add new plaintiffs using this procedure are strongly encouraged to contact the Clerk of Court and make arrangements to send members of their technical staff to court-sponsored training regarding the proper protocols for adding new plaintiffs to existing dockets. Plaintiffs added by this procedure need not re-serve defendants who have already been served. Any motion previously ruled on by the Court will be considered to have been filed and decided in the same manner and shall apply with equal force with regard to the claims of each new plaintiff. All other new plaintiffs must follow the procedures established in the Court's May 3, 2017 and January 24, 2018 Orders. ECF Nos. 3543, 3883 (in case no. 03md1570). Any plaintiff wishing to withdraw from the case must seek leave from the Court to dismiss his or her claims in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Civil Rules. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3943 (in case no. 03md1570). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/27/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al., as per Chambers. This Order is a duplicate of doc. no. 3982 entered in case no. 03md1570. (rjm)
March 22, 2018 Filing 469 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3939 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Letter filed by Dubai Islamic Bank. ENDORSEMENT: Attorney Robert G. Houck's motion to withdraw as counsel for Dubai Islamic Bank is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Attorney Houck as counsel. Attorney Robert G. Houck terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/22/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER: On Wednesday, January 24, 2018, the Court held a telephone conference with the parties to discuss the remaining disputes regarding the deposition protocol. The Court has decided the disputed matters and has separately issued a Deposition Protocol Order. For the sake of clarity, the Court will briefly explain its decisions regarding the disputed matters. First, the Court determined that each side will be permitted to take 75 depositions. The plaintiffs proposed 100 depositions as a fair number. This number was based, in part, on the plaintiffs' Rule 26(a) Witness List and their deposition protocol proposal, which identified dozens of individuals from each of the five organizational defendants and six individual defendants that they intended to depose. In addition, plaintiffs reference a 2015 multidistrict litigation (involving products liability) that authorized 100 depositions for each side and included damages depositions (which this protocol does not). The plaintiffs state that they intend to depose current and former employees of the defendant organizations, former government officials and incarcerated al Qaeda members. Defendants, for their part, argue first for 50 depositions, but in the main argue for parity, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) Modified on 2/1/2018 (ap). Modified on 2/2/2018 (ap).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 466 DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER: The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") established In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03 MDL 1570, and began transferring cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks from various judicial districts to this Court ("the MDL Court") for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. In addition to cases transferred into the MDL by the JPML, other cases related to the 9/11 terrorist attacks have been consolidated with this multidistrict proceeding (collectively, "MDL Proceeding"). A fundamental purpose of multidistrict litigation under 28 U.S.C. 1407 is to facilitate the conduct of efficient and non-duplicative discovery relating to questions of fact common to transferred and coordinated actions. The Parties have expressed an intention to conduct deposition discovery in the MDL Proceeding. Although several prior orders (see, e.g., ECF Nos. 247, 248, 1547, and 1900) contain provisions relating to depositions in the MDL Proceeding, the Court directed the Parties to meet and confer (see ECF No. 3541) to develop more specific protocols, and as further set forth in this order. (Deposition due by 1/31/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/31/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
January 25, 2018 Filing 465 OBJECTION to (599 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 3808 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 1/18/2018 re: (3667 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, (3702 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss /Al Rajhi Bank's Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. filed by Al Rajhi Bank, (3670 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina, (3691 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by National Commercial Bank, (3700 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi Binladin Group. Plaintiff Counsel: Stephen A. Cozen, Sean P. Carter, J. Scott Tarbutton, Jodi W. Flowers, Robert T. Haefele, Jerry S. Goldman, Bruce E. Strong, Kanishka Agarwala, Robert Horkovich, John M. Quinn, James P. Kreindler, Andrew Joseph Maloney, III, Steven R. Pounian, Justin T. Green, Megan W. BenettDefense Counsel: Michael K. Kellogg, Benjamin D. Margo, Gregory G. Rapawy, Lawrence S. Robbins, Roy T. Englert, Jr., Lukman Aleez, Christopher M. Curran, Nicole Erb, Reuben J. Sequeira, Nicolle Kownacki, Mitchell R. Berger, Alan T. Dickey, Alexandra E. Chopin, James E. Gauch, Mark Kubisch, Esha Mankodi and Court Reporter present. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER: granting #464 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/05/2018) (ama)
January 4, 2018 Filing 464 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Objections addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Robert M. Kaplan dated January 4, 2018. Document filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Comapny, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for Wednesday, January 24, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to provide a call-in for the Court and all parties. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee should each select one representative to speak on their behalf. The parties should be prepared to discuss several issues regarding the proposed deposition protocol. First, paragraph 7 of the proposed deposition protocol contemplates that merits and jurisdictional discovery will be completed within the same timeframe. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether depositions relating to jurisdictional discovery should conclude sooner than depositions relating to merits discovery. The parties should also be prepared to discuss a plan for taking depositions relating to the merits of the claims against the defendants who are currently in jurisdictional discovery in the event that those claims are not dismissed on jurisdictional grounds. Second, the parties should be prepared to discuss the number of fact depositions per side and whether the two sides should be allowed to take the same number of depositions (Paragraph 35). Furthermore, the parties should be prepared to discuss the reasoning behind the numbers they have proposed, including the specific witnesses they wish to depose and why they believe depositions of those witnesses are critical. At this time, the Court is inclined to permit 75 depositions for the plaintiffs; it is unclear whether a similar number for the defendants is necessary. Third, the parties should be prepared to discuss which depositions should be counted toward any imposed limit (Paragraph 38). At this time, the Court is inclined not to count de bene esse depositions but to count any discovery deposition of a witness whose testimony is subsequently taken for trial preservation. In addition, the defendants' proposal with respect to this paragraph refers to a party noticing "the deposition of its own witness." The defendants should be prepared to explain what this phrase means and how it is distinguishable from depositions to perpetuate testimony for trial. (Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/2/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap)
December 28, 2017 Filing 462 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (3845 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Status Report filed by Wael Jalaidan. ENDORSEMENT: The Court deems this status report to be sufficient. Counsel is directed to continue his efforts to communicate directly and proactively with OFAC to pursue the approval of the necessary license. In light of the holiday schedule, the next status report shall be due on February 4, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/28/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
November 22, 2017 Filing 461 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 11/22/2017 re: Adjourn Oral Argument as to Saudi Binladin Group, Al Rajhi Bank, and National Commercial Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 21, 2017 Filing 460 DECLARATION of Lawrence Boysen in Support re: (3628 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Islamic Republic of Iran.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER: terminating 3486 (in case 3md1570) Motion for Attorney Fees; terminating 3727 (in case 3md1570) Letter Motion for Conference. As discussed at the conference held on October 5, 2017, the following deadlines have been modified. Defendant World Assembly of Muslim Youth's ("WAMY's") document production shall be completed by November 30, 2017. Because WAMY has been given substantial time to produce documents, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees ("PECs") shall file a status letter discussing WAMY's document production and whether it intends to file any discovery motions by January 5, 2018. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendant Kadi shall oppose such motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. The PECs shall file any discovery motion against Defendants Muslim World League ("MWL") and International Islamic Relief Organization ("IIRO") no later than December 1, 2017, by motion not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. Defendants MWL and IIRO shall oppose such discovery motion no later than January 5, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 20 double-spaced pages. The PECs may file a reply no later than January 26, 2018, by memorandum of law not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages. All other deadlines remain in effect. In addition, in light of Defendant Perouz Sedaghaty's ongoing bankruptcy proceedings, Plaintiffs' application for attorney fees and expenses, ECF No. 3486, is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 3486 and 3727. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/12/2017) (ap) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ap) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER: The Court previously scheduled a telephone conference for 4:00 p.m. on October 5, 2017, to address certain deadlines. During the conference, the Court will also address the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' request to extend the deadlines to submit motions to compel or motions for sanctions against Defendants Muslim World League and the International Islamic Relief Organization. ECF No. 3737. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees are directed to circulate a call-in number to all interested parties and to provide that number to the Court in advance of the telephone conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/3/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(rj)
August 31, 2017 Filing 457 STATUS REPORT. Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' Status Report in accordance with the Court's July 28, 2017 Order Document filed by All Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 28, 2017 Filing 456 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Robert T. Haefele on behalf of the PECs dated August 28, 2017 re: Disputes regarding proposed deposition protocol for the MDL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 22, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (368 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 33 in 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN, 101 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN, 494 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 466 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 15 in 1:17-cv-05174-GBD, 46 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 418 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN, 221 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 768 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 449 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 556 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 565 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 39 in 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN, 981 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 9 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD, 372 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 29 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 576 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 844 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 455 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 338 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 541 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 46 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 362 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 23 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 624 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 378 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN, 66 in 1:16-cv-07853-GBD, 26 in 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN, 36 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 3698 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 46 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 363 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 21 in 1:17-cv-05471-GBD, 39 in 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN) MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14038631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (47 in 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN, 47 in 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN, 67 in 1:16-cv-07853-GBD, 47 in 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN, 48 in 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN, 37 in 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN, 40 in 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN, 3699 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 10 in 1:17-cv-06123-GBD) MOTION for Reuben J. Sequeira to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14039333. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(wb)
August 21, 2017 Filing 455 MOTION for Matthew S. Leddicotte to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14038631. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Curran, Christopher)
August 7, 2017 Filing 454 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (366 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 554 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 539 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 840 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 492 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 574 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN, 766 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 370 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 622 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 376 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN, 3674 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 979 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 563 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) Letter filed by Faisal Islamic Bank, Faisal Islamic Bank (Sudan), Faisal Islamic Bank-Sudan. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove John Lauro, Michael Califano, and Hugh Higgins from the electronic service list in all cases included in this multidistrict litigation. Attorney Hugh D Higgins and John F. Lauro terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/7/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(ap)
April 28, 2017 Filing 453 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated April 28, 2017 re: Revised Notice to Conform and Short Form Complaint. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Conform, #2 Exhibit B - Revised Proposed Short Form Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 21, 2017 Filing 452 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated April 21, 2017 re: (3524 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Steven T. Cottreau dated April 20, 2017. . Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 20, 2017 Filing 451 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated April 20, 2017 re: Response to Michael K. Kellogg's April 17, 2017 Letter on the PECs' Proposed Short Form Complaint. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 11, 2017 Filing 450 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 4/11/2017 re: Request to file amended proposals of short form complaints. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
March 23, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Status Conference held on 3/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(jnm)
September 28, 2016 Filing 449 REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Islamic Republic of Iran . Document filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration of service, #3 Exhibit Clerk's certificate)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kaplan, Robert)
July 8, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Discovery Conference held on 7/8/2016. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(mo)
March 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Oral Argument held on 3/22/2016 re: (94 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) Letter,,,,, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees, (95 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) Letter,, filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(mo)
February 5, 2016 Filing 448 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Christopher C. S. Manning, Esquire dated February 5, 2016 re: Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Document filed by Sanabel Al Kheer, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Manning, Christopher)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER. The conference scheduled for January 28, 2016 is adjourned until July 14, 2016 at 10:30 AM. (Status Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/25/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. (adc)
December 31, 2015 Filing 446 MOTION Admit Certain Evidence From A Related Case re: (112 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 3023 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Judgment,,,, Hoglan, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al.. Document filed by Hoglan Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER: The subsequent conference scheduled for January 14, 2016 is rescheduled for January 28, 2016 at 10:30 AM. (Status Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/10/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(kl)
November 9, 2015 Filing 445 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Thomas P. Steindler dated 11/4/2015 re: I respectfully request that I be removed from the docket list for the above matter, as my firm no longer represents Mr. Yassin Kadi. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., Attorney Thomas Peter Steindler terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/6/2015) (lmb)
October 30, 2015 Filing 443 CLERK'S RULE 54(b)JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated October 30, 2015, there is no just reason for delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), dismissing defendants Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina (SHC); the dismissals of defendants Saudi Arabia and SHC are certified as final pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 10/30/2015) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(dt)
October 30, 2015 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (336 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 446 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 124 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 338 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 324 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 442 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 607 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 527 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 3096 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 771 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 358 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 938 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 430 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 364 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 479 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 390 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 354 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 541 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 502 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 526 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 724 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 88 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM) Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(mro)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER: After careful consideration of the joint request for entry of final judgment, this Court finds that there is no just reason to delay the entry of a final judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b) dismissing defendants Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia & Herzegovina ("SHC"). A partial judgment under Rule 54(b) with respect to defendants Saudi Arabia and SHC is appropriate because both are immune from suit under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq. The Court has dismissed all claims asserted by any plaintiff against defendants Saudi Arabia as a foreign sovereign and SHC as an instrumentality of that foreign sovereign and has decided finally their rights and liabilities, constituting a final decision within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1291 as to those defendants. See ECF No. 3046. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's dismissals of defendants Saudi Arabia and SHC are certified as final pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare and enter a final judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al, as per Chambers.(mro)
October 29, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Kreindler, James to RE-FILE Document No. #441 belonging to case 03md1570 and 02cv6977 that was incorrectly filed on 10/29/2015 in case 03cv5738. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the appeal was filed in the wrong case.. (nd)
October 29, 2015 Filing 441 FILING ERROR - FILED IN WRONG CASES - NOTICE OF APPEAL from (3046 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Memorandum & Opinion,,. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kreindler, James) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nd).
October 13, 2015 Filing 440 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (85 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 321 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 934 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 522 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 439 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 719 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 425 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 3066 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 361 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 604 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 476 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 522 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 332 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 121 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 441 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 538 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 351 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 334 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 498 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 385 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 355 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 766 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM) Letter filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Motions due by 2/26/2016., Replies due by 12/4/2015.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(lmb)
October 13, 2015 Filing 439 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 10/13/2015 re: Extension of time.. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 21, 2015 Filing 438 AFFIDAVIT in Support re: (3042 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 117 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM) MOTION for Default Judgment as to .. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 21, 2015 Filing 437 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
September 21, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jerry Stephen Goldman to RE-FILE Document (473 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 762 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 328 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 930 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 494 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 715 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 3040 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 348 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 318 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 82 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 381 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 518 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 352 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 436 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 438 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 518 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 601 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 116 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 330 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 420 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 535 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 358 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM) MOTION for Default Judgment as to .. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
September 18, 2015 Filing 436 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 9/21/2015 (db).
September 15, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele to RE-FILE Document (357 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 3033 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 493 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 351 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 714 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 81 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 472 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 761 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 435 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 380 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 929 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-FM, 419 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 437 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-FM, 329 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 517 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 317 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 114 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-FM, 600 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 534 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 347 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 327 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 517 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) MOTION for Sanctions against Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc... Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
September 14, 2015 Filing 435 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Sanctions against Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2015 (db).
August 26, 2015 Filing 434 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman dated August 26, 2015 re: Revised Proposed Form Of Order For Entry Of Default Judgment Solely As To Liability Against The Iran Defendants. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 17, 2015 Filing 433 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jerry S. Goldman dated August 17, 2015 re: Requesting Extension of Default Judgment as to Liability Only, Obtained in this MDL against the Iran Defendants, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1605A, to the O'Neill Plaintiffs in the Case Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. The Republic of Iraq, et al., 04-CV-1076 (GBD). Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 432 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. in Support re: (99 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Islamic Republic of Iran, The Iranian Ministry of Intelligence and Security, The Iranian Minister of Intelligence and Security Ali Fallahian, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Co. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 431 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Islamic Republic of Iran, The Iranian Ministry of Intelligence and Security, The Iranian Minister of Intelligence and Security Ali Fallahian, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps, The Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corps -- Qods Force, Ayatollah Ali Hoseini-Khamenei, and Deputy Commander Brigadier General of the Iranian Revolutionary Guard Corp. Mohammed Baqr Zalqadr . Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 430 AFFIDAVIT of Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. In Support in Support re: (97 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Solely Against The Iran Defendants.. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 11, 2015 Filing 429 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Solely Against The Iran Defendants. Document filed by Estate of John Patrick O'Neill Sr..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
August 10, 2015 Filing 428 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Robert T. Haefele dated August 10, 2015 re: Request that the Court enter an order pursuant to Rule 37(a) and (b) compelling defendant Perouz Sedaghaty to immediately produce all documents and information responsive to Plaintiffs' document requests. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 10, 2015 Filing 427 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Robert T. Haefele dated August 10, 2015 re: Request that the Court enter an order pursuant to Rule 37(a) compelling defendant Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe to immediately produce all documents and information responsive to Plaintiffs' document requests. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
August 10, 2015 Filing 426 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Jerry S. Goldman, Esq. dated 08/10/2015 re: Letter Brief No. 2, Request That The Court Enter An Order Pursuant To Rule 37(a) Compelling Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan To Immediately Produce All Documents And Information Responsive To Plaintiffs' Document Requests. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Supplement OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
July 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 7/30/2015 re: (2891 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION for Leave to File A Consolidated Amended Pleading of Facts and Evidence as to The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and The Saudi High Commission for Relief of Bosnia and Herzegovina . filed by Burnett Plaintiffs, Kathleen Ashton, Federal Insurance Company, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., John Patrick O'Neill, Jr., Continental Casualty Company, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., (2893 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Saudi High Commission, The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Plaintiff Counsel: Sean P. Carter, Scott Tarbutton, Robert Haefele, James Kreindler, Jerry Goldman, Barbara Tirado, David C. Lee, Michel F. Baumeister; Defense Counsel: Michael K. Kellogg, Gregory G. Rapawy, Roy Englert, Steve Cottreau and court reporter present. The subsequent conference is scheduled for August 17, 2015 at 10:30a.m. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER: ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned: In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, No. 03-md-1570. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER: The conference currently scheduled for April 9, 2015 is adjourned to July 30, 2015 at 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/06/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER EXTENDING TIME AND LENGTH LIMITS FOR REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FOR LEAVE TO AMEND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the replies in support of the above motions each shall be filed no lather than March 27, 2015, and shall not exceed twenty pages in length. ( Replies due by 3/27/2015.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/11/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 2/03/2015 re: Accordingly, plaintiffs respectfully request the Court order the clerk's office to accept a CD Rom of the 4,000 pages to ensure that they are part of the publically filed record that both the Court and defense counsel now have. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/04/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ama)
January 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/3/2015 Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ajs)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting (402) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (695) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (2924) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (413) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD; granting (362) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (580) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD; granting (519) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD; granting (498) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD; granting (475) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (311) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (457) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD; granting (302) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (498) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (66) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM; granting (84) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD; granting (736) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM; granting (342) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM; granting (336) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD; granting (420) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD; granting (899) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD; granting (332) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD; granting (309) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. Any opposition to the Renewed Motion to Dismiss of the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia and Saudi High Commission for Bosnia & Herzegovina (SHC) is due on or before February 3, 2015. Any opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend is due on or before February 3, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. (ajs)
January 28, 2015 Filing 420 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kreindler, James)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting (395) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (678) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (2829) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (398) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD; granting (345) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (560) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD; granting (509) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD; granting (484) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD; granting (464) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (299) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (449) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD; granting (295) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (485) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (59) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM; granting (75) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD; granting (721) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM; granting (333) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM; granting (327) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD; granting (412) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD; granting (884) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD; granting (323) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD; granting (297) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. In this Court's April 23, 2014 Order, this Court adopted Magistrate Judge Maas's report and recommendation that Plaintiffs' motion for an award of attorneys' fees, due to Plaintiffs' efforts to compel the Al Haramain Defendants and Defendant Jelaidan to comply with their discovery obligations, be granted. See 03-MDL-1570, ECF No. 2851. The Clerk of the Court is therefore instructed to close the motion in In re Terrorist Attacks on September 11, 2001, 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(FM), at ECF No. 2829, and the motion in Ashton et al. v. Al Qaeda Islamic, et al., 02-CV-6977 (GBD)(FM), at ECF No. 721. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. ***Docketed in all member cases pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro)
June 18, 2014 Filing 418 RESPONSE re: (2868 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Al Haramain as ECF Document No. 2868. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
June 6, 2014 Filing 417 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: (395 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 323 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 333 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 485 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 59 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 299 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 295 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 398 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 327 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 560 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 464 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 345 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 2829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 484 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 412 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD, 509 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 721 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 449 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 884 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 297 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 678 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
June 6, 2014 Filing 416 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (395 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 323 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 333 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 485 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 59 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-FM, 299 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 295 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 398 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 327 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 560 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 464 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 345 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 2829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 484 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 412 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD, 509 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 721 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-FM, 449 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 884 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 297 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 678 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Response to Al Haramain Filing at ECF No. 2864 and in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Attorney's Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
May 15, 2014 Filing 415 AFFIDAVIT of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (2829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kreindler, James)
April 24, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 4/24/2014 re: (2773 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by Abdul Rahman Al Swailem. Plaintiff Counsel: Sean Carter, Robert Turner Haefele, James P. Kreindler, Jerry Stephen Goldman, J. Scott Tarbutton; Defense Counsel: Alan Robert Kabat,, Omar T. Mohammedi, Roni Bargoffen, Aisha Henry, Peter C. Salerno, Amy Rothstein, Frederick J. Goetz, Thomas E. Mellon, Martin F. McMahon (telephonic) and Court Reporter present. The next conference is scheduled for July 15, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Vega, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2014 Filing 414 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1, #3 Exhibit B2, #4 Exhibit B3, #5 Exhibit B4, #6 Exhibit C1, #7 Exhibit C2, #8 Exhibit C3, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 24, 2014 Filing 413 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD) MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013.. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 24, 2014 Filing 412 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to Report and Recommendation of October 28, 2013. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalfof themselves and all others similalrly situated).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER: The conference initially scheduled for Thursday, January 16, 2014 is adjourned until Thursday, April 24, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 4/24/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ja)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER: The discovery conference scheduled for September 10, 2013 is adjourned. By September 13, 2013, the parties shall submit a joint letter to my Chambers providing their availability for a further conference during the week of October 28, 2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/4/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers. (cd)
June 21, 2013 Filing 409 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Martin F. McMahon dated 6/20/2013 re: I have a serious conflict regarding next Friday's appearance with you on June 28th. Can I participate by phone instead? I would need a call-in number of course. I do not think that the plaintiffs would oppose this request, and I have emailed them to confirm. I appreciate the courtesy. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. Mr. McMahon should telephone (212)805-4051 five minutes before the scheduled conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 6/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: that the law firm of Doar Rieck Kaley & Mack is hereby substituted for the law firm of Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP as counsel of record for defendant Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(ja)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the May 30, 2013 conference is adjourned to June 28, 2013, at 11 a.m. The conference shall take place in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 6/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 5/24/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels(djc)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER: Pursuant to the conference held on April 16, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By April 30, 2013, Mr. Haefele shall submit a letter setting forth any reasons that the parties should not be required to move jointly before Judge Gershon to modify the protective order in Linde v. Arab Bank, PLC, such that any documents protected by the order may be disclosed in this litigation. 2. Also by April 30, 2013, Mr. Haefele shall submit any additional letter-briefing as to whether Plaintiffs may rely on the work-product doctrine to withhold certain documents related to their prior FOIA requests. 3. A further conference shall be held on May 30, 2013, at 12 p.m., in Courtroom 20A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. ( Status Conference set for 5/30/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/22/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. (djc) Modified on 4/23/2013 (djc).
April 4, 2013 Filing 405 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/19/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 4, 2013 Filing 404 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER: Pursuant to the conference held on March 19, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By March 29, 2013, Al-Haramain shall produce any paper documents received pursuant to Judge Aiken's order that are responsive to the plaintiffs' requests. By that date, Al-Haramain also shall produce a privilege log for any such documents as to which privilege is claimed. 2. By April 19, 2013, Al-Haramain shall produce any remaining documents or files received pursuant to Judge Aiken's order that are responsive to the plaintiffs' requests and, if applicable, a corresponding privilege log. 3. The Court will reserve decision on the plaintiffs' motion for sanctions against Al-Haramain. 4. A further conference shall be held on April 16, 2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/19/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
March 12, 2013 Filing 402 Reply Letter Brief (as to defendant Rabita Trust, with Exhibits A-Ct)addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 3/12/2013 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this reply in further support of plaintiffs' January 30, 2013 motion to compel ("Motion to Compel") defendant Rabita Trust Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
March 12, 2013 Filing 401 Reply Letter Brief (as to defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, with Exhibit A) addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 3/12/2013 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this reply in further support of their January 30, 2013 motion to compel ("Motion to Compel") defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan to produce: (1) all documentation and information verifying efforts the defendant and his counsel have undertaken to request and secure documents responsive to plaintiffs' requests for production of documents, consistent with this Court's November 16, 2011 Order as set forth herein; Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/15/2013 (djc).
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. At the request of counsel for the plaintiffs and defendants Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan and Rabita Trust, the Court directs that the following items be separately docketed as of record by the Clerk of the Court with the Court's ECF System: (a) Plaintiffs' January 30, 2013 opening letter brief as to defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, including Exhibits A-D; (b) Plaintiffs' January 30, 2013 opening letter brief as to defendant Rabita Trust, including Exhibits A-N; (c) Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan's March 1, 2013 opposition brief, including Exhibits 1-10; (d) Defendant Rabita Trust's March 1, 2013 opposition brief, including Exhibits 1-6; (e) Plaintiffs' March 12, 2013 reply letter brief as to defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, including Exhibit A; and (f) Plaintiffs' March 12, 2013 reply letter brief as to defendant Rabita Trust, including Exhibits A-C. 2. A copy of this Order shall accompany those filings. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/14/2013 (djc).
March 1, 2013 Filing 400 OPPOSITION Letter Brief of Defendant Rabita Trust with Exhibits 1-6 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/15/2013 (djc).
March 1, 2013 Filing 399 OPPOSITION Letter brief of Defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, including exhibits 1-10. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference held on February 21, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By February 28, 2013, each defendant that has produced documents, but has not served a privilege log, shall submit a letter to the Plaintiffs confirming that no documents have been withheld pursuant to the attorney-client privilege or work/product doctrine. 2. Also by February 28, 2013, any defendant who has withheld all of its documents on the basis of privilege or work/product protection shall submit a letter to the Plaintiffs explaining their reason for not submitting a privilege log. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 2/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable George B. Daniels. (djc)
February 21, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2013. Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(cd)
February 8, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. [2654, et al] HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Robert Turner Haefele : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
January 30, 2013 Filing 398 Opening Letter Brief (as to defendant Rabita Trust w. Exhibits A-N) addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/30/2012 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this letter and the accompanying exhibits and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(a), compelling defendant Rabita Trust, an Executive Order 13224 designee as set forth herein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc)
January 30, 2013 Filing 397 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/30/2013 re: The Plaintiffs' Executive Committees, on behalf of all plaintiffs, submit this letter and the accompanying exhibits and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(a), compelling defendant Wa'el Hamza Jelaidan, a co-founder of al Qaeda and Executive Order 13224 designee as set forth herein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(djc) Modified on 3/15/2013 (djc).
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. At the request of the counsel for the Plaintiffs, the Court directs that the following items be separately docketed as of record by the Clerk of the Court with the Court's ECF system: (1) the Letter Memorandum of the Plaintiffs, dated January 9, 2013, seeking imposition of sanctions against defendant Al Haramain, and (2) the attorney declaration of Robert T. Haefele, with accompanying Exhibits A-Y, in support of the Plaintiffs' request, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that 2. Defendant Al Haramain and the plaintiffs may file their respective opposition and reply papers concerning the above-referenced motion via the Court's ECF system, and a copy of this order shall accompany those filings. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 1/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies via ECF.(mro)
December 19, 2012 Filing 393 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/22/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
December 19, 2012 Filing 392 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2012 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER GOVERNING IDENTIFICATION OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(js)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/22/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Plaintiffs should initiate the call. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers(cd)
April 24, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Note to Attorney Jerry Goldman that Document No. 389 was incorrectly filed in this case. It should have been filed only in cases: 03md1570, 04cv1922. (nd)
April 24, 2012 Filing 389 FILING ERROR - DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE - CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (2588 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 309 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD) Notice of Appeal,. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr., Sandra Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry) Modified on 4/24/2012 (nd).
March 19, 2012 Filing 388 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Martin J. Schwartz. Document filed by Banca Del Gottardo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Schwartz, Martin)
March 16, 2012 Filing 387 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Hugh D. Higgins. Document filed by Faisal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Lauro, John)
March 13, 2012 Filing 386 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/15/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 13, 2012 Filing 385 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/15/2012 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from T. Barry Kingham dated 3/8/2012 re: Counsel requests that Your Honor direct the Court to remove Counsels name and e-mail address from the list of recipients of Notices of Electronic Filings Counsel's firm represented. Alfaisaliah Group (a/k/a Faisal Group Holdings Co.) and Prince Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdullah Al Saud. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(js)
December 28, 2011 Filing 383 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Omar Mohammedi and Frederick Goetz dated 12/28/2011 re: Request for the postponement of the 1/13/2012 hearing. ENDORSEMENT: The 1/13th conference was set up to follow Judge Daniels' conference earlier the same day and obviously involves numerous parties. I therefore am unwilling to move it simply to address these discrete issues. We can address the issues at the 2/15 conference and make any necessary adjustment in the discovery schedule following at that time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 12/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(cd)
December 20, 2011 Filing 382 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (2495 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) Objection (non-motion) - Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Perouz Sedaghaty's Rule 72 Objections to Magistrate Judge Maas' November 22, 2011 Ruling. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying (2403) Motion to Stay in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. For the foregoing reasons, Sedaghaty's motion to stay discovery is denied, and the Plaintiffs' application to compel Sedaghaty to respond to their Document Demands is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 11/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al. Copies Sent By Chambers and via ECF. (mro)
July 14, 2011 Filing 378 RULE 54(b) CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated July 13, 2011, the Court finds no just cause for delay, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), entering final judgment dismissing the defendants identified in Exhibit A. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/14/11) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(ml)
July 13, 2011 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (24 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD) Order,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(ml)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER that the Court's dismissal of the defendants identified in Exhibit A are certified as final pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)and the Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare and enter a final judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/13/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(ml) Modified on 7/14/2011 (ml).
July 6, 2011 Filing 380 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Robert T. Faefele dated 7/6/2011 re: For the Plaintiffs Executive Committees on behalf of all of the plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs"), we write in reply to the June 29, 2011 letter of defendant Perouz Sedaghaty (a/k/a Pete Seda, a/k/a Abu Yunas) ("Sedaghaty") and in further support of Plaintiffs' request dated June 17, 2011, and as further specified in this letter. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
June 17, 2011 Filing 379 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from The MDL 1570 Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 6/17/2011 re: We write for the Plaintiffs Executive Committees on behalf of all of the plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") to ask the Court for an order under Rule 37 (a)(3)(B)(iv) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure compelling defendant Perouz Sedaghaty (a/k/a Pete Seda, a/k/a Abu Yunas) ("Sedaghaty") to produce the information requested in Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Perouz Sedaghaty, served on Sedaghaty on December 10, 2010, and never answered.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(lmb)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER defendant Cherif Sedky is DISMISSED from Barrera,03-7036 and from Salvo, 03-5071. In Tremsky v Laden, 02-7300, defendant Cherif Sedky's unopposed motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant Cherif Sedky is dismissed from all of the above actions. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/20/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(cd)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: It is hereby Ordered that Frederick J. Goetz is admitted pro hac vice. (Pursuant to Chambers instructions the following attorney is admitted for the following parties). (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(jfe)
December 1, 2010 Filing 374 NOTICE of Correction to Reference in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc (USA)'s Rule 72 Objections to October 28, 2010 Ruling (Docket Entry 2389) re: (2389 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM) Response,. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 29, 2010 Filing 373 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Opposition re: (2384 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, part 1, #6 Exhibit B-3, part 2, #7 Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit B-5, part 1, #9 Exhibit B-5, part 2, #10 Exhibit B-5, part 3, #11 Exhibit B-6, #12 Exhibit B-7, part 1, #13 Exhibit B-7, part 2, #14 Exhibit B-7, part 3, #15 Exhibit B-8, #16 Exhibit B-9, #17 Exhibit B-10, #18 Exhibit B-11, part 1, #19 Exhibit B-11, part 2, #20 Exhibit B-12, #21 Exhibit B-13, #22 Exhibit B-14, part 1, #23 Exhibit B-14, part 2, #24 Exhibit B-15, #25 Exhibit B-16, #26 Exhibit B-17, #27 Exhibit B-18, #28 Exhibit B-19, #29 Exhibit B-20, #30 Exhibit B-21, #31 Exhibit B-22, #32 Exhibit B-23, #33 Exhibit B-24, #34 Exhibit B-25, #35 Exhibit B-26, #36 Exhibit B-27, #37 Exhibit B-28, #38 Exhibit B-29, #39 Exhibit B-30, #40 Exhibit B-31, #41 Exhibit B-32, #42 Exhibit B-33, #43 Exhibit B-34, #44 Exhibit B-35, #45 Exhibit B-36, #46 Exhibit B-37, #47 Exhibit B-38, #48 Exhibit B-39, #49 Exhibit B-40, #50 Exhibit B-41, #51 Exhibit B-42, #52 Exhibit B-43, #53 Exhibit B-44, #54 Exhibit B-45, #55 Exhibit B-46, #56 Exhibit B-47, #57 Exhibit B-48, #58 Exhibit B-49, #59 Exhibit B-50, #60 Exhibit B-51, #61 Exhibit B-52, #62 Exhibit B-53, #63 Exhibit B-54, #64 Exhibit B-55, #65 Exhibit B-56, #66 Exhibit B-57, #67 Exhibit B-58, #68 Exhibit B-59, #69 Exhibit B-60, #70 Exhibit C, #71 Exhibit D, #72 Exhibit D-61, #73 Exhibit E, part 1, #74 Exhibit E, part 2, #75 Exhibit E, part 3, #76 Exhibit E, part 4, #77 Exhibit E, part 5, #78 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 29, 2010 Filing 372 RESPONSE re: (2384 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM) Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. (USA)'s Rule 72 Objections to October 28, 2010 Ruling. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
November 8, 2010 Filing 371 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND Re Saudi Binladin Group renewed Motion to Dismiss: Responses due by 11/18/2010. Replies due by 12/20/2010. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/8/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(cd)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Timothy McCabe dated 10/4/2010 re: I request that you direct the Clerk of the Court to remove my name and e-mail address from the list of recipients of Notices of Electronic Filings in the above-referenced cases. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/4/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(jmi)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from T. Barry Kingham dated 10/4/2010 re: Counsel request that you direct the Clerk of the Court to remove counsel's name and e-mail address from the Notices of Electronic Filings. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 10/4/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(jfe)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 368 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION that Clifford Chance US, LLP be substituted as attorneys of record for defendant Dubai Islamic Back in place of Zuckerman Gore Brandeis & Crossman, LLP. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD -FM et al.(cd)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Alan Todd Dickey is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant NCB in the above captioned cases in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/7/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER. Defendant Saudi Binladin Group's application for leave to renew its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim is granted and its tendered motion to dismiss supporting memoranda are accepted for filing. Counsel is directed to file the tendered motion via the Court's ECF system as soon as practicable. Plaintiffs shall submit a consolidated response, not to exceed 45 pages, within 60 days of the electronic filing of Saudi Binladin Group's motion. Saudi Binladin Group may file a reply brief, not to exceed 25 pages, within 30 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/7/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION: That Mishcon de Reya New York LLP of200 Park Avenue, Floor 44, New York, NY 10166, telephone (212) 612-3270, facsimile (212) 612-3297, be substituted as attorneys of record for defendant DMI Administrative Services S.A. in this consolidated action in place of Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP as of the date hereof. Attorney James Joseph McGuire for DMI Administrative Services S.A. and DMI Administrative Services, S.A. added. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/18/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(db)
June 18, 2010 Filing 365 AFFIDAVIT OF JAMES J. MCGUIRE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO CHANGE COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 1.4. Document filed by Daral Maal Al Islami Trust. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 363 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Mishcon de Reya New York LLP of 200 Park Avenue, Floor 44, New York. NY 10166, telephone (212) 612-3270, facsimile (212) 612-3297, be substituted as attorneys of record for defendant Dar Al-Maal Al-Islami Trust in the above-captioned consolidated action in place of Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP as of the date hereof. Attorney James Joseph McGuire for Daral Maal Al Islami Trust added. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/18/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Other than to the limited extent indicated herein, defendant's Dubai Islamic Bank's motion to dismiss, pursuant to Fed.R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6), for failure to state a claim is denied. Dubai Islamic Bank's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper service of process, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) and (5) respectively, is also denied. The remaining moving defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), are granted. Final judgment is entered as to those thirty seven defendants, as well as to the twelve additional defendants whom plaintiffs concede dismissal is warranted. As the Court indicated at the April 15, 2010 conference, the parties shall immediately meet and confer, and propose to the magistrate judge a schedule, commencing on or after July 15, 2010, to complete discovery in all cases. Terminated all motions as per instructions of chambers. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
May 10, 2010 Filing 361 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support. Document filed by C. O'Neill. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
April 26, 2010 Filing 360 MOTION for Colin Sullivan Stretch to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Document filed by Saudi Joint Relief Committee.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
April 26, 2010 Filing 359 AFFIRMATION of Robert T. Haefele (corrected) in Opposition re: (2110 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs(on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Part 2))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 23, 2010 Filing 358 AFFIRMATION of Robert T. Haefele in Opposition re: (2110 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Part 2))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
April 23, 2010 Filing 357 NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority in Relation to All Pending Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit D part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
April 15, 2010 Filing 356 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Kellogg on behalf of Saudi Joint Relief Committee Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
March 16, 2010 Filing 355 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD) MOTION to Strike Document No. [MDL 2232].. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
March 16, 2010 Filing 354 MOTION to Strike Document No. [MDL 2232]. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Goldman, Jerry)
December 17, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (338 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 232 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 248 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 430 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 274 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 270 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 550 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 247 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 351 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 2212 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 365 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 276 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 8 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD, 612 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD, 369 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 353 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 749 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 235 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 360 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 266 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 462 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. granting (245) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (548) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (2208) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM; granting (336) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD; granting (272) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD; granting (460) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD; granting (428) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD; granting (363) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD; granting (349) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD; granting (233) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD; granting (367) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD; granting (245) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; granting (358) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD; granting (6) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD; granting (610) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD; granting (274) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM; granting (268) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD; granting (351) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD; granting (747) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD; granting (264) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD; granting (230) Motion for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER TO WITHDRAW DARIN J. MCMULLEN, MARK E. GOTTLIEB AND WILLIAM H. PILLSBURY AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD. Before the Court is the Motion to Withdraw Darin J. McMullen, Mark E. Gottlieb and William H. Pillsbury as Attorneys of Record as counsel for Plaintiffs in Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. AI Baraka Investment & Development Corp., et. al. 04-CV-1923 (GBD) (FM), Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. Republic; of Iraq, et al. 04-CV-1076 (GBD) (FM), and Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, et al. 04-CV-1922 (GBD)(FM) (collectively "O'Neill Plaintiffs"). It is ORDERED that Darin J. McMullen, Mark E. Gottlieb and William H. Pillsbury be withdrawn as counsel for the O'Neill Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. It is further ORDERED that all other counsel listed in the record of the law firm of Anderson, Kill & Olick, P.C. will continue to represent the O'Neill Plaintiffs in this matter. granting (2198) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
November 25, 2009 Filing 351 NOTICE OF MOTION for Hugh D. Higgins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Faisal Islamic Bank, Faisal Islamic Bank (Sudan). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
November 9, 2009 Filing 350 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Khalid Bin Mahfouz, New Party: The Estate of Khalid Bin Mahfouz, Naylah Abd-al-Aziz Kaaki, Abdelrahman Khalid Bin Mahfouz, Sultan Khalid Bin Mahfouz, and Iman Khalid Bin Mahfouz. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 349 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (3 in 1:09-cv-07055-GBD) MOTION to Strike Document No. (2189).. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 348 MOTION to Strike Document No. (2189). Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER. In accordance with the Court's directive at the July 15, 2009 conference, the Court has reviewed the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee letter submissions of July 8, 2009, copies of which are annexed hereto as Exhibits "A" and "B" respectively. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees and the Defendants' Executive Committee letter submissions of July 8, 2009 be separately docketed as of record by the Clerk of the Court with the Court's ECF system. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
July 16, 2009 Filing 346 REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (LETTERS ROGATORY) FOR THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS BY THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. This Court, in the spirit of comity and reciprocity, hereby requests international judicial assistance in the form of this Letter Rogatory seeking the documents and things described herein, from the ICTY and the Office of the Prosecutor. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
July 14, 2009 Filing 345 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Relation to All Pending Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Flowers, Jodi)
April 13, 2009 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (2166 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM) MOTION to Strike Document No. (2163) or, Alternatively, for Leave to Respond to New Arguments in Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Declaratory Relief. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to National Commercial Bank's Motion to Strike or for Leave to Respond. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Haefele, Robert)
March 30, 2009 Filing 343 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Mitchell R. Berger dated 3/27/09 re: For the foregoing reasons, and as explained further in our August 21, 2008 letter, this Court should: quash the Subpoenas; deny all of plaintiffs' pending requests for additional jurisdictional discovery as to NCB; and direct plaintiffs to respond promptly to NCB's renewed motion to dismiss, allowing NCB a period of not less than 30 days to submit its reply papers. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a conference on 4/9/09 at 11:30 am in Courtroom 20A to discuss this application. Opposing counsel is encouraged to respond in writing prior to then., (Conference set for 4/9/2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 3/30/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
September 15, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (538 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 235 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 2131 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 354 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 259 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 236 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 599 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD, 358 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 325 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 342 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 265 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 263 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 224 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 339 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 450 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 737 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 418 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 349 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 221 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 255 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Colin S. Stretch for Saudi Joint Relief Committee admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/15/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
September 15, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (223 in 1:04-cv-07216-GBD, 323 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD, 258 in 1:03-cv-05071-GBD, 2129 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 357 in 1:04-cv-07280-GBD, 235 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD, 341 in 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 448 in 1:04-cv-01923-GBD, 598 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD, 264 in 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-FM, 262 in 1:04-cv-01922-GBD, 417 in 1:04-cv-06105-GBD, 220 in 1:03-cv-08591-GBD, 234 in 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM, 537 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 353 in 1:04-cv-05970-GBD, 338 in 1:04-cv-07065-GBD, 736 in 1:03-cv-06978-GBD, 254 in 1:03-cv-07036-GBD, 348 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD) Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (2128) Motion for Mark E. Gottlieb, William H. Pillsbury, Darin J. McMullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/15/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER. Defendant National Commercial Bank's application for leave to renew its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, is granted. Defendant's request, to submit a single supporting memorandum of law not to exceed 35 pages, is also granted. To the extent that plaintiffs believe that additional jurisdictional discovery is necessary prior to filing a response, a specific discovery request and a request for a stay or extension of the time in which to respond to the motion should be made to the magistrate judge. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/11/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
July 8, 2008 Filing 340 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/8/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD(rjm) Modified on 7/29/2008 (rjm).
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER TO WITHDRAW MICHAEL J. GUZMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD that Michael J. Guzman be withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Prince Turki Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud in the referenced action. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/8/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
February 12, 2008 Filing 337 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD(Elsner, Michael)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER... that Ronald S. Liebman is relieved as one of the attorneys of record for NCB in the captioned actions. It is further ordered that appearance of Mitchell R. Berger for NCB in the captioned actions will remain unchanged. This document relates to 02cv7236, 03cv3859 as well as the member cases listed on this document. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (1227) Motion to Add ; granting (1228) Motion to Add in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. The Burnett plaintiffs' unopposed motions, purs. to FRCP 15(d), to add parties are granted. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/9/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(rjm)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER. The Estate of deft. Mohammad Abdullah Aljomaih moved to dismiss the claims asserted against deft., pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 25(a)(1), in all the complaints in which he was named. No opposition to the motion has been filed, and the time in which to do so has expired. If no opposition to the motion is filed within 30 days of this Order, the motion will be granted as to all the complaints in which defendant is named. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/3/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD; granting (1832 in 03md1570) Motion to Vacate in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM. Plaintiffs' request to strike those portions of defendant's motion, seeking dismissal of the claims asserted against him, is denied. Plaintiffs shall respond to defendant's filed motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD, 1:04-cv-07279-GBD, 1:04-cv-07280-GBD(rjm)
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD; granting (1384 in 03md1570) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is hereby ordered that David P. Donovan is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Prince Mohamed al Faisal al Saud in this action. Attorney David Patrick Donovan terminated in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
May 31, 2007 Filing 331 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, DMI Administrative Services S.A., Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Ahmed Totonji, Iqbal Yunus, Mohammed Jaghlit, Aradi, Inc., Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc., Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, Abdullah Bin Laden, Abdulrahman Bin Khalid Bin Mahfouz, Saleh Abdullah Kamel, Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Abdullah Omar Naseef, Saudi Dallah Al Baraka Group LLC, Tadamon Islamic Bank, Alfaisaliah Group, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation, Bakr M Bin Laden, Tarek M. Bin Laden, Omar M. Bin Laden, Mohamed Bin Laden Organization (SBG), Saudi Binladin International Company, Yeslam M. Bin Laden, Talal Mohammed Badkook, M.M. Badkook Co. for Catering & Trading, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi, Adnan Basha, Saudi Joint Relief Committee, Dallah Avco Trans Arabia Co. LTD., Mohammed Jamal Khalifa, M. Yaqub Mirza, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Safar Al-Hawali, Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini, Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company, Sheik Salman Al-Oawdah, World Assembly of Muslim Youth, Ahmed Zaki Yamani, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Islamic Assembly of North America, Saudi Red Crescent, Yassin Abdullah Kadi, Daral Maal Al Islami Trust, Dubai Islamic Bank, African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Sanabel Al-Kheer, Inc., Sana-Bell, Inc., Muhammad Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Schreiber & Zindel, Frank Zindel, Engelbert Schreiber, Engelbert Schreiber, Jr, Martin Watcher, Erwin Watcher, Banca Del Gottardo, Abdul Aziz Al-Ibrahim, Council on American-Islamic Relations (CAIR), Yousef Jameel, Asat Trust Reg., Jamal Barzini, Khaled Bin Mahfouz, National Commercial Bank, Sercor Treuhand Anstalt, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation (United States), Abdullah Bin Khalid Al Thani, M. Omar Ashraf a/k/a Muhammad Ashraf, Sulaiman Abdul Aziz Al-Rajhi, Al Aqsa Islamic Bank, Riggs Bank, N.A., Riggs National Corporation, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid, Perouz Seda Ghaty, Faisal Islamic Bank-Sudan, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi. (Attachments: #1 Bell Atlantic Corp. et al. v. Twombly et al.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(Kellogg, Michael)
May 15, 2007 Filing 330 SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Defendant HRH Prince Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud on May 4, 2007. Document filed by Alfaisaliah GroupAssociated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM, 1:03-cv-05738-GBD, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD(Kingham, T. Barry)
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER... that plaintiffs' General Steering Committee and defendants' Executive Committee each shall submit a letter to the Court by 5/28/07 summarizing the status of the captioned case... Response letters must be submitted to the Court by 6/4/07. Status Conference set for 6/26/2007 10:00 AM before Judge George B. Daniels... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-FM et al.(rjm)
April 25, 2007 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq)
April 17, 2007 Filing 328 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Richard C. Casey is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
December 15, 2006 Filing 327 MOTION for SHERYL MUSGROVE to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Sami Omar Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McKay, Scott)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 326 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF YUSUF AL-QARADAWI (This document relates to: 03 cv 5738; 03 cv 9849; 02 cv 6977; 04 cv 5970; 04 cv 6105); The Burnett Ashton, Continental Casualty co. and New York Marine and General Insurance Co. pltffs and deft Yusuf Al-Qaradawi agree to the dismissal of deft Yusuf Al-Qaradawi, without prejudice, each side to bear it's own attorney's fees, costs and expenses. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/27/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC(sn)
October 20, 2006 Filing 325 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard.. Document filed by Burnett Plaintiffs, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., World Trade Center Properties LLC, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Elsner, Michael)
October 18, 2006 Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard.. Document filed by New York Marine and General Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Fromm, David)
October 17, 2006 Filing 323 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., WTC Retail LLC, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Leonardo, Christopher)
October 17, 2006 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1903 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Statement of Jean-Charles Brisard. FEDERAL INSURANCE AND O'NEILL PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT KHALID BIN MAHFOUZ. Document filed by John Patrick O'Neill, Jr, Federal Insurance Company et al., Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
October 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 321 STIPULATION AND ORDER, agreed between Plaintiffs in the referenced cases and Defendant Yusuf Al-Qaradawi the following extensions: Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to 1877 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints.: Responses due by 10/11/2006 Replies due by 11/13/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/4/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC(rjm, )
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MEMORANDUM & ORDER regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of The Defendants' Executive Committee's application for an umbrella protective order covering all materials produced during discovery in the captioned case which is granted in part. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/3/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER... that Ugo Colella is relieved as one of the attorneys of record for National Commercial Bank of Saudi Arabia in the captioned actions. It is further ordered that appearances of Ronald S. Lieberman and Mitchell R. Berger for National Commercial Bank of Saudi Arabia in the captioned actions will remain unchanged. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/11/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC. This Document also relates to 02-7236 and 03-3859.(rjm, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF LAW FIRMS AS COUNSEL... that the law firm of Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP, shall be hereby substituted for the law firm of Hunton & Williams LLP as counsel of record for defendant Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/25/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
August 4, 2006 Filing 317 DECLARATION of Abdullah Bin Khalid Al-Thani in Support re: 1758 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Khalid Al-Thani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Nachman, David)
July 31, 2006 Filing 316 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #307 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani.. Document filed by Ahmed Zaki Yamani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Hamilton, Rayner)
July 12, 2006 Filing 315 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1758 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Khalid Al-Thani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Nachman, David)
July 11, 2006 Filing 314 STIPULATION AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570, Sheikh Yusuf Al Qardawi's answer to the complaint is due on 8/4/2006. Plaintiffs shall have 60 days from receipt of Defendants motion papers to & through 10/4/06 to file opposition papers, Deftendant shall have 30 days from receipt of Plaintiffs' opposition papers, to and through 11/4/06 to file reply papers. Deadlines set: Replies due by 11/4/2006. Responses due by 10/4/2006 (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/10/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC(rjm, )
July 11, 2006 Filing 313 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL that through counsel, the Burnett plaintiffs and defendants Bakr Binladin, Omar Binladin, Tariq Binladin, and Hamad Al-Husaini have agreed to and hereby stipulate to the dismissal, with prejudice, of defendants Bakr Binladin, Omar Binladin, Tariq Binladin, and Hamad Al-Husaini... each side to bear its own attorney's fees, costs, and expenses. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/10/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(rjm, )
July 10, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #307 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani. Responses due by 7/17/2006 (db, )
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 312 STIPULATION AND ORDER It is agreed by and between Ptffs. in all of the referenced cases consolidated under 03 MDL 1570 and Deft. Ahmed Zaki Yamani by and through their undersigned counsel, that Ptffs' time to respond to Defts' 1832 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani is due by 7/17/06 and that Defts' time to file reply papers shall be fourteen days after receipt of service of the ptffs' response. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 1832 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani.: Responses due by 7/17/2006 (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/10/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
June 28, 2006 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1838 MOTION to Strike Document No. 1789 DMI Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Further Support of Motions to Dismiss.. Document filed by Daral Maal Al Islami Trust, DMI Administrative Services S.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James)
June 28, 2006 Filing 310 MOTION for Johnathan Goodman Stacey Saiontz to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Leonardo, Christopher)
June 23, 2006 Filing 309 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1738 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion.. Document filed by Tadamon Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
June 5, 2006 Filing 308 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #307 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani.. Document filed by Ahmed Zaki Yamani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)(Hamilton, Rayner)
June 5, 2006 Filing 307 MOTION to Vacate Defaults and Dismiss the Claims Against Ahmed Zaki Yamani. Document filed by Ahmed Zaki Yamani. (Hamilton, Rayner)
June 5, 2006 Filing 306 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rayner Max Hamilton on behalf of Ahmed Zaki Yamani (Hamilton, Rayner)
May 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Please take notice that Baker Botts LLP shall be and hereby is substituted for Bryan Cave LLP, as counsel of record for defendant Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/30/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
May 22, 2006 Filing 304 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1697 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Asat Trust Reg.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David)
May 18, 2006 Filing 303 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1658 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Yassin Abdullah Kadi To Dismiss Complaints.. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Arthur, Bonnie)
April 21, 2006 Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1697 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Asat Trust. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
April 19, 2006 Filing 301 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
April 19, 2006 Filing 300 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC-FM,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
April 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH #3 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #4: Fact Discovery shal be completed by 6/30/2007. Expert Discovery: Experts are to be designated and their expert reports exchanged by 8/15/07. Expert depositions shall commence after 8/15/07 and shall be completed by 10/15/07. All liability discovery is to be completed by 10/15/07... The Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Executive Committees shall confer and submit a proposal to the Court regarding revised discovery deadlines on or before 4/15/07. Discovery due by 6/30/2007. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/13/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
March 31, 2006 Filing 298 STIPULATION AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 1644 MOTION to Dismiss Ashton, Federal Insurance, World Trade Center, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, New York Marine, and Burnett (5738) Complaints.: Extension of time for plaintiffs to file an opposition to the Binladin defts' motion to dismiss, which was filed on 1/27/06, Responses due by 4/18/2006... and as further set forth in said stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/30/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
March 28, 2006 Filing 297 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1714 MOTION to Strike Document No. [1697-98] Cross Motion to Strike Asat Trust's Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 1697-98.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
March 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [1720 in Case No. 03md1570] MOTION to Strike Document No. [1665 in Case No. 03md1570] Declaration of Jean-Charles Brisard, Affidavit of Carmen Bin Ladin, and Statement of Guillaume Dasquie. Responses due by 4/21/2006... and as further set forth in said stipulation & order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/27/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
March 21, 2006 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1714 MOTION to Strike Document No. [1697-98] Cross Motion to Strike Asat Trust's Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 1697-98., 1697 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Asat Trust Reg.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David)
March 20, 2006 Filing 294 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY AL SHAMAL ISLAMIC BANK. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
March 15, 2006 Filing 293 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1500 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
March 15, 2006 Filing 292 DECLARATION of Omar T. Mohammedi in Support re: 1458 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion., 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
March 15, 2006 Filing 291 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1458 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion., 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
March 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 290 STIPULATION AND ORDER. It is hereby stipulated & agreed by & between Ptffs in all of the above-referenced cases consolidated under 03MDL1570 and Deft. Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, by & through their undersigned counsel, that Ptffs' time to respond to Deft's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss of Deft. Sami Omar Al-Hussayen Submitted Purs. to Case Mgt. Order No. 4 shall be extended to 2/10/06, and that Defts' time to file reply papers shall likewise be extended two additional days. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/9/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
March 8, 2006 Filing 289 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Steven K. Barentzen in Support re: 1541 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Jamal Barzinji. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
March 8, 2006 Filing 288 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1541 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Jamal Barzinji. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
March 7, 2006 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1714 MOTION to Strike Document No. [1697-98] Cross Motion to Strike Asat Trust's Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 1697-98.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
March 7, 2006 Filing 286 MOTION to Strike Document No. [1697-98] Cross Motion to Strike Asat Trust's Motion to Dismiss, Docket No. 1697-98. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
February 20, 2006 Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1697 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Asat Trust Reg.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David)
February 20, 2006 Filing 284 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Asat Trust Reg.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David)
February 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 283 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570... It is hereby stipulated and agreed, between counsel for Federal Insurance Plaintiffs, represented by J. Scott Tarbutton on behalf of all Plaintiffs in the captioned actions, and counsel for Defendants World Assembly of MuslimYouth in Saudi Arabia and the World Assembly of Muslim Youth International, represented by the Law Firm of Omar T. Mohammedi, LLC that the parties respectfully seek this Court's approval for an extension of time for the Defendants WAMY SA and WAMY USA to Reply to the referemced Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), filed on 1/23/06; It is stipulated & agreed that Defts' Reply Briefs shall be served within fifty days of serviceof Ptffs' Opposition motions... and as further set forth in said stpiulation & order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/15/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC, 1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
February 15, 2006 Filing 282 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Jamie S. Kilberg dated 2/6/06 re: Application is granted. The Clerk of the Court is asked to note on the docket that the motions have been withdrawn. Accordingly Motion document #1515 in 03md1570 is withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC, 1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 281 STIPULATION WITH REGARD TO RULINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS HRH PRINCE NAIF BIN ABDULAZIZ AL-SAUD, HRH PRINCE SALMAN BIN ABDULAZIZ AL-SAUD, AND THE SAUDI HIGH COMMISSION IN RELATED CASES... subject to the approval of the Court that the parties hereto adopt as a binding order in the Actions, with regard to Prince Naif, Prince Salman, and the SHC, the Opinion and Order of this Court dated 9/21/05, deciding the consolidated motions... and as further set forth in said stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/8/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 280 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 04cv6105, 04cv7280); that plaintiffs' time to respond to defendants Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, and the Saudi High Commission's motion to dismiss shall be extended to 2/1/2006, and defendants' time to file reply papers shall be extended to 3/3/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 2/6/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC, 1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, )
February 3, 2006 Filing 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Raymond R. Castello on behalf of Aradi, Inc. served on All Counsel on February 1, 2006. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard)
February 3, 2006 Filing 278 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss served on All Counsel on February 2, 2006. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard)
February 2, 2006 Filing 277 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC).. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard)
February 2, 2006 Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC). Plaintiffs Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Aradi, Inc.. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Feldman, Elliott)
February 1, 2006 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC).. Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard)
February 1, 2006 Filing 274 MOTION to Dismiss originally filed October 20, 2005 in 03-MDL-1570 (RCC). Document filed by Aradi, Inc.. (Castello, Richard)
February 1, 2006 Filing 273 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Castello on behalf of Aradi, Inc. (Castello, Richard)
January 27, 2006 Filing 272 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1453 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Iqbal Yunus, Mohammed Jaghlit, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
January 25, 2006 Filing 271 DECLARATION of Gina M. MacNeill, Esquire in Opposition re: 1040 MOTION to Dismiss., 926 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
January 25, 2006 Filing 270 DECLARATION of Gina M. Mac Neill, Esquire in Support re: 1640 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. [1591-1592].. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
January 24, 2006 Filing 269 CROSS MOTION to Strike Document No. [1591-1592]. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
January 24, 2006 Filing 268 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 926 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction., 1040 MOTION to Dismiss. Specifically refers to Defendants Supplemental Memorandum of Law Docket # 1591-2. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
January 23, 2006 Filing 267 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss served on All Parties on January 23, 2006. Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations (CAIR). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
January 23, 2006 Filing 266 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1411 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations (CAIR). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 03cv9849, 03cv6978, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 04cv6105, 04cv7280); extending plaintiffs' time to respond to Yeslam Binladin's motion to dismiss to 2/3/2006; any reply by defendant shall be served on or by 3/10/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, )
January 23, 2006 Filing 264 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1438 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Saleh Abdullah Kamel, Dallah Al Baraka Group LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
January 19, 2006 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1614 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Supplement)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
January 19, 2006 Filing 261 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Al Shamal Islamic Bank. Responses due by 3/20/2006 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
January 19, 2006 Filing 260 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1433 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
January 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER (this document relates to all actions); the 1/10/2006 Judgment entered by the Clerk in these cases applies only to cases in which the Court has granted the named Defendants' motions to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, )
January 11, 2006 Filing 259 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1388 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance., 1385 MOTION to Dismiss NY Marine.. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James)
January 11, 2006 Filing 258 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1304 MOTION to Dismiss New York Marine., 1302 MOTION to Dismiss the Continental Casualty and Federal Insurance actions.. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdulaziz Al Ibrahim. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James)
January 10, 2006 Filing 257 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated December 16, 2005, that there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), final judgment is entered dismissing the following twelve defendants: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, HRH Crown Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Mohamed Al-Faisal Al-Saud, the Saudi High Commission, Sheikh Hamad Al-Husani, Abdulrahman bin Mahfouz, Tariq Binladen, Omar Binladen, and Bakr Binladen. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 1/10/06) (Attachments:, #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(ml, )
January 9, 2006 Filing 256 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to CMO No. 4. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Abdullah Omar Naseef, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Talal Mohammed Badkook, Adnan Basha, Safar Al-Hawali, Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini, Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Saudi Red Crescent, Salman Al-Ouda. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
January 9, 2006 Filing 255 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to CMO No. 4. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Perouz Seda Ghaty. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
December 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 04cv1923, 03cv5738); extending the time for the Personal Injury Plaintiffs to file their opposition to WAMY's motion to dismiss within 60 days of service of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Property Plaintiffs' claims; Defendants' reply briefs shall be served within 30 days of service of the Plaintiffs' oppositions... (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/29/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, )
December 23, 2005 Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1411 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. CAIR. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
December 20, 2005 Filing 252 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1433 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Burnett & Ashton Plaintiffs, Continental Casualty Company, Euro Brokers Inc., et al., World Trade Center Properties LLC, et al., New York Marine and General Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Elsner, Michael)
December 19, 2005 Filing 251 STIPULATION AS TO BRIEFING SCHEDULE RELATING TO COMPLAINTS CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570... It is stipulated & agreed by and between Plaintiffs in all of the referenced cases consolidated under 03 MDL 1570 and Defendants Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, and the Saudi High Commission, by and through the undersigned counsel, that Defendants' counsel shall file Reply papers by 3/1/2006. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be due by 1/30/2006 (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC, 1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
December 19, 2005 Filing 250 DECLARATION of Joshua M. Ambush in Opposition re: 1526 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ambush Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 19, 2005 Filing 249 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1526 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11. O'Neill Plaintiffs' Response to the Defendant, Taha Al' Alwani's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 11. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER... that the Court's dismissals of the Kingdom of Saidi Arabia, HRH Crown Preince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki-Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Naif bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Mohamed Al- Faisal Al-Saud, the Saudi High Commission, Sheikh Hamad Al-Husani, Abdulrahman bin Mahfouz, Tariq Binladen, Omar Binladen, and Bakr Binladen in the Court's Orders of 1/18/05, 5/5/05, and 9/21/05, are certified as final purs. to the FRCP 54(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare and enter a final judgment. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC, 1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
December 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 247 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING THE SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOHAMMAD BINLADIN ORGANIZATION, SAUDI BINLADIN INTERNATIONAL CO., YESLAM BINLADIN, ABDULLAH BINLADIN, BAKR BINLADIN, TARIQ BINLADIN, AND OMAR BINLADIN TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS... agreed by & between counsel for Plaintiffs in the captioned cases and for named Defendants Bakr Binladin, Tariq Binladin, Omar Binladin, Mohammad Binladin Organization, and Saudi Binladin International Co., (collectively Bakr, etal."), Yeslam Binladin, and Abdullah Binladin, by and through their undersigned counsel that Bakr, et al. shall serve their consolidated motion to dismiss on or before January 27, 2006. Plaintiffs shall serve their consolidated opposition to that motion on or before 3/28/06, and the movants shall serve their consolidated reply on or before 4/27/06. Plaintiffs shall serve their consolidated opposition to Yeslam Binladin's motion to dismiss on or before 1/20/06 and Yeslam Binladin shall serve his consolidated reply on or before 2/24/06. Plaintiffs shall serve their consolidated opposition to Abdullah Binladin's motion to dismiss on or before 1/30/06 and Abdullah Binladin shall serve his consolidated reply on or before 3/1/06. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
December 13, 2005 Filing 246 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by International Islamic Relief Organization(IIRO). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McMahon, Martin)
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 245 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5: That the Defendants shall designate a single Executive Committee which shall have the following authority, and no other authority: To confer and agree with Ptffs' Executive Committee on scheduling matters relating to court hearings, depositions, and deadlines affecting Defts. generally, and on proposed agenda items for court hearings. To coordinate communications with counsel for any Ptff. seeking the consent of Defendants generally to a nondispositive motion. To coordinate the examination of witnesses by defense counsel at a deposition or hearing. To coordinate communications with Ptffs' Executive Committee and with the Court concerning any requested changes in this Case Mgt. & Pretrial Scheduling Order. Any deft. may, by motion filed and served upon all parties, object to any action of the Defts' Executive Committee and request the Court to modify that action. The Defts' Executive Committee shall consist of members chosen by the Defts. Those members may in turn select from among their number a chair or co-chairs and will so inform the Court. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 244 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4: This Order supplements and amends Case Management Order #2, issued by the Court on 6/15/04 and docketed by the Clerk's office on 6/16/04. Unless supplemented or amended by this or another Order of the Court, the provisions of Case Management Order #2 remain in full force and effect... The following control dates are hereby adopted with respect to the discovery process: Fact Discovery shall be completed by 6/30/2006. Expert Discovery: Experts are to be designated and their expert reports exchanged by 8/15/06. Expert depositions shall commence after 8/15/06 and shall be completed by 10/15/06. All liability discovery is to be completed by 10/15/06. The parties recognize that further developments in this complex litigation may require that the control dates set forth above be extended or otherwise amended. The Ptffs' and Defts' Executive Committees shall confer and submit a proposal to the Court regarding revised discovery deadlines on or before 4/15/06... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
December 9, 2005 Filing 243 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 242 CONSENT MOTION AND STIPULATION AS TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS CONSOLIDATED UNDER MDL 1570... that the time provided for the Plaintiffs to file a consolidated opposition to the motions to dismiss submitted by DMI S.A. and DMI Trust shall be extended to and through 12/19/2005. DMI S.A. shall file reply papers in the Cantor Fitzgerald and O'Neill actions on 1/20/06; in the Burnett D.C., Burnett N.Y., World Trade Center Properties, and Euro Brokers actions on 1/27/06; and in the Federal Insurance and N.Y. Marine actions on 2/3/06. DMI Trust shall file reply papers in the N.Y. Marine, Continental Casualty, and Federal Insurance actions on 2/3/06; in the Ashton, Cantor Fitzgerald, and O'Neill actions on 2/10/06; and in the Burnett D.C., Burnett N.Y., World Trade Center Properties, and Euro Brokers actions on 2/17/06... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/8/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
December 7, 2005 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1541 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Jamal Barzinji. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
December 7, 2005 Filing 240 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Jamal Barzini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
December 5, 2005 Filing 239 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Wa'el Hamza Jalaidan. Related document: #3 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,.(McMahon, Martin)
December 5, 2005 Filing 238 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by International Islamic Relief Organization. Related document: #3 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,.(McMahon, Martin)
December 1, 2005 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Hisham Al-Talib, Iqbal Yunus, Jamal Barzinji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza, Saar Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
December 1, 2005 Filing 236 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Hisham Al-Talib, Iqbal Yunus, Jamal Barzinji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza, Saar Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
December 1, 2005 Filing 235 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esquire in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 1, 2005 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Gina M. Mac Neill, Esquire in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 1, 2005 Filing 233 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman, Esquire in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 1, 2005 Filing 232 DECLARATION of Gina M. Mac Neill, Esquire in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
December 1, 2005 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #230 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints.. Document filed by Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Jeffress, William)
December 1, 2005 Filing 230 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints. Document filed by Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Jeffress, William)
November 30, 2005 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #228 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of the FSIA Defendants for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kellogg, Michael)
November 30, 2005 Filing 228 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Saudi High Commission, Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kellogg, Michael)
November 30, 2005 Filing 227 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Notice of Motion of HRH Prince Mohamed Al Faisal Al Saud for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Document filed by Mohammed Al Faisal Al Saud. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Allen, Tracey)
November 22, 2005 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #226 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rjm, )
November 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Initial Conference set for 12/2/2005 11:30 AM before Judge Richard C. Casey in Courtroom 23A for oral argument in the pending motions for consolidation, appointment of lead plaintiff, and approval of selection of lead counsel; Any attorney not admitted to practice in this District is directed to apply for admission pro hac vice purs. to Rule 1.3 of the Local Rules of the US District Court for the Southern & Eastern Districts of New York; and, all future orders shall be filed with the caption listed unless otherwise indicated. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/22/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
November 22, 2005 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1504 MOTION to Dismiss. Ashton, Burnett, Federal Insurance, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, New York Marine, World Trade Center Properties. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Laden. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Abdullah A. Binladin)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gauch, James)
November 22, 2005 Filing 224 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Laden. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gauch, James)
November 22, 2005 Filing 223 DECLARATION of Ally Hack in Support re: 1502 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,., DECLARATION of Ally Hack re: 1502 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
November 21, 2005 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Omar T. Mohammedi in Support re: 1500 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
November 21, 2005 Filing 221 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
November 18, 2005 Filing 220 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 219 DECLARATION of Gina M. MacNeill in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Joshua M. Ambush in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 217 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1495 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 216 MOTION Strike Defendant Taha Al Alwani's Motion to Dismiss, to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, for Leave to File RICO Statement, For Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Relative to the Filing of A RICO Statement and other Relief. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 215 DECLARATION of Jerry S. Goldman in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Gina M. MacNeill in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Joshua M Ambush in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 18, 2005 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1468 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 3, 2005 Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1392 MOTION to Dismiss (corrected). Jerry S. Goldman. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Goldman, Jerry)
November 2, 2005 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1458 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion., 1456 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Wamy International, Inc., World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Attachments: #1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mohammedi, Omar)
November 2, 2005 Filing 209 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #206 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Personal Injury Plaintiffs. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Attachments: #1)(Mohammedi, Omar) Modified on 11/8/2005 (gf, ).
November 1, 2005 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss on November 1, 2005. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Mohammedi, Omar)
November 1, 2005 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Omar T. Mohammedi in Support re: #206 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Mohammedi, Omar)
November 1, 2005 Filing 206 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by World Assembly of Muslim Youth. (Mohammedi, Omar)
October 31, 2005 Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Iqbal Yunus, Mohammed Jaghlit, Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, M. Yaqub Mirza, Taha Al Alwani. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
October 28, 2005 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1449 MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion.. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Iqbal Unus (Yunus), Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
October 28, 2005 Filing 203 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (WRONG PARTY SELECTED)- MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion. Document filed by Ahmed Totonji, Mohammed Jaghlit, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Iqbal Unus (Yunus), Muhammad Ashraf, M. Omar Ashraf, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, M. Yaqub Mirza. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven) Modified on 11/1/2005 (gf, ).
October 28, 2005 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence H. Schoenbach. Document filed by Yeslam M. Bin Laden. (Gauch, James)
October 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CONSENT MOTION AND STIPULATION AS TO SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA AND EXTENSION OF TIME that on 11/4/05, DMI S.A. and/or DMI Trust shall serve & file 3 supplemental memoranda, no to exceed 10 pages each. DMI S.A. shall respond to the O'Neill ptffs' First Consol. Complaint; DMI Trust shall respond to the Ashton ptffs' Sixth Amended Complaint; and DMI Trust shall respond to the Continental Casualty ptffs' Second Amended Complaint and DMI S.A. & DMI Trust shall respond to the NY Marine ptffs' Second Amended Complaint. The time provided in the Global Stipulation for ptffs to file a partially consolidated opposition to the motions submitted by DMI S.A. shall be extended to & through 12/5/05, and that the time provided in the Global Stipulation for ptffs, who will now be deemed to include the Continental Casualty ptffs, to file a partially consolidated opposition to the motions by DMI Trust shall be extended to 12/19/05. DMI S.A. shall file reply pprs. in the Cantor Fitzgerald & O'Neill actions on 1/13/06; in the Burnett D.C. N.Y., World Trade Center Props., and Euro Brokers actions on 1/20/06; and in the Federal Insurance action on 1/27/06. DMI Trust shall file reply pprs. in the NY Marine, Continental Casualty, and Federal Insurance action on 1/27/06; in the Ashton, Cantor Fitzgerald, and O'Neill actions on 2/3/06; and in the Burnett D.C., Burnett N.Y., WTC Props., and Euro Brokers actions on 2/10/06... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 10/27/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
October 24, 2005 Filing 200 DECLARATION of Dr. Friedrich Wohlmacher in Support re: 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process.. Document filed by Martin Watcher, Erwin Watcher, Sercor Treuhand Anstalt, Asat Trust Reg.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David)
October 24, 2005 Filing 199 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process.. Document filed by Martin Watcher, Erwin Watcher, Sercor Treuhand Anstalt, Asat Trust Reg.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Gourevitch, David)
October 21, 2005 Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1433 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
October 21, 2005 Filing 197 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by Mena Corporation, Sterling Management Group, Inc., African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, York Foundation, Sterling Charitable Gift Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Barentzen, Steven)
October 18, 2005 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Support re: 892 MOTION to Dismiss., 654 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Plaintiffs (Ashton, Burnett, O'Neill, Salvo, and Tremsky)., 655 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Complaints (Ashton, Burnett, Salvo, and Tremsky)., 656 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Cantor Fitzgerald, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties)., 657 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties).. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Support re: #99 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss., #87 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss., #97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Support re: #86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss., #98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss., #83 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Support re: #85 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 186 RESPONSE in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss., #84 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett)., #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third Amended Complaint (Burnett).. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 18, 2005 Filing 185 RESPONSE in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
October 17, 2005 Filing 184 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for an Order Adjourning Indefinately the Time For Defendant Faisal Islamic Bank - Sudan to Respond to Recent Pleadings. Document filed by Faisal Islamic Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Lauro, John)
October 4, 2005 Filing 183 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brown in Support re: 1388 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance., 1389 Memorandum of Law in Support,,. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James)
October 4, 2005 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1388 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance.. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James)
October 4, 2005 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss Continental Casualty, Burnett, WTC, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance. Document filed by Ibrahim Bin Abdul Aziz Al Ibrahim Foundation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(McGuire, James)
September 28, 2005 Filing 180 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 179 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 178 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 177 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 176 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 175 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 174 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 173 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 27, 2005 Filing 172 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 26, 2005 Filing 171 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 26, 2005 Filing 170 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 26, 2005 Filing 169 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 26, 2005 Filing 168 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Dismiss (filed in error on 03cv9849 as document number 241). Document filed by Khalid Bin Salim Bin Mahfouz. (Gauch, James)
September 23, 2005 Filing 167 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Aradi, Inc. served on 7/21/2004, answer due 8/10/2004; Benevolence International Foundation-USA served on 1/13/2005, answer due 2/2/2005; American Muslim Foundation (AMF) served on 6/2/2004, answer due 6/22/2004; Aqsa Islamic Bank served on 7/28/2004, answer due 8/17/2004; Hisham Al-Talib served on 7/27/2004, answer due 8/16/2004; Ahmed Idris Nasreddin served on 5/27/2004, answer due 6/16/2004; Mamoun Darkazanli served on 5/27/2004, answer due 6/16/2004; Somali Network, A.B. served on 5/27/2004, answer due 6/16/2004. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company et al., Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit #10 Exhibit #11 Exhibit #12 Exhibit #13 Exhibit #14 Exhibit #15 Exhibit #16 Exhibit #17 Exhibit #18 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. ABDULLAH NASEEF. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT ADNAN BASHA. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT HAMAD AL-HUSAINI. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS SHEIKH SAFER AL-HAWALI AND SHEIKH SALMAN AL-OADAH. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS MOHAMED ALI MUSHAYT AND THE MUSHAYT FOR TRADING ESTABLISHMENT. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss. plaintiffs' consolidated memorandum of law in opposition to motion to dismiss by defendants Talal M. Badkook and M.M. Badkook Company. Document filed by Continental Casualty Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kaplan, Robert)
September 20, 2005 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS OF SHAHIR ABDULARAOUF BATTERJEE. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
September 20, 2005 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT SHEIKH SALEH AL-HUSSAYEN. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. ABDULLAH BIN SALEH AL-OBAID. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT DR. ABDULLAH BIN ABDUL MOHSEN AL-TURKI. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 20, 2005 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss. PLAINTIFFS? MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO DISMISS OF THE SAUDI RED CRESCENT SOCIETY AND DR. ABDUL RAHMAN AL SWAILEM. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliott)
September 14, 2005 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION., 1100 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process., 1101 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process. Regarding Martin Wachter, Erwin Wachter, Asat Trust and Sercor Treuhand Anstalt. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
September 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Brief submission from each side setting out their respective positions on topics mentioned in this order due by 9/22/2005. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2005 11:00 AM before Judge Richard C. Casey in Crtrm. 14C to address Case Management Plan, Managing Correspondence to the Court, and Motions to Dismiss... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
September 7, 2005 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1204 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Omar Naseef. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1201 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1198 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1195 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 142 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Adnan Basha. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 7, 2005 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1192 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Talal Mohammed Badkook. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1189 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 136 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Sheik Hamad Al-Husaini. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-9)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1186 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Safar Al-Hawali. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1183 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1180 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1177 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Saleh Al-Hussayen. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Kabat in Support re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1174 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
September 6, 2005 Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Saudi Red Crescent. Responses due by 9/20/2005 Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
August 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TO ADMIT MARY ELLEN POWERS PRO HAC VICE (This document relates to all actions); Mary Ellen Powers is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of deft Saudi Binladin Group, Inc. in this matter. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/16/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(sn)
August 10, 2005 Filing 119 STIPULATION AS TO CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFTS. DALLAH AL BARAKA, SALEH KAMEL, AND AL BARAKA INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT CORP. that effective w/the Court's endorsement or entering of this Stipulation, Dallah, ABID's and Saleh Kamel's pending motions to dismiss the Cantor ptffs' complaint will be withdrawn w/out prejudice automatically w/the Court's endorsement or entering on this Stipulation; Ptffs. must file their RICO statements if any for Dallah no later than 30 days after the Court endorses or enters this Stipulation; Dallah, ABID and Saleh Kamel must answer or otherwise move to dismiss Ptffs' complaints no later than 75 days following the Court's endorsement or entry of this Stipulation... and as further set forth in said Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
August 9, 2005 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 926 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction., 1040 MOTION to Dismiss. Schreiber and Zindel, Frank Zindel, Engelbert Schreiber Sr., Engelbert Schreiber Jr.. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
August 8, 2005 Filing 117 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 892 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv7279, 03cv6978, 04cv6105, 04cv1923, 04cv7280); regarding service of process and extension of time as to defendants DMI Administrative Services S.A., and Dar Al-Maal Al-Islami Trust, as set forth in this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/26/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, )
July 14, 2005 Filing 115 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 869 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Reply to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 14, 2005 Filing 114 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 869 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Reply to Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Sulaiman Al Rajhi's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 14, 2005 Filing 113 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 865 MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Saleh Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 14, 2005 Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 867 MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 1, 2005 Filing 111 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF MOHAMMED HUSSEIN AL AMOUDI that the Burnett, Euro Brokers and World Trade Center plaintiffs and defendant, Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi, have agreed to and hereby stipulate to the dismissal of defendant, Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi without prejudice, each side to bear its own attorney's fees, costs, and expenses.. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/1/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
June 28, 2005 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #110 Motion to Dismiss. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sn)
June 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that the Court hereby finds that Al Watania Poultry is not currently a defendant in the actions: 03-5738, 03-9849, 02-7300 & 04-7280. The Court further finds that Al Watania Poultry is not required to file an answer or other pleading in response to the above-named complaints unless and until such time as it is added as a party defendant. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/23/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
June 15, 2005 Filing 109 STIPULATION AS TO TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT AL RAJHI BANK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. It is Stipulated & Agreed by & between Plaintiffs in all actions consolidated under 03 MDL 1570, and Defendant Al Rajhi Banking & Investment Corp., by & through their undersigned counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Reply to Al Rajhi Bank's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment shall be served on or before 6/20/05. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/14/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
June 15, 2005 Filing 108 STIPULATION AS TO TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT SAUDI AMERICAN BANK'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. It is agreed by & between plaintiffs in all actions consolidated under 03 MDL 1570, and defendant Saudi American Bank, by & through their undersigned counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Reply to Saudi American Bank's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment shall be served on or before 6/20/05. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/14/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(rjm, )
June 6, 2005 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 919 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA, PRINCE SULTAN BIN ABDUL AZIZ AL SAUD, PRINCE TURKI AL FAISAL AL SAUD, PRINCE MOHAMED AL FAISAL AL SAUD, AND AL. Document filed by Saudi American Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Polovoy, Brian)
June 6, 2005 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 919 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA, PRINCE SULTAN BIN ABDUL AZIZ AL SAUD, PRINCE TURKI AL FAISAL AL SAUD, PRINCE MOHAMED AL FAISAL AL SAUD, AND AL. Document filed by Al Rajhi Bank. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Curran, Christopher)
June 2, 2005 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re: 919 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTS REGARDING DEFENDANTS KINGDOM OF SAUDI ARABIA, PRINCE SULTAN BIN ABDUL AZIZ AL SAUD, PRINCE TURKI AL FAISAL AL SAUD, PRINCE MOHAMED AL FAISAL AL SAUD, AND AL by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, HRH Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki Al-Faisal Al-Saud, and HRH Prince Mohamed Al Faisal Al Saud. Document filed by Mohammed Al Faisal Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Prince Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Jeffress, William)
May 9, 2005 Filing 103 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 656 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Cantor Fitzgerald, Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties)., 657 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Property Damage and Insurance Complaints (Continental Casualty, Euro Brokers, Federal Insurance, NY Marine, and World Trade Center Properties).. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Perouz Seda Ghaty. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
May 9, 2005 Filing 102 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 654 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Plaintiffs (Ashton, Burnett, O'Neill, Salvo, and Tremsky)., 655 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Complaints (Ashton, Burnett, Salvo, and Tremsky).. Document filed by Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Perouz Seda Ghaty. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
May 9, 2005 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Kabat, Alan)
May 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ORDER ON MOTION granting 879 (Doc #879 in 03md1570, Doc. #96 in 03-5738, Doc. #222 in 03-9849, and Doc. #284 in 02-6977) Motion for David F. Geneson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, )
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (this document relates to all cases); for the reasons stated in the Court's 1/18/2005 Order, the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, HRH Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, HRH Prince Turki Al-Faisal, HRH Prince Mohamed Al-Faisal, and Al Rajhi Banking & Investment Corporation are DISMISSED from all remaining cases consolidated before this Court under docket number 03 MDL 1570. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, )
May 5, 2005 Filing 100 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. that Ptffs in the referenced actions hereby voluntarily dismiss Deft. Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al-Jomaih (D203) from cases 03-5738, 03-9849, 04-7279 & 04-7280. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER. The Court hereby finds that Omar Sulaiman Al Rajhi is not a deft. in the following actions: 03-5738, 03-9849, 04-7280. The Court further finds that Omar Sulaiman Al Rajhi is not required to file an answer or other pleading in response to the above-named complaints. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(rjm, )
May 5, 2005 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT of Steven P. Solow in Support re: 879 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for David F. Geneson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, )
May 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice that the Motion for admission pro hac vice is granted in all respects for David F. Geneson, Esq. $25.00 fee pending. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, )
May 5, 2005 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT of David F. Geneson in Support. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, )
April 29, 2005 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 869 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
April 29, 2005 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss Sulaiman Al Rajhi., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Sulaiman Al Rajhi. Document filed by Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
April 29, 2005 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 867 MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
April 29, 2005 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss Abdullah Al Rajhi., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Abdullah Al Rajhi. Document filed by Abdullah Salaiman Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
April 29, 2005 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 865 MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi.. Document filed by Saleh Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
April 29, 2005 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Saleh Al Rajhi., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Saleh Al Rajhi. Document filed by Saleh Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Saleh Abdulaziz Al-Rajhi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Melsheimer, Thomas)
April 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER (this document relates to all actions); regarding the scheduling of the next round of oral argument, as set forth in this Order. The Court will issue a decision on the pending motions to dismiss by the 17 defendants represented by DLA Piper Rudnick, and the pending motions to dismiss by the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia (and, in the O'Neill matter, certain of its agencies), Prince Sultan, prince Turki, Prince Mohamed, and the al Rahji Banking & Investment Co., without further brieing or argument. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/27/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, )
April 28, 2005 Filing 86 ENDORSED LETTER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv7036. 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 03cv6978, 04cv6105, 04cv1923, 03cv5071, 02cv7300, 04cv7280) addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from John M. Helms dated 4/25/2005; counsel for defendant Sulaiman Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi writes to request a 10-page extension of the page limit for memoranda of law in support of a dismissal motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Court asks counsel to meet 25 page limit. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/27/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, )
April 26, 2005 Filing 96 NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for David F. Geneson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(rjm, )
April 8, 2005 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 654 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Personal Injury Plaintiffs (Ashton, Burnett, O'Neill, Salvo, and Tremsky). O'Neill Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pertaining to Certain RICO Issues Only. Document filed by Estate of John P.O'Neill, Sr.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Mac Neill, Gina)
April 7, 2005 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 803 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or, in the alternative, for more definite statement. Document filed by Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC(d' Auguste, James)(kkc, )
April 7, 2005 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss the complaints or, in the alternative, for more definite statement. Document filed by Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC(d' Auguste, James) (kkc, ) Modified on 4/7/2005 (kkc, ).
March 23, 2005 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Note: Summons & Complaint were successfully received by the Dept. of State on (date not indicated, rec'd by the Clerk's Office on 4/5/05) in regard to certified mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2649 to be forwarded to The Republic of The Sudan through diplomatic channels. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 23, 2005 Filing 82 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt at the following address: Edward A. Betancourt Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State, 2100 Pennsylvania Ave., SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 on 3/23/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2649 to be forwarded by way of diplomatic channels to The Republic of the Sudan, Ministry of External Affairs, Dr. Mustafa Osman Ismail, PO Box 873, Khartoum, Sudan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 23, 2005 Filing 81 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt at the following address: Edward A. Betancourt Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State, 2100 Pennsylvania Ave, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20530 on 3/23/05 by Registered Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2694 to be forwarded by way of diplomatic channels to The Islamic Republic of Iran, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Dr. Seyed Kamal Kharrazzi, Ebn e Sina Street, Tehran, Iran. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Mark J. MacDougall for Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi; Nicole H. Sprinzen for Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi; Mara Zusman for Mohammed Hussein Al Amoudi admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/23/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC(kkc, )
March 18, 2005 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Note: Summons & Complaint were successfully received by the Dept. of State on 3/28/05 in regard to certified mail #'s 7002 2410 0002 6964 2595 and 7002 2410 0002 6964 2618 to be forwarded to The Republic of Iran and The Republic of Iraq respectfully. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 77 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Saudi Commission for Relief and Charity Abroad at the following address: Saudi Commission for Relief and Charity Abroad c/o The Saudi Ministry of Foreign Affairs, PO Box 55937, Postal Code 11544, Riyadh, Saudi Arabia on 3/18/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 892 243 and RB 632 892 257. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 76 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Prince Saud Al Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud, Nasseriya Street, PO Box 55937, Postal Code 11124 Riyadh, Saudi Arabia on 3/18/05 by Registered Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2632. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 75 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to The Syrian Arab Republic Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Farouk Al-Shara, Muhajereen Shora Avenue, Damascus, Syria on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2601. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 74 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to Republic of Iraq Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Hoshyar Zebab, Karradat Maryam, Baghdad, Iraq on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2618. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 73 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to Republic of Iran at the following address: Republic of Iran Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Dr. Seyed Kamal Kharrazi, Ebn e Sina Street, Eman Khomeini Square, Tehran Iran on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0002 6964 2595. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 18, 2005 Filing 72 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Complaint mailed to Edward A. Betancourt, Director of Special Consular Services, US Dept. of State2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, SA-29-4F, Washington DC 20520 to be sent by diplomatic channels to Republic of the Sudan at the following address: Republic of the Sudan Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Dr. Mustafa Osman Ismail, PO Box 873, Khartoum, Sudan c/o on 3/18/05 by Certified Mail Receipt # 7001 2410 0002 6964 2625. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
March 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv5738, 03cv6978, 03cv9849, 04cv1923, 04cv5970, 04cv6105, 04cv7065, 04cv7279, 04cv7280); the time for defendant Dubai Islamic Bank to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in each of the cases referenced above shall be on or before 5/27/2005; plaintiffs shall serve their respective RICO statements concerning Dubai Islamic Bank on or before 4/29/2005... (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/16/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, )
March 16, 2005 Filing 70 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Last publication date 01/13/2005. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(Feldman, Elliot)
March 2, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Complaint mailed to Air Force Intelligence c/o Farouk Al-Shara on 3/2/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 889 774, RECEIVED ON: 3/17/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber, Schreiber and Zindel on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 755, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber Jr., Schreiber and Zinel on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 747, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg. on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 733, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Schreiber and Zindel on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 716, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 702, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Secor Treuhand Anstalt on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 693, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 720, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg. on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 870, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber, Schrieber and Zindel on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 852, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Secor Treuhand Anstalt on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 866, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schrieber, Jr., Schreiber and Zindel on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 835, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Schreiber and Zindel on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 818, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schrieber on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 804, RECEIVED ON: 3/18/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 781, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Martin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg. on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 778, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Asat Trust Reg. on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 764, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons and Second Amended Complaint mailed to Asat Trust Reg. on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 821, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Matin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg. on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 849, RECEIVED ON: 3/14/05. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 Filing 79 (1) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Treuhand-u. Verwaltungsburo, Altenbach 1, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 781. (2) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Dr. Frank Zindel at the following address: Dr. Frank Zindel, Sonnblickstrasse 7, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 795. (3) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Kirkstrass 39, Privat, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 804.(4) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Schreiber & Zindel at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Krichstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 818.(5) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Asat Trust Reg. at the following address: Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 821. (6) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber, Jr. at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Kirchstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 835. (7) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Martin Wachter at the following address: Martin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 849. (8) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Schreiber and Zindel, Truehand-Ansalt, Kirchstr. 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 866. (9) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Secor Treuhand Anstalt at the following address: Secor Hreuhand Anstalt, Kirkstrass 39, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 866(?). (10) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 870. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
February 28, 2005 Filing 78 (1) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 733. (2) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Erwin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter Treuhand-u. Verwaltungsburo, Altenbach 1, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 720. (3) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Secor Treuhand Anstalt at the following address: Secor Hreuhand Anstalt, Kirkstrass 39, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 693. (4) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Asat Trust Reg. at the following address: Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 764. (5) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Schreiber & Zindel at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Krichstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 716. (6) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Dr. Frank Zindel at the following address: Dr. Frank Zindel, Sonnblickstrasse 7, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 680. (7) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber, Jr. at the following address: Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Kirchstrasse 39, FL9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 747. (8) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engelbert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Kirchstr. 39, Privat, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 702. (9) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Engel Bert Schreiber at the following address: Engelbert Schreiber, Schreiber and Zindel, Treuhand-Anstalt, Kirchstrasse 39, FL-9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 755. (10) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Second Amended Complaint mailed to Martin Wachter at the following address: Erwin Wachter, Asat Trust Reg., Altenbach 8, 9490 Vaduz, Liechtenstein, on 2/28/05 by Registered Mail # RB 632 969 778. (ps, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2005. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(ps, )
January 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv6978, 02cv6977, 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 04cv7065, 04cv5970, 04cv7279, 04cv6105, 04cv1923, 04cv7280); that plaintiffs pursuing claims for relief under the RICO Act shall serve their respective RICO Statements concerning the stipulating defendants on or before 3/31/2005. The time for defendants Sulaiman Abdulaziz Al Rajhi, Abdullah Sulaiman Al Rajhi, Omar Sulaiman Al Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al Rajhi, and Saleh Abdulaziz Al Rajhi to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in each of the cases in which they are defendants, shall be on or before 4/29/2005. All other agreements are set forth in this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/27/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC, 1:04-cv-07280-RCC(kkc, )
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION and ORDER #91124 (this document relates to 02cv6977, 02cv7300, 03cv5071, 03cv5738, 03cv6978, 03cv7036, 03cv8591, 03cv9849); that for the reasons set forth in this Opinion and Order, Prince Sultan bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud's motions to dismiss the Burnett, Ashton, Tremsky, Salvo, Barrera, and Federal Insurance complaints for lack of subject matter and personal jurisdiction are granted. Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud's motions to dismiss the Burnett, Ashton, Tremsky, Salvo, Barrera, and Federal insurance complaints for lack of subject matter and personal jurisdiction are granted. The Kingdom of Saudi Arabia's motion to dismiss the Federal Insurance and Vigilant Insurance complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction are granted. Prince Mohamed Al-Faisal Al-Saud's motions to dismiss the Ashton and Federal Insurance complaints for lack of personal jurisdiction are granted. Mohammad Abdullah Aljomaih's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Sheikh Hamad al Husani's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Abdulrahman bin Mahfouz's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Tariq, Omar and Bakr Binladin's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. Al Rajhi Banking & Investment Corporation's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint for failure to state a claim is granted. Saudi American Bank's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for failure to state a claim are granted. Arab Bank's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Federal Insurance complaints for failure to state a claim are granted. Al Baraka and Saleh Abdullah Kamel's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for failure to state a claim are granted. National Commercial Bank's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for lack of subject matter and personal jurisdiction are denied without prejudice. The Burnett and Ashton negligence claims against National Commercial Bank are dismissed for failure to state a claim. The Saudi Binladin Group's motions to dismiss the Burnett and Ashton complaints for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim are denied without prejudice, but the TVPA and negligence claims against SBG are dismissed. The SAAR Network (African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Mena Corporation, Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust, Sana-Bell Inc., Sterling Charitable Gift Fund, Sterling Management Group, Inc., and York Foundation)'s motion to dismiss the Federal complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim is denied without prejudice. The RICO, TVPA, assault and battery, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and negligence claims against the SAAR Network are dismissed. Adel Batterjee's motion to dismiss the Burnett complaint is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/18/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC, 1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-08591-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
January 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting Motion for Donna M. Sheinbach to Withdraw as Attorney. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/14/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-05970-RCC,1:04-cv-06105-RCC, 1:04-cv-07065-RCC,1:04-cv-07216-RCC,1:04-cv-07279-RCC,1:04-cv-07280-RCC,1:04-cv-07281-RCC(kkc, )
December 22, 2004 Filing 66 MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bonnie K. Arthur for Yassin Abdullah Kadi admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/20/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
December 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 02cv6977); that Hunton & Williams LLP is substituted for McDermott Will & Emery LLP as counsel for defendant Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/20/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
December 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bonnie K. Arthur for Yassin Abdullah Kadi admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/7/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
December 3, 2004 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Joseph J. Saltareill in Support re: #295 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph J. Saltarelli)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC(Saltarelli, Joseph)
December 3, 2004 Filing 62 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #295 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement.. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Kadi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC,1:04-cv-07065-RCC(Saltarelli, Joseph)
November 5, 2004 Filing 61 ENDORSED LETTER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv5738, 03cv9849) addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 11/4/2004; granting counsel's application for an extension of time until 11/8/2004 for the Ashton plaintiffs to file their brief in opposition to defendant Yassin al Qadi's motion to dismiss, and that defendant al Qadi will file a consolidated reply on or before 12/3/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 11/4/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
October 28, 2004 Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Alfaisaliah Group, Faisal Group Holding Co.. (Kingham, T. Barry)
September 30, 2004 Filing 59 ENDORSED LETTER (this document relates to 02cv6977, 03cv9849, 03cv5738, 03cv6978) addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Andrea Bierstein dated 9/27/2004; granting counsel's application for an extension of time to 10/4/2004 to file their opposition papers on the AFG Defendants' motions to dismiss, and that the AFG Defendants would have until 10/29/2004 to file their reply papers. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/29/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
September 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 03cv9849, 03cv6978, 04cv1923); that John D. Shakow and Deborah S. Burstein of King & Spalding are relieved as two of the attorneys of record for defendant Arab Bank Plc; that defendant Arab Bank Plc shall continue to be represented in this matter by counsel of record Richard A. Cirillo, Richard T. Marooney, Jr. and Jeanette M. Viggiano of the New York office of King & Spalding LLP. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 9/22/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, )
September 7, 2004 Filing 57 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Saudi High Commission. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Max Huffman Decl. in Support)(Robbins, Lawrence)
August 27, 2004 Filing 56 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaints.. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara E. Kropf#2 Attachment #1#3 Exhibit A#4 Exhibit B#5 Exhibit C#6 Exhibit D#7 Attachment #2#8 Attachment #3#9 Attachment #4)(Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing Omitted Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss the Complaints. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaints.. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B (Part 1)#3 Exhibit B (Part 2)#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E)(Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaints. Document filed by Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 52 NOTICE of Correction Regarding Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: #51 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 51 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints.. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara E. Kropf#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5)(Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Jeffress, William)
August 5, 2004 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. (Jeffress, William)
August 4, 2004 Filing 47 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from James P. Kreindler dated 7/30/2004; granting the Ashton, Burnett and Federal Plaintiffs' request to submit a thirty page consolidated brief in opposition to defendant Naif bin Abdulaziz al-Saud?s motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 8/2/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 48 MEMO-ENDORSEMENT (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738) on copy of #338 Motion for Justin B. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849, 03cv5738. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted pending approval of attorney admissions office. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/28/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 46 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from James P. Kreindler dated 7/29/2004; granting the Ashton, Burnett and Federal Plaintiffs' request to submit a thirty page consolidated brief in opposition to Prince Salman bin Abdul Aziz al-Saud's motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/29/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
July 30, 2004 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Faisal Group Holding Co., Alfaisaliah Group, Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kingham, T. Barry)
July 30, 2004 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Faisal Group Holding Co., Alfaisaliah Group, Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. (Kingham, T. Barry)
July 22, 2004 Filing 43 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Justin B. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
July 22, 2004 Filing 42 MEMO-ENDORSEMENT (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738) on Motion for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted pending approval of attorney admissions office. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/20/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
July 16, 2004 Filing 41 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Viet D. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Yousef Jameel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(kkc, )
July 16, 2004 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Kenneth A. Caruso in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Yousef Jameel. (Caruso, Kenneth)
July 16, 2004 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss. . Document filed by Yousef Jameel. (Caruso, Kenneth)
July 16, 2004 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Yousef Jameel. (Caruso, Kenneth)
July 15, 2004 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement. Document filed by Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss#2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit #10 Exhibit #11 Exhibit #12 Exhibit)(Steindler, Thomas)
July 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv9849, 03cv5738); that the time for defendants HRH Prince Abdullah Al Faisal Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud and Alfaisaliah Group to answer, move or otherwise respond to the extant complaint in this action is extended to 7/30/2004. In the event defendants file motions to dismiss, as anticipated, plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed on or before 9/15/2004, and defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 10/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/8/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
July 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (this document relates to all actions); the Court shall hold a status conference in the multi-district cases on 7/20/2004 at 2:00 p.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom at 500 Pearl Street. The topic of the conference will be whether the Supreme Court's 6/28/2004 decisions in Hamdi v. Rumsfeld and Rasul v. Bush relate to pending motions to serve by publication certain defendants who are allegedly in U.S. custody. Specifically, the Court would like to hear the government's position on these cases. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 7/1/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, )
June 25, 2004 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Saudi High Commission. (Attachments: #1 Mem. of Law#2 Affidavit Huffman Decl. w/ Exhs. Vol. 1#3 Affidavit Huffman Decl. w/ Exhs. Vol. 2#4 Affidavit Huffman Decl. w/ Exhs. Vol. 3)(Robbins, Lawrence)
June 18, 2004 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Andrew Caruso on behalf of Yousef Jameel (Caruso, Kenneth)
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (this document relates to all actions); in an effort to prevent this Court from ruling on letter applications before the involved parties have been fully heard and to encourage all counsel to work out their differences before seeking Court intervention, it is Ordered that letter applications to the Court must not be submitted until they are fully briefed, i.e., the parties are to work out a schedule amongst themselves and, if during the exchange of correspondence they are still unable to reach an agreement, the applying party must only submit the letters as a package to the Court after the agreed upon deadline. Such letter applications must not exceed 3 pages in length. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/17/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, )
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 03cv5738, 03cv9849); that defendant Yousef Jameel's time to answer or move with respect to the third amended complaint is extended to and including 7/16/2004; in the event Yousef Jameel moves to dismiss the third amended complaint, then (a) plaintiffs shall serve papers in opposition to such motion on or before 10/15/2004; and (b) Jameel shall serve reply papers in further support of such motion on or before 12/17/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/17/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
June 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Motion for Matthew H. Kirtland to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Nimir Petroleum Limited. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/10/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(kkc, )
June 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 (this document relates to all actions); regarding Organization of Counsel and Document Depository as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/15/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2004 (kkc, ).
June 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 (this document relates to all actions); service of the summons and complaint on a defendant not located in a foreign country shall be made in accordance with F.R.C.P. 4(m). Service of the summons and complaint upon a defendant located in a foreign country who has been named as of the date of this order shall be made by 10/15/2004, or, if a motion to effect service through alternative means has been filed with respect to that defendant, service shall be made within 90 days of a decision by this Court on the motion. Joinder of additional parties must be accomplished by 12/31/2004. Amended pleadings may be filed until 7/31/2005, after which any amendments must be approved by the Court, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15(a). All liability discovery is to be completed by 4/15/2006. The next Case Management Conference shall take place on 9/13/2004. All other deadlines and procedures are set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/15/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, )
June 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Lawrence S. Robbins dated 6/11/2004; counsel for the Saudi High Commission writes to request that the Court waive its requirement of a pre-motion conference and to grant permission to file a single motion to dismiss all of the claims against it in each of the consolidated complaints. ENDORSEMENT: Upon application of counsel for the Saudi High Commission, it is Ordered that the Sauid High Commission will file, on or before 7/7/2004, a single motion to dismiss all of the claims against it in the complaints consolidated in this multi-district litigation; and it is further Ordered that the plaintiffs will file one consolidated opposition to the motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 6/15/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
June 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney David P. Gersch for defendants Mohammed Salim bin Mahfouz, International Development Foundation, and Saudi Economic and Development Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/26/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
June 1, 2004 Filing 25 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Paul J. Hanly Jr. dated 4/12/2004; counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849 writes to request that the Court waive its requirement of a pre-motion conference in connection with a motion counsel intends to file asking this Court to reconsider the ruling of the district court in Washington, D.C., dismissing defendants Sultan bin Abdulaziz al-Saud and Turki al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz al-Saud. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The motion shall be filed by 6/18/2004; the response shall be filed by 8/13/2004; and the reply shall be filed by 8/27/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/28/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC,1:04-cv-01922-RCC,1:04-cv-01923-RCC(kkc, )
May 28, 2004 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Quash Service of Process of His Royal Highness Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud.. Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. (Hansen, Mark)
May 21, 2004 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Arab Bank, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Marooney, Richard)
May 10, 2004 Filing 22 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Sara E. Kropf dated 5/5/2004; granting counsel for defendant Prince Salman bin Abdulaziz's application to file a single motion to dismiss all of the consolidated cases in which Prince Salman is named, including Federal Insurance, on 5/10/2004, and that plaintiffs' oppositions to that motion be combined into one consolidated brief. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 5/7/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC, 1:03-cv-07036-RCC(kkc, )
April 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Substitution of Counsel; that Chadbourne & Parke LLP is substituted for McDermott, Will & Emery as counsel for defendant Yousef Jameel. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/26/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
April 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER; that within 2 weeks of the date of entry of this Order counsel for plaintiffs shall meet with counsel for defendants, either in person or by telephone conference, to negotiate a revised Proposed Case Management & Pretrial Scheduling Order #2 upon which all parties can agree, which will then be submitted to the Court for approval. If no agreement can be reached among all parties on all issues, the Proposed Case Management Order shall include, for each issue of disagreement, a brief recitation of the parties' differing positions. In any case, a Proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted to this Court no later than 4/30/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 4/5/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC(kkc, )
March 30, 2004 Filing 19 Letter addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Peter J. Kahn dated 3/18/2004; counsel writes to report to the Court regarding gathering email addresses from most of the attorneys who represents clients in these matters. Document filed by Abdulrahman Bin Mahfouz. Filed in Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC(kkc, )
March 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE; that Elizabeth Smith and Robert T. Haefele are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849, 03cv5738. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/26/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
March 22, 2004 Filing 17 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard C. Casey from Lynne Bernabei dated 3/16/2004 counsel for defendant Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. writes to request an extension of time, up to and including 4/26/2004 to respond to plaintiffs' discovery requests. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/22/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
March 22, 2004 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Motion for Ronald L. Motley, Jodi Westbrook Flowers, Donald A. Migliori, and Jeffrey S. Thompson to appear pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in 03cv9849, 03cv5738. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/22/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
March 19, 2004 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and to Quash Service of Process of His Royal Highness Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. Responses due by 5/14/2004 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of#2 Exhibit 1#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5)(Frederick, David)
March 19, 2004 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. Responses due by 5/14/2004 (Jeffress, William)
March 19, 2004 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Consolidated Complaints. Document filed by Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud. Responses due by 5/14/2004 (Jeffress, William)
March 16, 2004 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' More Definite Statement as to Defendant Yousef Abdul Latif Jameel. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Elsner, Michael)
March 15, 2004 Filing 18 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Matthew H. Kirtland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Nimir Petroleum Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:03-cv-05738-RCC(kkc, )
March 15, 2004 Case Designated ECF. (kkc, )
March 10, 2004 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. John J. Walsh hereby withdraws its appearance as co-counsel for defendants African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jar Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Sara Trust, York Foundation, which was noticed on 1/27/04. (jco, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).
March 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Michael K. Kellogg, Mark C. Hansen, David C. Frederick, Michael J. Guzman, and J.C. Rozendaal to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/10/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
March 10, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order No. 1 (this document relates to all actions); all attorneys who have been admitted to this Court shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by 3/5/2004. All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at U.S.D.C. ? S.D.N.Y., 500 Pearl Street, Room 249. In addition to the documentation required by Local Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include with their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court and a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form. Pro hac vice motions should be submitted by 3/15/2004. Peter Kahn, Esq., from the law firm of Williams & Connolly, has offered to compile for the Court a list of all participating attorneys? email address. All attorneys who wish to receive a correspondence regarding this case are directed to submit their email address to Mr. Kahn via email or fax. Mr. Kahn?s fax number is (202) 434-5245 and his email address is pkahn@wc.com. If you have questions about this process, you can reach Mr. Kahn by phone at (202) 434-5045. In order to facilitate the electronic filing of motions to dismiss, the motion schedule set forth at the 3/1/2004 conference is amended as follows: moving papers shall be filed on 3/19/2004; responses shall be filed by 5/14/2004; and reply papers shall be submitted no later than 5/28/2004. Motions shall be filed electronically and need not be fully briefed when filed; however, as per Judge Casey?s individual practice rules, courtesy copies of fully briefed motions shall be filed with chambers, along with a diskette containing an electronic version of the documents. Plaintiffs may, without further leave of court, add or remove parties by supplemental pleadings as further set forth in this Order. A named defendant as to whom the complaint contains no allegations may move for a more definite statement and the motion will be granted. The following cases shall be consolidated into 03 MDL 1570: Federal Ins. Co. v. Al Qaida, 03 Civ. 6978 (RCC); Burnett v. Al Baraka Inv. And Dev. Corp., 03 Civ. 5738 (RCC); and Barrera v. Al Queda Islamic Army, 03 Civ. 7036 (RCC). The parties may move to sever these actions at the completion of discovery. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 3/3/2004) Filed in Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09848-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC, 1:04-cv-01076-RCC(kkc, )
March 10, 2004 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Case consolidated with 1:03-md-1570. (kkc, )
March 9, 2004 Filing 8 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Michael K. Kellogg, Mark C. Hansen, David C. Frederick, Michael J. Guzman, and J.C. Rozendaal to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Prince Turki Al-Faisal bin Abdulaziz Al-Saud. Document filed by Turki Al Faisal Al Saud. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael K. Kellogg#2 Affidavit of Mark C. Hansen#3 Affidavit of David C. Frederick#4 Affidavit of Michael J. Guzman#5 Affidavit of John C. Rozendaal)Filed in Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-RCC,1:02-cv-06977-RCC,1:02-cv-07300-RCC-FM,1:03-cv-05071-RCC,1:03-cv-05493-RCC, 1:03-cv-05738-RCC,1:03-cv-06978-RCC,1:03-cv-07036-RCC,1:03-cv-09849-RCC(kkc, )
January 28, 2004 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Walsh on behalf of African Muslim Agency, Grove Corporate, Inc., Heritage Education Trust, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Mar-Jac Investments, Inc., Reston Investments, Inc., Safa Trust (NDB) (pa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).
January 26, 2004 Set Answer Due Date purs. to #5 Memo Endorsement as to Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi answer due on 3/1/2004. (jsa, )
January 26, 2004 Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT that the defendant Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi's time to answer the third amended complaint is extended to 3/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2004) (jsa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).
January 26, 2004 Set Answer Due Date purs. to #4 Memo Endorsement as to Yousef Jameel answer due on 3/1/2004. (jsa, )
January 26, 2004 Filing 4 MEMO ENDORSEMENT Defendant Yousef Jameel's time to answer the third amended complaint is extended to 3/1/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 1/23/2004) (jsa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).
October 14, 2003 Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (gf)
October 14, 2003 Filing 2 Notice of Case to Judge Richard C. Casey . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Paul J. Hanly Jr., Jayne Conroy . (gf) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).
October 14, 2003 Case accepted as related to 1:02cv6977 . Notice of assignment to follow. (gf)
September 3, 2003 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mohammed Bin Abdullah Al Jomaith, Aaran Money Wire Service, Inc., Youssef Abdaoui, Salahuddin Abduljawad, Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah, Ibrahim S. Abdullah, Hussein Mahmud Abdullkadir, Mohammed Iqbal Abdurrahman, Abu Hafs The Mauritanian, Additional Defendants 1-1000, Abdirasik Aden, Ibrahim Muhammed Afandi, African Muslim Agency, Haji Abdul Manan Agha, Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad, Syed Suleman Ahmer, Akida Bank Private Limited, Akida Investment Co. LTD., Mohammed Amine Akli, Ghasoub Al Abrash, Wadi Al Aqiq, Al Baraka Investment and Development Corporation, Al Barakaat Exchange LLC, Al Farooq Mosque, Al Haramain Foundation, Al Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Ahmad Al Harbi, Yassin Abdullah Al Kadi, Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa, Mohammed Al Massari, Mohammed Ali Hasan Al Moayad, Al Qaeda, Sulaiman Bin Abdul Aziz Al Rajhi, Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, Al Rajhi Banking and Investment, Essam Al Ridi, Mohammad Khair Al Saqqa, Naif Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Sultan Bin Abdul Aziz Al Saud, Turki Al Faisal Al Saud, Al Shamal Islamic Bank, Abu Rida Al Suri, Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Al Taqwa Trade Property and Industry Company Limited, Hassan Al Turabi, Sayf Al-Adl, Sulaiman Al-Ali, Taha Jaber Al-Alwani, Mohammed Hussein Al-Amoudi, Asbat Al-Ansar, Aqueel Al-Aqueel, Al-Baraka Bankcorp, Inc., Al-Barakat Bank of Somalia (BSS), Al-Barakat Finance Group, Al-Barakat Financial Holding Co., Al-Barakat Global Telecommunications, Al-Barakat Group of Companies Somalia Limited, Al-Barakat International, Al-Barakat Investments, Al-Barakat Wiring Service, Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, Khalid Al-Fawwaz, Abu Qatada Al-Filistini, Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi, Muhammad Al-Hamati, Al-Hamati Sweets Bakeries, Amin Al-Haq, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Safar Al-Hawali, Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Sami Omar Al-Hussayen, Lujain Al-Iman, Ansar Al-Islam (AI), Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya, Al Gama'a Al-Islamiyya, Mohammed Al-Issai, Mansour Al-Kadi, Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr, Makhtab Al-Khidamat, Ibn Al-Shaykh Al-Libi, Anas Al-Liby, Abdullah M. Al-Mahdi, Abu Hamza Al-Masri, Abu Ibrahim Al-Masri, Abdul Al-Moslah, Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil, Abdelkarim Hussein Mohamed Al-Nasser, Al-Nur Honey Press Shops, Salman Al-Ouda, Abdullah Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Khalid Sulaiman Al-Rajhi, Al-Rashid Trust, Saqar Al-Sadawi, Sa'd Al-Sharif, Al-Shifa' Honey Press for Industry and Commerce, Yassir Al-Sirri, Tareq M. Al-Swaidan, Hisham Al-Talib, Ibrahim Salih Mohammed Al-Yacoub, Abu Musab Al-Zarqawi, Ayman Al-Zawahiri, Abdurahman Alamoudi. Related document: #1 Complaint.(ae, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).
August 1, 2003 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Richard C. Casey as possibly related to 1:02-cv-6977. (gmo) Modified on 09/05/2003
August 1, 2003 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 481060. (gmo) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2004 (kkc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett, et al v. Al Baraka Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayadi Chafiq Bin Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Rida Al Suri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohrez Amdouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Ibrahim Al-Mughassil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Sa'id Al-Kadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Atwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssef Abdaoui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of Islamic Cooperation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Qatada Al-Filistini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haji Abdul Manan Agha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tariq Anwar Al-Sayyid Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Saed Bin Ali El-Hooric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanabel Al Kheer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdalrahman Alarnout Abu Aljer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansar Al-Islam (AI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saar Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Musti Rashid Ahmad Ladehyanoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondher Baazzoui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurjaman Riduan Ismuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Global Relief Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasan Izz-Al-Din
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al-Nur Honey Press Shops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Atif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Assembly of Muslim Youth
Represented By: Omar T. Mohammedi
Represented By: Frederick James Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionel Dumont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Shamal Islamic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anas Al-Liby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirwat Salah Shihara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy International Relief Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Amine Akli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moussa Ben Amor Essaadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mounir Ben Habib Jerraya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Abu Omar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Barakaat Exchange LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saudi High Commission
Represented By: Lawrence Saul Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Jamal Al Khalifa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhsin Musa Matwalli Atwah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamdouh Mahmud Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustafa Mohamed Fadhil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Friedrich Arman Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Islamic Relief Organization
Represented By: Martin Francis McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nedal Saleb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imad Eddin Barakat Yarkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riad Hijazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yassir Al-Sirri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osama Bin Laden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Al-Hamati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdullah Ahmed Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amin Al-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaish-I-Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaykh Sa'id
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Hasni Rarrbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abd Al-Hadi al-Iraqi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiheb Ben Mohamed Ayari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammed Galeb Kalaje Zouaydi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Abdul Jalil Batterjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al-Barakat International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheikh Abdullah Azzam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Hafs The Mauritanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Mohammed Hamed Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enaam Mahmoud Arnaout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muslim World League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfaisaliah Group
Represented By: T. Barry Kingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Cultural Institute of Milan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustaf Ahmed Al-Hisawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fahid Mohammed Ally Msalam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fouzi Iendoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Salah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Khalfan Ghailani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Itihaad Al-Islamiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Baraka Investme